Fish et al v. Kobach et al
Plaintiff: Fish, Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Donna Bucci, Ralph Ortiz, Douglas Hutchinson and Steven Wayne Fish
Defendant: Kobach, Kansas Secretary of State, Kris W. Kobach and Nick Jordan
Undetermined: Alder Cromwell, Jamie Shew, Cody Keener and Parker Bednasek
Amicus Curiae: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., The
Interested Party: Tabitha M Lehman
Case Number: 2:2016cv02105
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On January 14, 2019, Scott Schwab replaced Kris Kobach as Secretary of State for the State of Kansas. The party name of the defendant has been updated to reflect this change. (tvn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 573 NOTICE of Substitution by Kris W. Kobach (Crouse, Toby)
January 18, 2019 Filing 572 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Garrett Roe, Kris Kobach, Sue Becker as to Kris W. Kobach (Roe, Garrett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 571 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Consol Interested Dft Kris W. Kobach re #542 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law . (Attachments: #1 Ex 1)(Roe, Garrett)
October 25, 2018 Filing 570 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #560 Motion to Enforce Protective Order and #564 Motion to Clarify, or in the Alternative, for Modification of Trial Order. The Court clarifies its oral rulings at trial to make clear that the videotape of Defendant's deposition was not made part of the public record and is therefore not released from its confidential status under the protective order. Defendant's #569 Motion for Stay of Execution of Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Enforce Protective Order is moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/25/2018. (hl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 569 MOTION for Stay of Execution of Ruling on Def's Motion to Enforce the Protective Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Becker, Susan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 568 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #564 MOTION to Clarify or in the alternative, for Modification of Trial Order (Bonds, Lauren)
October 12, 2018 Filing 567 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #564 MOTION to Clarify or in the alternative, for Modification of Trial Order (Becker, Susan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 566 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #560 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Becker, Susan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 565 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #560 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order and Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Orion Danjuma, #2 Ex. A - KCUR Letter, #3 Ex. B - Pro Publica Letter, #4 Ex. C - Smith Declaration, #5 Ex. D 9.10.18 Letter re Tape, #6 Ex. E 3.23.16 Telephonic Conf. Tr. Excerpt)(Bonds, Lauren)
September 28, 2018 Filing 564 MOTION to Clarify or in the alternative, for Modification of Trial Order by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonds, Lauren)
September 19, 2018 Filing 563 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #557 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Appeal No. 18-3186). (tvn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 562 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Kris W. Kobach re #557 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Received from 10CCA. (tvn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 561 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #560 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Becker, Susan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 560 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Becker, Susan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 559 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 09/04/2018 and assigned Appeal No. 18-3186 re: #557 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Kris W. Kobach. (tvn)
September 4, 2018 Filing 558 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: #557 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
August 31, 2018 Filing 557 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4573427. (Parker, Stanley)
August 31, 2018 Filing 556 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stanley R. Parker on behalf of Kris W. Kobach (Parker, Stanley)
August 7, 2018 Filing 555 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: DISMISSING appeal (Appeal No. 16-3175). (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(tvn)
August 1, 2018 Filing 554 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #529 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs are awarded $24,658 in attorneys' fees and $1,556.79 in expenses as a sanction for the contempt found by the Court in its April 2018 Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/1/2018. (bw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 553 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #548 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Appeal No. 18-3133). (tvn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File re #548 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Received from 10CCA. (tvn)
July 6, 2018 Filing 551 STATUS REPORT Jointly Submitted Regarding Compliance by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A June 20 2018 Instructions, #2 Exhibit B 2018.06.25 Compliance Letter)(Bonds, Lauren)
July 3, 2018 Filing 550 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 07/03/2018 and assigned Appeal No. 18-3133 re #548 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Kris W. Kobach. (tvn)
July 3, 2018 Filing 549 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #548 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(tvn)
July 2, 2018 Filing 548 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #543 Judgment, #542 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4522808. (Crouse, Toby)
July 2, 2018 Filing 547 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Toby Crouse on behalf of Kris W. Kobach. (Crouse, Toby)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #545 Joint Motion for an Order Holding in Abeyance Proceedings Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/2/2018. (hl)
June 29, 2018 Filing 545 Joint MOTION for Order Holding in Abeyance Proceedings Regarding Attorneys' Fees & Expenses by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonds, Lauren)
June 28, 2018 Filing 544 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Stephen D. Bonney as to All Plaintiffs (Bonney, Stephen)
June 19, 2018 Filing 543 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/18/2018. (hl)
June 18, 2018 Filing 542 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/18/2018. (bw) (Main Document 542 replaced and regenerated on 6/19/2018 due to typographical error.) (hl).
June 14, 2018 Filing 541 RESPONSE to #540 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
June 13, 2018 Filing 540 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Kris W. Kobach (Becker, Susan)
June 12, 2018 Filing 539 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt (Attachments: #1 Ex. F Contempt Hr'g Tr. Excerpt, #2 Ex. G Ho Declaration)(Bonney, Stephen)
June 4, 2018 Filing 538 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KBA Survey)(Becker, Susan)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #532 Defendant's Motion for a Stay, or in the Alternative, an Extension of Time to File Response re #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt. In light of the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals' dismissal of the appeal, Defendant's motion for stay is denied. The Court grants in part his alternative request for an extension of time of 14 days as unopposed, and extends the response deadline to 6/4/2018. To the extent Defendant requires more time to respond, he shall file another motion on or before June 4, 2018, in compliance with D. Kan. Rule 6.1(a). The motion shall include a statement of prior, meaningful consultation with Plaintiffs, and a greater showing of cause for the extension. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 5/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
May 23, 2018 Filing 536 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Bonds on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bonds, Lauren)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER of 10CCA DISMISSING APPEAL as to #526 Notice of Appeal filed by Kris W. Kobach. (Appeal No. 18-3094) (kao)
May 21, 2018 Filing 534 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #532 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt , #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt. (Bonney, Stephen)
May 20, 2018 Filing 532 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re #529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Becker, Susan)
May 18, 2018 Filing 531 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #526 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ( Appeal No. 18-3094). (tvn)
May 17, 2018 Filing 533 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File re #526 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Received from 10CCA). (tvn)
May 16, 2018 Filing 530 STATEMENT of Compliance with Local Rule 54.2 Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
May 7, 2018 Filing 529 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, Ho Declaration, #2 Ex. B, Hallquist Declaration, #3 Ex. C, Bonney Declaration, #4 Ex. D, Steiner Declaration, #5 Ex. E, Saylor Declaration)(Bonney, Stephen)
May 3, 2018 Filing 528 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 5/3/18 and assigned Appeal No. 18-3094 re #526 Notice of Appeal. (kao)
May 3, 2018 Filing 527 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #526 Notice of Appeal. (Attachment: #1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
May 2, 2018 Filing 526 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4470668. (Becker, Susan)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #524 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Plaintiffs' Application for Contempt-Related Attorney Fees and Costs is extended to May 7, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 4/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
April 27, 2018 Filing 524 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to File Application for Contempt-Related Attorney's Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 523 AMENDED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Kris W. Kobach.(Becker, Susan) Modified title on 4/24/2018. (kao)
April 24, 2018 Filing 522 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Kris W. Kobach.(Roe, Garrett)
April 23, 2018 Filing 521 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas.(Bonney, Stephen)
April 18, 2018 Filing 520 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #423 Motion to Enforce Court Orders and for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Kobach Should Not be Held in Contempt. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 4/18/18. (kao)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #518 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are due April 23, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 4/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
April 11, 2018 Filing 518 MOTION for extension of time to file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
April 3, 2018 Filing 517 AFFIDAVIT of Bryan Caskey re #499 Response to Motion by Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Becker, Susan)
March 30, 2018 Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held 03/20/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 7, PM Session (Pgs 1992-2197) held 03/19/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 514 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 7, AM Session (Pgs 1879-1991) held 03/19/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 6, PM Session held 03/13/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 512 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 6, AM Session (Pgs 1503-1649) held 03/13/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 5, PM Session (Pgs 1349-1502) held 03/12/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 510 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 5, AM Session (Pgs 1213-1348) held 03/12/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 4, PM Session (Pgs 1039-1212) held 03/09/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 4, AM Session (Pgs 913-1038) held 03/09/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 507 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 3, PM Session (Pgs 723-912) held 03/08/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 506 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 3, AM Session (Pgs 618-722) held 03/08/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 2, PM Session (Pgs 438-617) held 03/07/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 30, 2018 Filing 504 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 2, AM Session (Pgs 308-437) held 03/07/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 503 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 1, PM Session (Pgs 130-307) held 03/06/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (kg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 502 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial, Volume 1, AM Session (Pgs 1-129) held 03/06/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale E. Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018. (ks)
March 22, 2018 Filing 499 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #423 MOTION for Contempt (Supplemental Response) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
March 20, 2018 Filing 501 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: MOTION HEARING held on 3/20/2018 re #423 MOTION for Contempt filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci. Court takes matter under advisement and will issue an order. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: #1 Witness List, #2 Plaintiffs Exhibit List, #3 Defendant's Exhibit List) (bw) Modified on 4/2/2018 to correct date of hearing (bw).
March 19, 2018 Filing 500 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL completed on 3/19/2018. The Court sets deadline of April 16, 2018 for parties to file simultaneous proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Court considers the record closed on the trial and will take the matter under advisement on April 16. The Court will issue a written decision. Hearing is set for Tuesday, March 20 at 9:15 a.m. on plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt (Doc. 423). Court adjourns at 6:07 p.m.(Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Fish Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiff Bednasek Exhibit List, #3 Defendant Exhibit List, #4 Witness List) (bw)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER finding as moot #486 Motion in Limine, asking the Court to take judicial notice of the official voter turnount in certain elections in Sedgwick County, Kansas. In light of the parties' stipulations filed on March 18, 2018 (Doc. 495 at 2), the Court need not take judicial notice of these facts. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 3/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
March 19, 2018 Filing 496 NOTICE of Joint Stipulations by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-C Census Tables)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 18, 2018 Filing 495 NOTICE of Joint Stipulations by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 18, 2018 Filing 494 STIPULATION regarding DOV Facts by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 16, 2018 Filing 493 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (of Bradley Bryant) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 16, 2018 Filing 492 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (of Eric Rucker) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 16, 2018 Filing 491 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (of Kris Kobach) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #427 Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman; granting in part and denying in part #428 Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky; denying #431 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite; granting #459 Motion in Limine for Court to Take Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts; denying #463 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Alleged Efforts to Amend the NVRA. See Order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 3/14/18. (kao)
March 13, 2018 Filing 497 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/13/2018. Defendant continues with his presentation of evidence. Plaintiffs presented rebuttal witnesses. Court adjourns at 6:47 p.m. and will resume on Monday, 3/19/2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 12, 2018 Filing 489 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/12/2018. The plaintiffs rest. Defendant begins presentation of evidence. Court adjourns at 5:13 p.m. and will resume on Tuesday, March 13, 2018. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 9, 2018 Filing 488 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/9/2018. The plaintiffs continue with presentation of evidence. The Court adjourns at 5:49 p.m. and will resume on Monday, March 12, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 9, 2018 Filing 486 MOTION in Limine for Court to take Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daphne Ha, #2 Ex. 1 2004 General Turnout, #3 Ex. 2 2006 Primary Turnout, #4 Ex. 3 2006 General Turnout, #5 Ex. 4 2008 Primary Turnout, #6 Ex. 5 2008 General Turnout, #7 Ex. 6 2010 Primary Turnout, #8 Ex. 7 2010 General Turnout, #9 Ex. 8 2012 Primary Turnout, #10 Ex. 9 2012 General Turnout, #11 Ex. 10 2014 Primary Turnout, #12 Ex. 11 2014 General Turnout, #13 Ex. 12 2016 General Turnout)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 8, 2018 Filing 487 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/8/2018. The plaintiffs continue with presentation of evidence. The Court adjourns at 5:15 p.m. and will resume on Friday, March 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 7, 2018 Filing 485 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/7/2018. Plaintiffs continue with presentation of evidence. Court adjourns at 5:16 p.m. and will resume on Thursday, March 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 6, 2018 Filing 484 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: BENCH TRIAL held on 3/6/2018. Opening statements by the parties. Plaintiff begins presentation of evidence. Court adjourns at 5:38 p.m. and will resume on Wednesday, March 7, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
February 28, 2018 Filing 483 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #463 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Amending NVRA (Becker, Susan)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #481 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendant shall file the attached reply forthwith. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 2/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
February 27, 2018 Filing 481 MOTION for Leave to file Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
February 27, 2018 Filing 480 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #448 Motion to Strike and Exclude Untimely "Additional" Expert Opinions From Dr. Jesse Richman. The motion to exclude is granted and the motion to strike is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #460 Motion to Exclude Testimony, Strike Deposition Designations, and Exclude Survey of Patrick McFerron is granted in part, denied in part, and taken under advisement in part. The Court denies Plaintiffs' motion to exclude, grants the motion to strike McFerron's deposition designation, and takes under advisement Plaintiffs' objection to the admissibility of the survey. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 2/27/18. (kao)
February 23, 2018 Filing 479 EXHIBIT C IN SUPPORT of #460 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Strike Deposition Designations, and Exclude Survey of Patrick McFerron by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
February 21, 2018 Filing 478 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #459 MOTION in Limine for Court to Take Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts (Becker, Susan)
February 20, 2018 Filing 477 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #460 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Strike Deposition Designations, and Exclude Survey of Patrick McFerron (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
February 20, 2018 Filing 476 OBJECTION(S) to #461 Objection(s), to Plaintiffs Counter Designations by Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
February 20, 2018 Filing 475 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas.(Bonney, Stephen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 474 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #463 MOTION in Limine and re Defendant's Objection to Designation of His Deposition (Bonney, Stephen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 473 OBJECTION(S) to #464 Objection(s) and Counter Deposition Designations of Defendant by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 472 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #429 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Steven A. Camarota (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daphne Ha, #2 Ex. A Camarota Deposition Excerpt)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 471 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #427 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman and Suggestions in Support (Bonney, Stephen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 470 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #428 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky and Suggestions in Support (Bonney, Stephen)
February 19, 2018 Filing 469 NOTICE of Joint Pretrial Stipulations by Kris W. Kobach (Becker, Susan) (Modified on 2/20/2018 to correct title of document in docket text. (hl))
February 18, 2018 Filing 468 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #448 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Untimely "Additional" Expert Opinions from Dr. Jesse Richman (Bonney, Stephen)
February 16, 2018 Filing 467 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #448 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Untimely "Additional" Expert Opinions from Dr. Jesse Richman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
February 15, 2018 Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status/Final Pretrial Conference (41 pgs) held 02/08/2018 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018. (ks)
February 13, 2018 Filing 465 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
February 13, 2018 Filing 464 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations by Kris W. Kobach. (Becker, Susan)
February 13, 2018 Filing 463 MOTION in Limine by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
February 13, 2018 Filing 462 OBJECTIONS to #445 Exhibit List , as Revised by Defendant, by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A 2018.02.07 Revised Def. Exhibit List, #2 Ex. B 2018.02.12 Revised Def. Exhibit List)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 13, 2018 Filing 461 OBJECTIONS to #443 Designation of Depositions and Counter-Designations by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Pls.' Objections & Counter-Designations)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 13, 2018 Filing 460 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Strike Deposition Designations, and Exclude Survey of Patrick McFerron by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Pls.' Tentative Expert Disclosures Email, #2 Ex. B Confirmation of Live Defense Experts Email)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 13, 2018 Filing 459 MOTION in Limine for Court to Take Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
February 9, 2018 Set Additional Court Trial Days: Bench trial set for 3/7/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/8/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/9/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/12/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/13/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM, 3/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Room 643 before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. This bench trial begins on 3/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and will be held in Courtroom 643.(bw)
February 8, 2018 Filing 458 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2018. The Court sets deadline of 2/19/2018 for parties to reach an agreement on stipulated exhibits and factual stipulations. Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike Untimely "Additional" Expert Opinions from Dr. Jesse Richman (Doc. 488) is due February 16, 2018. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are not mandatory, but may be filed by February 20, 2018. The Court will set a deadline for post-trial proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law at the conclusion of trial. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting #456 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Rong Zhang for Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/8/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
February 7, 2018 Filing 456 MOTION for attorney Emily Rong Zhang to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4400120.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Rong Zhang, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 5, 2018 Filing 455 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach to Response re #429 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Steven A. Camarota. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Camarota Report, #2 Ex B Camarota Depo, #3 Ex C McDonald Report, #4 Ex D McDonald Depo, #5 Ex E McArdle Article, #6 Ex F insidious, #7 Ex G National Review, #8 Ex I Minnite Report, #9 Ex J Kansas statistics)(Roe, Garrett)
February 5, 2018 Filing 454 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #429 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Steven A. Camarota. (Roe, Garrett)
February 5, 2018 Filing 453 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #431 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sophia Lin Lakin, #2 Ex. A Minnite CV (3/2017), #3 Ex. B Minnite Dep. Excerpts (6/2/2016), #4 Ex. C Minnite Affidavit (2/5/2018), #5 Ex. C-1 McGrandy Letter, #6 Ex. D Minnite Rebuttal Report, #7 Ex. E Pls.' Rebuttal Expert Disclosures, #8 Ex. F Minnite Dep. Excerpt (3/31/2017))(Bonney, Stephen)
February 5, 2018 Filing 452 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #428 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky and Suggestions in Support. (Becker, Susan)
February 5, 2018 Filing 451 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #427 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman and Suggestions in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Becker, Susan)
February 5, 2018 Filing 450 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Telephone conference set for 2/6/2018 at 1:00 p.m. is cancelled. The Court reset telephone status conference to 2/8/2018 at 12:15 p.m. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw) Modified on 2/5/2018 to correct date of cancelled hearing. (kao)
February 5, 2018 Filing 449 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 12:15 PM before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone status conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#.(bw)
February 2, 2018 Filing 448 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Untimely "Additional" Expert Opinions from Dr. Jesse Richman by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 31, 2018 Filing 447 AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 31, 2018 Filing 446 AMENDED WITNESS LIST by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 445 EXHIBIT LIST by Kris W. Kobach.(Becker, Susan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 444 WITNESS LIST by Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 443 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS by Kris W. Kobach. (Becker, Susan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 442 EXHIBIT LIST by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas.(Bonney, Stephen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 441 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (Bradley Bryant) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 440 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (Kris Kobach) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 439 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION (Eric Rucker) by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 438 WITNESS LIST by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas.(Bonney, Stephen)
January 24, 2018 Filing 437 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #423 MOTION for Contempt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. K 10.05.2016 Status Conference Transcript)(Bonney, Stephen)
January 23, 2018 Filing 436 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #431 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Becker, Susan)
January 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION:Per chambers, docket entries #434 MOTION and #433 Exhibits have been blocked from public view and are to be re-filed using the correct ECF event. See #436 for correct filing. (kao)
January 22, 2018 Filing 435 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #423 MOTION for Contempt. (Becker, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Filing 434 (DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT ECF EVENT SELECTED; TO BE RE-FILED CORRECTLY) MOTION to Disqualify Minnite by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan) Modified on 1/23/2018 (kao).
January 22, 2018 Filing 433 (DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT/INCOMPLETE DOCUMENTS ATTACHED; TO BE RE-FILED CORRECTLY)EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #431 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Becker, Susan) Modified on 1/23/2018 (kao).
January 22, 2018 Filing 432 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #431 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Becker, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Filing 431 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Lorraine Minnite by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Becker, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Filing 430 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #429 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Steven A. Camarota by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daphne Ha, #2 Ex. A Camarota Expert Report, #3 Ex. B Camarota 10.17.16 Dep. Tr., #4 Ex. C SPLC Profile, #5 Ex. D Keeping America Empty Article, #6 Ex. E Why is CIS Publishing an Alt Right Article, #7 Ex. F CIS Spokesman Lashes out Article, #8 Ex. G 01.13.2017 Roe-Liu Email, #9 Ex. H McDonald Supplemental Report, #10 Ex. I 05.25.2016 Caskey-Camarota Email, #11 Ex. J 05.26.2016 Camarota-Caskey Email)(Bonney, Stephen)
January 22, 2018 Filing 429 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Steven A. Camarota by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 22, 2018 Filing 428 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky and Suggestions in Support by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 22, 2018 Filing 427 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman and Suggestions in Support by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 18, 2018 Filing 426 NOTICE of Telephone Status Conference: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Status Conference set for 2/6/2018 at 01:00 PM - before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone status conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#.(bw)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL FILING DEADLINES: The parties shall file all motions in limine no later than February 13, 2018. Bench Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 1/10/18. (kao)
January 9, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #423 MOTION for Contempt . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(srj)
January 8, 2018 Filing 424 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #423 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. A - Excerpts from County Election Manual, #3 Ex. B - 12.7.2017 Email from Dale Ho, #4 Ex. C - 7.19.2017 Letter from Doug Bonney, #5 Ex. D - 7.27.2017 Email from Sue Becker, #6 Ex. E - 8.31.2017 Email from Doug Bonney, #7 Ex. F - 11.10.2017 Letter from Dale Ho, #8 Ex. G - Sample Cert. of Registration, #9 Ex. H - 11.21.2017 Letter from Sue Becker, #10 Ex. I - 11.30.2017 Letter from Dale Ho, #11 Ex. J - 12.11.2017 Letter from Sue Becker)(Bonney, Stephen)
January 8, 2018 Filing 423 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 8, 2018 Filing 422 STATUS REPORT regarding Trial Procedures by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 3, 2018 Filing 421 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #366 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #382 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to Counts 4 and 6. It is otherwise denied. Granting in part and denying in part #389 and #391 Motion to Exclude the testimony and reports of Jesse T. Richman. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 1/3/18. (hw)
December 15, 2017 Filing 420 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney J. Brian Cox as to Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the deposition excerpts in Doc. 417, filed by Plaintiffs today in response to the Court's oral ruling at the October 25, 2017 telephonic conference. Most of the attached pages are allowable under the Court's ruling. However, the Court finds that several pages included in this filing go beyond the scope of the Court's ruling that Plaintiff could file deposition transcript excerpts that were specifically referenced in its summary judgment brief, and necessary context for those cited-to pages. The Clerk is therefore instructed to redact the following pages in Doc. 417: pages 37 through 40, and 62 through 71. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/26/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ams)
October 26, 2017 Filing 418 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Roe, Garrett)
October 26, 2017 Filing 417 EXHIBIT DD EXCERPTS IN SUPPORT of #396 SEALED Response to Motion, (Deposition of Kris Kobach) by Plaintiffs. (Bonney, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2017: #1 Exhibit DD Redacted per the Court's Order 419 ) (bw).
October 25, 2017 Filing 416 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/25/2017. The Court orders that: (1) the Clerk shall unseal Plaintiffs' unredacted summary judgment briefs (Docs. 373 and 396); (2) the Clerk shall unseal the Court's unredacted October 5, 2017 Memorandum and Order (Doc. 406); (3) Defendant shall file an amended redacted reply brief that omits all redactions except for footnote 2; (4) Ex. DD attached to Doc. 396 (the full deposition testimony) shall remain under seal; and (5) Plaintiffs shall file the excerpts from Ex. DD referenced in their brief, along with content that provides necessary context. The parties shall file these documents forthwith.(Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
October 24, 2017 Filing 415 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Bethany J. Lee as to Kris W. Kobach (Lee, Bethany)
October 19, 2017 Filing 414 RESPONSE to 412 Notice of Hearing (Brief in Support of Unsealing) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Orion Danjuma, #2 Ex. A Class Cert Tr. Excerpt, #3 Ex. B Emails 9.13.17, #4 Ex. C Emails 10.11.17, #5 Ex. D Emails 10.13.17, #6 Ex. E Emails 10.17.17)(Bonney, Stephen)
October 19, 2017 Filing 413 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach, Consol Interested Dft Kris W. Kobach re #405 Order on Motion to Unseal Document (Brief on Unsealing Limited Portions of Deposition) (Becker, Susan)
October 16, 2017 Filing 412 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Notice of Telephonic Conference Re: redactions to summary judgment briefs per the Court's October 5, 2017 Memorandum and Order (Doc. 405). The parties shall be prepared to discuss whether they have resolved the issue of unsealing limited portions of Defendant Kobach's deposition testimony as referenced in Defendant's October 12 Notice (Doc. 411), and how any such agreement impacts redactions of the summary judgment briefs. To the extent the parties continue to disagree about this issue, they may submit briefs to the Court not to exceed 3 pages in length no later than Thursday, October 19, 2017 by 5:00 p.m. The telephone status conference is set for 10/25/2017 at 02:30 PM before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE 4697748# (bw)
October 12, 2017 Filing 411 NOTICE of Already Filed Redacted Brief by Kris W. Kobach re #406 Document Sealed, Memorandum & Order, #405 Order on Motion to Unseal Document, #402 Reply to Response to Motion (Roe, Garrett)
October 11, 2017 Filing 410 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Roe, Garrett)
October 11, 2017 Filing 409 NOTICE of Filing Regarding Unsealed Materials by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
October 6, 2017 Filing 408 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #391 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. G Latino Policy Coal. Survey Questions, #3 Ex. H Latino Policy Coal. 2006 Midterm Survey, #4 Ex. I NALEO Cross Tabulation)(Bonney, Stephen)
October 6, 2017 Filing 407 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #389 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman (Bonney, Stephen)
October 5, 2017 Filing 406 SEALED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to #369 Motion to Unseal. **Note: This is a sealed/unredacted version of #405 Memorandum & Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/5/17. (kao) Modified on 10/26/2017 to unseal per #416 Minute Entry. (kao)
October 5, 2017 Filing 405 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #369 Motion to Unseal Document. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/5/17. (kao)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith the requested unredacted document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category, subject to review when the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion to unseal. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 9/18/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
September 18, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #401 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply for MSJ. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
September 15, 2017 Filing 403 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex SS Hersch Supplement)(Roe, Garrett)
September 15, 2017 Filing 402 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #394 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Roe, Garrett)
September 15, 2017 Filing 401 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Reply for MSJ by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Brief for Court)(Roe, Garrett)
September 14, 2017 Filing 400 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #391 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LIst, #2 CV, #3 Deposition, #4 Barreto biography, #5 Docking Ins. Survey List, #6 Testimony of ACLU, #7 2012 Kansas Speaks Survey, #8 2011 Kansas Speaks Survey, #9 2015 Kansas Speaks Survey, #10 Latino Decisions Survey, #11 Barreto Expert Report in Applewhite, #12 Latino Decisions Pre-Election Survey Nov 2016, #13 NBC News Report, #14 Latino Decisions Survey for, #15 Latino Decisions for NALEO, #16 2017 Kansas Speaks, #17 Survey Practice Publishing Guide, #18 Latino Decisions Blog)(Lee, Bethany)
September 14, 2017 Filing 399 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #389 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Exhibit LIst, #2 Exhibit Richman Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Richman Rebuttal Report, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Richman, #5 Exhibit Do Noncitizens vote in US elections, #6 Exhibit working paper, #7 Exhibit ODU Research Center Brochure, #8 Exhibit Richman CV, #9 Exhibit Open Letter Blog Post, #10 Exhibit Email bw Richman and Schaffner, #11 Exhibit Call Log, #12 Exhibit Response Rate Calculator, #13 Exhibit AAPOR Standard Definitions, #14 Exhibit Richman/Andrews Paper, #15 Exhibit Expert Witness List - Lee, #16 Exhibit Lee case - testimony scheduling, #17 Exhibit weak statistical power quote, #18 Exhibit Telephone survey questions, #19 Exhibit Ansolabehere article)(Lee, Bethany)
September 11, 2017 Filing 398 TRANSCRIPT of Deposition Objections held August 3, 2017 before Judge James P. O'Hara, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: American Civil Liberties Union. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2017. (kg)
August 31, 2017 Filing 397 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: DISMISSING appeal. (Appeal No. 17-3161) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
August 30, 2017 Filing 396 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. DD, #3 Ex. EE)(Bonney, Stephen) Modified on 10/5/2017 to unseal 396-3 per #405 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.(kao) Modified on 10/26/2017 to unseal main doc 396 per #416 Minute Entry. (kao)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #394 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
August 28, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #394 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 28, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #391 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky, #389 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 25, 2017 Filing 394 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Pls. Consolidated SJ Resp. and Repl. Br., #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Dale Ho, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Ex. DD, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Ex. EE)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 393 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Exhibit - Redacted DD, #3 Exhibit - Redacted EE, #4 Ex. FF Fish Depo, #5 Ex. GG Rucker Depo, #6 Ex. HH SAVE - Agency Search Tool, #7 Ex. II Nov. 20 Notice Letter, #8 Ex. JJ Dec. 17 Notice Letter, #9 Ex. KK Partial Summ. J. Tr., #10 Ex. LL Bucci Decl., #11 Ex. MM Boynton Decl., #12 Ex. NN Stricker Decl., #13 Ex. OO Fish Decl., #14 Ex. PP Close Elections Spreadsheet)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 392 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #391 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daphne T. Ha, #2 Ex. A Expert Report of von Spakovsky, #3 Ex. B von Spakovsky Depo. Tr., #4 Ex. C Ex. 23 Feinstein Letters, #5 Ex. D Ex. 24 Feinstein Letter, #6 Ex. E Barreto Rebuttal Rep., #7 Ex. F GAO Report)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 391 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Hans von Spakovsky by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 390 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #389 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daphne T. Ha, #2 Ex. A Richman Report, #3 Ex. B Richman Rebuttal Report, #4 Ex. C Richman Dep. Tr., #5 Ex. D Ansolabehere Election Studies Art., #6 Ex. E WaPo Methodological Challenges, #7 Ex. F WaPo What Can We Learn, #8 Ex. G WaPo Non-citizens Following Laws, #9 Ex. H Open Letter to Richman, #10 Ex. I Ansolabehere and Hersh Article, #11 Ex. J Ansolabehere Report, #12 Ex. K Richman Electoral Studies Article, #13 Ex. L Hersh Expert Report, #14 Ex. M Hersh Second Suppl. Report, #15 Ex. N Ex. 14 to Richman Depo., #16 Ex. O Think Progress Article, #17 Ex. P Ex. 18 to Richman Depo.)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 389 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Jesse T. Richman by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
August 15, 2017 Filing 388 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #369 MOTION to Unseal Document #368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/14/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
August 14, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #386 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Unseal and Exhibit. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
August 11, 2017 Filing 386 UNOPPOSED SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Unseal and Exhibit by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Unseal, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint Exhibit A)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 11, 2017 Filing 385 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #369 MOTION to Unseal Document #368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted)(Bonney, Stephen)
August 4, 2017 Filing 384 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex A Caskey Depo, #2 Ex B Caskey Depo, #3 Ex C Caskey Depo, #4 Ex D Earnest Depo, #5 Ex E Amended Notice of Intraagency policy, #6 Ex F Bryant Deposition, #7 Ex G Minnite Deposition, #8 Ex H Barreto Deposition, #9 Ex I Caskey Declaration, #10 Ex J Caskey Declartion, #11 Ex K Mayorkas Letter, #12 Ex L Richman Depo, #13 Ex M Richman Report, #14 Ex N Richman Rebuttal, #15 Ex O Caskey Declaration, #16 Ex P Caskey Declaration, #17 Ex Q Caskey Declartion, #18 Ex R Lehman Declaration, #19 Ex S Chart, #20 Ex T Chart, #21 Ex U Chart, #22 Ex V Declaration, #23 Ex W Declaration, #24 Ex X Declaration, #25 Ex Y Declaration, #26 Ex Z Election Spreadsheet, #27 Ex AA Letter from Napolitano, #28 Ex BB Lehman Deposition, #29 Ex CC PILF Amicus Brief, #30 Ex DD Von Spakowsky Depo, #31 Ex EE Von Spaowsky Report, #32 Exhibit FF Amended Pretrial Order, #33 Ex GG Registration Receipt, #34 Ex HH Butterworth Deposition, #35 Ex II Congressional Records Excerpts, #36 Ex JJ Chart, #37 Ex KK Arizona SAVE website, #38 Ex. LL From RCD, #39 Ex MM Testimony, #40 Ex NN Seward County Letter, #41 Ex. OO Intraagency Agreement, #42 Ex PP Notice of Changes, #43 Ex QQ Elections Crimes Spreadsheet, #44 Ex TT Bucci Depo, #45 Ex UU Caskey Declaration)(Roe, Garrett)
August 4, 2017 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
August 4, 2017 Filing 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kris W. Kobach and RESPONSE re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Roe, Garrett)
August 3, 2017 Filing 381 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: Partial In Court Hearing and Deposition held in courthouse conference room on 8/3/2017. (FTR 10:04.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER of 10CCA: The emergency motion for a stay pending appeal is denied (Appeal No. 17-3161). (cv)
August 1, 2017 Filing 379 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 07/31/2017 and assigned Appeal No. 17-3161 re #377 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Kris W. Kobach. (cv)
August 1, 2017 Filing 378 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #377 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal ( Appeal No. 17-3161). (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(cv)
July 31, 2017 Filing 377 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #374 Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Kris W. Kobach Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4235924. (Becker, Sue)
July 28, 2017 Filing 376 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #369 MOTION to Unseal Document #368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci (Roe, Garrett)
July 25, 2017 Filing 375 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sue Becker on behalf of Kris W. Kobach (Becker, Sue)
July 25, 2017 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge. See Order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/25/17. (kao)
July 24, 2017 Filing 373 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. S, #3 Ex. U)(Bonney, Stephen) Modified on 10/5/2017 to unseal 373-2, 373-3 per #405 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (kao) Modified on 10/26/2017 to unseal 373 main document per #416 Minute Entry. (kao)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #368 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, in order for the Court to resolve the matter of public filing. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/24/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
July 24, 2017 Filing 371 FINANCIAL RECEIPT re: #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions received by Finance on July 21, 2017, paid on July 21, 2017. Receipt # T4631011024 in the amount of $1000.00. (hw)
July 17, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #369 MOTION to Unseal Document and #368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (amh)
July 14, 2017 Filing 370 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #361 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Roe, Garrett)
July 14, 2017 Filing 369 MOTION to Unseal Document #368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
July 14, 2017 Filing 368 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Pls.' Br. in Supp. of SJ, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Ho Affidavit, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Ex. S NVRA Amendments, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Ex. U Trump Memo Cover Page)(Bonney, Stephen)
July 14, 2017 Filing 367 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dale Ho, #2 Ex. A Amended PTO, #3 Ex. B Caskey Decl. 3/24/17, #4 Ex. C Earnest Transcript, #5 Ex. D Caskey Transcript 6/15/16, #6 Ex. E PI Hr'g Transcript, #7 Ex. F Richman Report, #8 Ex. G Richman Transcript, #9 Ex. H Richman Rebuttal, #10 Ex. I Richman Dep. Ex. 13, #11 Ex. J Caskey Transcript 3/28/2017, #12 Ex. K Bryant Transcript, #13 Ex. L von Spakovsky Dep. Ex. 10, #14 Ex. M Caskey Dep. Ex. 11, #15 Ex. N Caskey Dep. Ex. 38, #16 Ex. O Caskey Dep. Ex. 39, #17 Ex. P von Spakovsky Transcript, #18 Ex. Q von Spakovsky Dep. Ex. 6, #19 Ex. R AZ Election Proc. Manual, #20 Exhibit - Redacted S, #21 Ex. T Kobach-Hamilton email, #22 Exhibit - Redacted U, #23 Ex. V Wichita Eagle Art., #24 Ex. W 2016 Election Turnout, #25 Ex. X EAC Miller Memo, #26 Ex. Y Kansas DOR Webpage, #27 Ex. Z Rucker Dep. Ex. 2, #28 Ex. AA Lehman Transcript, #29 Exhibit - Redacted BB Lehman Dep. Ex. 6, #30 Ex. CC Washington Times Art.)(Bonney, Stephen)
July 14, 2017 Filing 366 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
July 11, 2017 Filing 365 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #361 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails between counsel)(Bonney, Stephen)
July 5, 2017 Filing 364 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #363 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #361 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach . (Attachments: #1 Ex A. June 23 Order, #2 Ex B. Def Resp to Mtn for Sanction, #3 Ex C. Pretrial Transcript excertp, #4 Ex D. Tweets by counsel, #5 Ex E. Def's Mtn for Reconsideration, #6 Ex F. Denial of Mtn for Reconsideration)(Roe, Garrett)
July 5, 2017 Filing 363 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #361 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
July 5, 2017 Filing 362 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #361 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER denying #358 defendant's motion for reconsideration of June 23, 2017 order (ECF No. 355). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/5/2017. (amh)
June 30, 2017 Filing 360 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #358 MOTION for Reconsideration re #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions (Bonney, Stephen)
June 29, 2017 Filing 359 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #358 MOTION for Reconsideration re #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
June 29, 2017 Filing 358 MOTION for Reconsideration re #355 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #356 unopposed motion to amend scheduling order and reschedule deposition date. The deposition of Secretary Kobach is rescheduled for August 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. With the consent of the presiding U.S. District Judge, Julie A. Robinson, the deadlines for summary judgment and Daubert briefs are amended as described in the proposed briefing schedule set forth in the motion. However, the parties are cautioned that no further extensions of the summary judgment and/or Daubert deadlines will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Finally, because defendant has advised the court that the anticipated motion for reconsideration and objections to the undersigned's June 23, 2017 order (ECF No. 355) will challenge the taking of Secretary Kobach's deposition, the briefing schedule surrounding any such challenge is expedited as follows: any motion for reconsideration is due today, June 29, 2017, and any response is due June 30, 2017. No reply shall be filed, and the briefs shall be limited to five pages. Any objections to the June 23, 2017 order (ECF No. 355) shall be filed by July 5, 2017, with any response due July 12, 2017, and any reply due July 14, 2017; all briefing of the objections shall be limited to three pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/29/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
June 28, 2017 Filing 356 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Reschedule Deposition Date by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #343 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/23/2017. (amh)
June 20, 2017 Filing 354 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #343 MOTION for Sanctions and Suggestions in Support (Attachments: #1 Ex. A. Excerpt from 3/23/16 Conf. Tr.)(Bonney, Stephen)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #351 unopposed motion to amend pretrial order and AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/20/2017. (amh)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #350 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The Court grants the parties' joint request to amend the deadlines and page limits for summary judgment and Daubert briefs as described in the proposed briefing schedule set forth in their motion. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/20/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
June 19, 2017 Filing 351 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #349 Pretrial Order, by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Clean Proposed Pretrial Order, #2 Ex. B - Redlined Proposed Pretrial Order)(Bonney, Stephen)
June 19, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #350 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with Respect to Dispositive Motions and Related Filings. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
June 16, 2017 Filing 350 JOINT MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with Respect to Dispositive Motions and Related Filings by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Dispositive motion deadline 7/7/2017. Court Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson. Estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/13/17. (ss)
June 8, 2017 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held June 5, 2017 before Judge James P. O'Hara, Court Reporter Jean Crawford. Transcript purchased by: Garrett Roe. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter, Jean Crawford, Jean_Crawford@mow.uscourts.gov, 816-512-5642 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (kg)
June 6, 2017 Filing 347 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #346 Response to Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Ex A. Ho twitter, #2 Ex B. Danjuma email, #3 Ex C. NY Times Article, #4 Ex D. Newspaper article, #5 Ex E. Ho Q&A, #6 Ex. F. Groups fume, #7 Ex G. Fraud squad, #8 Ex H. Voter ID Hawk, #9 Ex I. Salon article, #10 Ex J. Bipartisan Report article, #11 Ex K. Advocate for Tough Voting Rules)(Roe, Garrett)
June 6, 2017 Filing 346 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #343 MOTION for Sanctions and Suggestions in Support (Roe, Garrett)
June 5, 2017 Filing 345 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2017. Dale E. Ho, Sophia Lin Lakin, and Stephen D. Bonney appear for plaintiff. Garrett R. Roe and Bethany J. Lee appear for defendant. (Court Reporter Jean Crawford.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER regarding #343 plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. As discussed during today's pretrial conference, without objection by plaintiffs, the deadline for defendant to file his response to this motion is extended by one day, i.e., to 6/6/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/5/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
May 22, 2017 Filing 343 MOTION for Sanctions and Suggestions in Support by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange, May 12, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - Email Exchange, May 22, 2017)(Bonney, Stephen)
May 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #341 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Despite the lack of good-cause showing, the court will extend the deadline for submission of the Proposed Pretrial Order to NOON on 5/31/2017. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted, even if unopposed, to preserve the court's time to review the proposed order before the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 19, 2017 Filing 341 MOTION for extension of time to submit a proposed pretrial order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER of 10CCA continuing abatement as to #173 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 16-3175) (kao)
May 10, 2017 Filing 339 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2017. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
May 10, 2017 Filing 338 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #326 Motion for Review. See Order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 5/10/17. (kao)
May 5, 2017 Filing 337 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Julie A. Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#.(bw)
May 5, 2017 Filing 336 DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - THIS WAS A DUPLICATE ENTRY - See Document 337
May 4, 2017 Filing 335 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) (Roe, Garrett)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #267 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/4/17. (kao)
May 2, 2017 Filing 333 NOTICE of HEARING CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING at the informal request of the parties, the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 31, 2017, has been rescheduled for June 5, 2017 at 02:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The proposed pretrial order shall now be due by May 25, 2017.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 1, 2017 Filing 332 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) (Bonney, Stephen)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 11, 2017, HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR May 31, 2017, at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The proposed pretrial order shall now be due by May 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #328 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a). The response deadline is extended to 5/1/2017; the reply deadline is extended to 5/4/2017. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
April 28, 2017 Filing 328 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
April 28, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #328 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
April 26, 2017 Filing 327 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
April 26, 2017 Filing 326 MOTION for Review under 72(a) by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (Roe, Garrett)
April 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #321 Motion to Stay, and expediting deadlines related to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/23/2017. (amh)
April 21, 2017 Filing 324 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #321 MOTION for Order to Stay Magistrate O'Hara's Enforcement Pending Review to Judge Robinson (Bonney, Stephen)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding #321 Motion to Stay Order. The response deadline is April 21, 2017. The reply deadline is April 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/19/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
April 19, 2017 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #321 MOTION for Order to Stay Magistrate O'Hara's Enforcement Pending Review to Judge Robinson by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
April 19, 2017 Filing 321 MOTION for Order to Stay Magistrate O'Hara's Enforcement Pending Review to Judge Robinson by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #272 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/17/2017. (amh)
April 12, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE of Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert by Kris W. Kobach (Roe, Garrett)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER regarding #272 plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents. Defendant ordered to submit documents for in camera review by 5:00 PM on April 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/5/2017. (amh)
March 30, 2017 Filing 317 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Anne A. Gruner as to Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
March 28, 2017 Filing 316 NOTICE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Lorraine Minnite on March 31, 2017 (Roe, Garrett)
March 28, 2017 Filing 315 NOTICE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Eitan Hersh on April 4, 2017 (Roe, Garrett)
March 28, 2017 Filing 314 NOTICE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Stephen Ansolabehere on April 3, 2017 (Roe, Garrett)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 unopposed motion for extension of time until April 12, 2017, for defendant Kobach to serve rebuttal expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
March 28, 2017 Filing 312 MOTION for extension of time to File a rebuttal Expert Report by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Ex A--Excerpt of Transcript)(Roe, Garrett)
March 28, 2017 Filing 311 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Amended Second Request for Admissions from Defendant Kris Kobach (Bonney, Stephen)
March 27, 2017 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Second Request for Admissions from Defendant Kris Kobach (Bonney, Stephen)
March 27, 2017 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Amended Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Bonney, Stephen)
March 23, 2017 Filing 308 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Jesse T. Richman on April 21, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 20, 2017 Filing 307 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) The Final Pretrial Conference HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 5/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The proposed pretrial order remains due May 5, 2017.(ss)
March 20, 2017 Filing 306 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Ray as counsel for Nick Jordan, terminated defendant. (daw)
March 17, 2017 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing (134 pgs) held 03/03/2017 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Ms. Sophia Lakin. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2017. (ks)
March 16, 2017 Filing 304 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Designation and Reports (Bonney, Stephen)
March 6, 2017 Filing 302 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Bonney, Stephen)
March 3, 2017 Filing 303 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: Oral Arugment held on 3/3/2017 taking under advisement #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
March 2, 2017 Filing 301 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Eric Rucker on March 28, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 2, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Bryan Caskey on March 29, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 2, 2017 Filing 299 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Brad Bryant on March 28, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 2, 2017 Filing 298 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Jameson Beckner on March 29, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #296 unopposed motion for extension of time until March 22, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel related to their fifth document requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/2/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
March 1, 2017 Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 295 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Kelly Baker on April 4, 2017 (Bonney, Stephen)
February 21, 2017 Filing 294 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Bonney, Stephen)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #292 unopposed motion for extension of time until March 6, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel related to plaintiffs' fifth request for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
February 17, 2017 Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
February 15, 2017 Filing 291 AFFIDAVIT of R. Orion Danjuma re #290 REPLY by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Ex. P - Fish Dep. p. 33, #2 Ex. Q - Ahrens Dep. Excerpts, #3 Ex. R - PI Hr'g Tr., #4 Ex. S - Class Cert. Hr'g Tr., #5 Ex. T - Jackson Cty, Free ID Guide, #6 Ex. U - Wisc. Prop. Ord., #7 Ex. V - Oregon Initiative, #8 Ex. W - Oregon Webpage)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 15, 2017 Filing 290 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Bonney, Stephen)
February 7, 2017 Filing 289 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #288 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production, #2 Ex B-Plaintiffs' Seventh Request for Production, #3 Ex C-Plaintiffs' First Request for Production, #4 Ex D-Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production, #5 Ex E-Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production, #6 Ex F-Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production, #7 Ex G-Excerpts of this Court's, #8 Affidavit H-Declaration of Garrett Roe)(Roe, Garrett)
February 7, 2017 Filing 288 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Roe, Garrett)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #286 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Reply deadline is extended to 2/15/2017. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/7/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
February 7, 2017 Filing 286 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #280 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #284 unopposed motion for extension of time until February 7, 2017, for defendant to respond to plaintiffs' motion to compel (ECF No. 272). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/07/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
February 7, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #286 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #280 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
February 6, 2017 Filing 284 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plainitffs' #272 Motion to Compel by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
January 30, 2017 Filing 283 NOTICE of Expert Report by Kris W. Kobach (Roe, Garrett)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #276 Joint Motion for Consolidated Oral Argument Hearing. Oral argument set for 3/3/2017 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/30/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
January 27, 2017 Filing 281 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Kris W. Kobach to #280 Response Memorandum re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Fish Depo, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex B-1-Voter Reg Receipt, #4 Ex C--Depo of Caskey (4/6/16), #5 Ex D-Caskey Affidavit, #6 Exhibit - Redacted D-1-Redacted Fish ELVIS, #7 Exhibit - Redacted D-2 Redacted Bucci ELVIS, #8 Exhibit - Redacted D-3 Redacted copy of Hutchinson ELVIS, #9 Exhibit - Redacted D-4 Redacted copy of Stricker ELVIS, #10 Exhibit - Redacted D-5 Redacted Boyton ELVIS, #11 Ex E-Chart to KS Legislature, #12 Ex F-Lehman Affidavit, #13 Exhibit - Redacted F-1 Redacted Alkhalifa ELVIS, #14 Exhibit - Redacted F-2 Redacted Wagner ELVIS, #15 Exhibit - Redacted F-3 Redacted Bidzimou ELVIS, #16 Ex F-4 Sedgwick County Chart, #17 Ex G-Caskey Depo (12/1/2015), #18 Ex H-KDHE/SOS MOU, #19 Ex I-Caskey Depo (6/16/2016), #20 Ex J-Lehman Depo, #21 Ex K-Bucci Depo, #22 Ex L-Hutchinson Depo, #23 Ex M-Boynton Depo, #24 Ex N-Stricker Depo, #25 Ex O-Notice of Interagency Policy Changes, #26 Ex P-KS Voter Registration Form, #27 Ex Q-National Voter Registration Form, #28 Ex R-Ahrens Depo, #29 Ex S-Kobach Testimony, #30 Exhibit - Redacted T-Parks Declaration Redacted, #31 Ex U-Form RCD, #32 Ex V-Notice of Interagency Policy Change, #33 Ex W-Amended Notice of Interagency Policy Change, #34 Ex X-SAVE Correspondence, #35 Ex Y-Teaching Module for Voter Registration Printout, #36 Ex Z-2010 General Election Turnout, #37 Ex AA-2010 Primary Turnout, #38 Ex BB-2008 General Turnout, #39 Ex CC-2008 Primary Turnout, #40 Ex DD-2006 General Turnout, #41 Ex EE-2006 Primary Turnout)(Roe, Garrett)
January 27, 2017 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Roe, Garrett)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #278 unopposed motion for extension of time until February 20, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel related to plaintiffs' fifth request for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/26/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
January 26, 2017 Filing 278 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
January 26, 2017 Filing 277 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Seventh Request for Production of Documents from Defendant Kris Kobach (Bonney, Stephen)
January 25, 2017 Filing 276 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Hearing on Summary Judgment Only ( Response deadline 2/8/2017) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
January 25, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #276 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Hearing on Summary Judgment Only. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #274 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daphne T. Ha for Thomas J. Boynton,Daphne T. Ha for Donna Bucci,Daphne T. Ha for Steven Wayne Fish,Daphne T. Ha for Douglas Hutchinson,Daphne T. Ha for Charles Stricker,Daphne T. Ha for The League of Women Voters of Kansas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/24/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
January 24, 2017 Filing 274 MOTION for attorney Daphne T. Ha to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4073340.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen)
January 23, 2017 Filing 273 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Angela Liu, #2 Ex. A - Pls.' 6th RFP, #3 Ex. B - Def.'s Response, #4 Ex. C - Privilege Log, #5 Ex. D - CJOnline article, #6 Ex. E - Danjuma email, #7 Ex. F - Roe email, #8 Ex. G - 3.34.16 Tr. Excerpts, #9 Ex. H - 11.03.16 Tr. Excerpts)(Bonney, Stephen)
January 23, 2017 Filing 272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #270 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The response deadline is extended to 1/27/2017. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
January 10, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #270 MOTION for extension of time . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
January 9, 2017 Filing 270 MOTION for extension of time to File Response re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
December 22, 2016 Filing 269 AFFIDAVIT of R. Orion Danjuma re #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kansas Voter Reg Form, #2 Exhibit B - SOS KDHE MOU, #3 Exhibit C1 - Kobach Testimony Jan 2014, #4 Exhibit C2 - Kobach Testimony Feb 2015, #5 Exhibit D1 - Trans. Prelim Inj. Hearing, #6 Exhibit D2 - Trans. Brown Perm Inj. Hearing, #7 Exhibit E1- Caskey Aff. Mar 29 2016, #8 Exhibit E2 - Caskey Aff. May 18 2016, #9 Exhibit F1 - Caskey Dep. June 15 2016, #10 Exhibit F2 - Caskey Dep. Apr. 6 2016, #11 Exhibit F3 - Lehman Dep. Apr. 6 2016, #12 Exhibit - Redacted G1 - Fish Decl, #13 Exhibit G2 - Fish Supp. Decl, #14 Exhibit - Redacted G3 - Bucci Decl, #15 Exhibit - Redacted G4 - Stricker Decl., #16 Exhibit - Redacted G5 - Boynton Decl., #17 Exhibit - Redacted G6 - Hutchinson Decl., #18 Exhibit - Redacted H1 - Fish DMV rec, #19 Exhibit - Redacted H2 - Bucci DMV rec, #20 Exhibit - Redacted H3 - Stricker DMV rec, #21 Exhibit - Redacted H4 - Boynton DMV rec, #22 Exhibit - Redacted H5 - Hutchinson DMV rec, #23 Exhibit - Redacted I1 - Fish Dep., #24 Exhibit I2 - Bucci Dep., #25 Exhibit - Redacted I3 - Stricker Dep., #26 Exhibit - Redacted I4 - Boynton Dep., #27 Exhibit I5 - Hutchinson Dep., #28 Exhibit J - Ahrens Dep., #29 Exhibit K1 - CEO Instr., #30 Exhibit K2 - Implementation Guide, #31 Exhibit L1 - Kobach Resp. RFAs, #32 Exhibit L2 - Kobach Resp RFPs, #33 Exhibit M1, #34 Exhibit M2 - Lehman Spreadsheet, #35 Exhibit M3 - 2015 Voter reg, #36 Exhibit M4 - 2013 Voter reg, #37 Exhibit M5 - Miller Memo, #38 Exhibit N - Ahrens index, #39 Exhibit N1, #40 Exhibit N2, #41 Exhibit N3, #42 Exhibit N4, #43 Exhibit N5, #44 Exhibit N6, #45 Exhibit N7, #46 Exhibit N8, #47 Exhibit N9, #48 Exhibit N10, #49 Exhibit N11, #50 Exhibit N12, #51 Exhibit O - League Resp. to Jordan)(Bonney, Stephen)
December 22, 2016 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas(Bonney, Stephen)
December 22, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #263 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/21/2016. (srj)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #264 unopposed motion for extension of time until December 30, 2016, for defendant to respond to plaintiffs' fifth set of requests for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/15/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
December 15, 2016 Filing 264 MOTION for extension of time to Respond or Object to Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Documents by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
December 15, 2016 Filing 263 MOTION to Compel by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
November 22, 2016 Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production of Documents from Defendant Kris Kobach. (Bonney, Stephen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production of Documents from Defendant Kris Kobach (Bonney, Stephen)
November 10, 2016 Filing 260 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference (15-9300) and Scheduling and Status Conference (16-2105) (45 pgs) held 11/03/2016 before Judge James P. O'Hara, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Dale Ho. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2017. (ks)
November 10, 2016 Filing 259 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: AFFIRMING and REMANDING for further proceedings. (Appeal No. 16-3147) (Attachments: #1 Order and Judgment of September 30, 2016, #2 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 4/26/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 7/7/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Court Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 9:30 AM in KC Courtroom 427 before District Judge Julie A. Robinson; estimated trial time 2-4 days. SEE ORDER FOR ANY ADDITIONAL SCHEDULED DEADLINES AND HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/3/2016. (kg)
November 3, 2016 Filing 257 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/3/2016. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER: Because these cases are no longer on the same discovery or pretrial track, the benefits to case consolidation have ended. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to unconsolidate the cases. All future filings shall be made in the individual cases to which they apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/3/16. (hw)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: the pretrial conference scheduled for November 3, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. is hereby converted to a telephone status and scheduling conference in light of Judge Robinson's order (ECF doc. 254) granting defendant's request to reopen discovery. All counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/31/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #248 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Reopen Discovery. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/28/16. (kao)
October 27, 2016 Filing 253 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re: #248 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Roe, Garrett)
October 25, 2016 Filing 252 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #248 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and to Reopen Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, Fish Pls.' First RFP to Def. Kobach, #2 Ex. B, Fish Pls.' First Interrogs. to Def. Kobach, #3 Ex. C, Fish Pls.' First RFA to Def. Kobach, #4 Ex. D, Expert Report of Steven Camarota, #5 Ex. E, Excerpts from LWV v. Newby Oct. 13, 2016 Mots. Hr'g Tr.)(Bonney, Stephen)
October 20, 2016 Filing 251 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/20/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/20/2016. (ah)
October 20, 2016 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #248 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach(Roe, Garrett)
October 20, 2016 Filing 248 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying #233 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/20/2016. (ah)
October 20, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #248 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
October 18, 2016 Filing 246 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Bonney, Stephen)
October 18, 2016 Filing 245 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING CHANGE. The final pretrial conference set for 10/20/2016 at 1:00 PM will be conducted by telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 16, 2016 Filing 244 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bethany J. Lee on behalf of Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett) Modified attorney name on 10/17/2016. (kao)
October 14, 2016 Filing 243 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Ex. A--Excerpt of Telephone Status Conference, #3 Ex. B-Excerpt of Lehman Deposition)(Roe, Garrett)
October 14, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Bryan J. Brown as to Kris W. Kobach (Brown, Bryan)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/14/16. (hw)
October 13, 2016 Filing 240 STATUS REPORT Jointly Submitted Pursuant to Court Order by Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs revisions to original notices, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants subsequent revisions to DMV, #5 Exhibit E - Defendants subsequent revisions to website)(Roe, Garrett)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting, in part, #238 joint motion for extension of time to submit proposed pretrial order. The proposed pretrial order is now due by 4:00 p.m. on October 13, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/11/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
October 10, 2016 Filing 238 MOTION for extension of time to file a Pretrial Order by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding #233 motion to compel production of documents. In light of the upcoming October 20, 2016 pretrial conference and the November 16, 2016 dispositive motions deadline, the response and reply deadlines are expedited to October 14, 2016, and October 18, 2016, respectively. The response shall be limited to twelve, double-spaced pages and should address the authorities in plaintiffs' opening brief, as well as the privilege and work-product principles that were included in the general discovery order entered on March 8, 2016 (ECF doc. 30). The reply shall be limited to four double-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/7/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
October 7, 2016 Filing 235 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #234 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Ex. F Status Conf. Transcript Excerpts). (Bonney, Stephen)
October 7, 2016 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary H. Kim, #2 Declaration of Angela M. Liu, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Lehman Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Ex. B Lehman Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Ex. C North Email, #6 Exhibit Ex. D Privilege Log, #7 Exhibit Ex. E Caskey Transcript Excerpts)(Bonney, Stephen)
October 7, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
October 7, 2016 Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Status Conference (24 pgs) held 10/05/2016 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Orion Danjuma. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2017. (ks)
October 5, 2016 Filing 236 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/5/2016. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #228 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne A. Gruner for Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/3/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
September 30, 2016 Filing 230 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for Wednesday, October 5, 2016 at noon CDT before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. This telephone conference will be available to the public and any interested individual may dial into the conference to listen in. All counsel and any interested individual wishing to join in the conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748# (ses)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER - The Court orders the parties to prepare and submit to the Court for review a draft joint notice by Monday, October 3, 2016, at noon CDT. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on Wednesday, October 5, 2016, at noon CDT, to discuss the notice and any revisions thereto. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/30/16. (kao)
September 30, 2016 Filing 228 MOTION for attorney Anne A. Gruner to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3971152.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form )(Bonney, Stephen)
September 29, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Show Cause Heairng set for 9/30/2016 cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER finding as moot #220 Motion to Enforce, Motion for Contempt, Motion to Expedite. The Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2016 is CANCELLED. The Court further directs the parties to FILE A STATUS REPORT regarding compliance with these steps by 10/12/2016. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/29/2016. (bw)
September 29, 2016 Filing 225 STATUS REPORT Jointly submitted by the Parties Regarding Order to Show Cause by Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER - Defendant Kobach is hereby ordered to produce to this Court a draft of the notice required by Judge Hendricks' Order when he appears this Friday for the Show Cause hearing. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/28/16. (Attachment: #1 Shawnee County Order)(kao)
September 28, 2016 Filing 223 NOTICE of Hearing (COURTROOM CHANGE - ROOM #643): THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2016 at 09:00 AM in KC Room 643 before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (bw)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2016 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/26/2016. (bw)
September 23, 2016 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #220 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Contempt MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)(Bonney, Stephen)
September 23, 2016 Filing 220 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction (Response deadline 10/7/2016), MOTION for Contempt (Response deadline 10/7/2016), MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
September 23, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #220 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Contempt MOTION to Expedite . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
September 16, 2016 Filing 219 Letter from John Ellis dated 8/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Court's Response) (bw)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: Although the related cases of Fish v. Kobach, 16-2105, and Bednasek v. Kobach, 15-9300, were consolidated for discovery and pretrial purposes (ECF doc. 29 in Case No. 16-2105), they will be tried separately. Accordingly, as set out in the original scheduling order (ECF doc. 49 at 13, in Case No. 16-2105 ), counsel must submit separate proposed pretrial orders for each case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/15/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
September 14, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Pretrial Conference (in person) set for 10/20/2016 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. (bw)
September 14, 2016 Filing 216 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/14/2016. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER of 10CCA abating appeal as to #173 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 16-3175) (kao)
September 9, 2016 Filing 214 DOCKET ANNOTATION: PLEASE DISREGARD 213 Notice of Cancelled Hearing - filed in this case in error. (bw)
September 9, 2016 Filing 213 DISREGARD - FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR - NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Modified on 9/9/2016 (bw).
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER finding as moot #201 plaintiffs' motion to compel Secretary Jordan to produce documents, and #202 Secretary Jordan's motion for sanctions. The two motions are moot in light of Judge Robinson's order granting Secretary Jordan's motion to dismiss (ECF doc. 211). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/29/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant Jordan's #64 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Defendant Jordan are hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/29/16. (kao)
August 17, 2016 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production (Cox, Joseph)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #208 unopposed motion for extension of time until August 29, 2016, for Secretary Jordan to respond to the motion to compel (ECF doc. 201). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/12/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
August 12, 2016 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #201 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Nick Jordan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Willoughby, M.)
August 12, 2016 Filing 207 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone scheduling conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#(bw)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #205 unopposed motion for extension of time until August 31, 2016, for plaintiffs to file a response to #202 motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/11/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
August 11, 2016 Filing 205 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
August 3, 2016 Filing 204 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #202 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 by Defendant Nick Jordan Exhibit A Amended Certification of Conferring with Counsel (Cox, Joseph)
August 3, 2016 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #202 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 by Defendant Nick Jordan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Willoughby, M.)
August 3, 2016 Filing 202 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 by Defendant Nick Jordan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Willoughby, M.)
August 1, 2016 Filing 201 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rebecca Waldman, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Document Requests, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Response to Document Request, #4 Exhibit Index)(Bonney, Stephen)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #3 Motion to Certify Class; denying #77 Motion to Certify Class. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/29/16. (kao)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #197 motion for extension of time to file motions to compel discovery. Any motion by plaintiffs to compel Jordan's responses to plaintiffs' third request for production of documents, and any motion by Jordan to compel related to the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the League of Women Voters shall be filed by August 3, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/19/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
July 18, 2016 Filing 198 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #197 MOTION for extension of time (Bonney, Stephen)
July 18, 2016 Filing 197 MOTION for extension of time by Defendant Nick Jordan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Willoughby, M.)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 unopposed motion for extension of time until July 27, 2016, for plaintiff to bring a motion related to defendant Secretary Jordan's responses to plaintiffs' third request for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/18/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ac)
July 15, 2016 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Bonney, Stephen)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #193 unopposed motion for extension of time up to July 18, 2016, in which to file discovery-related Rule 37 motion regarding the deposition of the League of Women Voters of Kansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/8/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ac)
July 8, 2016 Filing 193 MOTION for extension of time to File Discovery Related Rule 37 Motion by Defendant Nick Jordan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Willoughby, M.)
July 1, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 7-10 Introduced at the 4/14/2016 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Ex 7_Congressional Record, #2 Ex 8_Lehman Declaration and Updated Sedgwick County Spreadsheet, #3 Ex 9_ELVIS Screenshots, #4 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Secretary of State Representative Caskey)(Roe, Garrett)
June 30, 2016 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Certify Class Hearing (117 pgs) held 06/14/2016 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Juan Diaz. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2016. (ks)
June 28, 2016 Filing 190 RESPONSE to #185 Amended Supplemental Submission, #184 Supplement by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
June 24, 2016 Filing 189 RESPONSE to #170 Objection(s) (i.e. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's rebuttal expert) by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Roe, Garrett)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 motion for extension of time until July 1, 2016, for defendant Jordan to file a motion to compel. The court finds good cause for the short extension based on the stated difficulty accessing the produced documents. Defendant Jordan is cautioned, however, that his interpretation of the timing rules is incorrect. Both the Scheduling Order (ECF doc. 49 at 12) and D. Kan. Rule 37.1(b) require motions to compel to be filed within 30 days of the default or service of the response that is the subject of the motion --- neither allows for the addition of "an extra three (3) days" to this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/23/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
June 22, 2016 Filing 187 MOTION for extension of time by Defendant Nick Jordan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Cox, Joseph)
June 22, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of responses and obj's to 3d Req for Production (Cox, Joseph)
June 21, 2016 Filing 185 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION by Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
June 21, 2016 Filing 184 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
June 21, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of all Plaintiffs' Answers and Objections to Defendant Kobach's First Interrogatories, as well as Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas's Amended Answers and Objections to Defendant Jordan's First Interrogatories (Bonney, Stephen)
June 21, 2016 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker of Amended Answers and Objections to Defendant Nick Jordan's First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Fish, Bucci, Stricker, Boynton, and Hutchinson. (Bonney, Stephen)
June 20, 2016 Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions (Cox, Joseph)
June 20, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas's Answers and Objections to Defendant Jordan's Second Interrogatories to Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
June 20, 2016 Filing 179 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #173 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 16-3175) (kao)
June 20, 2016 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File by Nick Jordan re #173 Notice of Appeal. (Recvd from 10CCA). (kao)
June 16, 2016 Filing 176 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 6/16/16 and assigned Appeal No. 16-3175 re #173 Notice of Appeal. (kao)
June 16, 2016 Filing 175 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #173 Notice of Appeal. (Attachment: #1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
June 16, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kris W. Kobach of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Steven Camarota (Roe, Garrett)
June 15, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #129 Memorandum & Order, by Defendant Nick Jordan. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3850523. (Willoughby, M.) Modified title on 6/16/2016. (kao)
June 15, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas's Responses to Defendant Nick Jordan's First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
June 14, 2016 Filing 177 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: taking under advisement #3 Motion to Certify Class; taking under advisement #77 Motion to Certify Class; MOTION HEARING held on 6/16/2016 re #3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Thomas J. Boynton, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Ralph Ortiz, Donna Bucci, #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Ralph Ortiz, Donna Bucci. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw) Modified on 7/5/2016 to correct file date of minute entry(bw).
June 13, 2016 Filing 171 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: granting #164 MOTION to Quash of Donna Bucci and Suggestions in Support filed by Thomas J. Boynton, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Ralph Ortiz, Donna Bucci. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
June 13, 2016 Filing 170 OBJECTION(S) to Defendant Kobach's Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witness (Joint) by Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell, Cody Keener. (Johnson, Mark)
June 13, 2016 Filing 169 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #164 MOTION to Quash of Donna Bucci and Suggestions in Support (Roe, Garrett)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER of 10CCA denying motion for stay pending appeal and denying the request for an administrative stay as moot. (Appeal No. 16-3147) (kao)
June 13, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Rebuttal Expert Designation and Reports (Bonney, Stephen)
June 13, 2016 Filing 166 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 6/13/2016 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone hearing are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#.(bw)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER expediting the deadline for Defendant to respond re MOTION to Quash of Donna Bucci and Suggestions in Support #164 . Defendant Kobach shall respond today, 6/13/2016, by 3:00 p.m. CDT. The Court will set the motion for telephonic hearing at 4:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/13/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
June 13, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #164 MOTION to Quash of Donna Bucci and Suggestions in Support. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
June 12, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION to Quash of Donna Bucci and Suggestions in Support by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachment: #1 Declaration of Angela Lui, #2 Unsigned Declaration of Donna Bucci)(Bonney, Stephen)
June 9, 2016 Filing 163 AMENDED NOTICE of Amended Interoffice Policy by Kris W. Kobach re #134 Notice of Interoffice policy change. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Roe, Garrett)
June 8, 2016 Filing 162 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Appeal No. 16-3147) (kao)
June 7, 2016 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Kris W. Kobach re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Kobach, Kris)
June 7, 2016 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Answers and Objections to Defendant Nick Jordan's First Interrogatories to the Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
June 7, 2016 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (Bonney, Stephen)
June 6, 2016 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of responses to 2nd request for production (Cox, Joseph)
June 3, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell, Cody Keener of first Interrogatories to Defendant Shew (Lawrence, William)
June 2, 2016 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #155 NOTICE by Defendant Nick Jordan of taking deposition. (Cox, Joseph)
June 2, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE by Defendant Nick Jordan of taking deposition on June 8, 2016 of representative of the Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas, and Marge Ahrens and Dolores Furtado. (Cox, Joseph)
June 1, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Defendant Nick Jordan on June 10, 2016 (Bonney, Stephen)
June 1, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Designee of the Department of Vehicles on June 10, 2016 (Bonney, Stephen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Pat McFerron on June 7, 2016 (Bonney, Stephen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker of Amended Responses and Objections to Defendant Jordan's First Request for Admissions. (Bonney, Stephen) Modified filer name on 5/31/2016. (kao)
May 27, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Responses and Objections to Defendant Jordan's Request for Production of Documents (Bonney, Stephen)
May 26, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Cody Keener, Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell of taking deposition of Bryan Caskey on 06/15/2016. (Johnson, Mark) Modified filer name on 5/27/2016 (kao).
May 26, 2016 Filing 148 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Cody Keener, Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell of taking deposition of Hans Von Spakovsky on 06/01/2016. (Johnson, Mark) Modified filer name on 5/27/2016. (kao)
May 26, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Michael McDonald on June 3, 2016 (Roe, Garrett)
May 26, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Lorraine C Minnite on June 2, 2016 (Roe, Garrett)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Defendant Kris Kobach's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal Under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(a)(1)(A) (Doc. 137) is denied. The temporary stay granted in the Court's May 17, 2016 Memorandum and Order is extended for two additional weeks until June 14, 2016. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/25/16. (kao)
May 24, 2016 Filing 144 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 5/24/16 and assigned Appeal No. 16-3147 re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Kris W. Kobach. (kao)
May 24, 2016 Filing 143 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachment: #1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
May 23, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #129 Memorandum & Order, by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3825305. (Roe, Garrett)
May 23, 2016 Filing 141 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint, by Kris W. Kobach.(Roe, Garrett)
May 23, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Responses to Defendant Jordan's First Request for Production to the Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
May 23, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Bryan Caskey on June 15, 2016 (Bonney, Stephen)
May 23, 2016 Filing 138 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Hans von Spakovsky on June 1, 2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
May 23, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #137 MOTION for Order to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal pursuant to FRAP 8.1(a)(1). The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
May 20, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION for Order to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal pursuant to FRAP 8.1(a)(1) by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Supporting Motion, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Ex A-Excerpts of PI Hearing, #4 Ex B-Caskey Aff, #5 Ex C-Caskey Aff (previous), #6 Ex. D--Excerpts of 30(b)(6) Deposition of SOS, #7 Ex. E--Lehman Affidavit, #8 Order granting Stay in Kobach v EAC)(Roe, Garrett)
May 19, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE of deposition of Hans von Spakovsky on May 26, 2016 by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Bonney, Stephen)
May 19, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Discovery Requests (Bonney, Stephen)
May 18, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Interoffice policy change by Kris W. Kobach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index Exhibit Index, #2 Declaration Ex A-Caskey Declaration, #3 Excerpts of Deposition Ex B-Stricker Deposition excerpts, #4 Excerpts of Deposition Ex C-Hutchinson Deposition excerpts)(Roe, Garrett)
May 18, 2016 Filing 133 EXHIBITS to Defendant Kobach's Response to Class Certification by Kris W. Kobach #131 Memorandum in Opposition re #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , #3 MOTION to Certify Class . (Attachments: #1 Ex A to Resp to Class Cert, #2 Ex B to Resp to Class Cert, #3 Ex C to Resp to Class Cert, #4 Ex D to Resp to Class Cert, #5 Ex E to Resp to Class Cert)(Roe, Garrett)
May 18, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Second Interrogatories (Cox, Joseph)
May 17, 2016 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , #3 MOTION to Certify Class , RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , #3 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Ex F, #3 Affidavit Ex G, #4 Exhibit Ex H, #5 Excerpts of Deposition Ex I)(Roe, Garrett)
May 17, 2016 Filing 130 RESPONSE by Defendant Nick Jordan re #77 Amended MOTION to Certify Class , #3 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Willoughby, M.)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 19) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion to enjoin enforcement of K.A.R. 7-23-15 is denied. (See this Memorandum and Order for further information and details.) Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/17/2016. (bw) (Additional attachment added on 5/17/2016: #1 Incorrect Document - Redacted) (bw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2016 with correct redacted version per chambers) (mm). : #2 Main Document - Sealed) (kao).
May 17, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kris W. Kobach of Rule 26(b) Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Hans von Spakovsky Expert Report)(Roe, Garrett)
May 16, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Cox, Joseph)
May 16, 2016 Filing 126 RESPONSE to #118 Notice of Supplemental Authority, by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
May 16, 2016 Filing 125 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Defendant Nick Jordan executed upon Doug Bonney on May 2, 2016 by Personal Service. (Willoughby, M.)
May 12, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Supplemental disclosures (Cox, Joseph)
May 11, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kris W. Kobach of 26(a) Supplemental Disclosures (Roe, Garrett)
May 11, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell, Cody Keener of Rule 26 Disclosures (Lawrence, William)
May 11, 2016 Filing 121 SUPPLEMENT to #20 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,, Supplemental Declaration of Steven Wayne Fish by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Bonney, Stephen)
May 10, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Kris Kobach (Bonney, Stephen)
May 10, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Responses and Objections to Defendant Nick Jordan's First Request for Admissions (Bonney, Stephen)
May 9, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Kris W. Kobach re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Boynton, Plaintiff Charles Stricker, Plaintiff Douglas Hutchinson, Plaintiff Steven Wayne Fish, Plaintiff Ralph Ortiz, Plaintiff Donna Bucci (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kobach, Kris)
May 9, 2016 Filing 117 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Ray on behalf of Nick Jordan. (Ray, Christopher)
May 9, 2016 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of Answers and Objections to Defendant Jordan's First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Fish, Bucci, Stricker, Boynton, and Hutchinson (Bonney, Stephen)
May 6, 2016 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (196 pgs) held 04/14/2016 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. J. Brian Cox. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2016. (ks)
May 5, 2016 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Nick Jordan re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss (Cox, Joseph)
May 5, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiff Ralph Ortiz (Bonney, Stephen)
May 4, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker of Responses and Objections to Defendant Jordan's First Requests for Production (Bonney, Stephen)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying #104 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/3/2016. (ah)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part #109 unopposed motion for extension of deadlines set in the scheduling order (ECF doc. 49). The motion is granted to the extent that the deadline for defendants to file expert reports is extended to May 16, 2016. However, in order to keep the current pretrial conference date of July 1, 2016 (and related June 24, 2016 deadline for submission of a proposed pretrial order), extensions of other deadlines are shorter than requested. Specifically, the deadline for rebuttal expert reports is extended to June 10, 2016, and the deadline for the close of discovery is extended to June 20, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/3/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
May 2, 2016 Filing 109 MOTION for extension of time to file an expert report and modify discovery deadlines by Defendant Kris W. Kobach (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Roe, Garrett)
May 2, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #104 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scheduling of Depositions of Plaintiffs Bucci and Stricker (Bonney, Stephen)
May 2, 2016 Filing 107 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #106 Response to Motion . (Willoughby, M.)
May 2, 2016 Filing 106 RESPONSE by Defendant Nick Jordan re #104 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scheduling of Depositions of Plaintiffs Bucci and Stricker (Willoughby, M.)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding #104 Motion for Protective Order. The court will hold a telephone conference to address the motion at 10:30 a.m. on May 3, 2016. Counsel are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 8914911#. Any response to the motion shall be filed by 2:00 p.m. today, May 2, 2016. Any reply shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. today. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/2/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
May 2, 2016 Filing 104 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scheduling of Depositions of Plaintiffs Bucci and Stricker by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Waldman Decl., #3 Exhibit 1A - Waldman-Cox Emails, 4/28, #4 Exhibit 1B - Waldman-Cox Emails, 4/29, #5 Exhibit 1C - Waldman-Cox Emails, 4/29 - 5/1, #6 Exhibit 2 - Ho Decl., #7 Exhibit 2A - Cox-Ho Email, 4/18, #8 Exhibit 2B - Ho-Cox Email, 4/18, #9 Exhibit 2C - Roe-Ho Email, 4/21, #10 Exhibit 2D - Ho-Roe Email, 4/26, #11 Exhibit 2E - Ho-Roe Email, 4/27)(Bonney, Stephen)
May 1, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE by Defendants Nick Jordan, Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Hutchinson, Fish on May 10, 2016. (Cox, Joseph)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part #96 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response deadline 5/17/2016. Plaintiffs' Reply deadline 6/7/2016. There will be no further extensions of time on the class certification briefs and this motion shall proceed to hearing on June 14, 2016, as scheduled. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/29/16. (mm)
April 29, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of notice of intent to issue subpoena. (Cox, Joseph)
April 28, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of responses to plaintiffs second Request for Production. (Cox, Joseph)
April 27, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE by Defendants Nick Jordan, Kris W. Kobach of taking deposition of Ortiz, Boynton,Stricker, Bucci on May 4, 2016 (Cox, Joseph)
April 22, 2016 Filing 98 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #96 MOTION for extension of time. (Bonney, Stephen)
April 22, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #96 MOTION for extension of time . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
April 21, 2016 Filing 97 RESPONSE by Defendant Kris W. Kobach re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Declaration Regarding Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits for Resp to PI)(Roe, Garrett)
April 21, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motions for Class Certification by Defendant Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
April 21, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #64 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - County Election Manual, #3 Exhibit B - Caskey Decl., #4 Exhibit C - Caskey Dep. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D - Lehman Decl. (Kobach v. EAC))(Bonney, Stephen)
April 21, 2016 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 11 - Def. Kobach Resp. to Pls.' 1st Interrogs., #3 Exhibit 12 - Def. Kobach 2d Suppl. to Pls.' 1st RFP, #4 Exhibit 13 - March 23 Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 14 - Caskey Dep. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 15 - McDonald Suppl. Rep., #7 Exhibit 16 - Minnite Suppl. Rep., #8 Exhibit 17 - Lehman Dep. Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 18 - Caskey. Aff. (LWV v. Newby))(Bonney, Stephen)
April 21, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of First Request for Production. (Cox, Joseph)
April 21, 2016 Filing 92 SURREPLY by Defendant Nick Jordan re: #88 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Reply in Support of #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Cox, Joseph)
April 15, 2016 Filing 91 RECEIPT of acknowledgement of return of exhibits used at the PI hearing on 4/14/2016 as to Steven Wayne Fish, Nick Jordan, Kris W. Kobach (bw)
April 14, 2016 Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: taking under advisement #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; MOTION HEARING held on 4/14/2016 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas J. Boynton, Charles Stricker, Douglas Hutchinson, Steven Wayne Fish, Ralph Ortiz, Donna Bucci. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting as unopposed #88 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/13/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
April 12, 2016 Filing 88 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 11 - Def. Kobach Resp. to Pls.' 1st Interrogs., #4 Exhibit 12 - Def. Kobach 2d Suppl. to Pls.' 1st RFP, #5 Exhibit 13 - March 23 Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 14 - Caskey Dep. Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 15 - McDonald Suppl. Rep., #8 Exhibit 16 - Minnite Suppl. Rep., #9 Exhibit 17 - Lehman Dep. Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 18 - Caskey. Aff. (LWV v. Newby))(Bonney, Stephen) (Attachment 10 blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy; redacted version added on 4/13/2016: #11 Exhibit 18 - Redacted) (kao).
April 11, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Request for Admissions. (Cox, Joseph)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 motion to withdraw limited entry of appearance. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. North from the CM/ECF electronic notification system. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/11/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
April 11, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION to Withdraw Limited Entry of Appearence by Interested Party Tabitha M Lehman. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (North, Michael)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying #66 Motion to Stay Discovery. Secretary Jordan's motion to stay discovery and pretrial activities is denied. However, until Judge Robinson decides the immunity issue, all discovery served on Secretary Jordan shall be narrowly restricted as discussed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/8/2016. (ah)
April 8, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Objections, Amended Objections. (Cox, Joseph)
April 7, 2016 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Nick Jordan re: #66 MOTION to Stay Discovery And Other Pretrial Activities. (Cox, Joseph)
April 7, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of First Interrogatories. (Cox, Joseph)
April 6, 2016 Filing 80 AMICUS BRIEF by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schlozman, Bradley)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #76 Unopposed Motion to File Amicus Brief. Public Interest Legal Foundation shall file the proposed Amicus Curiae brief forthwith. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/6/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
April 5, 2016 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #76 UNOPPOSED MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Proposed Amicus Brief), #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Amicus Brief)(Schlozman, Bradley)
April 5, 2016 Filing 77 AMENDED MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Listing Enclosed Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Caskey Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Article regarding KS birth records, #5 Exhibit Article regarding suspended voters, #6 Exhibit Editorial, #7 Exhibit Fish Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ortiz Declaration, #9 Exhibit Bucci Declaration, #10 Exhibit Stricker Declaration, #11 Exhibit Boynton Declaration, #12 Exhibit Hutchinson Declaration)(Bonney, Stephen) (Attachments 7-12 blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy; redacted versions added on 4/6/16: #13 Exhibit E - Redacted, #14 Exhibit F - Redacted, #15 Exhibit G - Redacted, #16 Exhibit H - Redacted, #17 Exhibit I - Redacted, #18 Exhibit J - Redacted) (kao).
April 5, 2016 Filing 76 UNOPPOSED MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., The. (Schlozman, Bradley)
April 5, 2016 Filing 75 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas re #66 MOTION to Stay Discovery And Other Pretrial Activities. (Bonney, Stephen)
April 5, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of First Request for Production. (Cox, Joseph)
April 5, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #76 Unopposed MOTION to File Amicus Brief . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
April 4, 2016 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of Supplemental discovery resonses by Kris W. Kobach re #47 Notice of Service per Plaintiffs' requests. (Brown, Bryan)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER regarding #66 Motion to Stay Discovery. Before the Court is Kansas Secretary of Revenue Nick Jordan's request for an expedited ruling on his Motion to Dismiss, filed March 31, 2016. This request is included in Secretary Jordan's Motion to Stay Discovery and Other Pretrial Activities (Doc. 66), which is not yet fully briefed. Secretary Jordan's request is denied. The relief sought in the motion to stay is otherwise referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for disposition. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/4/16. (kao)
April 4, 2016 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Disclosures by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (Bonney, Stephen)
April 1, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Parker Bednasek, Alder Cromwell, Cody Keener of Expert Disclosures. (Lawrence, William)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 unopposed motion for limited entry of appearance in this case by Michael North to represent interested party Tabitha M. Lehman at her deposition and in related filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/1/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
April 1, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kris W. Kobach of Initial Disclosures. (Roe, Garrett)
April 1, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Permit Limited Entry of Appearence by Interested Party Tabitha M Lehman. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(North, Michael)
March 31, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to Stay Discovery And Other Pretrial Activities by Defendant Nick Jordan. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Willoughby, M.)
March 31, 2016 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #64 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
March 31, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nick Jordan. (Cox, Joseph)
March 31, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Initial Disclosures. (Cox, Joseph)
March 31, 2016 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (Bonney, Stephen) (kao).
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting as unopposed #59 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/30/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (as)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice #58 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/30/16. (kao)
March 30, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #59 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Response to Pls Mtn for Preliminary Injunction, #58 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Brief and Exhibit. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
March 29, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Over length Brief_Redacted, #2 Exhibit Index #3 Exhibits_Redacted)(Roe, Garrett)
March 29, 2016 Filing 58 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Brief and Exhibit by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Brief with confidential information, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibits)(Roe, Garrett)
March 29, 2016 Filing 57 RESPONSE by Defendant Nick Jordan re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Willoughby, M.)
March 29, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of response to discovery. (Cox, Joseph)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/29/2016. (ah)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 joint motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/29/2016. (ah)
March 29, 2016 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery and Status Conference held March 23, 2016 before Judge James P. O'Hara, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: American Civil Liberties Union. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2016. (kg)
March 28, 2016 Filing 52 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Redlined Draft Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B. Def. Kobach Resps. to Interrogatories)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 24, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Representative of Kansas Secretary of State's Office on April 6, 2016 (Bonney, Stephen)
March 24, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Nick Jordan of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' (Fish Plaintiffs) First Request for Production (Willoughby, M.)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER: regarding #3 Motion to Certify Class and #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in 16-2105 and (60) Motion to Certify Class in 15-9300. Discovery deadline 6/17/2016. Dispositive motion deadline 7/15/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2016 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 in Case No. 15-9300; and in Case No. 16-2105 for 5/23/2017 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 before District Judge Julie A. Robinson; estimated trial time 2-4 days. SEE ORDER FOR ALL ADDITIONAL SCHEDULED DEADLINES AND HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/24/2016. (kg) Modified on 3/24/2016 (mm).
March 24, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #3 MOTION to Certify Class : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (bw)
March 24, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kris W. Kobach of Expedited Discovery Responses on March 23, 2016. (Brown, Bryan)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #41 joint motion for resolution of discovery disputes. The court addressed the issues raised in the motion at the telephone conference held on March 23, 2016. The court's rulings made at that conference will be set forth in a separate scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
March 23, 2016 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Defendant Nick Jordan re #41 Joint MOTION for Discovery Status Report and Motion to Resolve Discovery Issues (Willoughby, M.)
March 23, 2016 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of Discovery Disputes by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order Draft)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 22, 2016 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Status Conference (21 pgs) held 03/07/2016 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Garrett Roe. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2016. (ks)
March 22, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Bryan Caskey on March 31, 2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 22, 2016 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Status Report and Motion to Resolve Discovery Issues) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1st Interrogatories to Def. Kobach, #2 Exhibit B - 1st RFPs to Def. Kobach, #3 Exhibit C - 1st RFPs to Def. Jordan, #4 Exhibit D - Def. Kobach's Objections)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker, The League of Women Voters of Kansas of taking deposition of Tabitha Lehman on April 1, 2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 17, 2016 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nick Jordan, Kris W. Kobach, filed by Douglas Hutchinson, Donna Bucci, The League of Women Voters of Kansas, Ralph Ortiz, Steven Wayne Fish, Charles Stricker, Thomas J. Boynton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, Nov. 20, 2015, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Letter, Dec. 17, 2015)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 16, 2016 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections to Fish Expedited Discovery by Kris W. Kobach, Kris W. Kobach re #35 Certificate of Service. (Roe, Garrett)
March 10, 2016 Filing 37 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/24/16 for Defendant Nick Jordan to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/10/16. (hw)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2016 at 02:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/17/2016. Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Deadline set for 3/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/10/2016. (ah)
March 9, 2016 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 9, 2016 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Hutchinson, Donna Bucci, Ralph Ortiz, Steven Wayne Fish, Charles Stricker, Thomas J. Boynton upon Nick Jordan served on 3/8/2016, answer due 3/29/2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 9, 2016 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Hutchinson, Donna Bucci, Ralph Ortiz, Steven Wayne Fish, Charles Stricker, Thomas J. Boynton upon Nick Jordan served on 2/18/2016, answer due 3/25/2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 9, 2016 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Hutchinson, Donna Bucci, Ralph Ortiz, Steven Wayne Fish, Charles Stricker, Thomas J. Boynton upon Kris W. Kobach served on 2/19/2016, answer due 3/25/2016. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 8, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 3/23/2016 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. See DE # 29 - Memorandum & Order for details. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 8914911#. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/8/2016. (ah)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 15-9300 shall be consolidated for pretrial management and discovery with Case No. 16-2105. Case No. 16-2105 is designated as the lead case. See Order for additional deadlines and hearings. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/8/16. (kao)
March 8, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per #29 Order Case No. 15-9300 shall be consolidated for pretrial management and discovery with Case No. 16- 2105. Case No. 16-2105 is designated as the lead case. All future discovery- related filings shall bear the consolidated caption on this Order and shall be filed in only the lead case. Class certification pleadings, dispositive motions, and other filings related to same shall be filed in the specific case without a consolidated caption. (kao)
March 7, 2016 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Julie A. Robinson: granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. An order will follow. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/7/2016. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
March 7, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nick Jordan. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (mm)
March 4, 2016 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: On 03/04/2016 a Response to the #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases was filed in related case #15-9300, document #79, by Defendant Jamie Shew. (mg)
March 3, 2016 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Bonney, Stephen)
March 3, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class until March 18, 2016 : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) TELEPHONE Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2016 at 01:00 PM via telephone conference before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephone pretrial conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. (bw)
March 3, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class until March 18, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail)(Bonney, Stephen)
March 3, 2016 Filing 24 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until March 25, 2016 for Defendants Kris W. Kobach, Nick Jordan to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on March 3, 2016. (ydm)
March 3, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class until March 18, 2016. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
March 2, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class until March 18, 2016 by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Brown, Bryan)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Parties are notified that this proceeding will be recorded under the Cameras in Courts pilot unless one or more parties objects. To object to recording, complete the form provided at this link (http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/cameras-in-courts/) and return it to ksd_robinson_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov at least five days prior to the proceeding unless otherwise ordered by the judge. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (KHV) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (bw)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 19), filed on February 26, 2016. The following schedule shall apply to this motion: Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition is due no later than March 18, 2016. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum is due no later than April 1, 2016. The Court sets this matter for hearing on April 14, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. in Kansas City, Kansas Courtroom 427. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/29/16. (kao)
February 26, 2016 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney R. Orion Danjuma re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McDonald Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fish Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ortiz Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bucci Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Stricker Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Boynton Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Hutchinson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Miller Memo, #9 Exhibit 9 - Minnite Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - LWV v. Newby Hearing Transcript)(Bonney, Stephen) Exhibits 2-7 blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy; redacted versions added 2/26/16: #11 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #15 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #16 Exhibit 7 - Redacted) (kao).
February 26, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Neal A. Steiner for Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, and Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/24/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
February 24, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Neil A. Steiner to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3694725.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Kahan Waldman for Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, and Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kao)
February 23, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
February 22, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Rebecca Kahan Waldman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3692432.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 22, 2016 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3 MOTION to Certify Class . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ah)
February 19, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Kris W. Kobach. (Kobach, Kris)
February 19, 2016 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kris W. Kobach on behalf of Kris W. Kobach. (Kobach, Kris)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Angela M. Liu for Thomas J. Boynton,Angela M. Liu for Donna Bucci,Angela M. Liu for Steven Wayne Fish,Angela M. Liu for Douglas Hutchinson,Angela M. Liu for Ralph Ortiz,Angela M. Liu for Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/19/16. (mm)
February 19, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Angela M. Liu to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3690754.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Orion Danjuma for Thomas J. Boynton,R. Orion Danjuma for Donna Bucci,R. Orion Danjuma for Steven Wayne Fish,R. Orion Danjuma for Douglas Hutchinson,R. Orion Danjuma for Ralph Ortiz,R. Orion Danjuma for Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/19/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mm)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dale E. Ho for Thomas J. Boynton,Dale E. Ho for Donna Bucci,Dale E. Ho for Steven Wayne Fish,Dale E. Ho for Douglas Hutchinson,Dale E. Ho for Ralph Ortiz,Dale E. Ho for Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/19/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mm)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sophia Lin Lakin for Thomas J. Boynton,Sophia Lin Lakin for Donna Bucci,Sophia Lin Lakin for Steven Wayne Fish,Sophia Lin Lakin for Douglas Hutchinson,Sophia Lin Lakin for Ralph Ortiz,Sophia Lin Lakin for Charles Stricker pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/19/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mm)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/18/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
February 18, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Sophia Lin Lakin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3689739.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2016: #3 Ink Signed Affidavit) (mg))
February 18, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney R. Orion Danjuma to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3689729.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2016: #3 Ink Signed Affidavit) (mg))
February 18, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Dale E. Ho to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3689619.) by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonney, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2016: #3 Ink Signed Affidavit) (mg))
February 18, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 18, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Thomas J. Boynton, Donna Bucci, Steven Wayne Fish, Douglas Hutchinson, Ralph Ortiz, Charles Stricker. (Bonney, Stephen)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3689053.), filed by Douglas Hutchinson, Charles Stricker, Steven Wayne Fish, Donna Bucci, Ralph Ortiz, Thomas J. Boynton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter)(Bonney, Stephen)
February 18, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nick Jordan, Kris W. Kobach. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ydm)
February 18, 2016 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fish et al v. Kobach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Boynton
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The League of Women Voters of Kansas
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stricker
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bucci
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Ortiz
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Fish
Represented By: Emily Rong Zhang
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: R. Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Daphne T. Ha
Represented By: Angela M. Liu
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Neal A. Steiner
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Secretary of State
Represented By: Stanley R. Parker
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Stanley R. Parker
Represented By: Kris W. Kobach
Represented By: Bryan J. Brown
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Bethany J. Lee
Represented By: Garrett Robert Roe
Represented By: Susan Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Jordan
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Represented By: Joseph Brian Cox
Represented By: Christopher M. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Alder Cromwell
Represented By: William R. Lawrence, IV
Represented By: Mark P. Johnson
Represented By: Curtis E. Woods
Represented By: Paul Treanor Davis
Represented By: Samantha Jo Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jamie Shew
Represented By: Bradley R. Finkeldei
Represented By: John T. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Cody Keener
Represented By: William R. Lawrence, IV
Represented By: Mark P. Johnson
Represented By: Curtis E. Woods
Represented By: Paul Treanor Davis
Represented By: Samantha Jo Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Parker Bednasek
Represented By: William R. Lawrence, IV
Represented By: Mark P. Johnson
Represented By: Curtis E. Woods
Represented By: Paul Treanor Davis
Represented By: Samantha Jo Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc., The
Represented By: J. Christian Adams
Represented By: Kaylan Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tabitha M Lehman
Represented By: Michael L. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?