Hapka v. CareCentrix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah Hapka
Defendant: CareCentrix, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02372
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 09/29/17. (aw)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 60 Motion putative class discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/7/17. (df)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/19/2016. (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hapka v. CareCentrix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hapka
Represented By: J. Austin Moore
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: Barrett J. Vahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareCentrix, Inc.
Represented By: Wade P. K. Carr
Represented By: Diane D. Carter
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?