The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG et al
Plaintiff: The Delong Co., Inc.
Defendant: Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02614
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/16/2020. (amh)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 63 motion to strike expert disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/4/2020. (amh)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 consent motion to extend certain pre-trial deadlines. For good cause shown, the court enters the parties' proposed amended scheduling order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/24/20. (jc)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (relates to Case No: 17-2614,The DeLong Co., Inc., v. Syngenta AG, et al.,) - granting Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of plaintiff's complaint (12) in case 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/26/2019. (ses)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER amending 11 scheduling order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/10/19. (jc)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/23/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Delong Co., Inc.
Represented By: David Charles Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?