BVM Merriam, LLC v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BVM Merriam, LLC
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv02563
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion to amend the pretrial order 67 is GRANTED, and the pretrial order 59 is hereby deemed amended to include the defense of a lack of insurable interest. It is further ordered that plaintiff shall file any response to defendant's pending summary judgment motion 58 on or before 1/16/2019, and defendant shall file any reply brief on or before 1/25/2019. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/02/2019. (ses)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/16/2018. (ses)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of plaintiff's complaint and Count II is hereby dismissed. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its compliant, on or before January 2, 2018, to assert an alternative cause of action. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/15/2017. (ses)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BVM Merriam, LLC v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BVM Merriam, LLC
Represented By: Philip A. Klawuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark E. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?