Mark LeTourneau et al v. Kansas Department of Transportation, et al
Plaintiff: Mark LeTourneau and Deborah LeTourneau
Defendant: Venture Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv02629
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Defendant Venture Corporation's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 87 Plaintiffs Deborah LeTourneau, Mark LeTourneau's Motion in Limine. Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Witness & Exhibit List is SUSTAINED (see order for details). Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 7/23/2018. (mam)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 77 Motion to Designate Wichita as Place for Trial. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 01/19/2018. (tvn)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/1/2017. (hl)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 54 Motion to Strike and Exclude Plaintiffs' Designation of Jan Roughan as an Expert Witness. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/3/2017. (hl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark LeTourneau et al v. Kansas Department of Transportation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark LeTourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah LeTourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Corporation
Represented By: Tyler E. Heffron
Represented By: John P. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?