Tilmon v. Polo Ralph Lauren Factory Store
Plaintiff: Melba A. Tilmon
Defendant: Polo Ralph Lauren Factory Store
Case Number: 2:2017cv02383
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 56 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 05/14/2019. Mailed to pro se party Melba A. Tilmon by regular mail. (tvn)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/8/2018. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 motion for leave to file responsive pleading out of time. Responsive pleading must be filed by April 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/2/2018. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 5 Report and Recommendations, 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Melba A. Tilmon Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/25/2017.Mailed to pro se party Melba Tilmon by regular mail (ydm)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 motion for reconsideration of report and recommendation. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the court's privacy policy. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/2017. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/6/2017. Mailed copy of order to Melba Tilmon by regular mail. (ydm) Modified on 7/6/2017 (lak).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilmon v. Polo Ralph Lauren Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba A. Tilmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polo Ralph Lauren Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?