Ezfauxdecor, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Ezfauxdecor, LLC and Amber Shank
Defendant: Alison Smith, Appliance Art Incorporated, Instant One Media, Inc. and Easy Home Renewals
Case Number: 2:2015cv09140
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/23/17. (df)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion Regarding ESI Protocol; granting in part and denying in part 122 Second Motion to Adopt ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/16/17. (df)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 81 Motion for Protective Order; granting 83 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for ESI protocol; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for ESI protocol; granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motion. The Court will enter the Protective Order as a separate entry in the Court's docketing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/6/17. (df)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 63 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/17/17. (hw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezfauxdecor, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezfauxdecor, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Shank
Represented By: Steven J. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Smith
Represented By: Cheryl L. Burbach
Represented By: Todd A. Gangel
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appliance Art Incorporated
Represented By: Cheryl L. Burbach
Represented By: Todd A. Gangel
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instant One Media, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl L. Burbach
Represented By: Todd A. Gangel
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Home Renewals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?