Bricker v. State of Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Corinthian Bricker
Defendant: State of Kansas, Mark Furney, Patrick Carney, Jessica Travis, American Family Insurance Company of Wisconsin and Butler & Associates
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv02283
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 54 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denied as moot 55 Motion for Order; granting 64 Motion to Dismiss; denying 67 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/3/2017.Mailed to pro se party Corinthian Bricker by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70123460000082626597 (ydm)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT plaintiff is granted an extension of time to serve defendant Mark Furney. Plaintiff must serve Mr. Furney within 30 days from the date of this Order. If plaintiff fails to serve Mr. Furney within this time, the court will dismiss plaintiff's claims against Mr. Furney. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/16/2017.Mailed to pro se party Corinthian Bricker by regular mail (ydm)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss; denied as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 2/13/2017.Mailed to pro se party Corinthian Bricker by regular mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70123460000082626160 (ydm)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 1/24/2017.Mailed to pro se party Corinthian Bricker by regular and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70150920000170458584 (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bricker v. State of Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinthian Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kansas
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Furney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Carney
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Travis
Represented By: Nick Joseph Kurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: Stephanie B. Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler & Associates
Represented By: Stephanie B. Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?