Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. et al v. Syngenta AG et al
Plaintiff: Jay Manternach, Garvick's Farms Inc., Inel Ryckman, RH Farms, Inc., Brian Abbott, Zachary A. Charlton, Stan Adams Farms LLC, Simmons Farm, Golden West Farm/Hawks Herefords, Cripe Farms Inc., C & A Bouslog Farms, Inc., Richard E. Cole, Jr., Herschel Briney Farms, Inc., Larry Appledorn, Carl D. Tingley, Rahm Farm, Inc., Best Farms, Inc., Michael Gastel, Timothy J. Whalen Living Trust, Frazier Farms, Mark Thordsen Farm, Blankenship Farms, Inc., David Kanne d/b/a Kanne Bros., Thaddeus Haines, Edco Properties LLC, Braun Joint Venture, Kimbrough Farms, Inc., Mark Motl, Then and Now Farm Corp., Rebecca Bohde, Melba Todd, Susan Elbe, Scott May Farms, Evans Farns, Inc., Chad Fischbach, Daniel Rubin, Tammi Ann Jaeger, Robert Whitworth, Dean R. Shafer, Kraus-Allbee Trucking, Inc., Bryce Maher, Sudderth Farms, Inc., Roger Harris Jr, Walker Farming, Carlos Bailey, Gary Stearns Farms, Jacob Ayecok Farms, Ruth Thomann, Rolling Prairie Farm Inc., R.A. Reed, Perry Loewe, Swan Lake Farm, Clayton Gathe, Scott Rozell, Brian Willenborg, John V Welsh, Haley McLendon, Roger Pic, Dolores Ann Curry, Rick Alan Cripe, Christopher Lee Skinner, Pleasant Spring Farm, Inc., Jesse Young, Janice Dole, Burnside Acres, Inc., Ebert Farms, Ramona Clark, Jim Stevenson, Donald Pieper, South Shore, Inc., Steven Allen Thompson, Gregory James, Tim Heilman, Reid Farms, Jan Ridgely, Glen David Brown, Scott Louis Landrey, Wernz, Ltd., Ettis Ditto, Robert G. Potter, Ray & Gary Machens Farms Inc., Williams Farms, Jeremy Koenig, Myron Reiman, Craig Manternach, Alan Hilt, Thompson Brothers, Ray Wesley Poynter, Dan L. Stoner Farms Inc., Cherie Medlin Kirby, Clifford Roberts, Gibson Development, LLC, Dale Voss, OKC Farms LLC, Gail Everson, Maher Farms Inc., Robert C. Joplin Trust, Lindsay Price, Whiskey Creek Arkansas, Mark Haines, Heilman Farming Inc., Shirley Moroni, Stephanie Connor, Alan K. Newcomb, Brian Stoberl, Steven Weakly, Nelda Mungle, Martin T. Duncan, Shady Lane Farms, Inc., John Foels, Shane M. Cornwell, Krause AG, LLC, Orin Washburn, Lauretta Darlene Bauer, William M. Todd and Ann M. Todd JT Trust, Gary Briggs, Max Tyler Trevathan and Jay Mugge
Defendant: Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation.***, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. and Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Case Number: 2:2017cv02460
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to the Order (Doc. 4113 in 14-md-2591) filed on March 1, 2019, the Court orders that the claims of Plaintiffs in the cases outlined in Exhibit B, be dismissed. The Court retains exclusive and continuing jurisdiction over all of these cases on the terms described in the Final Order and Judgment (Doc. 3850 in 14-md-2591). The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/22/2019.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(gw) (Main Document 28 replaced on 7/23/2019) (gw). (Main Document 28 replaced on 7/23/2019) (gw).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRELIMINARY PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(a) filed in MDL 14-2591. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/22/2014. (mg)
August 10, 2017 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00320. Electronic file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (cs)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER appointing plaintiffs' settlement negotiation committee. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/9/2017. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to District of Kansas and MDL #2591. (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 23 Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order.(cds) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed until thirty days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action to an MDL proceeding and completes any such transfer action. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/10/2017. (ceh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Heinz, Jordan) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heinz, Jordan) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Heinz on behalf of Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. (Heinz, Jordan) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Corporation served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Seeds, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Blair. (kek) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Blair. (kek) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and original mailed to Attorney Blair. (kek) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Corporation and original mailed to Attorney Blair. (kek) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Summonses Requested. Submitted summonses are fillable documents. Counsel is reminded that fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF's prior to docketing in CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Mark Ekonen. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Ekonen $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3276567 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ekonen, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David R. Herndon assigned. All future documents must bear case number 17-320-DRH. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jlrr) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Blair on behalf of All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320 (Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3204273.), filed by All Plaintiffs in Case 17-320. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blair, William) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/10/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael's Grain Farm, Inc. et al v. Syngenta AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation.***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan M. Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Manternach
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garvick's Farms Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inel Ryckman
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Abbott
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary A. Charlton
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Adams Farms LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmons Farm
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden West Farm/Hawks Herefords
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cripe Farms Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & A Bouslog Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Cole, Jr.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herschel Briney Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Appledorn
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl D. Tingley
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahm Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gastel
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Whalen Living Trust
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frazier Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thordsen Farm
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blankenship Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kanne d/b/a Kanne Bros.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Haines
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edco Properties LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braun Joint Venture
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbrough Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Motl
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Then and Now Farm Corp.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Bohde
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Todd
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Elbe
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott May Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evans Farns, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Fischbach
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rubin
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi Ann Jaeger
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Whitworth
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean R. Shafer
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kraus-Allbee Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Maher
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudderth Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Harris Jr
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker Farming
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Bailey
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stearns Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ayecok Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Thomann
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolling Prairie Farm Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.A. Reed
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Loewe
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swan Lake Farm
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Gathe
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rozell
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Willenborg
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John V Welsh
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley McLendon
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Pic
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Ann Curry
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Alan Cripe
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Skinner
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pleasant Spring Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Young
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Dole
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnside Acres, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebert Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Clark
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Stevenson
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Pieper
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Shore, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Allen Thompson
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory James
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Heilman
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Ridgely
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen David Brown
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Louis Landrey
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wernz, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ettis Ditto
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Potter
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray & Gary Machens Farms Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Farms
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Koenig
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Reiman
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Manternach
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Hilt
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Brothers
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Wesley Poynter
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan L. Stoner Farms Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Medlin Kirby
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Roberts
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibson Development, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Voss
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OKC Farms LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Everson
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Farms Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Joplin Trust
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Price
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whiskey Creek Arkansas
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Haines
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heilman Farming Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Moroni
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Connor
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan K. Newcomb
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Stoberl
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Weakly
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda Mungle
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin T. Duncan
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shady Lane Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Foels
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane M. Cornwell
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krause AG, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orin Washburn
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta Darlene Bauer
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Todd and Ann M. Todd JT Trust
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Briggs
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Tyler Trevathan
Represented By: Mark R. Ekonen
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Mugge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?