Farr v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Defendant: Daryl Davis, Dennis Moon, DeAnn Coote, John Patrick Hall and Huckleberry Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02180
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 142 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 03/15/2018. (tvn)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 136 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 02/14/2018. (tvn)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 119 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 120 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 126 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; denying 127 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 01/25/2018. (tvn)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 107 Motion for Recusal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections to Memorandums and Orders Filed August 4 & 8, 2017 (Docs. 105 & 106) (Doc. 108) is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/31/17. (kao)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 94 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion for Hearing/Motion for Sanctions/Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/8/17. (df)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 75 Motion to Reconsider; denying 82 Objections/Motion for Review/Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/4/2017. Mailed to pro se party Joan E. Farr by regular mail. (hl)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration and granting 84 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/26/17. Mailed to pro se party Joan E. Farr by regular mail. (hw)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 83 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/23/17. (df)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 77 Motion Requesting Court Acknowledgement of Lis Pendens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on May 10, 2017.(Gale, Kenneth) (Main Document 78 replaced on 5/10/2017) (aa).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER adopting in full the Magistrate Judge's 68 Report and Recommendations. Further, denying Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Leave to Join Additional Defendants. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 05/04/2017. (mg)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Stipulate; denying 45 Motion to Join Additional Party as Plaintiff; denying 48 Motion for Rule 35 Mental Evaluation. (Note: This Order also contains the undersigned Ma gistrate Judge's Report & Recommendation to the District Court to deny Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Join Additional Defendants 46 . This document is being docketed twice on the Court's electronic docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/6/17. (df)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of Judge Gale (Doc. 38) is adopted in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Amend (Doc. 36) is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/27/2017. Mailed to pro se party Joan E. Farr by regular mail. (hl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farr v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Davis
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Represented By: Jason M. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Moon
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Represented By: Jason M. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAnn Coote
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Represented By: Jason M. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patrick Hall
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Represented By: Jason M. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huckleberry Homeowners Association
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Represented By: Jason M. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?