McDermed et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed and Georgia Lee Iocco
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Not Classified By Court: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv02430
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Shawnee
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: AFFIRMING decision of the District Court. (Appeal No. 17-3105) (Attachment: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #181 Notice of Appeal. ( Appeal No. 17-3105) (kao)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #181 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Kjorlie, Eric)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 5/3/17 and assigned Appeal No. 17-3105 re: #181 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Paul C. McDermed. (kao)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #181 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #180 Memorandum and Order on #175 Motion for Reconsideration, and Motion for New Trial by Plaintiff Paul C. McDermed. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4163184. (Kjorlie, Eric)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #175 Motion for Reconsideration, and #175 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/26/2017. (mg)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re: #175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MO . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Response)(Kjorlie, Eric) (Modified on 1/4/2017 to link Reply to Response to correct motion, #175 Motion for Reconsideration per Chambers request (hl).)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MO, #175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Ward, Steven)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for New Trial Response deadline 9/28/2016. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/9/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for New Trial by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ward, Steven)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Judgment, #169 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment , MOTION for New Trial ( Response deadline 9/14/2016) by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration/ New Trial, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P)(Kjorlie, Eric)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #173 Motion for Extension of Time to File their Rule 59 Motion. Motion deadline 8/31/2016. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/15/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Rule 59 Motion to Non-Dispositional Order (Doc.169) by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 JUDGMENT: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 99) is granted. The case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/4/16. (hw)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER finding as moot #117 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #118 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #146 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #166 Motion to Continue. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/4/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/3/16. (hw)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells; granting #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan; denying #111 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Shawn Parcells; denying #112 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert David McLellan. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/3/16. (hw)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #166 MOTION to Continue Trial Setting for Special Setting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ward, Steven)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #166 MOTION to Continue Trial Setting for Special Setting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D")(Kjorlie, Eric)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to Continue Trial Setting for Special Setting by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ward, Steven)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #160 Defendant's Motion for additional time to depose Dr. John Jones, a physician identified by plaintiffs. Defendants are granted additional 30 days to and including June 12, 2016, to schedule and conclude the deposition of Dr. John Jones Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 06/03/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 AMENDED EXHIBIT K IN SUPPORT of #103 Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs. (CD FILED CONVENTIONALLY)(kao) One copy provided to Judge Murguia's chambers; one copy maintained in clerk's office.
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/26/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Conventionally Plaintiffs' Response/Motion to Strike Amended Exhibit "K" by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #143 Order on Motion to Strike . (Kjorlie, Eric)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for extension of time to Depose Dr. John Jones, a Physician Identified by Plaintiffs by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ward, Steven)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #156 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit B by Defendant Ford Motor Company(Ward, Steven)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/3/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Ward, Steven)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #146 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of David R. McLellan and Legal Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ward, Steven)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Ben K. Upp re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #152 by Defendant Ford Motor Company(Ward, Steven)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #152 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ben K. Upp for Ford Motor Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/20/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James re #152 MOTION for attorney Ben K. Upp to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3749141.) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/20/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for attorney Ben K. Upp to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3749141.) by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Ward, Steven)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Dr. Bradley Woods on May 12, 2016 (Ward, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #146 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of David R. McLellan and Legal Memorandum in Support, #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan, #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Kjorlie, Eric)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #140 Motion for Leave of Court to Take the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Designated Corporate Representative. Each party shall bear its own costs related to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/8/2016. (ck)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' [Doc. 131] Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Ward, Steven)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts of McClellan Depo)(Ward, Steven)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of David R. McLellan and Legal Memorandum in Support by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David McLellan)(Ward, Steven)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ward, Steven)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #140 MOTION for Leave to file Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Take Deposition Defendant Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ward, Steven)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #96 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/1/2016. (byk)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 CD EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan, Exhibit D (Doc 132-5) and #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Exhibit L (130-19) by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed. CD filed conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's Office. (hw)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James re #140 MOTION for Leave to file Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Take Deposition Defendant Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative filed by Diane L. McDermed, Georgia Lee Iocco, Paul C. McDermed Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/29/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to file Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Take Deposition Defendant Ford Motor Company's Corporate Representative by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Kjorlie, Eric)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #135 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan, #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells Reply deadline 4/4/2016. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/24/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #136 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File "D" and "L" Conventionally. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/24/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Brad E. Miller as to Ford Motor Company (Ward, Steven)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File "D" and "L" Conventionally by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "D", #2 Exhibit "L")(Kjorlie, Eric)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #130 Response to Motion,,, #127 Response to Motion,, #132 Response to Motion,, by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email)(Ward, Steven)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying #108 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Response; and denying #121 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's (Second) Motion to Strike. Defendant argues that Plaintiffs' #103 Response, filed on February 2, 2015, is untimely as it was not filed within the 14-day time period established by D. Kan. Rule 6.1(d)(1). Plaintiffs do not dispute that their response is untimely filed, but request that the Court exercise its inherent equitable power, which includes the power to grant Plaintiffs the right to file their response out of time and for the Court to determine the issues raised in #96 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures on the merits. Although Plaintiffs' response is untimely by five days, the Court will grant Plaintiffs leave to file it out of time. The length of the delay is short and Defendant is not prejudiced by such short delay over a weekend. The Court will consider Plaintiffs' #103 Response opposing #96 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures. Because the Court is considering Plaintiffs' #103 Response and Plaintiffs timely filed their subsequent #114 Response to #108 Defendant's (Second) Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response, the Court finds no reason to strike that #114 Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/23/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve and Compel Answers and Production of Documents Pertaining to Non-Litigated Claims; granting #124 Defendant's Motion to Strike; and striking #115 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs, however, may file a motion for leave to depose Mr. Krishnaswami a second time in strict accordance with the requirements set out in the Order. Any such motion must be filed by 3/25/2016. To expedite consideration of the motion, Defendant's response to any such motion will be due seven days after the motion is filed and no reply will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/17/2016. (byk)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "A-A", #3 Exhibit "A-B", #4 Exhibit "A-C", #5 Exhibit "A-D", #6 Exhibit "A-E", #7 Exhibit "B", #8 Exhibit "B-A", #9 Exhibit "B-B", #10 Exhibit "B-C", #11 Exhibit "B-D", #12 Exhibit "C", #13 Exhibit "D")(Kjorlie, Eric)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED INCORRECTLY - SEE DOCKET #132 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "A-A", #3 Exhibit "A-B", #4 Exhibit "A-C", #5 Exhibit "A-D", #6 Exhibit "A-D", #7 Exhibit "B", #8 Exhibit "B-A", #9 Exhibit "B-B", #10 Exhibit "B-C", #11 Exhibit "B-D", #12 Exhibit "C", #13 Exhibit "D")(Kjorlie, Eric) Modified on 3/15/2016 (hw).
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan BSME (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "G-A", #9 Exhibit "G-B", #10 Exhibit "G-C", #11 Exhibit "G-D", #12 Exhibit "G-E", #13 Exhibit "G-F", #14 Exhibit "G-G-Page 18", #15 Exhibit "G-H", #16 Exhibit "G-I-Page 20", #17 Exhibit "G-J", #18 Exhibit "G-K", #19 Exhibit "G-L")(Kjorlie, Eric)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #118 MOTION in Limine Dr. William R. Scott/Cynthia M. Day M.D. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. William R. Scott, Ford's Biomechanical Engineer's Testimony Re Medical Causation or Injuries and Death; and Dr. Scott's In-House Radiologist Cynthia M. Day, M.D.'s Report/Testify [Doc. 118] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of William Scott, #2 Exhibit CV of William Scott, #3 Exhibit Excerpts of William Scott Depo, #4 Exhibit Testimony History of William Scott)(Miller, Brad)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #117 MOTION in Limine Ford's Expert Gregory A. Miller, P.E. re Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendant's Designated Expert Witness, Gregory A. Miller, P.E., to Testify Regarding Defendant's Compliance With Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards (Miller, Brad)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells BS, MSHAPIA, PA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "G-A", #9 Exhibit "G-B", #10 Exhibit "G-C-First Article", #11 Exhibit "G-C-Second Article-Part 1", #12 Exhibit "G-C-Second Article- Part 2", #13 Exhibit "G-D")(Kjorlie, Eric)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/11/2016 regarding Plaintiffs' #93 Motion and #115 Renewed Motion to Compel and Defendant's #96 #108 #121 #124 Motions to Strike. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Eric Kjorlie. Defendant appeared through counsel, Brad Miller and Steven Ward. The Court advised Defendant that it need not file a response to Plaintiff's #115 Renewed Motion to Compel. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James re #124 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Preserve and Compel Answers and Production of Documents Pertaining to Non-Litigated Claims and List of Lawsuits [Doc. 115] filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/9/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Preserve and Compel Answers and Production of Documents Pertaining to Non-Litigated Claims and List of Lawsuits [Doc. 115] by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Miller, Brad)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James regarding Plaintiffs' #93 Motion and #115 Renewed Motion to Compel and Defendant's #96 #108 #121 Motions to Strike. PARTICIPATING COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/8/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Teresa J. James re #121 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Ford Motor Company's (Second) Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Their Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures [Doc. 114]; Reply in Support of Ford Motor Company's Mot filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/8/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Ford Motor Company's (Second) Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Their Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures [Doc. 114]; Reply in Support of Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Response to Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike [Doc. 108]; and Ford Motor Company's Sur-Sur-Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures [Doc. 96]. by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Miller, Brad)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #112 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert David McLellan (Miller, Brad)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #111 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Shawn Parcells (Miller, Brad)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION in Limine Dr. William R. Scott/Cynthia M. Day M.D. by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shawn L. Parcells, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I", #11 Exhibit "J", #12 Exhibit "K", #13 Exhibit "L", #14 Excerpts of Deposition "B")(Kjorlie, Eric) (Main Document 118 replaced on 3/2/2016. Original document was incorrect.) (hw). Modified on 3/2/2016 to replace main document(hw).
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION in Limine Ford's Expert Gregory A. Miller, P.E. by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James re #115 Second MOTION to Compel and Preserve (Doc. 93) filed by Diane L. McDermed, Georgia Lee Iocco, Paul C. McDermed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/29/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Second MOTION to Compel and Preserve (Doc. 93) by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiffs' Counsel Renewed Motion to Preserve and Compel, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F")(Kjorlie, Eric)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #108 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Response to Ford's Motion to Strike and Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's (Second) Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I", #11 Exhibit "J", #12 Exhibit "K", #13 Exhibit "L")(Kjorlie, Eric)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response deadline 3/14/2016. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/19/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert David McLellan by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Shawn Parcells by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To File Response to Defendant Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as to #100 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Teresa J. James re #108 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Response to Ford's Motion to Strike and Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/16/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Response to Ford's Motion to Strike and Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Miller, Brad)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CD EXHIBIT (K) IN SUPPORT of #103 Response to #96 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures and Memorandum of Law by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed. CD filed conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's Office pursuant to the Court's 106 Order. (mg)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #104 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Order Granting Leave to File Conventionally Plaintiffs' Response Exhibit "K." Plaintiffs are permitted to conventionally file a CD containing a video as Exhibit "K" to their #103 Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures. Plaintiffs shall forthwith submit the referenced CD to the Clerk's Office for conventional filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/5/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James re #104 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Plaintiffs' Response Exhibit "K" Conventionally filed by Diane L. McDermed, Georgia Lee Iocco, Paul C. McDermed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/4/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Plaintiffs' Response Exhibit "K" Conventionally by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #96 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures and Memoradum of Law (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits "A"-"N", #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I", #11 Exhibit "J", #12 Exhibit "K", #13 Exhibit "L", #14 Exhibit "M", #15 Exhibit "N")(Kjorlie, Eric)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resume of David McLellan, #2 Excerpts of Deposition of David McLellan)(Miller, Brad)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Excerpts of Deposition of Shawn Parcells)(Miller, Brad)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Excerpts of Deposition of Shawn Parcells, #2 Excerpts of Deposition of David McLellan, #3 Excerpts of Deposition of Emma Edwards)(Miller, Brad)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Miller, Brad)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PRETRIAL ORDER. Dispositive motion deadline 2/1/2016. Jury Trial set for 9/6/2016 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Estimated trial time 10-12 days. If no dispositive motions are timely filed, or if the case remains at issue after timely dispositive motions have been decided, then the trial judge will enter an order or convene another pretrial conference to discuss, among other things, setting deadlines for filing final witness and exhibit disclosures, exchanging and marking trial exhibits, designating deposition testimony for presentation at trial, motions in limine, and proposed jury instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/26/2016. (byk)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #93 MOTION to Compel Discovery/Non-Litigated Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Miller, Brad)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, Part 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, Part 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Miller, Brad)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER from FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held by telephone on 1/12/2016 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The parties advised that they have made substantial progress toward resolving the discovery disputes raised in #93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve and Compel Answers and Production of Documents Pertaining to Non-Litigated Claims. On the Court's own motion, the deadline for either Defendant to file its response or for the parties to file a stipulation that the issues in Plaintiffs' motion have been resolved and it can be withdrawn is extended to 1/18/2016. Plaintiffs' request to amend the pleadings to add a duty to warn claim based upon negligence is denied as untimely. At the unopposed request of Defendant, the current 2/12/2016 mediation deadline is continued indefinitely. After the parties have filed their motions to exclude expert testimony, they shall confer and discuss whether mediation or another ADR process would be fruitful. The parties shall submit their revised Pretrial Order, with the changes discussed at the Pretrial Conference, no later than 1/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/12/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Ford Motor Company's Settlement Counter-Proposal by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Compel Discovery/Non-Litigated Claims by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Kjorlie, Eric)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE (re Plaintiffs' Position Pertaining to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures) by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #90 Order. (Kjorlie, Eric)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #90 Order,,, Plaintiffs' Good Faith Settlement Demand. (Kjorlie, Eric)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS FROM DECEMBER 11, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE. If counsel cannot reach an agreement regarding the propriety of Plaintiffs' 11/24/2015 supplemental initial disclosures, then Defendant may file a motion to strike and/or exclude such supplemental disclosures by 1/15/2016. Any motion by Plaintiffs to compel the non-litigated claims discovery from Defendant shall be filed by 12/31/2015. The deadline for Plaintiffs to submit a good-faith settlement proposal to Defendant is extended to 12/21/2015. The deadline for Defendant to make a good-faith settlement counter-proposal is extended to 1/15/2016. The deadline for the parties to jointly file a mediation notice, or submit their respective confidential settlement reports, is extended to 2/5/2016. The deadline for the parties to complete mediation remains 2/12/2016. See Order for more deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/15/2015. (byk)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2015. Written order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/11/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James to discuss discovery issues raised by the parties, including the supplementation of initial disclosures and the exchange of good faith settlement proposals. Participating counsel should dial 913-735-2279 to join the telephone conferences with the Magistrate Judge. Please do not call more than five minutes prior to the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/10/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to #78 Notice to Take Deposition by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed of taking deposition of William R. "Mike" Scott, Ph.D. on December 18, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Kjorlie, Eric)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 (e) (1) Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed. (Kjorlie, Eric)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed of taking deposition of Ram Krishnaswami Rule 30(b)(6) on December 4, 2015 (Kjorlie, Eric)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Leave to Extend Discovery Deadline only for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of Defendant Ford's expert witness. The Scheduling Order deadline for Plaintiffs to complete the deposition of Defendant Ford's designated expert witness, Dr. William "Mike" R. Scott, is hereby extended to 12/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/18/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Second MOTION for Leave For Leave To Extend Discovery Deadline by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Kjorlie, Eric)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER from DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held by telephone on 11/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Plaintiff appeared through administrator Diane McDermed and counsel, Eric Kjorlie. Defendant appeared through counsel, Brad E. Miller and Steven E. Ward. At the request of the parties, the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant's corporate representative will be taken on 12/8/2015. Counsel will attempt to reschedule the deposition of Defendant Ford's designated expert witness, Dr. William "Mike" R. Scott, to a mutually agreeable date before 12/15/2015, but if not possible will file a motion prior to that date requesting an extension of the discovery deadline for the limited purpose of completing Dr. Scott's deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/10/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed of taking deposition of William R. "Mike" Scott, Ph.D. on December 8, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Kjorlie, Eric)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting as unopposed #76 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Extend Discovery Deadline only for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of Defendant Ford's expert witness. The Scheduling Order deadline for Plaintiff to complete the deposition of Defendant Ford's designated expert witness, Dr. William "Mike" R. Scott, is hereby extended to 12/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/6/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed of taking deposition of Corporate Representative/Spokesperson on November 16, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Kjorlie, Eric)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time Leave to Extend Discovery Deadline by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Kjorlie, Eric)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Emma Edwards on October 16, 2015 (Miller, Brad)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Expert Witness Designations and Expert Reports pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #53 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike the Supplemental Attachments to Plaintiffs' Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/3/2015. (byk)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Matthew Orozco on October 16, 2015 (Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of David Hamersky on October 15, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Mark Johnson on October 15, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Ryan Neill on October 15, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Daniel McCollum on October 15, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Clinton Bearden on October 15, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Robert Simmons on October 16, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Evan Friedrichs on October 16, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Sara Friedrichs on October 16, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Bradley Ginter on October 16, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Kelly Adams on October 16, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Miller, Brad)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED ORDER GRANTING #54 FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE REMOVAL AND NON-DESTRUCTIVE TESTING OF THE SUBJECT FRONT RIGHT PASSENGER SEAT BELT ASSEMBLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/24/2015. (byk)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of David R. McLellan on August 25, 2015 (Miller, Brad)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Shawn L. Parcells, BS, MSHAPI, PA on August 19, 2015 (Miller, Brad)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brad)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brad)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: #53 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Attachments to Plaintiffs' Expert Mr. David McLellan's Report and Memorandum of Law in Support (Miller, Brad)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #53 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Attachments to Plaintiffs' Expert Mr. David McLellan's Report and Memorandum of Law in Support in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit "A"McLellan e-mail to Plaintiff's Attorney of 6-11-15 attached Final Expert Report, #3 Exhibit "B" Plaintiifs' Attorney e-mail to Defendant's Counsel attaching Final Expert Report, #4 Exhibit "C" 6-11-15 e-mail from Plaintiffs' Counsel's Office to Defendant's Counsel's Office containing fifteen (15) demo photographs, #5 Exhibit "D" 6-26-15 e-mail from Plaintiffs' Counsel's Office yo Defendant's Counsel's Office containing six (6) supplemental attachments to McLellan's Final Expert Report of 6-11-15, #6 Exhibit "E" Contour air bag demo photo, #7 Exhibit "F" NHTSA Abtract DOT HS 811 202 - "Fatalities in Frontal Crashes...", #8 Exhibit "G" CSU Study, "Increased Injuries and Death due to Air Bags", #9 Exhibit "H" NMTRI Publication 2008-40 "Abdominal Injury in Frontal Crashes...", #10 Exhibit "I" Abstract "Patterns of Abdominal Injuries in Frontal Automotive Crashes No. 98-S1-W-26, #11 Exhibit "J"Ford Abstract SAE #2001-22-0002)(Kjorlie, Eric)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Compel the Removal and Non-Destructive Testing of the Subject Front Right Passenger Seat Belt Assembly and Suggestions in Support by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McLellan Expert Report-Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Testing Protocol-Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Gregory Miller Affidavit-Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Certificate of Service-Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's 1st RFP-Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Email and attachments of 7-7-2015-Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Email of 7-20-2015-Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Email of 7-22-2015-Exhibit H)(Miller, Brad)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Attachments to Plaintiffs' Expert Mr. David McLellan's Report and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Miller, Brad)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Ali McDermed on July 13, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Michelle Beavers on July 13, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Bonnie Stovall on July 14, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Charles Stovall on July 14, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Paul McDermed on July 14, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company of taking deposition of Emma Edwards on July 14, 2015 (Ward, Steven)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service of Ford's Response to Plaintiff's RFP by Ford Motor Company. (Ward, Steven)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service for Ford's Answers to Plaintiffs' Second INT by Ford Motor Company. (Ward, Steven)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed Re #21 Scheduling Order, Supplemental Attachments. (Kjorlie, Eric)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #41 the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Jointly filed mediation notice, or confidential settlement reports to the Magistrate Judge due 12/29/2015. Telephone Discovery Status Conference set for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Discovery deadline 12/15/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2016 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel should dial 913-735-2279 to join the telephone conferences with the Magistrate Judge. Please do not call more than five minutes prior to the scheduled time. Dispositive motion deadline 2/1/2016. Mediation deadline 2/12/2016. Jury Trial set on a docket beginning on 9/6/2016 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. See Amended Scheduling Order for more deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/24/2015. (byk)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/23/2015 re the parties' #41 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Amended Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Ward, Steven)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #21 Scheduling Order, Certificate of Compliance/Designation of Expert Witness. (Kjorlie, Eric)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed re #21 Scheduling Order, Supplemental Certificate of Compliance. (Kjorlie, Eric)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Diane L. McDermed of DISCOVERY (Kjorlie, Eric)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ford's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. The Discovery Status Conference, presently set for 6/17/2015, is hereby continued to 6/23/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Counsel shall dial 913-735-2279 to join the conference. The conference line will open 5 minutes before the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/4/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. The Discovery Status Conference, presently set for 6/10/2015, is hereby continued one week to 6/17/2015 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Counsel shall dial 913-735-2279 to join the conference. The conference line will open 5 minutes before the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/30/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Defendant Ford Motor Company's unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories. The deadline for Defendant to serve its answers and objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories is hereby extended to May 4, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/30/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Miller, Brad)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Expert Witness Deadlines. For good cause shown, the #21 Scheduling Order deadline for Plaintiffs to produce their experts for depositions is hereby extended to 6/15/2015. Defendant's deadline to serve its disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2), including reports from retained experts, is extended to 7/1/2015. Defendant's deadline to produce its experts for depositions is extended to 8/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/21/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Witness Deadlines by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Miller, Brad)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Kenneth J. Morton as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Schaffer, Mark)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Diane L. McDermed of Discovery (Kjorlie, Eric)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed Re: #21 Scheduling Order (Kjorlie, Eric)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Diane L. McDermed of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents all Plaintiffs (Kjorlie, Eric)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Plaintiffs. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs are granted an additional thirty (30) days, up to and including 2/4/2015, in which to respond to Defendant Ford Motor Company's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/5/2015. (byk)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DESIGNATION OF COMPARATIVE FAULT by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Discovery Requests as to #22 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Georgia Lee Iocco, Diane L. McDermed, Paul C. McDermed (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Kjorlie, Eric)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER limiting the disclosure and use of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/29/2014. (byk)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Plaintiffs by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 7/1/2015. Discovery Status Conference set for 6/10/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Discovery deadline 11/13/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2015 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Both telephone conferences will be conducted as a Meet Me dial-in conference call, requiring counsel to dial 913-735-2279 to join the conference. Dispositive motion deadline 12/29/2015. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Estimated trial time 10 days. See Scheduling Order for other deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/3/2014. (byk)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2014. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ck)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Scheduling Conference reset for 12/2/2014 at 02:30 PM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Parties please dial in to 913-735-2279. (ck)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures and Appendix by Diane L. McDermed. (Kjorlie, Eric)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond or Serve Objections to Subpoena filed by non-party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. For good cause shown, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(d)(2)(B) deadline for the subpoenaed party, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, to serve its objection or response to Defendant's subpoena requesting its claim file is hereby extended ten (10) days, up to and including 12/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/25/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond or Serve Objections to Subpoena by Objector State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Morton, Kenneth)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth J. Morton on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morton, Kenneth)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Ford Motor Company. (Miller, Brad)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sherry A. Rozell and Rodney E. Loomer for Ford Motor Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/20/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Rodney E. Loomer to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3238289.) by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Ward, Steven)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Sherry A. Rozell to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3238284.) by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration ECF Registration Form)(Ward, Steven)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company executed upon State Farm Auto Claims on 11-11-2014 by Regular Mail (Miller, Brad)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company executed upon Key Insurance Company on 11-11-2014 by Regular Mail (Miller, Brad)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: (ck) Modified on 10/9/2014 to block from public view. (kao)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2014 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline: 11/25/2014. The report must follow the prescribed form and must be submitted electronically in.pdf format as an attachment to an e-mail sent to ksd_james_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. It must not be filed with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/9/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ck) Modified on 10/9/2014 to correct date by which completed report of parties planning conference is due. Correct date is 11/25/14. (kao)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Ward, Steven)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Mailing Complaint and Designation of Place of Trial by Diane L. McDermed re #3 Designation of Place of Trial, #1 Complaint (Kjorlie, Eric)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Diane L. McDermed upon All Plaintiffs (Kjorlie, Eric)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Diane L. McDermed - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kjorlie, Eric)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Diane L. McDermed . (Kjorlie, Eric)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3159073.), filed by Diane L. McDermed .(Kjorlie, Eric)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford Motor Company. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney for service.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermed et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L. McDermed
Represented By: Eric Kjorlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. McDermed
Represented By: Eric Kjorlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Lee Iocco
Represented By: Eric Kjorlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ben K. Upp
Represented By: Brad E. Miller
Represented By: Rodney E. Loomer
Represented By: Sherry A. Rozell
Represented By: Steven E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth J. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?