Jessica Flax v Eric L. Hetzel D.O
Plaintiff: Jessica Flax
Defendant: Eric L. Hetzel D.O.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02184
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Gray
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Defendant shall file his amended answer by 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/30/2018. (wh)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion for Determination of Place of Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 11/30/2017. (wh)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/31/2017. (wh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessica Flax v Eric L. Hetzel D.O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Flax
Represented By: James P. Frickleton
Represented By: Michelle L. Marvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Hetzel D.O.
Represented By: Mark A. Lynch
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?