Morgan v. Central RV, Inc.
Plaintiff: Todd Morgan
Defendant: Central RV, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02300
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/20/2018. (srj)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/29/2018. (srj)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/15/2018. (srj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Central RV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Morgan
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Mark W. Schmitz
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central RV, Inc.
Represented By: Derek H. Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?