Doe et al v. USD 237, the Smith Center School District et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Angela Harrison
Defendant: USD 237, the Smith Center School District and Brock Hutchinson
Case Number: 2:2016cv02801
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Defendant Brock Hutchinson's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/06/2017. (ses)
October 27, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Defendant Hutchinson's Renewed Motion for Stay of Discovery on Qualified Immunity Grounds. All discovery and case deadlines set in the 52 Scheduling Order as to all parties in this case are hereby stayed until the Tenth Circuit issues its decision on Defendant Hutchinson's interlocutory appeal of the Court's qualified immunity ruling. The parties shall promptly file a status report or motion to lift the stay of discovery when the Tenth Circuit issues its decision on Defendant Hutchinson's interlocutory appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/27/2017. (byk)
September 1, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and granting 36 Plaintiff Doe's Motion for Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall electronically file their proposed First Amended Complaint, revised in accordance with the rulings in this Memorandum and Order and further revised to specify which specific Defendant(s) each cause of action is asserted against. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/1/2017. (byk)
March 2, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 defendant Hutchinson's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and denying 11 defendants' Motion to Stay Case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/02/2017. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. USD 237, the Smith Center School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Harrison
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 237, the Smith Center School District
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Hutchinson
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?