Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of Bama Air Inc and Bridgeport Associates, Inc. v. Cessna Aircraft Company et al
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company, Textron Aviation, Inc. and TAT Technologies
Case Number: 2:2016cv02755
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 52 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/19/2018. (ses)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim 40 . The motion is denied with respect to the issue of personal jurisdiction. The motio n is granted with respect to plaintiff's claims as subrogee of Bridgeport Associates, Inc. (Counts IV and VI); those claims are hereby dismissed as time-barred. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery 41 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/01/2017. (ses)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Set Aside 31 Clerks Entry of Default. Defendant may respond to the complaint on or before 10/18/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/28/2017. (ses)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against defendant TAT Technologies. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/07/2017. (ses)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motions to Quash by non-parties Piedmont and Limco 14 19 are denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for discovery 21 is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/30/2017. (ses)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 24 Motion to Continue. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/7/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2017 at 11:15 AM in Telephone GLR - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 8533057 before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 6/27/17. (kao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of Bama Air Inc and Bridgeport Associates, Inc. v. Cessna Aircraft Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Mark Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew R. Leffler
Represented By: Albert S. Nalibotsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAT Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?