In Re: Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation
Plaintiff: Eagle-View Dairy, LLC, Michael D. Tiede, Frank Hagenmaier, Thomas R. Busch, Martin W. Irwin, Duane Hess, Gaikowski Farms, Inc., Gary Vontalge, Larry Appledorn, Mary Lee Framstad, Joe Smith, Ned Schroeder, Don Angel, John C. Anderson, Old River Farms, Matthew Sondgeroth, Susan M. Briese, Dreyer Farms, Corp., Colleen Ann Kosen, Kenneth Ray Bonin, Gregory D. Clampitt, D Bar D Farms Partnership, Tracy J. Cox, Morris Wildermuth, Lane Erlandson, David B. Mertz, Abler Farms, Inc., Aaron D. Jackson, Carlton O. Schely, Peggy Jo Tersteeg, Caillier Farms, Harold P. Schlimgen, Kent Holler, Miller Brothers Enterprises, Inc., Hill Crest Farms, Inc., LeRoy Erickson, Ronald Egan, Kent Loran Ableidinger, Michael Degner, Linville Farms, Daryl J. Pernat, Lori Ash, Troy Jerome Irlbeck, Robbins Farm, Inc., Lankow Farms, Inc., James J. Tyler, Whispering Oats Farms, Troy Anliker, Jeff A. Demers, Sheldon Onderstal, David Ristau, Diane Gerhardt, A. M. Mitchell, Glenn Jostes, Pleasant Spring Farm, Inc., Charles Arthur Liesinger, Matthew Oswald, Mary J. Meginnes, Gordon Seggebrush, Friars Point Farms, Todd Duane Schilling, Jennifer Frank, Roger Wittrock, Jason Rick Mettler, M & S Rhodes, Inc., Michael J. Lebrun, Brad W. Thompson, Patrick Rocconi Farms, Will P. Gourlay, Neil C. Blume, Norbert A. Hoerner, Arthur H. Froehling, T-P Rocconi Farms, Inc., Joel J. Lorenz, William Thomas Carr, Glen David Brown, Taylor Farms, Arnold V. Olson Family Partnership, Le Repedur, Delmar Bell, Jeremy Becker, SSP Farms, Inc., Bernie Jark, Dean A. Goetz, Rail Transfer, Incorporated, Michael W. Schroedter, Leonard Jenson, Daniel Lahrman Farms, Inc., Mason Kuhn, Terwey Bros PRT, Joseph P. Graves, Kelly Johnson, David Adams Farms, Inc., Michael Traxinger, Gary Richter, Rudolph P. Itzen, Ken Merryfield, Robert G. Weber, Travis John Rogahn, Todd Seefeldt, James C. Shortt Trust, Matthew Louis Anderson, Beulah J. Imming, Bryan Michael Kerkaert, Shipman & Sons, Inc., Mark J. Fischbach, Jerald L. Campbell, Ohlau Joint Living Trust, Don Zebedee & Sons, Inc., Mark Parrish, Randall W. Miller, Kent A. Krogstad, Kevin William Schwartz, Shady Lane Farms, Inc., Hughes Place, Inc., Chad Koop, Nolt Farms, Inc., Tim M. Wales, AgIntellex, Inc., Patschke Land & Cattle, DBA-Orr Farms, Davidson Farms No. 3, Dan Burns, Thomas Rost, Keith Hupke, John Mark Ufer, Durst & Durst Partnership, Matthew Pelzer, Kenneth James Mudek, Bruce R. Rademacher, WJ Farms, Arnold F. Dahlstrom, L & P Farms, Ltd., Charles Frickey Rev. Trust, Roland J. Killoran, C&J Farm, Inc., David Rydstrom, Charles Hamm, Carey Joe Donahue, Zech Farms, Inc., Robert Landrigan, Lamoreux Farms Partnership, Myrtle C. Fisher Family Trust, Richards Family Farms, Larry D. Wampler, Irrevocable Trust, H & D Thompson Farms, Ltd., Richard A. Hare, Roger W. Wessels, Kevin Brokaw, Craig D. Murman, Brenda Hunt, Greg A. Deinken, Cory R. Sickelka, Tony Gene Sanders, Denice Gustafson Revocable Trust, Freeland Bass, Inc., Debra Shannon, Capesius M Farms, Ltd., Paul J. Logsdon, III, Los Robelas, Nathan Jon Kitzinger, Pamela Rosborough, Terry George Kohlhaas, Ron Spitzley, Gerald Kubacki, James Edward Simpson, B. Bass, Inc., Fairfield Farms, Inc., Neu Farms, Inc., Jim Herman, Inc., Clyde C. Kilber, John R. Howarth, Virgil M. Kruckenberg, Charles O. Hilde, Austin Fenner, Larry Leslie, Diggs Bros., Barbara Stanley, Lentsch Farms, Dennis Jay Hubers, Timothy Leighton, Walter Nesheim, Paul Payne, Anton Farms, Inc., Robert Otto, David Bassett, Raymond Effling, Randy Peters, Kevin O. Tweed, Curtis Samson, Wilkinson Farms, LLC, Jonas Cure, Bryan Nelson, Gaines Barksdale, Inc., Keller Partnership, Vajdak Partners, LLC, Reynolds Farm, Randy Lutringer, Blatt Farms, Inc., Thomas E. Howarth, Ronald M. Bockenstedt, Leslie Alan Evavold, Cason S. Delap, Richard J. Dickman, Munson Brothers Farm, Guy Frank Lines, Jr., Howard Scott Haas, Ryan N. Giese, Louann Gjermo, Dizzie D. Maull, Dana Phipps, Steven Faust, Ronald Jorgensen, Steven Pigg, Daniel Gubbels, Eric David Grimsgard, Steven Ray Waggoner, Krieger Farm Partnership, John Pierce, DJF Farm, Inc., Mark Roark, James Bradley Peterson, Donald W. Riker, Bevel Farms, LLC, Kaping Farms, Inc., W A Hobbs and Sons, Inc., Mertz Bros., Harold E. Voehl, Ronald Lynn Niemeyer, Ken Chonko, Charles Fuessley, Shane Merry, Todd Wright, Allan Werner Living Trust, Sherman Cutler and Nancy Cutler Living Trust, Les V. Wildin, Michael Kunerth, J. Edward Jacquot, Barry Brent Bigger, Randall Peter Schurmann, Deborah Klein, Dane County Growers, LLP, Brandon Lentsch, Hunt Barksdale, Inc., Anthony Ferretti, Dean Leonard Sellner, Nicholas Larson, R & T Acres, Inc., Ronald Allen Bischoff, Dean Torbenson, Warren B. Wolfe, Mike Todd Harberts, Mark Eddleman, Doug Kuttner, Edinger Enterprise, Inc., Thomas Land and Livestock Corp., Sappington Farms, KAU Farms Operations, LLC, Jared P. Schmidgall, Dennis Robert Meulebroeck, Roger Schuller, Woerner Family Farms, LLC, Sara Beth Pillow, Richard J. Janechek, Robert L. Osman, Red River Grain Company, Dole Farms Inc., Randall Scott Dykstra, Haney Farms, Brent Willimack, Scott Clevenger Farms, Gregory W. Thomas, James L. Grundmeyer, Norma Kutz Trust, Connie L. Kinnaman, Craig S. Kelley, Dan Jeffrey Stall, Andrew Gastel, Randall R. Roberts, Brian Allan Werner, Hillman Farms, Gary Thomas Riesselman, P.R.T. Farms, Inc., Roger Dean Dutton, Jonathan Ayer, Lonell M. Allen, Fred Zulauf, Michael A. Tonsley, Norma K. Palasini, Ed Vitt, John Robert Jerzak, SS Halcomb Farms, Richard Jackson, William Klein, Donald E. Nelson, Heins Brother Farms, Gene Funke, Harley Houghton, Glen Krammin, J&D Banwart Farms, Inc., Austin Schiley, Cynthia Alderdice, Katina Jacquot Rhodes, Thomas A. Freidel, Doug Mitchell, Randal H. Sievers, Mitch B. Schulz, Robert Rolfs, Jamie H. Frideres, Bumme Farms, LLC, Ricky D. Henry, Tadpole, Inc., Scott Vonasek Farms, Neal Herr, Randy Buboltz Farms, Dave Blackburn, Moore Bros. Farm, Charles A. Hambrick, Ronnie L. Baruth, Dwaine Westrom, Bradle H. Becker, Abbott Myers, Andrews Farms Partnership, Bill Heath, Arthur Wolfe, Michael E. Ebelhar, Gary L. Scott, Leroy F. Weber, Bryce Maher, Ryan Wittnebel, Paul Roady Living Trust, David Allen Degner, Sr., David Finley, Brooke Virchow, Shane Neil Stevens, Charles Hedrick, Randy Jacobson, Myron C. Fosdal, Dwight Kampa, Alan N. Kaiser, TLC-K Aq Enterprize, Inc., Franklin Edwards, Michael Newman, Kenneth Bell, Allan Falk, Steven D. Johnson Farms, Inc., Danny L. Luebke, Insight Farms, Inc., Gary L. Teerink, Martin W. Schelling, Marla J. Steier, Thomas Lichty, Wayne Snaza, Stiegelmeier Farms & Spraying, LLC, Michael Rosborough, Dennis L. Fischer, Jr., Thomas Jansen, Cory Cole Farms, Inc., Tom Kuchta, Randy Lee Hochstein, Rose of Sharon Farm, Inc., Drietz Farm, Kevin L. Bottin, Twin Ridge Farms Partnership, Catlett Farms, Inc., Kubesh Farms, Inc., Fox Creek Farms, Ltd., Bigger Farms, Thomas Lembcke, Shawn Brian Johnson, Clifford Ryan Schaffer, Jerry Edward Weseman, Timothy Lynn Wehrli, Allan Robert Wiebers, Terry Krewinghaus, Trevor Gene Justesen, Rodney L. Trotter, Blanke Farms Partnership, Michael E. Johnson, Jr., Bruce Wurst, Duncan Davis, Jed Wiese, Snake Creek Plainting & Leasing, Noel Elmore, Randy Wiersma, Dwayne R. Wienrank, Nicholas Pinkston, B&S Farms, LLC, Glen Allen Swanson, Jeff Fischer, Michael E. Schwettman, Kel Corporation Farms, Inc., Clarence Pistorius, Bums Farms, Inc., Jerry N. Kocher, Travis Hoyle, Ruben Richardson, Gerald W. Wisner, Michael Ray Preston, Darlys Kampa, Bradley Marquart Farms, Rokala Farms, Rudy Davidson Farms, Inc., Sam Stuemke, Reynold Farms Limited Partnership, Scott Holt, Melvin V. Eckstein, Leon William Haverkamp, Robert Holmes, Jr., Terry Robert Ford, James O. Hougan, Kenny Lindquist, Doug Edward Heims, Edward John Gaasch, Deere Run, Ltd., Bar Cattle Limited Partnership, Frederick P. Jaminet, Rodney A. Christman, K&E Farms, LLC, Grove Creek Farms, Ltd., Loyd K. Nansel, Dean Nesloney, Judy A. Gordon, Robert Erickson, David Gutel, Jesse Lange, Dean Francis Stecher, Mitch J. Murphy, Herbert C. Johnson, Sarah Sue Osborn, Matthew Stevenson, Payload Trucking, Inc., Badgerland Grain Farms, LLC, David Wensing, Denton Place, Inc., Peters Springdale Farm, Inc., Bear Wallow, Inc., Richard Reed, Rowland Farms, LLC, Caryn Jacobson, Dave Shoot, Coverdale Farm Partnership, Jason Allen Mark, Phipps, Inc., Justin Davis, Kenneth W. Strizek, Marjorie Houghton, Kenneth Elwer, L&G Farms, Clyde Robert Lucking, Jerry Harkness Farms, Inc., Mary Ann Fox, Adam Wayne Suther, Jim Stevenson, Brent Larson, Eric J. Peterson, Jeremy Brent Self, Lakeside Planting Company, Andrew & Annette Morris, Alfred Franke, Melvin S. Prochaska, David D. Riesop, Ernest Baruth and Sons, Myron James Mathiowetz, Homestead Farms, Inc., Jeff Soyer Childrens Trust, Everett McClary Farm, Wehrle Bros. Equipment, Inc., Glenn Lange, Houser Farms, Alan Francis Heitz, Phillip Burmeister, Belmont Planting Co., Inc., Marlys Marshall, Bryan Douglas Molyneux, Klahr & Sons, LLC, G & M Forward Trust, Carley Farm, Inc., Whispering Wind Farm, Inc., Gude Carver, Jr., Bill Lee Delap, Lloyd Danielson, James A. Herbison, Inc., Patrick Walsh, Kevin Holler, Danny Muzzi, ADB Farms, LLC, Scott Lee Swanson, Matthew Wade Johnson, Gary Thurston, Hill Grain Farms, Inc., JEV John Ernest Vineyard & Winery, Bill Burman, Michael D. Werk, Bruce French, Riley Alan Storjohann, Berglund Farms JV, Terry Morton Carpenter, Gary James Gorman, Kenneth and Francis Deese, Scott L. Hintz, Hagler M & N Farm, Inc., Mark Aslesen, Alvin Jacob Fast, Nickelson Farms, Inc., Yagow Farms, Inc., Danny Dickey, Douglas Simons, JLS Farm, Inc., Gerald Payne, Doris DeWald, Duane Neill, Merle Hartman, Estate of Mildred V. Hansen, Melvin Bayerl, Jeffrey L. Loge, Kevin C. Crawford, Tim Heine, D J Bierl Farms, Inc., Patricia Westnedge, Bruce E. Anderson, Geff Carstens, Alan A. Laubenthal, Charles A. McClintock, LLC, LAC, Inc., Dave McGaugh, Troy C. Orr, Eric Fioranelli, John Summers, Derek Drew Higgins, Dale A. Kramersmeier, Travis Paul Schroedl, Michael James Brown, Hunter Stracener, Mitch Donovan Vanness, Dale K. Anderson Farms, Inc., Erline Vickery, Lloyd E. Nedved, Beef Steak, Inc., Michael Krakow, Ryan Thomas Lippert, Osage 2 Land Trust, Severen West, Barbara L. Eiter, Triple P Farm. LLC, James Snoeberger, Frahm Farmland, Inc., Mike Burns, John Hinn, Marilyn Kay Hockman, Travis Kittelson, Alice I. Funderburg Irrevocable Trust, Ronald D. Eigsti, Daniel David Karl, Larry Skelton, Kurt Farms, Inc., Howard James, Matthew Irwin, Corri Zepponi, Larry Karhoff, Jeffrey D. Schlichter, William E. Kranz, Moser Farms, Inc., John Murphy, Richard Compton, Garber Farms, Inc., Express Grain Terminal, LLC, Bradley Groeneweg, Steve James Olson, Hamm Farms, Brian Thomas Greenslit, Richard John Schuetze, Jerry Wayne Roznovak, John Roy Freeland, Mike James McNeil, MJ, Inc., Phillip Lee Erb, Agra Earth Grains, LLC, Kastner Agri Farms, Ltd., Brent Eugene Roller, Warren M. Johnson, David Gregg, Inc., Jerry D. Hanson, Menz Farms, William J. Jansen, Progressive Farms, Gary A. Stensaas, Ronnevik Farms, Mark Allan Myron, Ronald Schroeder, Tim Lyste, Lee Rick Farms, Lester C. Jane Kroeger Trust, Rod Wilson, Rolf E. Ronnevik, Zwiefel Family Farm, Inc., DP Farms, Debra Jean Schluter, Philip Blum, Bryan D. Miller, Shafer Farms, Summy Farm Corp., Collin Jark, Wayne E. Kaufman, Christopher Charles Berry, John H. Schmitt, Michael Jude McFadden, Lance Koop Farms, Bernard Frazier, Michael J. Morrison, Joseph M. Keck, Roxanne C. Fisher, Ryerson Trust, The, Bernadette Nelson, Balegrade PLT Co., Lange Farms, Arthur R. Zoellner, William K. Chisholm, Raymond Beckermann, J. Boilini Farms, Inc., Mark Stewart, Barry R. Vculek, Steven Wayne Schaller, James E. Reed, Jr., Samuel Louis Schmidt, Quin E. Kelly, Shawn Rider, Wayne Alan Mackereth, Jana, Inc., Dan Charles Peters, Collin Cain, Wenthold Holsteins, Inc., Gerald Krueger, Malcom C. Winkler, Linn Vig Farms, Inc., Patrick Martin Farms, Kayle Dinger, Rohrbach Farms, Inc., Jerald R. Nesloney, Dewain Gipson, Doug D. Dahlen, Willis Wipf, Craig W. Jepsen, William O. Durst, John H. Mark, K-T Farms, Inc., Stencel Farms, Inc., TKF Farms, Inc., Lynell Hofer, Greg T. Roesler, Jason K. Douglas, Sisson Farms, Robert J. Vercruysse, Ronald William Speer, Brandon Keith Roznovak, Kohls Farm, Inc., Myron Sievers, C-Man Farms, Inc., B&K Kagay Farms, Inc., J.O. & H.C. Eastland, Inc., Billy Joe Miles, Virgil Anderson & Sons, LLC, Hillside Farms and Cattle, LLC, Jeff Bell, Curtis R. Jones, Dwight Kumm, Raymond Zastrow, Theodore E. Schmidgall, Danny Raye Booze, Adam R. Pryor, Dan & Sam Nachtigal Partnership, Rosborough Farms, Inc., Triple Two Acres, B-40 Farms, LLC, Robert Garry, Jennifer Moroni, White Brothers, Steven Bottelberghe, Mark Malaer, Peter Bisgard, Trevor Jay Gillespie, Audrey McClain, Jodi Storley, James W. Goche, Dennis Bartosh, Codee D. Souder, Crawford & Crawford, Inc., David Lee Delap, Spezia-Bruce & Sons, Fornea-5, LLC, Rector Farms, Inc., Richard Rister Farms, Kevin Kenneth Olson, Scott Johnson, Robert Annis, Doug Elmore, Ulen Farms Partnership, KT Planting Partnership, Kim Krauel, Michael Strain, H. Heath Hill, Charles L. Boynton, Linda Meyerdirk, Janice Dreiling, Jon Crilly, Dressler Brothers Farms, G. Joyce Knadler, Steve G. Rotz, Huett Brunson, Owen Elsen, Ronald A. Ennen, Darrel Kaping, Richard Glanzer, Robert D Dawson, Spencer Grant Love, Dale J. Galles, Carol L. Hildebrand, Casey Westergard, Dan West, Walter Holmes, Ronald R. Keller, Anderfroeh Trust, Anfang Farms, Inc., Christine Brandt, Kim Stiegelmeier, Victor Barton, Ryan Brokaw, Edward Schamper, Wayne Simon, Mark Howard Johnson, Triple K Farms, Albert Braun, Eldon Steindorf, Christopher Fischbach, Tyler Stiegelmeier, Leo Peddle Corporation Trust, Rodney W. Hebel, Harvey T. Primus, Darrell Eugene Seefeldt, Steve Headley, Charles M. Rooks and Erin Herbison Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Bunge North America, Inc.
Petitioner: Law Offices of Michael Miller, PC, Call & Gentry Law Group, LLC, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, PC, Clark Love Hutson, GP, The Poppe Law Firm, Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd., The Lyon Firm, April L. Rosenbaum, Johnson Becker, PLLC and Rhoades McKee
Other: Harry G. Barber, Jr. and Sharon Brunet
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Interested Party: Nolan Law Group and Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA
Case Number: 2:2014md02591
Filed: December 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1407
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4177 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - The Motion for Reconsideration #4174 filed by the Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC states that the motion is filed pursuant to the Court's April 22 order, in which the Court set deadlines for objections to the master's report concerning expenses, responses thereto, and reply briefs. Thus, the Court will consider the "motion" as an objection to be ruled by the Court and not as a matter for reconsideration by the special master, and the same response and reply deadlines as previously set by the Court shall apply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4176 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to Case No: 18-2408 Only) - Plaintiffs' motion to vacate the Court's dismissal order and judgment (Doc. 172 in 18-2408) is hereby granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to plaintiffs' claims arising under Minnesota law, and the judgment in favor of defendants on those claims is hereby vacated. The motion is denied with respect to plaintiffs' claims arising under federal law. Defendants shall file any sur-sur-reply brief in support of their motions to dismiss (Docs. 140 and 149 in 18-2408), limited as set forth herein, on or before May 31, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/21/2019. (ses)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4175 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #4145 Report of the Special Master by Shields Law Group, LLC, and Corresponding Motion for Leave to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email to Special Masters, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Spencer Shields)(Shields, Spencer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4174 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #4145 Report of the Special Master by Movant Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gates, Joseph) (Document title modified on 05/21/2019 to reflect this is not a motion.) (mg))
May 20, 2019 Filing 4173 Unopposed Twelfth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4172 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Report and Recommendation of Special Master Ellen Reisman Regarding Award of Common Benefit Expenses by Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employee Expenses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Paul Byrd Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Al Harkins Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - Phil Rickels Affidavit) (Gates, Joseph)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4171 ORDER (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) denying Motion to strike defendants' amended sur-reply (Doc. 189 in Case no: 18-2408). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/15/2019. (ses)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4170 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #4145 Report and Recommendation of Special Master Ellen Reisman Regarding Award of Common Benefit Expenses by Mesh Besher and Spence. (Nemo, Anthony)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4169 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4163 Settlement Class Counsel's Unopposed Motion to Change Investment of Settlement Funds. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/10/2019. (ses)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4168 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Amended Sur-Reply and the Declaration of Christopher L. Goodman Attaching Exhibit A by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4167 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #4154 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3082.) (tvn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File. Filed by Watts Guerra, LLP re: #4154 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4165 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #4143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Appeal No. 19-3079). (tvn)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript already on file. Filed by Toups-Coffman re #4143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Isaacson, Eric)
May 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4163 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Change Investment of Settlement Funds. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4163 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Order to Change Investment of Settlement Funds by All Plaintiffs. (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William B. Chaney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit A-6, #9 Declaration of Richard F. Pagnoni, #10 Exhibit B)(Stueve, Patrick)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4162 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Amended Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Reply by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4161 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Motion for Leave to File an Amended Sur-Reply by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4160 ORDER (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) granting in part and denying in part Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply brief (Doc. 183 in 18-2408). Defendants shall file their proposed sur-reply as soon as practicable. Plaintiffs shall then be permitted to file, on or before May 3, 2019, a sur-sur-reply, limited to four (4) pages of argument, addressing only the argument raised in Section I.B of plaintiffs' amended reply brief. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/30/2019. (ses)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4159 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4158 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4142 Unopposed Motion for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/26/2019. (ses)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4157 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 04/23/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3082 re: #4154 First Amended Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Watts Guerra, LLP. (tvn)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4156 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - Any objection to the special master's Report and Recommendation concerning expenses #4145 shall be filed on or before May 20, 2019; the special master and any other party shall file any response to a specific objection on or before June 19, 2019; and any reply brief in support of a specific objection shall be filed on or before July 3, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4155 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #4154 First Amended Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4154 First Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #4128 Memorandum and Order and #3882 Memorandum and Order by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4783314. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4153 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 7) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4152 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 6) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4151 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 5) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4150 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 4) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4149 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 3) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4148 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 2) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4147 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 04/18/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3079 re #4143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (tvn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4146 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Filing of Certain Supplemental Materials (Volume 1) by Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4145 REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Reisman, Ellen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4144 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #4143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record) (tvn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4143 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #4134 Memorandum and Order, #4128 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4780604. (Coffman, Richard)
April 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4142 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4142 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 04/16/2019. (mg))
April 15, 2019 Filing 4141 NOTICE (Relates to 17-2614; The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) of Intent to Proceed With Individual Lawsuit by Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4140 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 17-2614; The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by William B. Chaney, Patrick J. Stueve, Don Downing, Scott Powell, Andrew K. York, and Jerry Santangelo on behalf of Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William) **Attorney Jerry Santangelo is not an MDL attorney in this court; not added. (mg))
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4139 ORDER granting #4135 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. The Court approves the disbursement of $995,004.04 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached to the Motion as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/15/2019. (ses)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4138 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4137 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Devin DeBacker as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4136 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4130 Unopposed Motion for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure and the Court approves the Claims Processing Procedure attached as Exhibit 1 to the Motion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/08/2019. (ses)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4135 Unopposed Eleventh MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting in part #4108 Motion for Order Concerning Final Allocation Orders. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/02/2019. (ses)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4133 ORDER granting #4132 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds From the Common Benefit Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Special Master's Invoices and 2018 Income Taxes. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/02/2019. (ses)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4132 Unopposed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds From the Common Benefit Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Special Master's Invoices and 2018 Income Taxes by All Plaintiffs. (Chaney, William)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4131 ORDER - It is ordered that any objection to the #4130 Unopposed MOTION for Order for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY) shall be filed no later than APRIL 5, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
March 29, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4130 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4130 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Approval of a Claims Processing Procedure by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/29/2019. (mg))
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4129 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4119 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/21/2019. (ses)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - The Report and Recommendation by the Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel #4079 is hereby adopted as the Court's own allocation of the Kansas MDL common benefit pool of attorney fees, and fees are hereby awarded to particular attorneys in accordance with Schedule 2 of the Report and Recommendation, which has been incorporated into this Order as Attachment A. The objections to the Report and Recommendation by the Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel #4098 and by Hossley Embrey, LLP #4099 are hereby overruled in their entirety. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(ses)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4127 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas P. Schult. (Schult, Thomas)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4126 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees.(Stueve, Patrick)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4125 RESPONSE by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC re: #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. (Garrison, W.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4124 SUPPLEMENT To Beasley Allen's Attorneys' #3577 Fee and Expense Application by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pescia, Leslie)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4123 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Shields Law Group, LLC re: #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. (Shields, Spencer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4122 NOTICE (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.): A pretrial order was entered in Case No. 16-2788-JWL, Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG et al, as document number 199. (amh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4121 NOTICE (Relates to 15-2279; Agribase International, Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) of Intent to Proceed with Individual Lawsuit by Agribase International, Inc. (Conroy, Jayne)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4120 NOTICE (Relates to 14-2637; Trans Coastal Supply Company Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) of Intent to Proceed with Individual Lawsuit by Trans Coastal Supply Company Inc. (Conroy, Jayne)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4119 Unopposed Tenth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
March 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4116 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Revised Petition for IRPA Pool Award). The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ss)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4118 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #4088 Notice of Cross Appeal. (Appeal No. 19-3032) (tvn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4117 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File re: #4088 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by by All Plaintiffs. (Received from 10CCA) (tvn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4116 Revised MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for IRPA Pool Award by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Watts, Mikal)
March 4, 2019 (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Pursuant to Order (Doc. 4115 ) Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. Response deadline 3/8/2019. Reply deadline 3/13/2019. (ses)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4115 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4114 Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for Briefing Schedule Regarding Their Motion For Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. It is ordered that any further responses to the Motion for Order #4108 be filed by March 8, 2019 and that Settlement Class Counsel's reply be filed by March 13, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/04/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4114 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Expedite Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for Briefing Schedule Regarding Their Motion for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Stueve, Patrick)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4113 ORDER (Relates to all cases EXCEPT 16-2788-JWL, Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al) granting #4080 Syngenta's Unopposed Motion for Order Dismissing Individual Cases Subject to the December 17, 2018 Final Order and Judgment and Addressing Outstanding Individual Actions. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (list of cases)) (ses)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4112 NOTICE OF FILING (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) - A Judgment (Doc #169 in 18-2408) was filed and the action was dismissed in its entirety. (hw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4111 NOTICE OF FILING (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) - A Memorandum and Order (Doc. #168 in 18-2408) was filed and the action was dismissed in its entirety. (ses)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4110 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. (Toups, Mitchell)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4109 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Robin Anderson and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Christopher Allman on behalf of United States of America. (Allman, Christopher)
February 28, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4108 MOTION for Order Regarding (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4108 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) for Order Regarding Final Order Related to Attorneys' Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)(Motion referral removed on 02/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta AG by The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta Crop Protection AG by The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. by The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta Seeds, LLC by The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC by The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4102 REPLY (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) in Support of Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel's #4079 Report and Recommendation Regarding Attorneys' Fee Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chaney, William)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4101 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by Melissa Ann Hoag Sherman on behalf of Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC. (Hoag Sherman, Melissa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4100 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by J. Nick Badgerow on behalf of Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC. (Badgerow, J.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4099 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) to #4079 the Report and Recommendation of Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees for the Kansas MDL Common Benefit Pool by Movant Hossley-Embry, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel Allen Hossley, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Christie Ford, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Brett Redenbaugh)(Hossley, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4098 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) and (to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) to #4079 Report and Recommendation of KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees for the KS MDL Common Benefit Pool by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toups, Mitchell)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4097 SEALED DOCUMENT (Report of Claims Administrator) Regarding Certain Claim Forms. (Stueve, Patrick)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4096 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4092 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File the Report of the Claims Administrator Under Seal. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/15/2019. (ses)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4095 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 02/13/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3032 re: #4088 Notice of Conditional or Contingent Cross Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (tvn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4094 LETTER TO 10CCA (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) stating record is complete re: #4072 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3022.) (tvn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4093 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Declaration of William B. Chaney in Support of Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Report and Recommendation Regarding Attorneys' Fee Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Chaney, William)
February 14, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4092 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (amh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4092 Unopposed SEALED MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 02/14/2019. (mg))
February 13, 2019 Filing 4091 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Transcript Already on File filed by Toups-Coffman, Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #4072 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Isaacson, Eric)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4090 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) transmitted to 10CCA re: #4088 Notice of Conditional or Contingent Cross Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4089 LETTER TO 10CCA (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) stating record is complete re: #4070 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3021.) (tvn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4088 NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL OR CONTINGENT CROSS APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4712383. (Stueve, Patrick)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4087 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Transcript Already on File filed by Watts Guerra, LLP re: #4070 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4086 Second Amended MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses From IRPA Pool by Movants Carey, Danis & Lowe re: #3886 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4085 Amended RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC. (Borgen, Grant)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4084 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4083 Unopposed Ninth Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. The Court approves the disbursement of $738,073.12 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached to the Motion as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/07/2019. (ses)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4083 Unopposed Ninth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4082 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA. (Koehler, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4081 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
February 6, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4080 Unopposed MOTION for Order Dismissing Individual Cases Subject to the December 17, 2018 Final Order and Judgment and Addressing Outstanding Individual Actions. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4080 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) for Order Dismissing Individual Cases Subject to the December 17, 2018 Final Order and Judgment and Addressing Outstanding Individual Actions by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 02/06/2019. (mg))
February 1, 2019 Filing 4079 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees for the Kansas MDL Common Benefit Pool by All Plaintiffs re: #3883 Order. (Attachments: #1 Schedule 1, #2 Schedule 2, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of William B. Chaney, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Patrick J. Stueve, #5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Don M. Downing, #6 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Scott A. Powell)(Chaney, William)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4078 RESPONSE (Expense Reimbursement Spreadsheet) by Movants Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC, Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC re: #3886 Order. (Schrier, James)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4077 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 01/30/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3022 re: #4072 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (tvn)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4076 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4075 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #4072 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4074 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4073 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 01/30/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3021 re: #4070 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Watts Guerra, LLP. (tvn)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4072 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3882 Memorandum and Order, #3883 Order, by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4698860. (Coffman, Richard)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4071 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #4070 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4070 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3882 Memorandum and Order by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4697883. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4069 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by F. Ronalds Walker on behalf of W. Lee Egler Farms, Egler Brothers, Inc., F. Ronalds Walker. (Walker, F. Ronalds)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4068 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4067 Syngenta's Unopposed Motion for Order Releasing Syngenta's Original Supersedeas Bond. The supersedeas bond that Syngenta previously posted on July 12, 2017 in the amount of $272,125,000.00 with respect to the Kansas class jury verdict and judgment #3329 is hereby RELEASED. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/28/2019. (ses)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4067 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Order Releasing Syngenta's Original Supersedeas Bond by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4064 AMENDED RESPONSE (Amended Attorney Expense Report) to #3886 Order by Movant Conmy Feste, Ltd. (Murch, Douglas)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4063 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4062 Motion for Leave to Complete Submission of Client Retainers to Claims Administrator and The Law Offices of Charles H. Johnson is granted leave until 02/15/2019 to complete the submission of client retainers to the Claims Administrator in the correct format. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/24/2019. (ses)
January 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4062 MOTION for Leave to Complete Submission of Client Retainers to Claims Administrator. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4062 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to Complete Submission of Client Retainers to Claims Administrator by Movant Law Offices of Charles H. Johnson, PA. (Johnson, Charles) (Motion Referral Removed on 01/24/2019. (mg))
January 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4058 MOTION (Petition) for Award of Attorney's Fees From IRPA Pool. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4061 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Bunch and James Law Firm. (Reinke, Jevon)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4060 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #3894 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3009.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4059 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Egler Brothers, Inc., W. Lee Egler Farms, F. Ronalds Walker re: #3887 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Received from 10CCA.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4058 MOTION (Petition) (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorney's Fees From IRPA Pool by Movant Hodge Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Client list)(Rosenbaum, April)(Motion Referral Removed on 01/24/2019. (mg))
January 23, 2019 Filing 4057 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #3891 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3008.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4056 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #3888 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 19-3005.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4055 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4053 Hodge Law Firm, PLLC's Motion for Leave to File Petition for Award of Attorney's Fees from IRPA Pool Out of Time. The Hodge Law Firm, PLLC shall file the petition attached to their motion forthwith. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4054 ORDER (Relates to 16-cv-02317 Barker, et al. v. Syngenta AG, et al. and 16-cv-02676, McCormack v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting #4047 Motion for to Accept Tardy Petition for IRPA Pool Award #4041 . Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 23, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4053 MOTION for Leave to File Petition for Award of Attorney's Fees From IRPA Pool Out of Time. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4053 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Petition for Award of Attorney's Fees From IRPA Pool Out of Time by Movant Hodge Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Petition)(Rosenbaum, April) (Motion Referral Removed on 01/23/2019. (mg))
January 23, 2019 Filing 4052 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Jami Hayhurst re: #3888 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Received from 10CCA.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4051 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts re: #3894 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Received from 10CCA.) (tvn)
January 23, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4047 MOTION to Accept Tardy Petition for Award from IRPA Pool. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
January 23, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4050 MOTION (Petition) by Pavlack Law, LLC for IRPA Fee Pool Award. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4048 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Toups-Coffman, Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #3891 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Isaacson, Eric)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4047 MOTION (Relates to 16-2317; Barker, et al. v. Syngenta AG, et al., and 16-2676; Duncan McCormack dba McCormack Enterprises v. Syngenta AG, et al.) to Accept Tardy Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd. (Dellett, Kevin) (Motion Referral Removed on 01/23/2019. (mg))
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4046 ORDER (Relates to 16-2570; Jay Drozd, et al. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) - The motion by Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd. #4042 for an extension of time in which to file its petition for an award from the IRPA pool is granted. The firm shall file its petition and submit the required information to the Claims Administrator on or before February 19, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4045 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - The motion by Watts Guerra, LLP #4036 for an extension of time in which to file its petition for an award from the IRPA pool is granted. The firm shall file its petition and submit the required information to the Claims Administrator on or before March 4, 2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4044 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #4043 Pavlack Law, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Belated Petition for IRPA Fee Pool Award. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/22/2019. (ses)
January 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4023 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses, #4024 MOTION (Petition) for Attorney Fee and Expense Award From IRPA Pool, #4019 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses, #4004 MOTION for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses From IRPA Pool, #4013 MOTION (Petition) for Award from IRPA Pool and Expense Reimbursement, #4005 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool, #4022 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses, #4012 Joint MOTION for Approval of Common Benefit Expense, #4000 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to 1/4/19 Order Regarding IRPA & Expense Applications, #3994 MOTION (Petition) for Award From IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4041 MOTION (Petition) of Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd. for IRPA Pool Award, #4043 MOTION for Leave to File Belated Petition for IRPA Fee Pool Award, #4042 MOTION for Extension of Time to Apply for Award from IRPA Pool, #4028 Joint MOTION (Petition) for Award of Attorneys' Fees From IRPA Pool and Reimbursement of Expenses, #4038 MOTION (Petition) for Fees From the IRPA Pool and Award of Expenses Incurred for the Common Benefit of the Settlement Class, #4037 MOTION (Petition) for an Award from the IRPA Pool and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to Court Order, #4036 MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Additional IRPA Pool Information, #4029 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees From the IRPA Pool, #4034 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorney Fees From the IRPA Pool. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4043 MOTION for Leave to file Belated Petition for IRPA Fee Pool Award by Movant Pavlack Law, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition by Pavlack Law, LLC for IRPA Fee Pool Award, #2 Exhibit A. to Petition Claimant List)(Pavlack, Eric)
January 19, 2019 Filing 4042 MOTION for extension of time to apply for Award from IRPA Pool by Plaintiffs Jay Drozd, Lori Drozd, Melissa Drozd, T.J. Drozd (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Dellett, Kevin)
January 19, 2019 Filing 4041 MOTION (Petition) of Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd. for IRPA Pool Award by Movant Kevin E. Dellett, Chtd. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet)(Dellett, Kevin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4040 RESPONSE by Movants Kansas Co-Lead Counsel, Kansas Co-Lead Counsel re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Powell, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4039 RESPONSE by Movants Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award From IRPA Pool (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gates, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4038 MOTION for Attorney Fees Shields Law Group, LLC by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support by Spencer Shields, #2 Exhibit A Shields Law Group, LLC Client List, #3 Exhibit B Shields Law Group, LLC Revised Expense Application)(Shields, Spencer)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4037 MOTION An Award from the IRPA Pool and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to Court Order re #3550 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Wright & Schulte, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wright & Schulte Claimant List)(Schulte, Richard)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4036 MOTION for extension of time to Provide Additional IRPA Pool Information by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikal C. Watts in Support)(Watts, Mikal)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4035 RESPONSE by Movants Watts Guerra, LLP, Watts Guerra, LLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Watts, Mikal)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4034 MOTION for Attorney Fees from the IRPA Pool by Movant O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, PC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney List, #2 Exhibit B - Claimant List)(Demerath, Justin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4033 NOTICE of IRPA Application by All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cueto, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4032 RESPONSE by Movants Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Petition for Award From IRPA Pool) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barton, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4031 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4029 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees from the IRPA Pool by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Michael Gries, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Charles A. Welsh, Ron Wetz, Richard Crone, VJW Farm, Inc., Norman Sigrist (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phipps, Martin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4030 RESPONSE by Movants Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP, Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gayan, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4029 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees from the IRPA Pool by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Michael Gries, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Charles A. Welsh, Ron Wetz, Richard Crone, VJW Farm, Inc., Norman Sigrist (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Phipps, Martin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4028 MOTION Fees and Expenses re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movants Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Waters, Kerrianne)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4027 RESPONSE by Movants Michael Miller, Michael Miller re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Cross, Gerald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4026 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Mark Anton, Anton Farms, Inc., John Rave, Mark Anton, Anton Farms, Inc. re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for an Award from IRPA Pool (Cook, James)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4025 NOTICE of Attorney Fees and Expenses Worksheet by Conmy Feste, Ltd. (Murch, Douglas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4024 MOTION for Attorney Fees Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Dunk & Associates, PLLC, Plaintiffs Rogers Morris, Laurie Berry, Bridgeforth Farms, Olin Brown, Sr, Joe Bryant, Darden Bridgeforth & Sons, Christian Richburg, Willie Richburg, Jerol Hale, Dell-Cam Farm, Inc., Dexter Gilbert, Darastus Glover, Mae Glover, Oscar Glover, Garry Davis, Willie Davis, Billy Jimson, Haywood Harrell, John W. Harrell, Reginald Harrell, Howard James, Warren James, Wilbur Frederick, Power Tech Farm, LLC, Terry Priester, Property Resources Excavation, Inc., C&J Farm, Inc., P&J Farms, Philip Haynie, III, Philip Haynie, II, Haynie Farms, LLC, Rivah View Farms, Inc., Ronald Bunton, Bunton Farms, Ivory Neely, Roger Smith, Sneed Brothers, Sneed Farms, Inc., Antron Williams, Lawrence Conyer, Larry Clark, 7th Harvest, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claimant List, #2 Exhibit B - Expenses)(Sanchez, Brenna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4023 MOTION Petition for Expenses re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Law Offices of Charles H. Johnson, PA (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claimant List, #2 Exhibit Expense Sheet)(Johnson, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4022 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Monson & Halloway (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bender, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4021 NOTICE of and Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Maggio Thompson, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claimant List Spreadsheet)(Saltaformaggio, Mike)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4020 RESPONSE by Interested Parties Eiland Plaintiffs, Eiland Plaintiffs re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Eiland Petition for IRPA Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Client List)(Eiland, A.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4019 MOTION Petition for Expenses re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Law Offices of Charles H. Johnson, PA (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claimant List, #2 Exhibit Expense Sheet)(Johnson, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4018 RESPONSE by Movants Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC., Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC. re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Soper, Jerry)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4017 RESPONSE by Interested Parties Salim-Beasley, LLC, Salim-Beasley, LLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beasley, Barrett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4016 RESPONSE by Movants Paul, LLP, Paul, LLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Paul, Richard)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4015 RESPONSE by Movants Carey, Danis & Lowe, Carey, Danis & Lowe re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Amended Notice of IRPA Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4014 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Ryan, Moore, Cook, Triplett & Albertson, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Expense Spreadsheet, #2 Expense Supplement)(Triplett, Phillip)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4013 MOTION Petition for Award from IRPA Pool and Expense Reimbursement by Movant The Lyon Firm (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Ex Claimants, #2 Ex Expenses)(Lyon, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4012 MOTION for Approval of Common Benefit Expense by Movant Gustafson Gluek, PLLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gustafson, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4011 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Reichert Wenner, PA. (Sullivan, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4010 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Michael Smith Law, PLLC. (Smith, Michael by(mg))
January 18, 2019 Filing 4009 NOTICE of IRPA Application by Curtis Collins (Lemmon, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4008 RESPONSE by Movants Bassford Remele, PA, Bassford Remele, PA re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Corrected Date (Remele, Lewis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4007 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Merrida Coxwell. Amendment to #3949 Response to Order . (Coxwell, Merrida)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4006 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Wagner Reese, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Wagner, #2 Exhibit 2 - Court Ordered Expense Form, #3 Exhibit 3 - Itemization of Misc Expenses)(Wagner, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4005 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Axley Brynelson, LLP (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Claimants, #2 Exhibit B - Expense Report)(Modl, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4004 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2)(Bender, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4003 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, 3886 Order by Movant of Hehner & Associates, LLC by Movant Hehner & Associates, LLC. (Hehner, James)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4002 RESPONSE to #3999 Response Petition for IRPA [Corrected Date] by Movant Sunde Olson Kircher Zender, PLC. (Steinle, Pamela)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4001 AFFIDAVIT of Pamela D Steinle by Sunde Olson Kircher Zender, PLC. (Steinle, Pamela)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4000 MOTION for Order Nolan Law Group's Petition for Award from IRPA Pool and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to 1/4/19 Order Regarding IRPA & Expense Applications by Interested Party Nolan Law Group (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Routh, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3999 RESPONSE Petition for IRPA by Movant Sunde Olson Kircher Zender, PLC. (Steinle, Pamela)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3998 BILL OF COSTS Expense Sheet Kelley Law Firm by Kelley Law Firm. (Kelley, Kevin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3997 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Steinle on behalf of Sunde Olson Kircher Zender, PLC (Steinle, Pamela)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3996 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Gellhaus & Gellhaus, PC. (Gellhaus, Lonald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3995 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiffs Darvin Bentlage, Karl Otte, Jr, Dixie Moore, Stephen W. Tuttle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expense Report)(Speer, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3994 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Bryant Law Center (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bender, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3993 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by In Re Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. (Hutchins, Theodore)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3992 RESPONSE by Movants Gerald Lee Cross Jr, Gerald Lee Cross Jr re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Notice and Application of Cross Law Firm, LLC for Common Benefit Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gerald Lee Cross, Jr, #2 Exhibit Spreadsheet Regarding IRPA Applications and Expense Applications, #3 Exhibit Itemized Spreadsheet Containing Common Benefit Expenses)(Cross, Gerald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3991 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Toups, Mitchell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3990 RESPONSE by Movants Murray Law Firm, Murray Law Firm re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02)(Hayes, Jessica)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3989 RESPONSE by Movants Carey, Danis & Lowe, Carey, Danis & Lowe re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Notice of IRPA Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lowe, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3988 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Walter Rodney Richardson, Charles Creswell Farms, Inc. re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Notice of IRPA Application (Plant, Adam)
January 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3983 MOTION for Attorney Fees Petition for Award from IRPA Pool and Award of Expenses, #3986 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #3987 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Revised Compliant Expense Application. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3987 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Revised Compliant Expense Application by Movant Call & Gentry Law Group, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Gentry, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3986 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Movant Maschka, Riedy & Ries (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chronic, George)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3985 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Hossley Embry's Petition for Fee Award from IRPA Pool and Revised Expense Application by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Hossley Embry's Claimant List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Hossley Embry's Expenses)(Hossley, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3984 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Mauro Archer & Associates. (Link, Jeff)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3983 MOTION for Attorney Fees Petition for Award from IRPA Pool and Award of Expenses by Movant Novitzke, Gust, Sempf, Whitley & Bergmanis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Whitley, Jason)
January 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3982 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #3981 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool, #3979 MOTION for IRPA Fee Pool Award re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3982 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Rod Backhaus (Preston, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3981 MOTION re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant Downing Alexander & Wood (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bender, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3980 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Expense Sheet for Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick by Movant Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick. (Hundl, Philip)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3979 MOTION for IRPA Fee Pool Award re: #3886 Order, by Movants Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, PA, Chapman Lewis & Swan, PLLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2)(Chapman, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3978 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Hayes on behalf of Murray Law Firm (Hayes, Jessica)
January 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3970 Amended MOTION IRPA out of pocket expense re #3963 MOTION Clerical expense Petition IRPA Expense pdf of expense. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3977 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Catherine Duffy on behalf of Pemberton Law, PLLP (Duffy, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3976 RESPONSE by Movant Pemberton Law, PLLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Duffy, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3975 RESPONSE by Movants Watts Guerra, LLP, Watts Guerra, LLP re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Watts, Mikal)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3974 RESPONSE by Movants Merrida Coxwell, Merrida Coxwell re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet of Claimants)(Coxwell, Merrida)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3973 RESPONSE by Movants Fenchel, Doster, Buck & Ennen, PLC, Fenchel, Doster, Buck & Ennen, PLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ennen, Benjamin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3972 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Ennen on behalf of Fenchel, Doster, Buck & Ennen, PLC. (Ennen, Benjamin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3971 RESPONSE by Movants Johnson Becker, PLLC, Johnson Becker, PLLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Johnson, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3970 Amended MOTION IRPA out of pocket expense re #3963 MOTION Clerical expense Petition IRPA Expense pdf of expense by Movant Edward Tucker (Attachments: #1 Expense sheet, IRPA Order)(Tucker, Edward)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3969 AFFIDAVIT of Casey D. Marshall re #3967 Response to Order by Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3968 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Petition (And Memorandum in Support ) For Disbursement of Coxwell & Associates, PLLC's Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Court Order by Movant Merrida Coxwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spreadsheet of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Spreadsheet of Claimants)(Coxwell, Merrida)
January 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3963 MOTION Clerical expense Petition IRPA Expense. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3967 RESPONSE by Movant Bassford Remele, PA re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Remele, Lewis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3966 NOTICE of IRPA APPLICATION by Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. - ALL PLAINTIFFS in ILS 17-320 / KS 17-2460 re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Garrison, W.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3965 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC. (Borgen, Grant)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3964 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Grant Borgen on behalf of Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC (Borgen, Grant)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3963 MOTION Clerical expense Petition IRPA Expense by Movant Edward Tucker (Tucker, Edward)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3962 RESPONSE by Movants Cole, Cole, Easley & Sciba, PC, Cole, Cole, Easley & Sciba, PC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Easley, Rex)
January 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3960 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds - Petition for Award from the IRPA Pool and for an Award of Reasonable Expenses, #3956 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees & Expenses, #3961 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses from IRPA, #3959 MOTION Motion for Disbursement of Nelson, Zenter, Sartor & Snellings,LLC's Reasonable Expenses re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3961 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses from IRPA by Plaintiff David Fisher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morris, Bradford)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3960 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds - Petition for Award from the IRPA Pool and for an Award of Reasonable Expenses by Interested Party Diaz Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clients Represented, #2 Exhibit B - Expenses)(Segars, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3959 MOTION Motion for Disbursement of Nelson, Zenter, Sartor & Snellings,LLC's Reasonable Expenses re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Nelson Zentner (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sartor, Fred)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3958 RESPONSE by Defendants Daniel M. Homolka, Daniel M. Homolka re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel M. Homolka, #2 Exhibit 2 - Court Ordered Expense Form, #3 Exhibit 3 - Itemized Expense Report)(Medeiros, Joao)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3957 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Fitzgerald Law, PA. (Fitzgerald, Jacob)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3956 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees & Expenses by Plaintiff The Great Bend Cooperative Association (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roth, Kent)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3955 RESPONSE by Movants Denney & Barrett, PC, Denney & Barrett, PC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Denney, Richard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3954 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Johnson Kramer Mulholland Cochrane & Cocharane, PLC. (Mulholland, Neven)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3953 RESPONSE by Movants Zeilinger Law, Zeilinger Law re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Response to Order - Request for Expense Reimbursement (Zeilinger, George)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3952 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Brittany & Briana Deane, Attorneys at Law. (Deane, Briana)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3951 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and Reasonable Expenses by Interested Party Maggio Thompson, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (PDF of Expense Spreadsheet))(Saltaformaggio, Mike)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3950 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Notice of Expenses by Movant T. Mark Sledge, Attorney at Law, PLLC. (Sledge, T.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3949 RESPONSE by Movants Merrida Coxwell, Merrida Coxwell re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Joint Petition for Award From the IRPA Pool (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Claimants)(Coxwell, Merrida)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3948 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Frundt, Lundquist & Gustafson, Ltd.. (Lundquist, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3947 MOTION (Petition) for Award from IRPA Pool re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, , #3945 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #3942 MOTION for Expenses Pursuant to IRPA re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,,. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3947 MOTION (Petition) for Award from IRPA Pool re #3886 Order, by Movant Giles & Lexox, LLC (Lenox, Bryce)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3946 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Didion Ethanol LLC, Didion Ethanol LLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Expense Sheet)(Pizzirusso, James)
January 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3939 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool, #3942 MOTION for Expenses Pursuant to IRPA re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,,. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3945 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff The Great Bend Cooperative Association (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roth, Kent)
January 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3934 MOTION for IRPA Fee Pool Award and for Expenses Reimbursement re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, , #3937 MOTION for Order PE BY LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S ROGERS. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3944 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC. (Johnson, S.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3943 RESPONSE by Movants Ouderkirk Law Firm, Ouderkirk Law Firm re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Ouderkirk Law Firm Expenses (Ouderkirk, Mason)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3942 MOTION (PETITION) (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Expenses Pursuant to IRPA re: #3886 Order, by Movant Edward Tucker. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Expenses Spreadsheet)(Tucker, Edward by (mg))
January 17, 2019 Filing 3941 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mason J. Ouderkirk on behalf of Ouderkirk Law Firm. (Ouderkirk, Mason)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3940 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, By Beasley Allen by Plaintiffs Joseph E. Carpenter, Randy Wiersma, J & J Farms, Inc., Pruden Farms & Partnership, Whiddon Farms, D&C Thornton Farms, GEG Farms, LLC, Ness Enterprises, Inc., Gene Mitchell Farms, Heathman Plantation, Catherine Alderman, Holly Ridge Planting Company, Keith Brown, Brown & Brown, LLC, O'Hare Farms & Bland Peyton, Oak Grove, Inc., Alexander B. Robertson, Sr, Rodgers Farms, Jonathan Lindsey, Huett Brunson, Brunson Bend Farms, Denny Cullen Thornton, William J. Underwood, David Rice, Justin Rice. (Pescia, Leslie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3939 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Interested Party Mesh Besher and Spence (Nemo, Anthony)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3938 NOTICE of Expenses by Griffin, Dietrich & Elliott, LLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Dietrich, Troy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3937 MOTION for Order PE BY LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S ROGERS by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Rogers, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3936 NOTICE of Expenses by Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC (Degnan, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3935 RESPONSE by Movants Carpenter & Schumacher, PC, Carpenter & Schumacher, PC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Expense Spreadsheet) (Carpenter, Nathan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3934 MOTION for IRPA Fee Pool Award and for Expenses Reimbursement re #3886 Order, by Movant Barrett Law, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expenses Spreadsheet)(Barrett, Jonathan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3933 RESPONSE by Movants Ellison, Kovarik & Turman Law Firm, PC, Ellison, Kovarik & Turman Law Firm, PC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Ellison, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3932 RESPONSE by Movants Kirk Law Firm, PLLC, Kirk Law Firm, PLLC re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Expense Application (Kirk, Dana)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3931 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Habush Habush & Rottier, SC. (Rottier, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3930 RESPONSE by Movants Ferrer Poirot Wansbrough, Ferrer Poirot Wansbrough re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, (Kirtley, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3929 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Critchfield, Critchfield & Johnston, Ltd.. (Drushal, J.)
January 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3926 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3928 NOTICE of Expenses by Dewald Deaver, PC, LLO (Degnan, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3927 NOTICE of Expenses Incurred by The Poppe Law Firm re: #3886 Order. (Poppe, Hans) (Main Document 3927 replaced on 1/17/2019 with a firm named document.) (mg))
January 17, 2019 Filing 3926 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Interested Party Borgess Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Borgess, Pamela)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3925 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson and Schluesche, SC. (Schluesche, Todd)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3924 RESPONSE to #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, by Movant Yira Law Office, Ltd.. (Yira, Markus)
January 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3923 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3923 MOTION for Order Petition for Award from IRPA Pool by Movant The Gibbs Firm, LPA (Gibbs, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3922 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff Mahan Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Expenses)(DeMarcus, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3921 RESPONSE by Movants Fluegel, Anderson, McLaughlin & Brutelag, Chartered, Fluegel, Anderson, McLaughlin & Brutelag, Chartered re #3886 Order,,,,,,,,, Petition for Award from IRPA Pool (Lina, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3920 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Jason Lina on behalf of Fluegel, Anderson, McLaughlin & Brutelag, Chartered. (Lina, Jason)
January 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3919 MOTION for Award from IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3919 Joint MOTION (Petition) (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award from IRPA Pool and Award for Expenses by Movants Lewis, Kullman, Sterbcow & Abramson, LLC, The Law Office of Donald K. Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ibert, Jessica)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3918 RESPONSE by Movants Forbes Law Group, LLC re: #3886 Order.(Templeton, Quentin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3917 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Church Church Hittle & Antrim. (Antrim, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3916 AMENDED DOCUMENT (Common Benefit Assessment Fees) Regarding #3637 Motion by Merrida Coxwell. (Coxwell, Merrida)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3915 NOTICE of Expenses Incurred by Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. (Degnan, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3914 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Law Office of Leonel Alejandro, PC. (Alejandro, Leonel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3913 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Irvin L. Masching. (Masching, Irvin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3912 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (and Memorandum In Support) for Disbursement of the Hecker Law Group's Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Court Orders by Movant The Hecker Law Group. (Hecker, Jacob)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3911 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Irvin L. Masching on behalf of Irvin L. Masching. (Masching, Irvin)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3910 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3902 Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund. The Court approves the disbursement of $686,393.55 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached to the Motion as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/11/19. (hw)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3909 ORDER granting #3906 motion to withdraw documents filed in error. The clerk is directed to block from public view documents docketed as ECF Nos. #3903 and #3904 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3908 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, PC. (Barnes, Beth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3907 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Beth A. Barnes on behalf of Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, PC. (Barnes, Beth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3906 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Withdraw Documents #3903 and #3904 by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP, Defendant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Barnes, Beth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3905 RESPONSE to #3886 Order, by Movant Law Office of Mark L. Eurek, PC. (Eurek, Mark) (Main Document 3905 replaced on 1/17/2019 with firm named document.) (mg))
January 10, 2019 Filing 3904 (DISREGARD: Filed in Error. Public Viewing Restricted. See 3909 Order.) NOTICE of Expenses Incurred by Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, PC by Watts Guerra, LLP. (Barnes, Beth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3903 (DISREGARD: Filed in Error. Public Viewing Restricted. See 3909 Order.) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Beth A. Barnes on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Barnes, Beth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3902 Unopposed Eighth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
January 10, 2019 APPEAL FEE PAID in the amount of $505 Receipt No. K4631057149 re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #3894 . (Appeal No. 19-3009) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ca)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3901 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Supplement to Allocation Order re: #3882 Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/9/19. (hw)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3900 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE COURT'S DECEMBER 31, 2018 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, ECF NO. #3882 (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/9/19. (hw)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3899 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 01/08/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3009 re: #3894 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (tvn)
January 9, 2019 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #3894 . (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3898 DOCKET ANNOTATION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279): Per 10th Circuit Court of Appeals docket entry #3894 is a new appeal, not an amended appeal as originally filed. (tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3897 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 01/08/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3008 re: #3891 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3896 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 01/08/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3006 re: #3887 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by W. Lee Egler Farms, Egler Brothers, Inc., F. Ronalds Walker. (tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3895 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) transmitted to 10CCA re: #3894 Notice of Appeal (Appeal No. 18-3253). (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn) Modified title on 1/9/2019 per 10th Circuit, this is considered a new appeal and not an amended appeal. (tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3894 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (LaCroix, Anthony) Modified title on 1/9/2019 per 10th Circuit this is a new appeal, not an amended appeal(tvn).
January 8, 2019 Filing 3893 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #3891 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3892 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 01/07/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3005 re: #3888 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Jami Hayhurst. (tvn)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3891 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3849 Memorandum and Order, #3850 Final Order and Judgment by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4677382. (Toups, Mitchell)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3890 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) transmitted to 10CCA re: #3888 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3889 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) transmitted to 10CCA re: #3887 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3888 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3849 Memorandum and Order, #3850 Final Order and Judgment by Objector Jami Hayhurst. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675729. (Cochran, George)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3887 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3849 Memorandum and Order, #3850 Final Order and Judgment by Objectors Egler Brothers, Inc., W. Lee Egler Farms, F. Ronalds Walker. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675372. (Walker, F. Ronalds)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3886 ORDER REGARDING IRPA APPLICATIONS AND EXPENSE APPLICATIONS - (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Any attorney who represented a settlement class claimant with respect to the claims covered by the settlement, prior to the preliminary approval of the settlement on April 10, 2018, and who seeks an award from the IRPA pool, shall file in the Court, on or before January 18, 2019, a petition for an award from the IRPA pool, regardless of whether or not the attorney has previously been included in a petition for an award of fees for common benefit work. Each attorney applicant for an award from the IRPA pool shall also submit to the Claims Administrator via the applicant's Law Firm Portal on the Corn Seed Settlement Program website, on or before January 18, 2019, the Excel spreadsheet which will be posted on the page for this MDL on the Court's website and on the Corn Seed Settlement Program website. The IRPA pool applicant must also submit to the Claims Administrator on or before January 18, 2019, a retainer agreement (or, if no retainer agreement exists, a power of attorney) for each claimant listed on the Excel spreadsheet. Any attorney who is not included in an expense application previously submitted and who files a petition for an award or expenses on or before January 18, 2019shall complete and submit an Excel spreadsheet in the form attached hereto as Exhibit B. Accordingly, any attorney who previously submitted an expense application by the August 3, 2018 deadline and believes that revision of such expense application is appropriate to assure conformity to the standards and limitations contained at pages 12 through 14 of the Court's CBO of July 27, 2015 may file with the Court via ECF and submit to the special master a revised expense application, on or before January 18, 2019, that the attorney believes satisfies the Court's standards and limitations Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet Claimant List, #2 Exhibit B - Expense Sheet) The excel spread sheet referenced in Exhibit A can be found on the page for this MDL on the Court's website and on the Corn Seed Settlement Program website.(ses)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3885 ORDER - In light of the filing of the Final Order and Judgment #3850 , the following motions are hereby deemed moot: #3343 Syngenta's Post-Trial Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Alternatively, Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial and/or Remittitur, #3431 Producer Plaintiff's Second-Phase Motion for Class Certification, and #3439 Syngenta's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(B). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/02/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3884 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) re: #3882 Memorandum and Order. (Attachments: #1 Email from Judge Herndon, #2 Email from Judge Miller)(ses)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3883 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - On or before February 1, 2018, co-lead counsel shall file with the Court a report and recommendation concerning their proposed division. On or before February 15, 2018, attorneys in this pool shall file any responses or objections to co-lead counsel's report and recommendation. Co-lead counsel shall file any reply brief on or before February 22, 2018. The Court will then make the final awards of fees to attorneys in this pool. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/31/2018. (ses)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3882 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - It is Ordered that the special master's Report and Recommendation #3816 is hereby adopted in part as set forth herein. The following objections are sustained in part to the extent that the Court has altered the master's recommendations concerning the IRPA pool: Bassford Remele, P.A. #3823 ; Hossley-Embry #3825 ; Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC #3826 ; Toups / Coffman #3827 ; Clark / Phipps Group #3832 ; The Hecker Law Group #3833 ; Watts Guerra LLP #3836 ; Shields Law Group, LLC #3840 ; and Kirk Law Firm #3842 . Those objections are otherwise overruled. The objection by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC #3835 is overruled in its entirety. Johnson Becker, PLLC's request for clarification #3838 is granted, as set forth herein. The special master shall file a further report and recommendation concerning awards for reimbursement of expenses from the settlement fund. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/31/2018. (ses)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3881 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3876 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses and the Court approves the disbursement of $2,470,110.49 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached to the Motion as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/28/2018. (ses)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3880 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re: #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 18-3253) (tvn)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3879 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File re: #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Received from 10CCA). (tvn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3878 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing of Corporate Disclosure Statement, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Claim Action Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support in Kellogg v. Watts Guerra, 18-cv-2408 by Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA. (Koehler, Matthew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3877 TRANSCRIPT of Attorney Fee Allocation Hearing held December 17, 2018 before Judge John W. Lungstrum. Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Andrew Karron. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2019. (kg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3876 Unopposed SEVENTH MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3875 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA in the tag-a-long case Kenneth Kellogg, et al v. Watts Guerra, et al, Case No.: 18-cv-2408-JWL-JPO. (Koehler, Matthew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3874 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA in tag-a-long case Kenneth P. Kellogg v. Watts Guerra 18-cv-2408-JWL-JPO. (Koehler, Matthew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3873 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Matthew G. Koehler on behalf of Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA. (Koehler, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3872 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: IN COURT HEARING regarding Attorney Fee Allocation held on 12/17/2018. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (ses)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3871 Amended NOTICE of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. - Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hood, Chris)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3870 RESPONSE to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Plaintiff Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. - Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1)(Garrison, W.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3869 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Bassford Remele to Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3868 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3836 Objections to the Special Masters Report And Recommendation by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Pine Hurst Acres, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Kenneth Osborn, Bradley J. Vermeer, Norman Sigrist, Ron Wetz. (Phipps, Martin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3867 CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel and Settlement Class Counsel Christopher Seeger to all Objections to the Special Masters Report And Recommendation by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3866 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC. (Gustafson, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3865 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Gustafson Gluek PLLC to Objections to the Special Master's November 21, 2018 Report & Recommendation by Movant Gustafson Gluek, PLLC. (Gustafson, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3864 OMNIBUS RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Watts Guerra LLP to Objections to the Special Master's November 21, 2018 Report & Recommendation by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Watts, Mikal)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3863 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3862 MDL Co-Lead Counsel and Settlement Counsel's Motion for Enlargment of Page Limits and counsel shall have up to and including 68 pages for this consolidated response, inclusive of the introduction, factual background, argument and authorities section and conclusion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/14/2018. (ses)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3862 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Responses to Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendation by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Stueve, Patrick)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3861 AMENDED PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) transmitted to 10CCA re: #3858 Amended Notice of Appeal (Appeal No. 18-3253). (Attachments: #1 Amended Preliminary Record)(tvn)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3860 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Regarding the Extension of Time for the Claims Administrator's Preliminary Report by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stueve, Patrick)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3859 ORDER - Any response to the objections to the special master Report and Recommendation of November 21, 2018, is due by December 14, 2018. In order to facilitate the courts' review, any such response shall be filed by 12:00 PM (noon) CST on December 14, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3858 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (LaCroix, Anthony)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3857 APPEAL DOCKETED (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in 10CCA on 12/11/2018 and assigned Appeal No. 18-3253 re: #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (tvn)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3856 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3822 Unopposed Motion for Approval of Claims Processing Procedure by All Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/11/2018. (ses)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3855 ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON DECEMBER 17, 2018 (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - See Order for Details concerning the December 17, 2018 hearing on objections to the Special Master's report and recommendation concerning the initial allocation of the Court's attorney fee award, awards of expenses and service awards. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/11/2018. (ses)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3854 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #3847 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3853 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing in Kellogg Tag-A-Long Action by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Ricke, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3852 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office, Ltd. (Medeiros, Joao)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3851 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3850 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(ses)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3849 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279)- Plaintiffs' motion for final settlement approval and other relief #3776 is hereby granted, and the Court will issue a separate order setting forth the granted relief as requested by plaintiffs. Moreover, the Court approves the withdrawal of two objections #3684 , withdrawal requested in #3774 ; #3673 , withdrawal requested in #3782 , and it overrules all other objections to the settlement or to the total fee award (Doc. # #3545 , #3667 , #3669 , #3671 , #3672 , #3680 , #3681 , #3682 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT total attorney fees are awarded in the amount of one third of the settlement fund, or $503,333,333.33, and the petition for attorney fees filed by MDL co-lead counsel and settlement class counsel #3585 is granted to that extent (and otherwise remains pending). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the special master's pending motion for mediation expenses #3564 is granted as unopposed, and the special master is awarded $205,720.10 from the settlement fund. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/07/2018. (ses)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3848 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Hossley, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3847 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) as to #3811 Order on Motion for Settlement, #3849 Memorandum and Order, and #3850 Final Order and Judgment by Interested Parties Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654022. (LaCroix, Anthony)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3846 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Offer Argument by Shields Law Group, LLC. (Shields, Spencer)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3845 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear at Fee Allocation Hearing by Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Toups, Mitchell)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3844 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by Clark Love Hutson, GP re: #3832 Objection to #3816 Report of the Special Master. (Clark, Clayton)
December 6, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3822 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Claims Processing Procedure. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3843 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by Kirk Law Firm, PLLC regarding #3842 Objection to #3816 Report of the Special Master. (mg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3842 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Kirk Law Firm, PLLC. (mg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3841 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Dana G. Kirk on behalf of Kirk Law Firm, PLLC. (mg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3840 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Shields Law Group, LLC. (Shields, Spencer)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3839 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present by Johnson Becker, PLLC re: #3838 Request for Clarification / Objection to #3816 the Report of the Special Master. (Johnson, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3838 REQUEST (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Clarification Regarding #3816 Report of the Special Master by Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3837 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by Watts Guerra, LLP. (Watts, Mikal)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3836 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 the Special Master's November 21, 2018 Report and Recommendation by Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Index of Exhibits)(Watts, Mikal)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3835 OBJECTION to #3816 Special Master Report by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Garrison, W.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3834 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument by The Hecker Law Group re: #3833 Objection by The Hecker Law Group. (Hecker, Jacob)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3833 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master by The Hecker Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hecker, Jacob)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3832 Joint OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master Regarding Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Service Awards by Clark Love Hutson, GP. (Love, Scott)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3831 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Jacob A. Hecker on behalf of The Hecker Law Group. (Hecker, Jacob)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3830 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intention to Appear at Fee Allocation Hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3829 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Oral Argument by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. (Garrison, W.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3828 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument regarding #3826 Objection to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Gates, Joseph)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3827 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Toups, Mitchell)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3826 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master Regarding Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Service Awards by Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Gates, Joseph)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3825 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master Regarding Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Service Awards by Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hossley, Daniel)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3824 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Intent to Appear and Present Argument regarding #3823 Objection to #3816 Report of the Special Master by Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3823 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3816 Report of the Special Master Regarding Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Service Awards by Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3822 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Approval of Claims Processing Procedure by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 12/06/2018. (mg))
December 4, 2018 Filing 3821 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3820 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Patrick F. Philbin as to Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC, Syngenta AG. (Schult, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3819 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Approval Hearing (53 pages) held 11/15/2018 before Judge John W. Lungstrum, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Ms. Ellen Reisman. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2019. (ks)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3818 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.): the following order was entered on the docket in Kellogg v. Watts Guerra, as (ECF No. 126): ORDER - In light of their amended motion, plaintiffs' original motion to stay proceedings #118 is MOOT. Plaintiffs' amended motion to stay proceedings #120 is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief in support of their motion for partial declaratory judgment or for certification 69 on or before 11/30/2018. Plaintiff shall file their memorandum in support of their motion for preliminary injunction #50 on or before 11/30/2018; defendants' response is due 12/14/2018; and plaintiffs reply is due 12/28/2018. Plaintiffs' motion to amend their complaint with respect to four defendants 119] is GRANTED as unopposed. Plaintiffs' amended complaint #121 is hereby deemed filed against all defendants named therein. The pending motion to dismiss #108 and all joinders therein are hereby deemed MOOT. All defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before 12/07/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/26/2018. (ses)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3817 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - Objectors Krause Ag, LLC #3672 and James Barber Living Trust et al. #3680 are hereby granted leave to file, on or before December 3, 2018, any response to the Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval #3815 . Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/26/2018.Mailed to pro se party James Barber Living Trust, et al., by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3816 REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Reisman, Ellen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3815 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3777 Memorandum in Support of #3776 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Patrick J. Stueve)(Stueve, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3814 ORDER - The Court has been informed that co-lead counsel for plaintiffs has sent the special master an email following up on an issue from the final approval hearing. Plaintiff should include that information in a supplemental brief, filed with the Court by November 26, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3813 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE (listen in only) FOR HEARING ON DECEMBER 17, 2018: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. A hearing to discuss allocation of fees among the jurisdictions and approval concerning expenses and service awards is set for set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum, District Judge David R. Herndon, and Judge Laurie J. Miller. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 2126821. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3812 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER: (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) On or before November 21, 2018, Ms. Reisman shall prepare and file a report and recommendation concerning the Court's initial allocation of its attorney fee award from the settlement fund; the reimbursement of expenses from the fund; and the Court's approval of any requests for service awards. Any objection to the master's report and recommendation shall be filed on or before December 5, 2018, and any response to an objection shall be filed on or before December 14, 2018. The Court will conduct a hearing on any objection on December 17, 2018, at 1:00 PM CST in Courtroom #643. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/15/2018. (ses)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3811 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING held on 11/15/2018 regarding #3776 Motion for Settlement. WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. The Court appoints Ellen Reisman as special master to render a REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the allocation of fees, expenses and service awards and said report shall be filed no later than 11/21/2018. Any objection thereto shall be filed no later than 12/05/2018 and any response to the objections should be filed no later than 12/14/2018. A hearing to discuss allocation of fees among the jurisdictions and approval concerning expenses and service awards is set for set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum, District Judge David R. Herndon, and Judge Laurie J. Miller. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (ses)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3810 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of the Notice and Claims Administrator in Support of Plaintiffs' #3776 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stueve, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3809 NOTICE (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) of Filing Notice of Respondents' Joint Answer in Response to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3808 NOTICE of Correspondence Regarding November 15, 2018 Hearing by Jami Hayhurst (and Dale Brookover). (Cochran, George)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3807 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Objector Jami Hayhurst re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award, #3776 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Cochran, George) **Reminder to counsel -- Exhibits should be e-filed as separate attachments to your document.**
November 8, 2018 Filing 3806 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Interested Parties Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts re: #3776 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rademacher Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Roberts Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rep Forms, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence with Admin., #5 Exhibit 5 - Claims Data)(LaCroix, Anthony)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3805 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3776 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement. (Stueve, Patrick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3804 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chris Hood on behalf of Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. - ALL PLAINTIFFS in ILS 17-320 / KS 17-2460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hood, Chris)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3803 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. on behalf of Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. - ALL PLAINTIFFS in ILS 17-320 / KS 17-2460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garrison, W.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3802 ORDER REGARDING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/06/2018. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3801 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Settlement Approval Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 01:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 2126821. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg) (Conference line information added on 11/6/2018. (mg))
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3800 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3799 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/5/2018. (as)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3799 Unopposed Sixth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3798 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in Support of #3776 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and, Specifically, in Response to Cochran and Bandas Objections by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Stueve, Patrick) (Linked to #3667 Notice, #3669 Objections)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3797 NOTICE of Filing (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3796 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Simon Rademacher on October 30, 2018. (Downing, Don)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3795 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jami Hayhurst on 10/26/18. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3794 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dale Brookover on 10/26/18. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3793 NOTICE OF SERVICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Jami Hayhurst of Responses to Document Requests by Plaintiffs. (Cochran, George)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3792 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W Lungstrum: MOTION HEARING held on 10/23/2018 re: #3760 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas for Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts, #3757 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jami Hayhurst. The motions were granted in part, denied in part and found moot in part as set forth in full on the record. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (ses)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3791 NOTICE of Filing (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office, Ltd. (Medeiros, Joao)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3790 NOTICE of Filing in Tag-a-long Action (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Dewald Deaver, PC, LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. (Degnan, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3789 NOTICE of Joinder in Tag-A-Long Action (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Johnson Law Group, VanDerGinst Law, PC, Wagner Reese, LLP. (Boylan, Arthur)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3788 NOTICE of Filing in Tag-A-Long Action (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Ricke, Kelly)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3787 NOTICE of Filing (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Francisco Guerra. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3786 NOTICE of Filing of Joinder in Tag-A-Long Case (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Johnson Law Group, VanDerGinst Law, PC, Wagner Reese, LLP. (Boylan, Arthur)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3785 NOTICE of Filing in Tag-A-Long Action (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Ricke, Kelly)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3784 NOTICE of Filing (Relates to 18-2408; Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al. v. Watts Guerra, LLC, et al.) by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office, Ltd. (Medeiros, Joao)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3783 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3673 Objections (Request for a Service Award) by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3782 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Plaintiff Rail Transfer, Inc.'s Withdrawal of Objections to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear and Present Argument at the Final Fairness Hearing by Rail Transfer, Incorporated re: #3674 Affidavit, #3673 Objections. (Robinovitch, Hart)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3781 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Objections of Class Member Simon Rademacher to Document Requests Included in Deposition Subpoena, documents responsive to the deposition subpoena, and Objector Simon Rademacher's Privilege Log by Simon Rademacher. (LaCroix, Anthony)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3780 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Objector Jami Hayhurst re: #3757 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order. (Cochran, George)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3779 ORDER granting #3775 Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Rail Transfer, Inc.'s Objection and for Rail Transfer to File a Reply. Plaintiffs' response to Rail Transfer's Objection #3673 is due 10/22/2018 and Rail Transfer's reply is due 11/08/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/18/2018. (ses)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3778 ORDER granting #3774 Motion to Withdraw #3684 Objection and #3766 Notice of Appearance by Sharon Brunet. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/18/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 18, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3775 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3673 Objection. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(yh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3777 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3776 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Orran L. Brown, Sr, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit List)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3776 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Final Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3775 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3673 Objection by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/18/2018. (mg))
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3773 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3772 MDL Co-Lead Counsel and Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for Enlargement of Page Limits and counsel shall have up to and including 55 pages for the argument and authorities section of their Memorandum. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/17/2018. (ses)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3774 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Withdraw #3684 Objection and #3766 Notice of Appearance by Sharon Brunet. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Copy of FedX Envelope) (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3772 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Enlargement of Page Limits for their Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Stueve, Patrick)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3771 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Christopher Roberts on 10/16/2018. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3770 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3760 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas for Deposition and Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3769 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3757 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley T. Wilders)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3768 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Objection of Class Member Christopher Roberts to the Document Requests Included in Deposition Subpoena, documents responsive to the deposition subpoena, and Objector Christopher Roberts Privilege Log by Christopher Roberts. (LaCroix, Anthony)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3767 ORDER - By agreement of the parties, the October 10, 2018, deadline contained in the Court's preliminary approval order (Doc. #3532 ) is hereby extended to October 17, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3766 (WITHDRAWN: See 3778 Order.) NOTICE of Intent to Appear regarding #3532 Hearing by Adam Brunet, Sharon Brunet. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3765 ORDER - The #3764 Settlement Class Counsel's NOTICE of Withdrawal of #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief filed by All Plaintiffs is GRANTED and the motion #3746 is deemed withdrawn. The motion hearing scheduled for 10/10/2018 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3764 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Withdrawal of Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief by All Plaintiffs re: #3746 Settlement Class Counsel's MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief, #3747 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3763 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - The #3760 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas for Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Simon Rademacher and Christopher Roberts is set for hearing by TELEPHONE on 10/23/2018 at 11:00 am before District Judge John W.Lungstrum. Any response to the motion shall be filed on or before October 12, 2018, and any reply shall be filed on or before October 19, 2018. Objectors are not required to comply with the subpoenas pending resolution of the motion to quash. Counsel who wish to participate in this hearing shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 2126821. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3762 SUR-SURREPLY (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3739 Surreply to #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
October 9, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3760 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3761 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Shields Law Group, LLC re: #3654 Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses.(Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Spencer Shields)(Shields, Spencer)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3760 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Quash or Modify Subpoenas for Deposition and Production of Documents by Interested Parties Christopher Roberts, Simon Rademacher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(LaCroix, Anthony) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/09/2018. (mg))
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3759 NOTICE: the following order was entered on the docket in Kellogg v. Watts Guerra, 18-2408, as (ECF No. 98): ORDER LIFTING STAY: This case was stayed on August 28, 2018, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") on plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of the JPML's order transferring this action to the District of Kansas (ECF No. 97). On October 3, 2018, the JPML denied plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Accordingly, the stay in this case will be lifted on October 13, 2018, per the August 28, 2018 order. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby set for October 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/5/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3758 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - The #3757 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jami Hayhurst is set for hearing by TELEPHONE on 10/23/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Any response to the motion shall be filed on or before October 12, 2018, and any reply shall be filed on or before October 19, 2018. Objectors are not required to comply with the subpoenas pending resolution of the motion to quash. Counsel who wish to participate in this hearing shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 2126821. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/05/2018. (ses)
October 5, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3757 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3757 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Quash Subpoenas, and MOTION for Protective Order by Objector Jami Hayhurst. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Cochran, George) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/05/2018. (mg))
October 4, 2018 Filing 3756 SEALED AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Bradley T. Wilders re: #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3755 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE FOR UPCOMING MOTION HEARING ON 10/10/2018 (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279): A Motion Hearing re: Settlement Class Counsel's MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief #3746 is scheduled 10/10/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom #476. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 2126821. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (ses)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3754 AMENDED NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Hearing (courtroom change): THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING re: #3746 Settlement Class Counsel's MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief: Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3753 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING on #3746 Settlement Class Counsel's #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief: Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3752 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3748 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Declaration of Bradley T. Wilders to #3747 Memorandum in Support of #3746 Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/04/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief: Response deadline 10/9/2018 by noon and the Reply deadline is 10/10/2018 by noon.(ses)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3751 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3749 Motion to Expedite Settlement Class Counsel's Motion to Expedite Briefing on Their Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman by In Re All Plaintiffs. Any response in opposition to the motion be filed on or before October 9, 2018 at Noon and that any reply brief be filed by on or before October 10 at Noon. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/04/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 4, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3749 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Their Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman, #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(yh)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3750 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3745 Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Certain Objectors and for these Objectors to File Replies. Plaintiffs shall have up to November 1, 2018, to file their combined response to the Rademacher, Roberts, Hayhurst and Brookover objections only and these objectors shall have up to November 8, 2018, to file any replies. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/04/2018. (ses)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3749 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Expedite Briefing on Their #3746 Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/04/2018. (mg))
October 4, 2018 Filing 3748 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Declaration of Bradley T. Wilders to #3747 Memorandum in Support of #3746 Motion to Enjoin Toups/Coffman by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3747 (WITHDRAWN: See #3764 Notice of Withdrawal.) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3746 MOTION to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3746 (WITHDRAWN: See #3764 Notice of Withdrawal.) MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Enjoin Toups/Coffman and For Other Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)(Motion Referral Removed on 10/04/2018. (mg))
October 4, 2018 Filing 3745 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Extension of Time to File Responses to Certain Objectors and for These Objectors to File Replies by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Stueve, Patrick)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3744 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kelly A. Ricke on behalf of Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Ricke, Kelly)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3743 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC re: #3614 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (Waters, Kerrianne)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3742 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3741 Unopposed Fifth Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Releated Expenses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/01/2018. (ses)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3741 Unopposed Fifth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3740 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3738 Motion for Leave by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC to file reply to responses to motion for award of attorney fees and reimbursement of expenses and movants shall file the reply attached as exhibit 1 to their motion forthwith. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3739 SURREPLY (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Interested Parties Christopher Roberts, Simon Rademacher re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award. (LaCroix, Anthony)
September 27, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3738 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3738 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Responses to Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Waters, Kerrianne) (Motion Referral Removed on 09/27/2018. (mg))
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3737 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3733 Objecting Class Members, Simon Rademacher & Christopher Roberts', Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, and they shall file the sur-reply, attached as exhibit 1 to the motion, forthwith. Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel are granted leave to file a sur-surreply no later than 10/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3736 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3729 MOTION to Supplement the Record Out of Time With Regard to the Firm's Supplemental Submission Regarding its #3654 Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3654 Supplemental MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses. (Stueve, Patrick)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3735 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3734 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Shields Law Group, LLC's #3729 Motion to Supplement the Record Out of Time and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by All Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs shall file their the response, which is attached as exhibit A, forthwith and a reply shall be filed no later than 10/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3734 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Response to Shields Law Group, LLC's #3729 Motion to Supplement the Record Out of Time and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
September 26, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3733 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-reply . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3733 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Interested Parties Christopher Roberts, Simon Rademacher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LaCroix, Anthony) (Motion Referral Removed on 09/26/2018. (mg))
September 20, 2018 Filing 3732 EXHIBIT 1 by Shields Law Group LLC per Order of Court (Doc 3731 ) by All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Shields Law Group, LLC. (Shields, Spencer)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3731 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3729 Shields Law Group, LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record Out of Time With Regard to the Firm's Supplemental Submission Regarding its Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses (Doc. #3654 ) and Shields Law Group shall file Exhibit 1, which is attached to the motion, forthwith. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3730 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3727 Motion for Order to Send Reminder Postcards to Settlement Class Members by All Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/19/2018. (ses)
September 19, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3729 MOTION to Supplement the Record Out of Time With Regard to the Firm's Supplemental Submission Regarding its 3654 Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3729 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Supplement the Record Out of Time With Regard to the Firm's Supplemental Submission Regarding its #3654 Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Shields Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SLG Expense Report & Email to Special Masters, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Spencer Shields)(Shields, Spencer)(Motion Referral Removed on 09/19/2018. (mg))
September 18, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3727 Unopposed MOTION to Send Reminder Postcards to Settlement Class Members. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3728 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Plaintiff Bridgeforth Farms, by Dunk & Associates, PLLC re: #3588 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notice of Fee Interest. (Sanchez, Brenna)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3727 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Send Reminder Postcards to Settlement Class Members by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 09/18/2018. (mg))
September 18, 2018 Filing 3726 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Plaintiff Fisher Farms, LLC, by Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC re: #3600 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (Morris, Bradford)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3725 AFFIDAVIT of Spencer C. Shields for #3711 Reply re: #3584 MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Shields Law Group, LLC. (Shields, Spencer)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3724 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Join Arguments and Authorities Set Forth in the Reply Briefs and Memorandums Filed by the Plaintiffs' Counsel of Bassford Remele, PA and Toups-Coffman by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs re: #3604 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. (Hossley, Daniel) (Modified on 09/18/2018 to reflect this is a Motion to Join. (mg))
September 17, 2018 Filing 3723 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Plaintiffs David Stracener, Stracener Farming Company, J. Bart Hunt, Hunt Family Farms Partnership, Larry Petit, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC re: #3583 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses. (Gates, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3722 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP re: #3580 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Index of Exhibits)(Watts, Mikal)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3721 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Ron Wetz, Norman Sigrist, Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Charles A. Welsh, Kenneth Osborn, Bradley J. Vermeer re: #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phipps, Martin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3720 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Coffman, Richard)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3719 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Movant Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP re: #3594 MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barton, Eric)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3718 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movant Johnson Becker, PLLC re: #3575 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Johnson, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3717 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of C. Eiland re: #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Eiland Plaintiffs. (Eiland, A.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3716 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs re: #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (Eiland, A.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3715 (DISREGARD: Incorrect Document Attached. See 9720 for the Corrected Filing.) REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Coffman, Richard)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3714 AFFIDAVIT of James S. Rogers in Support of #3713 Reply re: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Rogers, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3713 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt re: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs. (Rogers, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3712 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 87, #2 Exhibit 88, #3 Exhibit 89, #4 Exhibit 90, #5 Exhibit 91, #6 Exhibit 92, #7 Exhibit 93, #8 Exhibit List)(Stueve, Patrick)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3711 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Shields Law Group, LLC re: #3584 MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SLG Expense Report & Email to Special Masters)(Shields, Spencer)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3710 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Lewis A. Remele in Support of #3709 Responsive Memorandum re: #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Remele, Lewis)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3709 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movant Bassford Remele, PA re: #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees. (Remele, Lewis)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3708 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3707 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/17/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 17, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3707 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3707 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Pages For its Reply Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)(Motion Referral Removed on 09/17/2018. (mg))
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3706 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3705 MDL Co-Lead Counsel's and Settlement Class Counsel Christopher Seeger's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and counsel shall have up to 41 pages, inclusive of the introduction, factual background, argument and authorities section and conclusion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 14, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3705 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3705 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 09/14/2018. (mg))
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3704 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3703 Watts Guerra LLP filed a Motion to Enlarge the Page Limits for its Reply in Support of its Fee & Expense Application. Watts Guerra shall file a reply in support of its Fee & Expense Application on September 17, 2018, containing an arguments and authorities section that does not exceed 60 pages. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/13/2018. (ses)
September 13, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3703 MOTION for Leave to file Excess Page Limits for its Reply in Support of its Application for a Fee & Expense Award . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3703 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Page Limits for its Reply in Support of its Application for a Fee & Expense Award by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Watts, Mikal)(Motion Referral Removed on 09/13/2018. (mg))
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3702 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3701 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/31/2018. (ses)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3701 Unopposed Fourth MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3700 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3699 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Reminder Notices by All Plaintiffs and the Court approves the reminder notices attached as Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Motion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/28/2018. (ses)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3699 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Approve Reminder Notices by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stueve, Patrick)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3698 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3695 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Certain Claims Processing Forms. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/22/2018. (ses)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3697 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Withdrawal by Watts Guerra, LLP re: #3691 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. (Watts, Mikal)
August 21, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3695 Unopposed MOTION Approval of Certain Claims Processing Forms . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3695 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Approval of Certain Claims Processing Forms by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/21/2018. (mg))
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3696 ORDER - Any response to #3691 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal shall be filed on or before August 22, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/20/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hw) (Document number added to docket entry on 8/21/2018. (mg))
August 20, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3691 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3694 RESPONSE by Shields Law Group, LLC re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award. (Shields, Spencer)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3693 CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Defendants re: #3583 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs, #3577 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses, #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3580 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses, #3600 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3599 MOTION (NOTICE of Fee Interest), #3595 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3573 MOTION (Notice of Fee Interest), #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees, #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3590 MOTION (Application) for Attorney's Fees and Expenses, #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #3575 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3569 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3581 MOTION (Application) for Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #3637 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees, #3663 SUPPLEMENT to #3595 Motion for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3604 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, #3614 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3594 MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation, #3584 MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3588 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notice of Fee Interest.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 75, #2 Exhibit 76, #3 Exhibit 77, #4 Exhibit 78, #5 Exhibit 79, #6 Exhibit A to Exhibit 79, #7 Exhibit B to Exhibit 79, #8 Exhibit C to Exhibit 79, #9 Exhibit D to Exhibit 79, #10 Exhibit 80, #11 Exhibit 81, #12 Exhibit 82, #13 Exhibit 83, #14 Exhibit 84, #15 Exhibit 85, #16 Exhibit 86, #17 Exhibit List)(Stueve, Patrick)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3692 OMNIBUS RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) in Partial Opposition to Fee & Expense Applications Filed by Other Common Benefit and Retained Counsel by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Watts, Mikal)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3691 (WITHDRAWN: See #3697 Notice of Withdrawal.) SEALED MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Under Seal by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Watts, Mikal) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/20/2018. (mg))
August 17, 2018 Filing 3690 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Certain Fee and Expense Motions by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Toups, Mitchell)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3689 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Lewis A. Remele, Jr. in Support of Responsive Memorandum Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees re: #3688 Response to #3585 Motion, by Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3688 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Movant Bassford Remele, PA re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award. (Remele, Lewis)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3687 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3685 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limits. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/17/18. (hw)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3686 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Correction to the Watts Guerra Fee & Expense Supplement by Watts Guerra, LLP re: #3661 Supplement to #3580 Motion (Application) for Attorney Fees & Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A, #2 Corrected Exhibit B, #3 Corrected Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Watts, Mikal)
August 16, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3685 MOTION for Enlargement of Page Limits for Their Consolidated Response. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3685 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Enlargement of Page Limits for Their Consolidated Response by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/16/2018. (mg))
August 15, 2018 Filing 3684 (WITHDRAWN: See 3778 Order.) OBJECTIONS by Sharon Brunet. (Attachments: #1 Examples, #2 Copy of Mailing Envelope) (mg)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3683 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Douglas J. Nill on behalf of Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC. (Nill, Douglas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3679 SEALED EXHIBITS B, C and D (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to the #3674 Declaration of Hart Robinovitch in Support of Non-Producer Rail Transfer's #3673 Opposition to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Notice of Intent to Appear and Present Argument at the Final Fairness Hearing by Rail Transfer, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Robinovitch, Hart) Corrected docket text on 8/14/2018. (tvn)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3678 ORDER finding as moot #3670 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/14/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3682 OBJECTIONS by Arnold Guyer. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Mailing Envelope) (mg)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3681 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Luke Petterson. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Mailing Envelope) (mg)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3680 OBJECTIONS by James Barber, Cynthia N. Barber, Harry G. Barber, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Mailing Envelope) (mg)
August 13, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, Kellogg et al v. Watts Guerra, LLP et al, Case #18-01082-DWF-BRT, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3665 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #18-2408-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3677 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3664 Unopposed Motion for Approval of Certain Claims Processing Procedures. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/13/2018. (ses)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3676 ORDER granting #3675 motion for leave to file under seal Exhibits B, C, and D to the affidavit of Hart L. Robinovitch (ECF No. #3674 ). For good cause demonstrated in the motion, Rail Transfer may file these documents under seal. Counsel is directed to file forthwith the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
August 13, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3675 for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Documents to the 3674 Declaration of Hart Robinovitch in Support of Plaintiff Rail Transfer's 3676 Objection to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3675 SEALED MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Documents to the #3674 Declaration of Hart Robinovitch in Support of Plaintiff Rail Transfer's 3676 Objection to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Notice of Intent to Appear and Present Argument at the Final Approval Hearing by Plaintiff Rail Transfer, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Under Seal Version), #2 Exhibit C (Under Seal Version), #3 Exhibit D (Under Seal Version))(Robinovitch, Hart) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/13/2018. (mg))
August 10, 2018 Filing 3674 (WITHDRAWN: See #3782 Notice of Withdrawal.) AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Hart L. Robinovitch re: #3673 Objections by Rail Transfer, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robinovitch, Hart)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3673 (WITHDRAWN: See #3782 Notice of Withdrawal.) OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and NOTICE OF INTENT to Appear and Present Argument at the Final Fairness Hearing by Rail Transfer, Incorporated. (Robinovitch, Hart)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3672 OBJECTIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Class Settlement by Linda Otto, Robert Otto, Krause AG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Watts, Mikal) Modified on 8/14/2018 (mg).
August 10, 2018 Filing 3671 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Settlement by Egler Brothers, Inc., W. Lee Egler Farms, F. Ronalds Walker. (Walker, F. Ronalds)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3670 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for attorney Robert Clore to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4552662.) by Interested Parties Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of R. Clore, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(LaCroix, Anthony)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3669 OBJECTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Proposed Class Action Settlement by Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(LaCroix, Anthony)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3668 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts. (LaCroix, Anthony)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3667 NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS to Settlement and Attorneys' Fees by Jami Hayhurst. (Cochran, George)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3666 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Clarification by MDL Co-Lead Counsel and Settlement Class Counsel by All Plaintiffs re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award, #3587 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Stueve, Patrick)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3665 TRANSFER ORDER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation regarding the District of Minnesota action, #18-cv-01082, Kellogg et al v. Watts Guerra, LLP et al.(mg)
August 8, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3664 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Claims Processing Procedures. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3664 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Approval of Claims Processing Procedures by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/08/2018. (mg))
August 7, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3663 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3663 SUPPLEMENT to #3595 Motion for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Interested Party Speer Law Firm, PA. (Attachments: #1 Speer Law Firm Summary of Expenses)(Speer, Charles) (Modified on 8/8/2018 to reflect this is NOT a Motion. (mg)) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/07/2018. (mg))
August 6, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3654 Supplemental MOTION/Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3655 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3662 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Minnesota Co-Lead Class Counsel's Joint Motion for Approval of Common Benefit Awards by Movant Gustafson Gluek, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gustafson, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3661 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3580 Motion (Application) for Attorney Fees & Expenses by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Watts, Mikal)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3660 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3583 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, by Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplement Paul Byrd Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #2 Exhibit B Supplement Jerry Kelly Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #3 Exhibit C Supplement Russell Winburn Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #4 Exhibit D Supplement Gale Lush Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #5 Exhibit E Supplement DeVaughn James Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #6 Exhibit F Supplement Clark Mason Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #7 Exhibit G Supplement Nolan Awbrey Declaration re Fee and Expense Application, #8 Exhibit H Supplement Jim Thompson Declaration re Fee and Expense Application)(Byrd, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3659 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3598 Memorandum in Support of #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP, Clark Love Hutson, GP, Meyers & Flowers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Phipps, Martin)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3658 SUPPLEMENT to #3577 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration)(Pescia, Leslie)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3657 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3614 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3655 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waters, Kerrianne)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3656 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3599 MOTION (NOTICE of Fee Interest), and SUPPLEMENT AND JOINDER to #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Movant O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, PC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Demerath, Justin)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3655 Supplemental MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Waters, Kerrianne) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/06/2018. (mg))
August 3, 2018 Filing 3654 Supplemental MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A, Sheilds Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shields Law Group Court Ordered Excel Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit V II - SLG Phone Records Jan2015 to Dec2015, #3 Exhibit V III - SLG Phone Records July2018, #4 Affidavit Amended Declaration of Spencer Shields)(Shields, Spencer) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/06/2018. (mg))
August 3, 2018 Filing 3653 SUPPLEMENT to #3595 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Plaintiff Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Saeed & Little - Expenses & Costs)(Pendley, Patrick)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3652 SUPPLEMENT to #3600 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Plaintiff Fisher Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Expenses)(Morris, Bradford)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3651 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3594 MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation by Movant Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barton, Eric)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3650 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3576 Memorandum in Support of #3575 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Movant Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Michael)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3649 SUPPLEMENT by Interested Party 'Maggio Thompson, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Allocation of Attorneys' Fees, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Fee Application)(Saltaformaggio, Mike)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3648 SUPPLEMENT to #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Interested Party Wilcox & Williams, LLC. (Wilcox, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3647 SUPPLEMENT to #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs. (Eiland, A.)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3646 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses by Movant Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Toups, Mitchell)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3645 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Interested Party Nolan Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Routh, Thomas)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3644 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Michael Pattillo, Jr. on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Pattillo, Michael)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3643 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Thomas P. Routh on behalf of Nolan Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Routh, Thomas)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3642 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mike Saltaformaggio on behalf of 'Maggio Thompson, LLP. (Saltaformaggio, Mike)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3641 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award By Co-Lead Counsel and Kansas Common Benefit Firms by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Stueve, Patrick)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3640 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Remele, Lewis)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3639 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award By Subclass Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stueve, Patrick)
August 3, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3637 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3638 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Interested Party Borgess Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Borgess, Pamela)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3637 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Regarding Allocation of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Merrida Coxwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion Regarding Allocation of Attorney's Fees, #2 Memorandum of Law regarding Allocation of Attorney's Fees, #3 Settlement Hours Spreadsheet)(Coxwell, Merrida) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/01/2018. (mg))
August 3, 2018 Filing 3636 SUPPLEMENT to #3590 MOTION (Application) for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by Movant Hodge Law Firm, PLLC. (Rosenbaum, April)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3635 SUPPLEMENT to #3581 MOTION (Application) for Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Movant Paul, LLP. (Paul, Richard)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3634 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Minnesota Co-Lead Counsel's Joint Motion for Approval of Common Benefit Awards and Meshbesher's Minnesota Fee and Expense Application by Interested Party Mesh Besher and Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meshbesher's Minnesota Fee and Expense Application, #2 Exhibit Excel Spreadsheet)(Nemo, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3633 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Pamela A. Borgess on behalf of Borgess Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Borgess, Pamela)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3632 SUPPLEMENT to Minnesota Co-Lead Counsel Fee Petition by Interested Party The Lyon Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time Sheet, #2 Exhibit Expenses)(Lyon, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3631 SUPPLEMENT to #3573 MOTION (Notice of Fee Interest) by Interested Party Conmy Feste, Ltd. (Murch, Douglas)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3630 SUPPLEMENT to #3588 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notice of Fee Interest pursuant to order #3613 by Plaintiffs P&J Farms, Laurie Berry, Ronald Bunton, Bunton Farms, Larry Clark, Lawrence Conyer, Darden Bridgeforth & Sons, Garry Davis, Willie Davis, Wilbur Frederick, Henderson Worldwide Investments, LLC, Dexter Gilbert, Darastus Glover, Mae Glover, Oscar Glover, Ivory Neely, Jerol Hale, Haywood Harrell, John W. Harrell, Reginald Harrell, Warren James, C&J Farm, Inc., Joe Bryant, Billy Jimson, Olin Brown, Sr, Roger Smith, Sneed Brothers, Sneed Farms, Inc., Dell-Cam Farm, Inc., Thomas McClellan, Thomas Turner, Rivah View Farms, Inc., Philip Haynie, III, Philip Haynie, II, Haynie Farms, LLC, Rogers Morris, Victor Goettl, Power Tech Farm, LLC, Terry Priester, Property Resources Excavation, Inc., Joe Patterson, Michael Patterson, Samuel Patterson, Christian Richburg, Bridgeforth Farms, Stanley Richburg, Willie Richburg, Richard Payne, Craig Walker, Yvonne Crum, 7th Harvest, Inc., A.T. Williams Farms, LLC. (Sanchez, Brenna)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3629 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Eric Richard Nitz on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Nitz, Eric)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3628 SUPPLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3550 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Movant Wright & Schulte, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Hourly Time, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Richard W. Schulte)(Schulte, Richard)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3627 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Jeffrey Lamken on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Lamken, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3626 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Thomas Wiegand on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Wiegand, Thomas)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3625 SUPPLEMENT to #3571 Memorandum in Support of #3569 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs pursuant to Order Regarding Attorney Fee Submissions #3613 by Movant Pavlack Law, LLC. (Pavlack, Eric)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3624 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Corrections to Previously-Filed Documents by All Plaintiffs re: #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award, #3587 Memorandum in Support of Motion.(Stueve, Patrick)
August 1, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3622 Supplemental MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3623 EXHIBIT (2) IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3622 Supplemental MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Hossley, Daniel)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3622 Supplemental MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HE Counsels' Spreadsheets-for-supplement-for-attorney-fees-submissions)(Hossley, Daniel) (Linked to original #3604 Motion.) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/01/2018. (mg))
August 1, 2018 Filing 3621 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT (Attorney Fee & Expense Spreadsheets (per ECF No. #3613 ) of #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Rogers, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3620 Amended AFFIDAVIT of James S. Rogers re: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Rogers Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Rogers Declaration)(Rogers, James)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3619 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3616 Unopposed Third MOTION for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Notice-Related Expenses. The Court approves the disbursement of $506,239.89 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/01/2018. (ses)
August 1, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3618 SUPPLEMENT for Attorney Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3618 SUPPLEMENT to #3595 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Benjamin F. Marshall, IV and Associates, LLC. (Marshall, Benjamin) (mg)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3617 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Kerrianne Louise Waters on behalf of Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC. (Waters, Kerrianne)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3616 Unopposed Third MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3615 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Anthony J. Nemo, Sr. on behalf of Mesh Besher and Spence. (Nemo, Anthony)
July 27, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3614 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3614 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Movants Vonachen, Lawless, Trager & Slevin, and Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Waters, Kerrianne) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/27/2018. (mg))
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3613 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY FEE SUBMISSIONS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - Any responses to the filed fee motions and petitions shall be filed by August 17, 2018, with any reply briefs filed by September 17, 2018. Any motion or petition for attorney fees or expenses that has been filed with the Court shall be supplemented by August 3, 2018. Petitioners shall complete and submit an Excel spreadsheet in the form attached hereto as Appendix A as set forth in full in this order. Each petitioner should (a) file (through ECF) a printout of its spreadsheet in PDF form and (b) submit an electronic copy of its spreadsheet in Excel form by email to the Special Masters. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(ses)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3612 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCKET MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk: Upon direction of the Court, and pursuant to 3609 Order, Exhibits 1-3 (A-C) attached to the #3593 Memorandum in Support of #3592 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses have been added to docket entry #3593 Memorandum in Support, and are also attached to this notice for the purpose of electronic notification. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit A - Exhibit A - Individual Client Timesheets, #1 Exhibit B - Attorney Timesheets, #2 Exhibit C - Client Expenses) (mg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3611 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3580 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Watts, Mikal)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3610 ORDER granting #3589 motion for leave to file documents in the public record. Plaintiffs' co-lead counsel has responded that they have no objection to the motion (ECF No. #3607 ). Movant Watts Guerra, LLP is directed to publicly file the documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/16/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3609 ORDER granting #3608 motion to withdraw motion for leave to file under seal (ECF No. #3591 ). The Clerk is directed to term the motion for leave to file under seal (ECF No. #3591 ) and to publicly file Attachments 1--3 to ECF No. #3591 as attachments to the Eiland Law Firm's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (ECF No. #3593 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/16/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3608 MOTION(Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Withdraw #3591 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Exhibits Attached to the Declaration of C. Eiland in Support of #3592 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Eiland, A.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3607 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3589 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File in the Public Record its Memorandum and Two Exhibits Supporting its Fee and & Expense Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Downing, Don)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3606 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Daniel Allen Hossley on behalf of Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Hossley, Daniel)
July 11, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3583 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award, #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs, #3590 MOTION (Application) for Attorney's Fees and Expenses, #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #3575 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3577 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses, #3569 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3581 MOTION (Application) for Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #3580 MOTION (Application) for Fees and Expenses, #3600 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3595 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3604 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, #3573 MOTION (Notice of Fee Interest), #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees, #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3594 MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation, #3584 MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3564 MOTION for Award of Deferred Expenses Incurred in Mediation, #3588 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notice of Fee Interest. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3603 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #3591 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The movant is directed to file a supporting brief that addresses the applicability of the Tenth Circuit's standards regarding when the public's right of access to judicial records may be overcome, as well as when attorney fee statements are considered privileged. The supporting brief is limited to five, double-spaced pages and must be filed by July 16, 2018. Any party that wishes to oppose the motion shall file a response brief, limited to five, double-spaced pages, by July 20, 2018. The movant may then file a reply brief, limited to two, double-spaced pages, by July 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/11/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3602 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #3589 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Any response shall be filed by July 16, 2018. Any reply shall be filed by July 20, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/11/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 11, 2018 Filing 3601 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3600 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by The Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brad Morris, #2 Exhibit 2 - Client/Claim List, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fee Agreements)(Morris, Bradford)
July 11, 2018 Filing 3600 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by The Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC. (Morris, Bradford) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3605 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3604 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel Allen Hossley, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hossley-Embry Redenbaugh & Mohr Client List) (mg)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3604 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees by Movant Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs. (Hossley, Daniel Allen) (mg) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3599 NOTICE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Fee Interest by O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Demerath, Justin)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3598 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3597 Joint MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP, Clark Love Hutson, GP, and Meyers & Flowers, LLC for Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Michael Gries, Richard Crone, VJW Farm, Inc., Norman Sigrist, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Charles A. Welsh, Ron Wetz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Phipps, Martin)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3597 Joint MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP, Clark Love Hutson, GP, and Meyers & Flowers, LLC for Plaintiffs Russell D. Rich, Peter V. Anderson, Michael Gries, Richard Crone, VJW Farm, Inc., Norman Sigrist, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Charles A. Welsh, Ron Wetz. (Phipps, Martin) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3596 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Eric D. Barton re: #3594 MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation by Movant Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barton, Eric)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3595 MOTION for Award of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movants Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP, Saeed & Little, LLP, and Benjamin F. Marshall, IV and Associates, LLC, for Plaintiff Craftco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support of Motion for Common Benefit Atty Fees & Costs 7-10-18, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Cross, Gerald) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3594 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Attorneys Fees and Expenses for Individual Client Representation by Movant Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP. (Barton, Eric) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3593 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3592 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Eiland)(Eiland, A.) (Additional attachments added on 7/17/2018 pursuant to the Court's 3609 Order: #2 Exhibit A - Individual Client Timesheets, #3 Exhibit B - Attorney Timesheets, #4 Exhibit C - Client Expenses) (mg)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3592 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs. (Eiland, A.) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3591 (WITHDRAWN: See 3609 Order.) SEALED MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Under Seal the Exhibits Attached to the Declaration of C. Eiland in Support of #3592 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by Interested Party Eiland Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Individual Client Timesheets, #2 Exhibit Attorney Timesheets, #3 Exhibit Client Expenses)(Eiland, A.) (Withdrawn 07/16/2018; Exhibits e-filed as directed pursuant to the 3609 Text Entry Order. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3590 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Application) for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by Movant Hodge Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Time & Billing Statement, #2 Exhibit C - Declaration of Shaun Hodge, #3 Exhibit D - Hodge Resume)(Rosenbaum, April) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3589 SEALED MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File in the Public Record its Memorandum and Two Exhibits Supporting its Fee and & Expense Application by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Watts, Mikal)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3588 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Attorney Fees and Notice of Fee Interest by Movant Dunk & Associates, PLLC for Plaintiffs Antron Williams, Larry Clark, Christian Richburg, Stanley Richburg, Willie Richburg, Bridgeforth Farms, Joe Bryant, Ronald Bunton, Bunton Farms, Lawrence Conyer, Garry Davis, Willie Davis, P&J Farms, Yvonne Crum, Henderson Worldwide Investments, LLC, Joe Patterson, Michael Patterson, Samuel Patterson, Wilbur Frederick, Philip Haynie, III, Philip Haynie, II, Haynie Farms, LLC, Howard James, Warren James, Laurie Berry, Thomas McClellan, Craig Walker, Darden Bridgeforth & Sons, Ivory Neely, Olin Brown, Sr., Richard Payne, Power Tech Farm, LLC, Terry Priester, Property Resources Excavation, Inc., C&J Farm, Inc., Victor Goettl, Rogers Morris, Thomas Turner, Dexter Gilbert, Darastus Glover, Mae Glover, Oscar Glover, Dell-Cam Farm, Inc., Roger Smith, Sneed Brothers, Sneed Farms, Inc., Rivah View Farms, Inc., Haywood Harrell, John W. Harrell, Reginald Harrell, Billy Jimson, 7th Harvest, Inc., A.T. Williams Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Orville Dunk)(Sanchez, Brenna) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3587 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3585 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award by Christopher Seeger for All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Appendix A, #76 Exhibit List)(Stueve, Patrick)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3586 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3583 MOTION (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses by Movant Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case List, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Paul Byrd, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jerry Kelly, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Nolan Awbrey, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jim Thompson, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Clark Mason, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Russell Winburn, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Gale Lush, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of DeVaughn James)(Byrd, John)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3585 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives/Bellwether Plaintiffs and Allocation of Attorneys' Fee Award by Christopher Seeger for All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3584 MOTION (Application) for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Movant Shields Law Group, LLC for Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Spencer Shields, #2 Exhibit List List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A Producer & Non-Producer Client Lists, #4 Exhibit B SLG Client Contracts Vol 1, #5 Exhibit B SLG Client Contracts Vol 2, #6 Exhibit C to T, #7 Exhibit U SLG Expense Logs 2015 to 2018, #8 Exhibit V SLG Phone Logs Vol 1, #9 Exhibit V SLG Phone Logs Vol 2, #10 Exhibit V SLG Phone Logs Vol 3, #11 Exhibit V SLG Phone Logs Vol 4, #12 Exhibit W to Z)(Shields, Spencer) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3583 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Petition) for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses by Movant Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC. (Byrd, John) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3582 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Spencer C. Shields on behalf of All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Producer and Non Producer Plaintiffs)(Shields, Spencer)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3581 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Application) for Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Movant Paul, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Richard M. Paul III, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Paul, Richard) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3580 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Application) for Fees and Expenses by Movant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Mikal Watts, #6 **SEE BELOW FOR SIGNED DECLARATION -- Exhibit 5 Declaration of Frank Guerra, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10.1, #12 Exhibit 10.2, #13 Exhibit 10.3, #14 Exhibit 10.4, #15 Exhibit 10.5, #16 Exhibit 10.6, #17 Exhibit 10.7, #18 Exhibit 10.8, #19 Exhibit 10.9, #20 Exhibit 10.10, #21 Exhibit 10.11, #22 Exhibit 10.12, #23 Exhibit 10.13, #24 Exhibit 10.14, #25 Exhibit 10.15, #26 Exhbit 10.16, #27 Exhibit 10.17, #28 Exhibit 11, #29 Exhibit 12, #30 Exhibit 13, #31 Exhibit 14)(Watts, Mikal) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg)) (Additional attachment added on 9/25/2018: #32 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Frank Guerra SIGNED COPY) (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3579 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by William P. Ferranti on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Ferranti, William)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3578 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by April L. Rosenbaum on behalf of Hodge Law Firm, PLLC, April L. Rosenbaum. (Rosenbaum, April)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3577 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Application) for Fees and Expenses by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC for Plaintiffs McLendon Farms, Inc., Huett Brunson, Brunson Bend Farms, Jonathan Lindsey, Live Oaks Planting Company, Gene Mitchell Farms, D&C Thornton Farms, DR III Farm, Inc., David Rice Farms, Vance McCorkle, Triple A Farms, J & J Farms, Inc., Joseph E. Carpenter, Heathman Plantation, Beth Houser, John D. Houser, III, Houser Farms, Catherine Alderman, GEG Farms, LLC, Carl Krielow, David Rice, Justin Rice, Holly Ridge Planting Company, Robbins Properties, Inc., Alexander B. Robertson, Sr., Rodgers Farms, Denny Cullen Thornton, Paul Nixon, O'Hare Farms & Bland Peyton, Oak Grove, Inc., Keith Brown, Brown & Brown, LLC, Pruden Farms & Partnership, Riverbend Plantation & 4 G Farms, James H. Paul, Jr, Jimmy Brad Tackett, Rodney Duncan, William J. Underwood, Vance McCorkle Farms, Justin Rice Farms, Kaidland Inc., Ness Enterprises, Inc., Whiddon Farms, Randy Wiersma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs List, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of C. Lance Gould, #3 Exhibit 3 Firm Resume)(Pescia, Leslie) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3576 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3575 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Movant Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael K. Johnson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Johnson, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3575 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Movant Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Johnson, Michael) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3574 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Justin B. Demerath on behalf of O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, PC. (Demerath, Justin)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3573 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) (Notice of Fee Interest) by Interested Party Conmy Feste, Ltd. (Murch, Douglas) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3572 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Douglas Murch on behalf of Conmy Feste, Ltd. (Murch, Douglas)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3571 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3569 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Pavlack Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Clients of Pavlack Law, LLC & Co-Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2. Time Records of Pavlack law, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3. Expenses of Pavlack Law, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4. Declaration of Eric S. Pavlack, #5 Exhibit 5. Declaration of Jason R. Reese, #6 Exhibit 6. Time Records of Wagner Reese, LLP)(Pavlack, Eric)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3570 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of Lewis A. Remele, Jr. re: #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Remele, Lewis)
July 10, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs, #3569 MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees, #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses, #3564 MOTION for Award of Deferred Expenses Incurred in Mediation. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3569 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Pavlack Law, LLC. (Pavlack, Eric)(Motion Referral Removed on 07/10/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3568 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3565 MOTION Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3567 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3566 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Toups, Mitchell)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3566 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses by Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs. (Toups, Mitchell) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/10/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3565 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) Regarding Allocation of Attorney Fees by Movant Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/10/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3564 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Award of Deferred Expenses Incurred in Mediation by Special Master Ellen K. Reisman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ellen K. Reisman)(Reisman, Ellen) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/10/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3563 AFFIDAVIT of James S. Rogers re: #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Rogers Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Rogers Declaration)(Rogers, James)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3562 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Rogers, James)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3561 MOTION for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Chep R. Gauntt. (Rogers, James) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/10/2018. (mg))
July 10, 2018 Filing 3560 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by A. Craig Eiland on behalf of Eiland Plaintiffs. (Eiland, A.)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3559 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Eric Pavlack on behalf of Pavlack Law, LLC. (Pavlack, Eric)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3558 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Michael K. Johnson on behalf of Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Johnson, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3557 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Richard W. Schulte on behalf of Wright & Schulte, LLC. (Schulte, Richard)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3556 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Mikal C. Watts on behalf of Watts Guerra, LLP. (Watts, Mikal)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3555 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Lewis A. Remele, Jr. on behalf of Bassford Remele, PA. (Remele, Lewis)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3554 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3552 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Ron Wetz, Charles A. Welsh, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Russell D. Rich, Norman Sigrist, VJW Farm, Inc. and the Court permits these parties' Memorandum Brief in Support of Joint Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses to contain up to forty-five (45) pages of arguments and authorities. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/09/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3553 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3551 MDL Co-Lead Counsel and Settlement Class Counsel Christopher Seeger's Motion for Enlargement of Page Limits and the page limit is increased to 62 pages. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/09/2018. (ses)
July 9, 2018 Filing 3552 Joint MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Ron Wetz, Charles A. Welsh, Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Russell D. Rich, Norman Sigrist, VJW Farm, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Phipps, Martin)
July 9, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3551 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
July 9, 2018 Filing 3551 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
July 7, 2018 Filing 3550 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3549 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Wright & Schulte, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff List, #2 Exhibit Hourly Time, #3 Exhibit Expenses, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Schulte, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Randall, #6 Exhibit Declaration Brian Galligan, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Welsh, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Fred Schultz)(Schulte, Richard)
July 7, 2018 Filing 3549 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs by Movant Wright & Schulte, LLC. (Schulte, Richard) (Motion Referral Removed on 07/11/2018. (mg))
July 3, 2018 Filing 3548 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marcy Blattner on behalf of Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. (Blattner, Marcy)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3547 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3546 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Non-Related Expenses. The Court approves the disbursement of $624,778.63 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/19/2018. (ses)
June 18, 2018 Filing 3546 Unopposed Second MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Notice-Related Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
June 1, 2018 Filing 3545 OBJECTIONS to Settlement by Mark Lorance. (mg)
May 31, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, Watson v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. et al, Case #18-0126, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3544 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-85). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #18- 2284-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
May 30, 2018 Filing 3544 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85) as to Texas Southern case #18-00126, Watson v. Syngenta Seeds, LLC et al. ONLY by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Sygenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/30/18. (hw)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3543 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/30/18. (hw)
May 16, 2018 Filing 3542 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas V. Bender, J. Brett Milbourn, and Dirk Hubbard. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3541 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3540 Unopposed Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Claim and Non-Related Expenses. The Court approves the disbursement of $417,551.13 from the Qualified Settlement Fund to pay the invoice attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/14/2018. (ses)
May 10, 2018 Filing 3540 Unopposed First MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Disbursement of Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3539 ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3538 Unopposed to Substitute Long Form Notice and Claim Forms. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/09/2018. (ses)
May 9, 2018 Filing 3538 Unopposed MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Substitute Long Form Notice and Claim Forms by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Stueve, Patrick)
April 16, 2018 Filing 3537 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Kenneth A. Wexler on behalf of Kruseman Fertilizer Company. (Wexler, Kenneth)
April 11, 2018 Filing 3536 NOTICE of Access to ECF No. #3509 (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3534 Order, and #3509 SEALED Exhibits. (Stueve, Patrick)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3535 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINT CITIBANK, N.A. AS ESCROW AGENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3530 Motion for Order. See order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/10/2018. (ses)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3534 ORDER REGARDING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AGREEMENT CONTAINING OPT-OUT WALK AWAY RIGHT THRESHOLDS UNDER SEAL WITH LIMITED ACCESS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) granting #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/10/2018. (ses)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3533 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND TO ENJOIN PUTATIVE SETTLEMENT CLASS FROM COMMENCING OR PROSECUTING ANY RELATED CLAIMS PENDING FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) re: #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/10/2018. (ses)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3532 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND THE SYNGENTA DEFENDANTS, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPOINTING SETTLEMENT CLASS COUNSEL SUBCLASS COUNSEL, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, APPROVING THE NOTICE PLAN, AND AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE, APPOINTING THE NOTICE ADMINISTRATOR AND CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR AND SPECIAL MASTERS, AND SETTING A SCHEDULE FOR THE FINAL APPROVAL PROCESS (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) re: #3506 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Final Settlement ApprovalHearing set for 11/15/2018 at 01:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/10/2018. (ses)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3531 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT plaintiffs' motion for preliminary settlement approval and related relief #3506 is granted, and the Court will issue a separate order setting forth the particular terms of relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT the motion by the Toups/Coffman plaintiffs for certain relief #3499 , joined by the Hossley-Embry plaintiffs, is hereby denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties' joint motion for a stay and injunction #3512 is hereby granted, and the Court will issue a separate order setting forth the particular terms of relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties' joint motion for leave to file the walk away agreement under seal #3508 is hereby granted, and the Court will issue a separate order setting forth the particular terms of relief. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/10/2018. (ses)
April 6, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3530 Joint MOTION to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint Escrow Agent. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
April 6, 2018 Filing 3530 Joint MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint Escrow Agent by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 04/06/2018. (mg))
April 6, 2018 Filing 3529 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held April 5, 2018 before Judge John W. Lungstrum, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Ms. Jennifer Wieland. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2018. (kg)
April 5, 2018 Filing 3528 MINUTE ENTRY (Relates to Kansas State Class Action) for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: MOTION HEARING held on 4/5/2018 re: #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement, (ii) Be Appointed to the Plaintiffs Settlement Negotiation Committee, and (iii) Compel the Production of Documents and Information filed by Kenneth Borah, J & P Farm, Dirba Farms, #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY), #3506 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY).(SEE MINUTE SHEET FOR DETAILS) WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW.(Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (ses)
April 2, 2018 Filing 3527 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement, #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access. (Stueve, Patrick)
April 2, 2018 Filing 3526 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3506 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stueve, Patrick)
March 28, 2018 Filing 3525 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher A. Seeger on behalf of Dixie Moore, Gregory Harris, Darvin Bentlage, Charlynn Hamilton, Karl Otte, Jr., Stephen W. Tuttle. (Seeger, Christopher)
March 28, 2018 Filing 3524 NOTICE OF HEARING and AVAILABILITY OF LISTEN IN TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE: A motion hearing is scheduled for APRIL 5, 2018 at 1:30 PM in COURTROOM #643, located on the 6th Floor, Robert J. Dole United States Courthouse, 500 State Avenue, Kansas City, Kansas. (See orders #3513 and #3523 for details of the motion hearing). A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 2126821. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call.(ses)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3523 ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON APRIL 5, 2018: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS Counsel and parties who have not submitted timely written briefs on these motions will not be permitted to argue at the hearing. The Court grants the various motions by the Hossley-Embry Plaintiffs to join in the motion and briefs submitted by the Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs (Doc. # #3500 , #3517 , #3518 , #3520 , #3521 ). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/28/2018. (ses)
March 27, 2018 Filing 3522 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by Daniel E. Gustafson on behalf of Grant Annexstad, Leroy Edlund, Roger Ward. (Gustafson, Daniel)
March 26, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3521 MOTION to Join, #3520 MOTION to Join, #3518 MOTION to Join, #3517 MOTION to Join. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3521 MOTION to Join #3519 Response in Opposition to #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hossley, Daniel) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/26/2018. (mg))
March 26, 2018 Filing 3520 MOTION to Join #3516 Reply to #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hossley, Daniel) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/26/2018. (mg))
March 26, 2018 Filing 3519 RESPONSE in Opposition by Plaintiff Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs re: #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement. (Toups, Mitchell)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3518 MOTION to Join #3515 Response in Opposition to #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hossley, Daniel) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/26/2018. (mg))
March 26, 2018 Filing 3517 MOTION to Join #3514 Response in Opposition to #3506 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hossley, Daniel)(Motion Referral Removed on 03/26/2018. (mg))
March 26, 2018 Filing 3516 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Kenneth Borah, J & P Farm, Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs, Williams Farms, LLC, Dirba Farms re: #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toups, Mitchell)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3515 RESPONSE in Opposition by Plaintiff Williams Farms, LLC re: #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access. (Toups, Mitchell)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3514 RESPONSE in Opposition by Plaintiffs Kenneth Borah, J & P Farm, Williams Farms, LLC, Dirba Farms re: #3506 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Toups, Mitchell)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3513 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: The following motions, #3499 , #3500 , #3506 , #3508 , and #3512 are set for hearing on 4/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. The response deadline as to motions, #3506 , #3508 , and #3512 is 3/26/2018; Reply deadline is 12:00 PM CDT on 4/2/2018. Reply deadline as to motions #3499 , and #3500 is 3/26/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/20/2018. (mg)
March 16, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3512 Joint MOTION for Leave to file Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(srj)
March 16, 2018 Filing 3512 Joint MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Motion to Stay and to Enjoin Putative Settlement Class From Commencing or Prosecuting Any Related Claims Pending Final Approval of the Settlement by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/16/2018. (mg))
March 16, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(srj)
March 14, 2018 Filing 3511 NOTICE that Plaintiffs Intend to file a (i) Response to the #3506 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and (ii) Reply in re: Their #3499 Motion to Delay Consideration of the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Kenneth Borah, J & P Farm, Williams Farms, LLC, Dirba Farms. (Toups, Mitchell)
March 13, 2018 Filing 3510 RESPONSE (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) by All Plaintiffs re: #3500 MOTION to Join, #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement, (ii) Be Appointed to the Plaintiffs Settlement Negotiation Committee, and (iii) Compel the Production of Documents and Information. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen K. Reisman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Stueve, Patrick)
March 12, 2018 Filing 3509 SEALED EXHIBIT (1) (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) re: #3508 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access. (Stueve, Patrick) (Sealed Access given as directed to ONLY those attorneys listed in #3536 Notice.)
March 12, 2018 Filing 3508 Joint MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Leave to File Agreement Containing Opt-Out Walk Away Right Thresholds Under Seal with Limited Access by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 03/16/2018. (mg))
March 12, 2018 Filing 3507 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) of #3506 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Declaration of Patrick Stueve, #11 Declaration of Daniel Gustafson, #12 Declaration of Christopher Seeger, #13 Declaration of Orran Brown, #14 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #15 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #16 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #17 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #18 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #19 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #20 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #21 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #22 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #23 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #24 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Orran Brown, #25 Exhibit C, #26 Exhibit D, #27 Exhibit E, #28 Exhibit F, #29 Exhibit G)(Stueve, Patrick)
March 12, 2018 Filing 3506 MOTION (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs.(Stueve, Patrick)
March 12, 2018 Filing 3505 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Relates to ALL CASES Except: 16-2788; 14-2637; 17-2614; and 15-2279) against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Stueve, Patrick)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3504 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION MASTER COMPLAINT. See order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/12/2018. (ses)
March 8, 2018 Filing 3503 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kent A. Roth on behalf of The Great Bend Cooperative Association. (Roth, Kent)
March 7, 2018 Filing 3502 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) by attorney William P. Ferranti as to William N. Funk, Funk Seed, LLC. (Ferranti, William)
March 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Entry #3501 Entry of Appearance was filed in the incorrect case and has been blocked from public view.(kao)
March 2, 2018 Filing 3501 (DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kent A. Roth on behalf of Bell Planting Co. (Roth, Kent) Modified on 3/2/2018 to block from public view. (kao)
February 28, 2018 Filing 3500 MOTION TO JOIN by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Listed In Exhibit A regarding #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement, (ii) Be Appointed to the Plaintiffs Settlement Negotiation Committee, and (iii) Compel the Production of Documents and Information. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1, #2Exhibit 2, #3Exhibit 3)(Hossley, Daniel) (Modified on 03/01/2018 to reflect this is a motion. (mg))
February 28, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement, (ii) Be Appointed to the Plaintiffs Settlement Negotiation Committee, and (iii) Compel the Production of Documents and Information . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
February 27, 2018 Filing 3499 MOTION (i) Delay Consideration of the Request for Preliminary Approval of the Mediated Settlement Agreement, (ii) Be Appointed to the Plaintiffs Settlement Negotiation Committee, and (iii) Compel the Production of Documents and Information by Plaintiffs Dirba Farms, J & P Farm, Kenneth Borah. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitchell A. Toups, #2 Declaration of Richard L. Coffman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Toups, Mitchell) (Motion Referral Removed on 02/28/2018. (mg))
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3498 ORDER granting #3497 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw From Plaintiffs' Executive Committee And For Archer Daniels Midland Company to Be Excused From Further Settlement Special Master Payments. Mr. Graham is hereby withdrawn as a member of the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee in this MDL. ADM's obligation to pay any fees or expenses of the settlement special master is hereby terminated with regard to any such fees or expenses incurred on or after January 3, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/27/2018. (mg)
February 26, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3497 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw from Plaintiffs' Executive Committee and for ADM to be Excused from further Settlement Special Master Payments. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
February 26, 2018 Filing 3497 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw from Plaintiffs' Executive Committee and for ADM to be Excused from further Settlement Special Master Payments by Plaintiff Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Graham, David) (Motion Referral Removed on 02/26/2018. (mg))
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3496 ORDER (Relates to Missouri and Arkansas Classes Certified by the Court): It is ordered that the new deadline for the parties to file dispositive motions for the Arkansas and Missouri Classes is May 28, 2018; the deadline for the parties to file oppositions to dispositive motions for the Arkansas and Missouri Classes is June 18, 2018; the deadline for the parties to file replies in support of dispositive motions for the Arkansas and Missouri Classes is July 2, 2018; and the trial date for the Arkansas and Missouri Classes is October 9, 2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/26/2018.(ses)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3495 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Patrick J. Stueve, William B. Chaney, Don M. Downing and Scott A. Powell as to The Great Bend Cooperative Association. (Chaney, William)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3494 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.). All future filings that relate to only the Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al., Case No: 16-2788/16-3588 are to filed in Case No: 16-2788, not in the MDL 14-md-2591 proceeding. The Clerk of the District Court shall refile all documents filed in Case No: 14-md-2591, In re: Syngenta AG MIR 162 Corn Litigation that relate only to the Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al., Case no: 16-2788/16-3588 into Case No: 16-cv-2788. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/06/2018. (mg)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3492 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT - (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) If the settlement documentation is not finalized to the satisfaction of Judges Lungstrum, Herndon, and Miller by February 22, 2018, a mandatory settlement meeting shall be held in Conference Room 659 in the United States District Court for the District of Kansas beginning at 9:00 a.m. on February 26, 2018, and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/30/2018. (ses)
January 25, 2018 Filing 3493 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2018 in the Minnesota Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County District Court before Judges Miller, Lungstrum, and Herndon presiding. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3491 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) finding as moot #3120 Syngenta's Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3490 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting in part and denying in part #3376 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #3472 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/19/2018. (ses)
January 19, 2018 Filing 3489 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Sean R. Cooper as to Wilson Farm, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3488 ORDER - A subsequent mandatory settlement status conference is set for 1/25/2018 at 01:00 PM at the HENNEPIN COUNTY GOVERNMENT CENTER in the Minnesota Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County District Court before Judges Miller, Lungstrum, and Herndon presiding. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/04/2018. (ses)
January 4, 2018 Filing 3487 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jeff Nye as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3486 ORDER - All deadlines established in the Court's Order #3453 are vacated. The trial date for the Arkansas and Missouri producer classes is reset for 5/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. All deadlines previously set in document #3319 for the May 14, 2018 trial of the Illinois and Nebraska producer classes are hereby made the deadlines for the Arkansas and Missouri producer classes trial. Any additional trial dates and scheduling shall be addressed in connection with the January 25, 2018 status conference. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/20/2017. (ses)
December 20, 2017 Filing 3485 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Status Conference held December 19, 2017 before Judge John W. Lungstrum, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Berkowitz Oliver. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2018. (kg)
December 19, 2017 Filing 3484 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC re: #3472 MOTION to Strike #3466 Affidavit, #3470 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion. (Doolittle, Patrick)
December 19, 2017 Filing 3483 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum, Judge David R. Herndon (Southern District of Illinois), and Judge Laurie Miller (Minnesota Fourth Judicial District Court): STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2017. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3482 ORDER - At the conclusion of the Settlement Status Conference on 12/19/2017, this Court will take up requests concerning a stay and scheduling as it relates to the MDL proceeding. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/13/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3481 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE: A mandatory settlement status conference is set for 12/19/2017 at 01:00 PM in KC Room 643 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum, Judge David R. Herndon (Southern District of Illinois) and Judge Laurie Miller (Minnesota Fourth Judicial District Court) Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/12/2017. (ses)
December 8, 2017 Filing 3480 JOINT REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Stueve, Patrick)
December 5, 2017 Filing 3479 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #3472 MOTION to Strike #3466 Affidavit, #3470 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion.(Schult, Thomas)
November 29, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Florida, Wiggins v. Syngenta AG et al, Case #17-00802-RV-CJK, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3478 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-84). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #17-2675-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
November 28, 2017 Filing 3478 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-84) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Sygenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. (hw)
November 21, 2017 Filing 3477 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to 17-2637 Gauntt v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc., et al.) by Clyde Talbot Turner on behalf of Chep R. Gauntt. (Turner, Clyde)
November 20, 2017 Filing 3476 NOTICE (Relates to 17-2637 Gauntt v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc., et al.) to Conform to Producer Plaintiffs Third Amended Class Action Master Complaint by Chep R. Gauntt. (Rogers, James)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3475 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting #3474 Motion to Modify Deadlines Regarding Motion to Strike [#3472], and the Response deadline is extended to 12/5/2017, and the Reply deadline is extended to 12/19/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/17/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 17, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3474 Consent MOTION to Modify Deadlines Regarding #3472 Motion to Strike. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
November 17, 2017 Filing 3474 Consent MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) to Modify Deadlines Regarding #3472 Motion to Strike by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 11/17/2017. (mg))
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3473 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) re: #3472 MOTION to Strike #3466 Affidavit, #3470 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion filed by Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC, the Court sets a Response deadline of 11/21/2017, and a Reply deadline of 11/28/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/15/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
November 15, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3472 MOTION to Strike #3466 Affidavit, #3470 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
November 14, 2017 Filing 3472 MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) to Strike #3466 Affidavit, #3470 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Motion Referral Removed on 11/15/2017. (mg))
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3471 ORDER (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) - In light of the Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice #3457 , the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #3190 is deemed moot. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/14/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 9, 2017 Filing 3470 SEALED REPLY (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) to Response to Motion by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #3376 MOTION to Partially Dismiss #3236 First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K)(Schult, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3469 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting #3465 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Syngenta's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss LDC's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/09/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 7, 2017 Filing 3468 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (Relates to #17-2637, Gauntt v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc., et al.) by Heather Cover on behalf of Chep R. Gauntt. (Cover, Heather)
November 7, 2017 Filing 3467 Joint STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) With Prejudice by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas)
November 7, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3465 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Syngenta's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss LDC's First Amended Complaint. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
November 6, 2017 Filing 3466 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) of Thomas P. Shult re: #3465 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Syngenta's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss LDC's First Amended Complaint by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N)(Schult, Thomas)
November 6, 2017 Filing 3465 SEALED MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) for Leave to File Under Seal Syngenta's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss LDC's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K)(Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 11/07/2017. (mg))
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3464 ORDER (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.)granting #3463 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #3190 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint and the Response deadline is extended to 11/13/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/06/2017. (ses)
November 6, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3463 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
November 3, 2017 Filing 3463 Consent MOTION (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint by Defendants Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 11/06/2017. (mg))
November 1, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Washington, Gauntt v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. et al, Case #17-5166, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3462 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-83). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #17-2637-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
November 1, 2017 Filing 3462 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-83) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Sygenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/1/17. (hw)
October 31, 2017 Filing 3461 NOTICE OF SERVICE (Relates to #17-2534, Rohrbach et al v. Syngenta AG et al) by Jason Rohrbach, Rohrbach Farms, Inc. of Documents and Fact Sheet. (Powell, Scott)
October 26, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Western District of Wisconsin, The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG et al, Case #17-0778, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3458 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-82). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #17-2614-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
October 26, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of South Dakota, Larson et al v. Syngenta Corporation et al, Case #17-1024, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3457 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-81). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #17-2610-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
October 26, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Iowa, Bunda et al v. Syngenta Corporation et al, Case #17-2080, received pursuant to MDL 2591 #3457 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-81). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #17-2607-JWL-JPO.) (mg)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3460 ORDER (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.)granting #3459 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and the Response deadline is extended to 11/3/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/25/2017. (ses)
October 25, 2017 Filing 3459 Consent MOTION (Relates to 16-2220 Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint by Defendants Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas)
October 23, 2017 Filing 3458 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Sygenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/23/17. (hw)
October 19, 2017 Filing 3457 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-81) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Sygenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/19/17. (hw)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3456 ORDER: In light of the adjusted trial settings for the remaining bellwether cases (see ECF No. #3453 ), the pretrial conference scheduled for November 15, 2017, is cancelled. By December 8, 2017, the parties shall jointly submit a new proposed date for the pretrial conference, as well as a proposed deadline for the parties to submit the omnibus proposed pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/16/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3455 ORDER (Relates to 16-2220, Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc.) granting #3454 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint and the Response deadline is extended to 10/25/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/11/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 11, 2017 Filing 3454 Consent MOTION (Relates to 16-2220, Funk v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re: #2188 Amended Complaint by Defendants Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas)
October 10, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: PURSUANT TO ORDER #3453 - The trial date for the Arkansas and Missouri producer class trial is moved from January 16, 2018, to APRIL 4, 2018; the trial date for the Illinois and Nebraska producer class trial is moved from April 4, 2018, to MAY 14, 2018; the trial date for the Iowa and South Dakota producer class trial is moved from May 14, 2018, to OCTOBER 9, 2018; and the trial date for the Ohio producer class trial is moved from October 9, 2018, to a date to be set thereafter. All deadlines previously set for the April 4, 2018 trial in ECF #3319 will become the deadlines for the Arkansas and Missouri producer class trial; all deadlines previously set for the May 14, 2018 trial in ECF #3319 will become the deadlines for the Illinois and Nebraska producer class trial; and all deadlines previously set for the October 9, 2018 trial in ECF #3319 will become the deadlines for the Iowa and South Dakota producer class trial. (ses)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3453 ORDER granting #3452 Motion to Stay Deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR TRIAL SETTING DETAILS. It is ORDERED that, excluding the deadlines for those claims brought by exporters like Louis Dreyfus Company, all other deadlines in this matter are stayed, including all deadlines related to the upcoming producer class trials scheduled in 2018 and all post-trial briefing related to the Kansas class trial (including the motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.54(b)). On or before December 8, 2017, the parties will report on their progress to the Court, and either recommend a continuation of the stay or jointly propose a schedule for all other remaining pretrial deadlines for these trials and for post-trial motions for the Kansas class trial. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/10/2017. (ses)
October 10, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3452 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Execution of Settlement Agreements. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
October 9, 2017 Filing 3452 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Execution of Settlement Agreements by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/10/2017. (mg))
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3451 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting #3450 Syngenta's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re: #3376 MOTION to Partially Dismiss #3236 First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC and the Reply deadline is extended to 11/6/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/06/2017. (ses)
October 6, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3450 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss as to #3376 MOTION to Partially Dismiss #3236 First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
October 6, 2017 Filing 3450 Consent MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss as to #3376 MOTION to Partially Dismiss #3236 First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/06/2017. (mg))
October 5, 2017 Filing 3449 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION (Relates to Nationwide and Kansas Classes) by All Plaintiffs re: #3439 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(B). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick)
October 3, 2017 Filing 3448 SEALED RESPONSE (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) by Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC re: #3376 MOTION to Partially Dismiss #3236 First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC.(Doolittle, Patrick)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3447 ORDER (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) granting #3445 Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal LDC's Opposition to Syngenta's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/03/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 3, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3445 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal LDC's Opposition to Syngenta's Partial Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
October 2, 2017 Filing 3446 AFFIDAVIT (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) of Patrick C. Doolittle re: #3445 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal LDC's Opposition to Syngenta's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC. (Doolittle, Patrick)
October 2, 2017 Filing 3445 SEALED MOTION (Relates to 16-2788 / 16-3588 Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising LLC v. Syngenta AG, et al.) for Leave to File Under Seal LDC's Opposition to Syngenta's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Louis Dreyfus Company Grains Merchandising, LLC. (Attachments