Draughon v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Donald Draughon
Defendant: United States of America, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Office of the Attorney General and United States Attorney
Case Number: 2:2014cv02264
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 226 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. The parties may stipulate to a reduced fee award and submit to the Court a proposed order reflecting such reduction and a revised distribution as set forth above. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 9/19/2018. (hl)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Movants Andrea Brightwell and Denise Cumberland's Motions to Serve as Next Friend Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 17(c)(2) 192 , 193 are granted. They shall be adde d to the docket sheet as interested parties. Their counsel shall file an entry of appearance on their behalf to ensure proper noticing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT that Movants' Amended Motion to Intervene 198 is denied. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 4/6/2018. (hl)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 2/23/2018. (hl)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 132 Motion to Exclude; granting 143 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/15/2017. (ydm)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants's 15 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For Transfer of Venue. The case is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Department of Veterans Affairs, Office of Attorn ey General, and United States Attorney. Plaintiff's survival claim is dismissed with prejudice. The motion is otherwise denied. Further, counsel shall be appointed to represent Plaintiff Donald Draughon. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 05/01/2015. Mailed to pro se plaintiff Donald Draughon by regular mail. (mg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draughon v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Draughon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?