Lengel v. HomeAdvisor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emerald Lengel
Defendant: HomeAdvisor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02198
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 86 Motion to Vacate Order. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 11/21/17. (hw)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER striking 74 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 09/25/2017.Mailed to pro se party Frederick Banks by regular mail. (cv)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 56 Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Updated Class Action Settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court preliminarily approves the proposed settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court approv es the proposed notice and the manner of distributing the notice to the settlement class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any motion for attorneys' fees and expenses and a class representative service award at least 14 days befo re the deadline to opt out or object. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file the motion for final approval no later than 14 days before the final approval hearing. In the final approval motion, plaintiffs shall address any timely submitted objections to the settlement agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will conduct a final approval hearing on July 27, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/12/2017. (hl)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs' unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement (Doc. #49) filed November 18, 2015 be and hereby is SUSTAINED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Fe deral Rule of Civil Procedure 23(c), the Court preliminarily certifies the following settlement class: All applicants for employment with HomeAdvisor about whom HomeAdvisor procured a consumer report for employment purposes at any time from January 1 3, 2013 through June 10, 2015, excluding any individuals who timely file a valid written notice of intent to opt out of the Settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court appoints Emerald Lengel as class representative for the settlement class. The Court appoints Kai H. Richter of Nichols Kaster, PLLP and Michael F. Brady and Mark Kistler of Brady & Associates as class counsel for the settlement class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before February 6, 2017, plaintiffs may file a motion for preliminary approval of a revised settlement and for approval of a revised proposed class notice. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/25/2017. (hl)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 5/5/15. (meh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lengel v. HomeAdvisor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerald Lengel
Represented By: Michael F. Brady
Represented By: Daniel Bryden
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeAdvisor, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Samsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?