Brez v. Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Lisa Brez |
Defendant: |
Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation |
Counter_claimant: |
Sandoz, Inc. and Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Lisa Brez |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02576 |
Filed: |
August 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Kansas |
Office: |
Kansas City Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Daniel D. Crabtree |
Presiding Judge: |
Gwynne E. Birzer |
Nature of Suit: |
Employment |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 75 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/20/2018. (mig)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint on or before August 8, 2017. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/1/17. (sj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brez v. Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Lisa Brez |
Represented By: |
Kathleen E. Mannion |
Represented By: |
Anne W. Schiavone |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emily Cuneo DeSmedt |
Represented By: |
August W. Heckman, III |
Represented By: |
Uzoamaka Nwonwu |
Represented By: |
Anthony J. Romano |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emily Cuneo DeSmedt |
Represented By: |
August W. Heckman, III |
Represented By: |
Uzoamaka Nwonwu |
Represented By: |
Anthony J. Romano |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation |
Represented By: |
Emily Cuneo DeSmedt |
Represented By: |
August W. Heckman, III |
Represented By: |
Uzoamaka Nwonwu |
Represented By: |
Anthony J. Romano |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Sandoz, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emily Cuneo DeSmedt |
Represented By: |
August W. Heckman, III |
Represented By: |
Uzoamaka Nwonwu |
Represented By: |
Anthony J. Romano |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Fougera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emily Cuneo DeSmedt |
Represented By: |
August W. Heckman, III |
Represented By: |
Uzoamaka Nwonwu |
Represented By: |
Anthony J. Romano |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Lisa Brez |
Represented By: |
Anne W. Schiavone |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?