Lenexa Hotel, LP v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lenexa Hotel, LP
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv09196
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 132 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/26/2018. (amh)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting 36 joint motion to amend scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/24/2017. (amh)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 3 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the magistrate judge shall expedite proceedings to prepare the case for trial beginning September 11, 2017. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/24/17. (kao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenexa Hotel, LP v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenexa Hotel, LP
Represented By: Brennan P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?