In Re: Epipen (Epinephrine Injection, USP) Marketing, Sales Practices and Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dollander, Lisa Vogel, April Sumner, Angie Nordstrum, Laura Chapin, Jennifer Walton, Francis Meyers, Eileen Montet, Vishal Aggarwal, Cassandra Bredek, Elizabeth Huelsman, Kimberly Corcoran, William Delprincipe, Chris Rippy, Amber Rainey, Stacee Svites, Lauren Coale, Heather DeStefano, Rachel Fernandez, Donna Anne Dvorak, Raymond C. Buchta, III, Alene McDaniel, Mark Kovarik, Christina James, Donna Wemple, Rosetta Serrano, Nikitia Marshall, Heather Ruland, Anastasia Johnston, Lorraine Wight, Annette Sutorik, Lesley Huston, Erin Korte-Lamparter, Lee Seltzer, Jae Jones, Landon Ipson, Joy Shepard, Kenneth Steinhauser, Suzanne Harwood, Cassandra Cobb, John Dodge, Miriam Clarke, Valerie Moore, Carly Bowersock, Todd Beaulieu, Michael Gill, Denya Anderson, Teia Amell, Curt Palmer, Meredith Krimmel, Shannon Clements, Sonya North, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Amie Vialet De Montbel, Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, Kenneth Evans, Linda Wagner, Robert Montoya, David H. Smith, Connie Stafford, Kim Dollander, Elizabeth Williamson, Christina Kollmeyer, Lori Collins, Maria Giurland, Annette P. Wilcome Sutorik, Liz Huelzman and Francis Meyer
Defendant: Epipen (Epinephrine Injection, USP) Marketing, Sales Practices and Antitrust Litigation **COUNSEL: DO NOT ADD PARTIES.**, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Pfizer, Inc., King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan, Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Petitioner: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Amerigroup Corporation, Anthem, Inc. and CareFirst, Inc.
In Re: Epipen (Epinephrine Injection, USP) Marketing, Sales Practices and Antitrust Litigation, Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs, All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY) and All Defendants (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)
Special Master: Honorable Margaret R. Hinkle (Ret.)
Not Classified By Court: Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Coventry Health Care, Elan Klein, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Traci Brannon, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Thomas Hadley, Aetna Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Massachusetts, OptumRx, Inc., Adam Klein, Express Scripts Holding Company, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Arissa Paschalidis, Prime Therapeutics, LLC, Jamie Herr, Humana, Inc., Lindsey Rizzo, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Segal Group, Inc., Leah Weaver, Humana Pharmacy Solutions, Inc. and Blue Horizon Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Interested Party: kaleo, Inc., MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc., Change Healthcare, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kinney Drugs and Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017md02785
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 2335 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Devan Rittler-Patton as to King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rittler-Patton, Devan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2334 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Steven N. Williams (Williams, Steven)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2333 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 [Sealed] Memorandum in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mylan to Produce a Non-Privileged Document Improperly Clawed Back, #2 Exhibit List in support of the Memorandum in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mylan to Produce a Non-Privileged Document Improperly Clawed Back, #3 Exhibit A [Sealed] MYEP00260131, #4 Exhibit C [Sealed] Foster Dep. Excerpt, #5 Exhibit D [Sealed] MYEP00719326-9328, #6 Exhibit E [Sealed] MYEP00318523-8525, #7 Exhibit F [Sealed] Graham 30(b)(1) Dep. Ex. 11, #8 Exhibit G [Sealed] Bresch Dep. Ex. 40, #9 Exhibit H [Sealed] Graham 30b1 Dep. Excerpt., #10 Exhibit I [Sealed] Bresch Dep. Excerpt)(O'Mara, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2332 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2331 MOTION to Compel Mylan to Produce a Non-Privileged Document Improperly Clawed Back (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Placeholder], #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-I [Placeholder])(O'Mara, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2331 MOTION to Compel Mylan to Produce a Non-Privileged Document Improperly Clawed Back by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (O'Mara, Brian)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2330 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Tanya Korkhov as to Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2329 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Erich P. Schork as to Vishal Aggarwal. (Schork, Erich)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2328 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. identifying Viatris Inc. as corporate parent SECOND AMENDED. (Levin, Adam)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2327 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Index of Filings Where the Expert Report of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover Was Attached as an Exhibit re #2325 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mayrell, Ralph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2326 SANOFI CASE -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re #2325 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Index of Filings Where the Expert Report of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover Was Attached as an Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Mayrell, Ralph)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2325 SANOFI CASE -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2321 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Please see order for further details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/15/2021. (gw) Modified on 3/16/2021 to unseal document per chambers. (gw)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2324 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. identifying Viatris Inc. as corporate parent AMENDED. (Levin, Adam)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2323 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- STATUS REPORT Class Plaintiffs' Final Status Report Re Implementation of Class Notice by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter of A.B. Data, Ltd. Re: Implementation of Class Notice) (Sarko, Lynn)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2322 SANOFI CASE -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Hochstadt, Eric)
February 9, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2321 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Refile Expert Report of Janusz Ordover Along with Third Party Requests to Lodge Certain Portions of the Report Under Seal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2321 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Renewed Motion to Refile Expert Report of Janusz Ordover Along with Third Party Requests to Lodge Certain Portions of the Report Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayrell, Ralph)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2320 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP Index of Filings Where the Expert Report of J. Lawrence Stevens Was Attached as an Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayrell, Ralph)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2319 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF ELECTION of September 2021 Trial Date by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2316 Scheduling Order, Trial Order. (Lanier, Kathryn) Modified docket text on 2/5/2021. (gw)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2318 SANOFI CASE -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: It is therefore ordered by the court that the parties' requests to seal certain portions of the court's two Memoranda and Orders issued on December 17, 2020 are granted in part and denied in part. The court directs the Clerk of the Court to unseal the two Orders (Docs. #2253 & #2254 ), consistent with the rulings in this Order. Please see Order for more detail. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/29/2021. (gw)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2317 ORDER REAPPOINTING DEFENDANTS' LIAISON COUNSEL: This Order appoints Brian Fries of Lathrop GPM, LLP as liaison counsel for all defendants. Please see Order for additional information. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/28/2021. (gw)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2316 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 13: This Order adopts Scheduling Order 13 (Trial Order). Jury Questionnaire Hearing set for 6/17/2021 at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference and In Limine Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 09:00 AM. Trial set for 9/7/2021 at 09:00 AM. ALL hearings will be held in KC Courtroom 643 in front of District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. See trial order for additional dates and information. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/28/2021. (gw)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2313 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #2263 Notice of Appeal (Appeal No. 21-3005). (ca)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2315 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/27/2021 conducted by Zoom Video Conference. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (mig)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2314 SANOFI CASE -- MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/27/2021. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (mig)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2312 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held January 27, 2021 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Brian Fries. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2021. (kg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2311 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Already on File filed by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re #2263 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2310 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT to #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Sechler, Philip) Modified texts on 1/26/2021 (msb).
January 26, 2021 Filing 2309 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT to #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Sechler, Philip) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (msb).
January 25, 2021 Filing 2308 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Rachel Lanier on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Lanier, Kathryn)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2307 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2249 Motion for Order, To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B) (Sharp, Rex)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2306 SANOFI CASE -- AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - Due to a fire at the Robert J. Dole Courthouse that has closed access to the building, the court must reschedule the telephone conference that it intended to hold on Friday, January 22, 2021, at 1:30 pm, to rule the parties' sealing requests for the Memoranda and Orders (Docs. #2253 & #2254 ) ruling the summary judgment and Daubert motions filed in the Sanofi track of this litigation. The court reschedules that telephone conference to Wednesday, January 27, 2021, at 12:30 pm CST. (Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 12:30 PM in Telephone DDC - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 8354715 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree.) Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw) Modified to correct typos on 1/22/2021. (gw)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2305 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) (Ex. 91) re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2270 SEALED Exhibits. (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2304 SEALED DOCUMENT Joint Notice Requesting that Portions of the Court's December 17, 2020 Memoranda Resolving the Parties' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Remain Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sechler, Philip)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2303 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ruth Anne French-Hodson on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (French-Hodson, Ruth)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2302 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's re #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur. (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2301 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's re #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2300 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's re #1673 Redacted MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2299 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Mylan's June 28, 2019 Expert Report Exhibits Filed Under Seal Pursuant to ECF No. 2257 re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H) (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2298 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP Mylan's June 28, 2019 Expert Report Exhibits Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2297 SANOFI CASE -- REDACTION Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1684 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2296 SANOFI CASE -- REDACTION Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1682 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Sechler, Philip)
January 16, 2021 Filing 2295 SANOFI CASE -- REDACTION Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2294 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Reply in Support of Mylan's re #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur. (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2293 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1879 Reply to Response to Motion, (Exhibits in Support of Mylan's #1879 Reply in Support of Mylan's #1685 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins. Ph.D.) (Exhibit 1 - Redacted) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2292 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Reply in Support of Mylan's re #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2291 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1868 Reply to Response to Motion (Exhibits in Support of Mylan's #1868 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1682 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton) (Exhibit 1 - Redacted) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 9 (Redacted)) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2290 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's re #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2289 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1883 Reply to Response to Motion (Exhibits in Support of Mylan's #1883 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment) (Exhibit 252) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 253 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 254 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 256 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 257 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 259, #6 Exhibit 260 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 261 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 262, #9 Exhibit 263, #10 Exhibit 264, #11 Exhibit 265, #12 Exhibit 267 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 270 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 272 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit 281, #16 Exhibit 282, #17 Exhibit 284) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2288 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's re #1673 Redacted MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 251, #2 Exhibit 253, #3 Exhibit 254, #4 Exhibit 255, #5 Exhibit 256, #6 Exhibit 257, #7 Exhibit 258, #8 Exhibit 260, #9 Exhibit 261, #10 Exhibit 266, #11 Exhibit 267, #12 Exhibit 268, #13 Exhibit 269, #14 Exhibit 270, #15 Exhibit 271, #16 Exhibit 272, #17 Exhibit 273, #18 Exhibit 274, #19 Exhibit 275, #20 Exhibit 276, #21 Exhibit 277, #22 Exhibit 278, #23 Exhibit 279, #24 Exhibit 280, #25 Exhibit 283) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2287 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1803 Response to Motion, (Exhibits in Support of #1803 Mylan's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1666 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Gary Zieziula) (Exhibit 1) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2286 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's re #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula. (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2285 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1804 Response to Motion, (Exhibits in Support of #1804 Mylan's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1675 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Thomas Varner) (Exhibit 1) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2284 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's re #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2283 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1813 Response to Motion, (Exhibits in Support of Mylan's #1813 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1691 Motion for Summary Judgment) (Exhibit 1) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit 23 (Redacted), #19 Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit 27 (Redacted), #23 Exhibit 29 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit 30 (Redacted), #25 Exhibit 31 (Redacted), #26 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), #27 Exhibit 37, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 52 (Redacted), #31 Exhibit 56, #32 Exhibit 67 (Redacted), #33 Exhibit 68, #34 Exhibit 79 (Redacted), #35 Exhibit 85 (Redacted), #36 Exhibit 88, #37 Exhibit 90, #38 Exhibit 91, #39 Exhibit 92, #40 Exhibit 93, #41 Exhibit 95, #42 Exhibit 97, #43 Exhibit 98, #44 Exhibit 99, #45 Exhibit 100, #46 Exhibit 101, #47 Exhibit 102 (Redacted), #48 Exhibit 114, #49 Exhibit 115, #50 Exhibit 117, #51 Exhibit 118, #52 Exhibit 119, #53 Exhibit 120, #54 Exhibit 121, #55 Exhibit 122, #56 Exhibit 123, #57 Exhibit 124, #58 Exhibit 125, #59 Exhibit 128, #60 Exhibit 129, #61 Exhibit 130, #62 Exhibit 131, #63 Exhibit 132, #64 Exhibit 133, #65 Exhibit 134, #66 Exhibit 136, #67 Exhibit 137, #68 Exhibit 138, #69 Exhibit 139, #70 Exhibit 140, #71 Exhibit 141, #72 Exhibit 142, #73 Exhibit 143, #74 Exhibit 144, #75 Exhibit 145, #76 Exhibit 146, #77 Exhibit 149, #78 Exhibit 150, #79 Exhibit 151, #80 Exhibit 152, #81 Exhibit 153, #82 Exhibit 154, #83 Exhibit 155, #84 Exhibit 156, #85 Exhibit 157, #86 Exhibit 158, #87 Exhibit 159, #88 Exhibit 160, #89 Exhibit 161, #90 Exhibit 164 (Redacted), #91 Exhibit 166, #92 Exhibit 167, #93 Exhibit 168, #94 Exhibit 169, #95 Exhibit 170, #96 Exhibit 171, #97 Exhibit 172, #98 Exhibit 173, #99 Exhibit 174, #100 Exhibit 175, #101 Exhibit 176, #102 Exhibit 177, #103 Exhibit 178, #104 Exhibit 179, #105 Exhibit 180, #106 Exhibit 181, #107 Exhibit 183) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2282 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,Order on Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Sanofi Exhibits to August 30, 2019 Reply In Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude The Expert Reports and Testimony of Gary Zieziula Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 6, #2 Ex. 9) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2281 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Sanofi Exhibits to August 30, 2019 Reply In Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude The Expert Reports and Testimony of Gary Zieziula Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 6, #2 Ex. 7) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2280 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Sanofi Exhibits to August 30, 2019 Summary Judgment Reply Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 154, #2 Ex. 157, #3 Ex. 158, #4 Ex. 159, #5 Ex. 160, #6 Ex. 161, #7 Ex. 162) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2279 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Sanofi Exhibits to August 30, 2019 Summary Judgment Reply Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 153, #2 Ex. 155, #3 Ex. 156, #4 Ex. 159, #5 Ex. 160, #6 Ex. 163) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2278 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Sanofi Exhibits to August 8/9, 2019 Oppositions to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. and Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 5, #3 Ex. 11, #4 Ex. A) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2277 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED DOCUMENT Mylan's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's re #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 27, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32, #18 Exhibit 33, #19 Exhibit 34, #20 Exhibit 35, #21 Exhibit 36, #22 Exhibit 38, #23 Exhibit 39, #24 Exhibit 40, #25 Exhibit 41, #26 Exhibit 42, #27 Exhibit 43, #28 Exhibit 44, #29 Exhibit 45, #30 Exhibit 46, #31 Exhibit 49, #32 Exhibit 50, #33 Exhibit 51, #34 Exhibit 52, #35 Exhibit 53, #36 Exhibit 54, #37 Exhibit 55, #38 Exhibit 57, #39 Exhibit 58, #40 Exhibit 59, #41 Exhibit 60, #42 Exhibit 61, #43 Exhibit 62, #44 Exhibit 63, #45 Exhibit 64, #46 Exhibit 65, #47 Exhibit 66, #48 Exhibit 67, #49 Exhibit 69, #50 Exhibit 70, #51 Exhibit 71, #52 Exhibit 72, #53 Exhibit 73, #54 Exhibit 74, #55 Exhibit 75, #56 Exhibit 76, #57 Exhibit 77, #58 Exhibit 78, #59 Exhibit 79, #60 Exhibit 80, #61 Exhibit 81, #62 Exhibit 82, #63 Exhibit 83, #64 Exhibit 84, #65 Exhibit 85, #66 Exhibit 86, #67 Exhibit 87, #68 Exhibit 89, #69 Exhibit 94, #70 Exhibit 96, #71 Exhibit 102, #72 Exhibit 103, #73 Exhibit 104, #74 Exhibit 105, #75 Exhibit 106, #76 Exhibit 107, #77 Exhibit 108, #78 Exhibit 109, #79 Exhibit 110, #80 Exhibit 111, #81 Exhibit 112, #82 Exhibit 113, #83 Exhibit 116, #84 Exhibit 126, #85 Exhibit 127, #86 Exhibit 135, #87 Exhibit 147, #88 Exhibit 148, #89 Exhibit 162, #90 Exhibit 163, #91 Exhibit 164, #92 Exhibit 165, #93 Exhibit 182) (Sechler, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2276 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Sanofi Exhibits to August 8/9, 2019 Oppositions to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. and Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion.(Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 5, #4 Ex. 11, #5 Ex. 12, #6 Ex. 13, #7 Ex. 14, #8 Ex. 15, #9 Ex. 16, #10 Ex. A) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2275 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,Order on Sealed Motion, by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Sanofi Exhibits to August 9, 2019 Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 2, #2 Ex. 6, #3 Ex. 8, #4 Ex. 9, #5 Ex. 14, #6 Ex. 15, #7 Ex. 16, #8 Ex. 25, #9 Ex. 31, #10 Ex. 32, #11 Ex. 33, #12 Ex. 45, #13 Ex. 54, #14 Ex. 61, #15 Ex. 63, #16 Ex. 73, #17 Ex. 81, #18 Ex. 82, #19 Ex. 95, #20 Ex. 107, #21 Ex. 110, #22 Ex. 114, #23 Ex. 115, #24 Ex. 116, #25 Ex. 117, #26 Ex. 120, #27 Ex. 121, #28 Ex. 122, #29 Ex. 126, #30 Ex. 127, #31 Ex. 128, #32 Ex. 130, #33 Ex. 131, #34 Ex 132, #35 Ex. 134, #36 Ex 136, #37 Ex. 137, #38 Ex. 138, #39 Ex. 144, #40 Ex. 146, #41 Ex. 147, #42 Ex. 148, #43 Ex. 151, #44 Ex. 152, #45 Ex. 161, #46 Ex. 165, #47 Ex. 167, #48 Ex. 172, #49 Ex. 179, #50 Ex. 180, #51 Ex. 190, #52 Ex. 191, #53 Ex. 197, #54 Ex. 199, #55 Ex. 205, #56 Ex. 213, #57 Ex. 221, #58 Ex. 222, #59 Ex. 230, #60 Ex. 231, #61 Ex. 237, #62 Ex. 238, #63 Ex. 239, #64 Ex. 246, #65 Ex. 251, #66 Ex. 255, #67 Ex. 256, #68 Ex. 257, #69 Ex. 270) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2274 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint STATUS REPORT by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Deadlines, #2 Exhibit B-Class Plaintiffs' Position, #3 Exhibit C-Defendants' Statement) (Sharp, Rex)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2273 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) (Ex. 150) Sanofi Exhibits to August 9, 2019 Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion.(Attachments: #1 Ex. 151, #2 Ex. 152, #3 Ex. 153, #4 Ex. 154, #5 Ex. 155, #6 Ex. 156, #7 Ex. 157, #8 Ex. 158, #9 Ex. 159, #10 Ex. 160, #11 Ex. 161, #12 Ex. 163, #13 Ex. 164, #14 Ex. 165, #15 Ex. 166, #16 Ex. 167, #17 Ex. 168, #18 Ex. 169, #19 Ex. 170, #20 Ex. 171, #21 Ex. 172, #22 Ex. 173, #23 Ex. 175, #24 Ex. 176, #25 Ex. 177, #26 Ex. 178, #27 Ex. 181, #28 Ex. 182, #29 Ex. 183, #30 Ex. 184, #31 Ex. 185, #32 Ex. 186, #33 Ex. 188, #34 Ex. 189, #35 Ex. 190, #36 Ex. 191, #37 Ex. 192, #38 Ex. 193, #39 Ex. 194, #40 Ex. 200, #41 Ex. 202, #42 Ex. 203, #43 Ex. 204, #44 Ex. 205, #45 Ex. 207, #46 Ex. 208, #47 Ex. 209, #48 Ex. 210, #49 Ex. 211, #50 Ex. 212, #51 Ex. 213, #52 Ex. 214, #53 Ex. 215, #54 Ex. 219, #55 Ex. 220, #56 Ex. 221, #57 Ex. 222, #58 Ex. 223, #59 Ex. 224, #60 Ex. 225, #61 Ex. 226, #62 Ex. 227, #63 Ex. 228, #64 Ex. 231, #65 Ex. 232, #66 Ex. 233, #67 Ex. 234, #68 Ex. 235, #69 Ex. 236, #70 Ex. 237, #71 Ex. 238, #72 Ex. 241, #73 Ex. 243, #74 Ex. 244, #75 Ex. 245, #76 Ex. 246, #77 Ex. 247, #78 Ex. 248, #79 Ex. 249, #80 Ex. 250, #81 Ex. 252, #82 Ex. 253, #83 Ex. 254, #84 Ex. 255, #85 Ex. 258, #86 Ex. 259, #87 Ex. 263, #88 Ex. 265) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2272 SANOFI CASE -- ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion to Seal the Joint Notice and Exhibits (Doc. #2265 ). The court grants the parties leave to file under seal their Joint Notice and Exhibits. Counsel is directed to file the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the court's Order Denying Sealed Access (Doc. #299 ). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2271 SANOFI CASE -- ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING - As the court explained in its Notice of Unsealing and Order (Doc. #2255 ), it had intended to unseal its Memoranda and Orders (Docs. #2253 & #2254 ) ruling the summary judgment and Daubert motions filed in the Sanofi track of this litigation by today, January 15, 2020, if the parties declined to file a joint notice identifying portions of the Orders that they contend should remain sealed. That didn't happen. Instead, the parties have filed a Joint Notice (Doc. #2265 ) that asks the court to seal substantial portions of the court's Orders. The court is in the process of reviewing those requests and will rule on them in a telephone conference with the parties on Friday, January 22, 2020, at 1:30 pm. Afterwards, the court will make the Memoranda & Orders publicly available consistent with its rulings on the sealing requests contained in the Joint Notice. (Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Telephone DDC - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 8354715 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree.) Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/15/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2270 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Sanofi Exhibits to August 9, 2019 Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 6, #4 Ex. 9, #5 Ex. 10, #6 Ex. 11, #7 Ex. 12, #8 Ex. 13, #9 Ex. 14, #10 Ex. 15, #11 Ex. 17, #12 Ex. 18, #13 Ex. 19, #14 Ex. 20, #15 Ex. 21, #16 Ex. 23, #17 Ex 24, #18 Ex. 25, #19 Ex. 26, #20 Ex. 27, #21 Ex. 28, #22 Ex. 29, #23 Ex. 31, #24 Ex. 32, #25 Ex. 34, #26 Ex. 35, #27 Ex. 36, #28 Ex. 37, #29 Ex. 38, #30 Ex. 39, #31 Ex. 40, #32 Ex. 41, #33 Ex. 42, #34 Ex. 43, #35 Ex. 44, #36 Ex. 45, #37 Ex. 47, #38 Ex. 48, #39 Ex. 49, #40 Ex. 50, #41 Ex. 51, #42 Ex. 52, #43 Ex. 53, #44 Ex. 55, #45 Ex. 56, #46 Ex. 58, #47 Ex. 59, #48 Ex. 60, #49 Ex. 61, #50 Ex. 62, #51 Ex. 63, #52 Ex. 64, #53 Ex. 65, #54 Ex. 66, #55 Ex. 67, #56 Ex. 68, #57 Ex. 69, #58 Ex. 70, #59 Ex. 72, #60 Ex. 73, #61 Ex. 74, #62 Ex. 75, #63 Ex. 76, #64 Ex. 77, #65 Ex. 78, #66 Ex. 79, #67 Ex. 80, #68 Ex. 81, #69 Ex. 82, #70 Ex. 84, #71 Ex. 85, #72 Ex. 86, #73 Ex. 87, #74 Ex. 88, #75 Ex. 89, #76 Ex. 90, #77 Ex. 92, #78 Ex. 94, #79 Ex. 95, #80 Ex. 96, #81 Ex. 97, #82 Ex. 98, #83 Ex. 99, #84 Ex. 100, #85 Ex. 101, #86 Ex. 102, #87 Ex. 103, #88 Ex. 104, #89 Ex. 105, #90 Ex. 106, #91 Ex. 108, #92 Ex. 111, #93 Ex. 112, #94 Ex. 113, #95 Ex. 114, #96 Ex. 115, #97 Ex. 116, #98 Ex. 117, #99 Ex. 119, #100 Ex. 120, #101 Ex. 121, #102 Ex. 122, #103 Ex. 126, #104 Ex 130, #105 Ex. 131, #106 Ex. 132, #107 Ex. 135, #108 Ex. 137, #109 Ex. 138, #110 Ex. 139, #111 Ex. 140, #112 Ex. 141, #113 Ex. 142, #114 Ex 143, #115 Ex. 144, #116 Ex. 145, #117 Ex. 146, #118 Ex. 147, #119 Ex. 148, #120 Ex. 149) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2269 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Maccarone on behalf of Vishal Aggarwal, Donna Anne Dvorak, Michael Gill, April Sumner. (Maccarone, Courtney)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2268 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion, by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Sanofi's June 28, 2019 Briefs and Expert Reports Filed Publicly Pursuant to ECF No. 2257). (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2267 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Sanofi's Briefs and Expert Reports Filed Under Seal Pursuant to re #2257 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Order on Sealed Motion. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J, #11 Ex. K, #12 Ex. L, #13 Ex. M) (Hochstadt, Eric)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2266 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 1/14/2021 and assigned Appeal No. 21-3005 re #2263 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (ca)
January 13, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2265 Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and Joint Notice Requesting that Portions of the Court's December 17, 2020 Memoranda Resolving the Parties' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Remain Under Seal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2265 Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and Joint Notice Requesting that Portions of the Court's December 17, 2020 Memoranda Resolving the Parties' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Remain Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sechler, Philip)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2264 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #2263 Notice of Appeal. The preliminary record is sealed and being transmitted to 10CCA separately. (ca)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2263 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2254 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, Counter Defendant Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5380806. (Buchweitz, Yehudah) Modified title on 1/13/2021 (ca).
January 8, 2021 Filing 2262 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #2249 MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Levin, Adam) Modified on 01/13/2021 to correct title. (gw)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2261 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER on #2246 Order regarding James Walker. Mr. Walker's request to enter an appearance in this case is denied. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Walker at the address shown on Exhibit 2. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/05/2021. Mailed to pro se party James Walker, 1871 Emerald Bay Drive, Rockwall, TX 75087 by regular mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EpiPen Longform Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Walker Reply) (gw)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #2258 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2249 MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission. The Court extends the response deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' motion #2249 to January 8, 2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2259 RESPONSE by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2246 Order,,,, Response to Pro Se Motion of James Walker to Enter an Appearance (Burns, Warren)
December 24, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2258 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2249 MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - Jointly Filed by Mylan and Pfizer Defendants. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
December 24, 2020 Filing 2258 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2249 MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission. - Jointly Filed by Mylan and Pfizer Defendants - by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fries, Brian)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2257 SANOFI CASE -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1796 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; denying without prejudice #1798 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; denying without prejudice #1800 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1801 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1802 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1805 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #1820 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1866 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting #1870 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1872 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1875 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting #1876 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1878 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1882 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1935 Sealed Motion; granting #1936 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #1937 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #1938 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting #1947 Sealed Motion; granting #1948 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. See order for further details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/17/2020. (hw)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2256 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE of Judgment filed in tag-a-long case Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC v. Mylan Inc. et al (KS case # 2:17-cv-02452-DDC-TJJ). (gw)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2255 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF UNSEALING AND ORDER *See Order for further details. The parties must file, no later than January 13, 2021, a joint notice: (a) identifying all portions that the party or parties contend should remain sealed and the parties' respective positions on that request; and (b) briefly explaining why the passage deserves sealed status. If no such notice is timely filed, the court will unseal the entire Memorandum and Order ruling the dispositive motions and the entire Memorandum and Order ruling the motions seeking to exclude expert opinions on the public CM/ECF docket on January 15, 2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/17/2020. (gw)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2254 SANOFI CASE -- **SEALED MEMORANDUM & ORDER** IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment #1673 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Sanofi's Motion for Summary Judgment #1691 is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/17/2020. (gw)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2253 SANOFI CASE -- **SEALED ORDER** IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT plaintiff/counterclaim defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Gary Zieziula #1666 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT plaintiff/counterclaim defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Thomas Varner #1675 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT defendant Mylan Inc. and defendant/counterclaim-plaintiff Mylan Specialty L.P.'s Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. #1682 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT defendant Mylan Inc. anddefendant/counterclaim-plaintiff Mylan Specialty L.P.'s Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. #1683 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT defendant Mylan Inc. anddefendant/counterclaim-plaintiff Mylan Specialty L.P.'s Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur #1684 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT defendant Mylan Inc. and defendant/counterclaim-plaintiff Mylan Specialty L.P.'s Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. #1685 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/17/2020. (gw)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2252 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING Status Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 01:30 PM will be conducted by Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Non-case related participants can join the hearing by dialing into the CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and entering the ACCESS CODE 8354715#. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2251 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #2244 Motion to Continue. Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2021. Video Status Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. See Order for more details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/16/2020. (gw)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2250 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. Amendment to #2248 Response to Motion to Continue Trial. (Sharp, Rex)
December 16, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2249 MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2249 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for Order To Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Actos-Supplemental Order, #2 Exhibit B Actos-CMO Protocol, #3 Exhibit C Order Granting Motion) (Sharp, Rex)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2248 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2244 Motion to Continue Trial. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - List of Jury Trials) (Burns, Warren)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2247 SANOFI CASE -- -- NOTICE: The court intends to issue its rulings on the parties' pending Motions for Summary Judgment in the Sanofi track of this MDL (Docs. #1673 , #1691 ) on Thursday, December 17. Also, on that same day, the court will issue its ruling on the parties' motions seeking to exclude expert opinions in the Sanofi track of the MDL (Docs. #1666 , #1675 , #1682 , #1683 , #1684 , #1685 ). The court will issue its rulings in two sealed filings. Also, the court will issue a publicly available Order that will summarize its rulings and provide a timeline for unsealing the two sealed filings, after the parties have an opportunity to review the filings and consider whether any portion of them contains confidential information that may qualify for continued sealing. (gw)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2246 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER The Clerk has advised that James Walker of Rockwall, Texas wishes to file an "Entry of Appearance." The proposed Entry of Appearance asserts that Mr. Walker is a class member, and related correspondence asserts that Mr. Walker plans to represent himself. Mr. Walker's submissions to the Clerk are attached as Exhibit 1 to this Order. In its discretion, the court construes Mr. Walker's submissions as a pro se motion to enter an appearance and directs the parties to file any response to this motion within 14 days of this Order, the time permitted by D. Kan. Rule 6.1(d)(1). Any party filing a response must serve it by first-class mail or other more efficient mean, e.g., overnight delivery, on the address shown for Mr. Walker in Exhibit 1. The court also directs the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Walker at the same address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/14/2020. Mailed to James Walker, 1871 Emerald Bay Drive, Rockwall, TX 75087 by regular mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (gw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2245 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- STATUS REPORT Class Plaintiffs' Status Report Re: Implementation of Class Notice by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter of A.B. Data, Ltd. on Status of Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan) (Sarko, Lynn)
December 1, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2244 MOTION to Continue Trial Currently Scheduled to Begin April 13, 2021 in Light of the Accelerating COVID-19 Pandemic. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2244 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Continue Trial Currently Scheduled to Begin April 13, 2021 in Light of the Accelerating COVID-19 Pandemic by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2243 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Reply Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. 375)(Levin, Adam)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2242 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Their Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G)(Sarko, Lynn)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2241 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Seal Document (Renewed) to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of their Reply in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Rebein, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2240 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The class plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan (Doc. #2209 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Please see Order for specific details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/13/2020. (gw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2239 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Omnibus Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Their Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Exclude and Motions for Summary Judgment by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Class Plaintiffs' Summary, #2 Appendix B - Mylan Part 1, #3 Appendix B - Mylan Part 2, #4 Appendix C - Pfizer, #5 Appendix D - Anthem, #6 Appendix E - Cigna, #7 Appendix F - CVS, #8 Appendix G - ESI, #9 Appendix H - Humana, #10 Appendix I - Kaiser, #11 Appendix J - Kaleo, #12 Appendix K - Magellan, #13 Appendix L - MedImpact, #14 Appendix M - Optum and United, #15 Appendix N - PayerServices, #16 Appendix O - Presbyterian, #17 Appendix P - Prime, #18 Appendix Q - Sanofi, #19 Appendix R - Teva) (Sarko, Lynn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2238 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Levin, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2237 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE to #2235 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP, Defendant Mylan, Inc. (Sechler, Philip)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2236 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2209 Motion for Order, Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Eric Schachter of A.B. Data, Ltd. in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Davidson, Stuart)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2235 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #1691 filed by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Hochstadt, Eric)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2234 RESPONSE to #2230 Notice of Supplemental Authority, by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.. (Levin, Adam)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2233 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: #2222 Pfizer's Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of the Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.; #2223 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert, filed by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.; #2224 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report re the '827 Patent, filed by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.; #2225 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV; #2226 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.; and #2228 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Daubert Motion Reply Briefing, file by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2232 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Reagan E. Bradford as to All Plaintiffs (Bradford, Reagan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2231 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #2209 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1)(Levin, Adam)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2230 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #2148 filed by Defendant Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Defendant King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Defendant Pfizer, Inc., MOTION for Summary Judgment #2141 filed by Defendant Mylan N.V., Defendant Mylan Specialty, LP, Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Mylan, Inc. (Sharp, Rex)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2229 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2228 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Daubert Motion Reply Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 383, #2 Ex. 385, #3 Ex. 386, #4 Ex. 387)(Levin, Adam)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2228 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Daubert Motion Reply Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Professor Einer Elhauge, #2 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #3 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Carl Peck, #4 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness James Bruno, #5 Exhibit List, #6 Ex. 384, #7 Ex. 388, #8 Ex. 389)(Levin, Adam)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2227 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2226 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 382)(Levin, Adam)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2226 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Ex. 374, #4 Ex. 375, #5 Ex. 376, #6 Ex. 377, #7 Ex. 378, #8 Ex. 379, #9 Ex. 380, #10 Ex. 381)(Levin, Adam)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2225 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV, #2 Declaration of Matthew S. Tripolitsiotis in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Sarko, Lynn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2224 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report re the '827 Patent by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report re the '827 Patent, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Kathryn Swisher in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report re the '827 Patent, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kathryn)(Rebein, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2223 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Patent Litigation Expert, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Raj Gandesha in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Patent Litigation Expert, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha)(Rebein, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2222 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of the Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Raj Gandesha in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4 to Declaration)(Rebein, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2221 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2215 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-27, #2 Exhibit A-28, #3 Exhibit A-29, #4 Exhibit A-30, #5 Exhibit A-31, #6 Exhibit A-32, #7 Exhibit A-33, #8 Exhibit A-34, #9 Exhibit A-35, #10 Exhibit A-36, #11 Exhibit A-37, #12 Exhibit A-38, #13 Exhibit A-39, #14 Exhibit A-40, #15 Exhibit A-41, #16 Exhibit A-42, #17 Exhibit A-43, #18 Exhibit A-44, #19 Exhibit A-45, #20 Exhibit A-46, #21 Exhibit A-47, #22 Exhibit A-48, #23 Exhibit A-49, #24 Exhibit A-50)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2220 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2215 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2, #2 Exhibit A-3, #3 Exhibit A-4, #4 Exhibit A-5, #5 Exhibit A-6, #6 Exhibit A-7, #7 Exhibit A-8, #8 Exhibit A-9, #9 Exhibit A-10, #10 Exhibit A-11, #11 Exhibit A-12, #12 Exhibit A-13, #13 Exhibit A-14, #14 Exhibit A-15, #15 Exhibit A-16, #16 Exhibit A-17, #17 Exhibit A-18, #18 Exhibit A-19, #19 Exhibit A-20, #20 Exhibit A-21, #21 Exhibit A-22, #22 Exhibit A-23, #23 Exhibit A-24, #24 Exhibit A-25)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2219 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2215 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 316, #2 Ex. 325, #3 Ex. 326, #4 Ex. 327, #5 Ex. 328, #6 Ex. 329, #7 Ex. 330, #8 Ex. 331, #9 Ex. 336, #10 Ex. 338, #11 Ex. 340, #12 Ex. 341, #13 Ex. 342, #14 Ex. 353)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2218 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2215 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 139, #2 Ex. 140, #3 Ex. 141, #4 Ex. 153, #5 Ex. 167, #6 Ex. 174, #7 Ex. 175, #8 Ex. 182, #9 Ex. 183, #10 Ex. 184, #11 Ex. 185, #12 Ex. 186, #13 Ex. 187, #14 Ex. 188, #15 Ex. 189, #16 Ex. 190, #17 Ex. 192, #18 Ex. 214, #19 Ex. 243, #20 Ex. 244, #21 Ex. 264, #22 Ex. 294, #23 Ex. 300, #24 Ex. 308, #25 Ex. 310)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2217 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2215 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 002, #2 Ex. 005, #3 Ex. 010, #4 Ex. 012, #5 Ex. 016, #6 Ex. 020, #7 Ex. 021, #8 Ex. 026, #9 Ex. 031, #10 Ex. 033, #11 Ex. 049, #12 Ex. 064, #13 Ex. 067, #14 Ex. 076, #15 Ex. 086, #16 Ex. 102, #17 Ex. 103, #18 Ex. 129, #19 Ex. 133)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2216 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Their Motion to Strike In Part The Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E - Part 1, #6 Appendix E - Part 2, #7 Motion to Strike in Part Testimony of Dr. Johnson, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike in Part Testimony of Dr. Johnson, #9 Declaration of Matthew Tripolotsiotis, #10 Exh A, #11 Exh B, #12 Exh C, #13 Exh D, #14 Exh E, #15 Exh F, #16 Exh G, #17 Exh H, #18 Exh I, #19 Exh J, #20 Exh K, #21 Exh L, #22 Exh M, #23 Exh N, #24 Exh O, #25 Exh P, #26 Exh Q, #27 Exh R, #28 Exh S, #29 Exh T, #30 Exh U, #31 Exh V, #32 Exh W, #33 Exh X)(Sarko, Lynn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2215 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Levin, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2214 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal regarding Sealing of Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Rebein, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2213 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of Their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A)(Rebein, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2212 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B)(Rebein, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2211 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #2210 Mylan and Pfizer defendants' Motion for a One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to #2209 Class Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan and the Response deadline is extended to 9/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/11/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 10, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2209 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan Defendants Unopposed Motion For A One-Week Extension Of Time To Respond To Class Plaintiffs Motion For An Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2210 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2209 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan Defendants Unopposed Motion For A One-Week Extension Of Time To Respond To Class Plaintiffs Motion For An Order Implementing Stage Two Of Class Notice Plan by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fries, Brian)
September 2, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2209 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2209 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for Order Implementing Stage Two of Class Notice Plan by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Pritzker in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summary Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Long Form Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Authority Template, #5 Exhibit 4 - Corcoran v. CVS Health Summary Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - In re USC Student Health Center Litig Summary Notice, #7 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Motion, #8 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice Plan) (Sarko, Lynn)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2208 ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: #2182 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF JAMES BRUNO AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; #2183 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; #2184 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF JAMES BRUNO AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; #2185 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' PATENT LITIGATION EXPERT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; #2186 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PRELIMINARILY FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE IN PART THE TESTIMONY OF DR. JOHN H. JOHNSON IV; #2187 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF PROFESSOR EINER ELHAUGE AND CERTAIN ASSOCIATED EXHIBITS; #2188 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL REPORT REGARDING THE '827 PATENT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; and #2190 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVISIONALLY FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/18/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2207 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs PUBLIC EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 195, #2 Exhibit 232, #3 Exhibit 238, #4 Exhibit 273, #5 Exhibit 295, #6 Exhibit 296, #7 Exhibit 297, #8 Exhibit 303, #9 Exhibit 305, #10 Exhibit 307, #11 Exhibit 308, #12 Exhibit 316, #13 Exhibit 321, #14 Exhibit 322, #15 Exhibit 326, #16 Exhibit 327, #17 Exhibit 349, #18 Exhibit 350, #19 Exhibit 352, #20 Exhibit 353, #21 Exhibit 355, #22 Exhibit 356, #23 Exhibit 357, #24 Exhibit 358, #25 Exhibit 359, #26 Exhibit 361, #27 Exhibit 365, #28 Exhibit 369) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2206 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs PUBLIC EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 35, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 61, #14 Exhibit 62, #15 Exhibit 114, #16 Exhibit 135, #17 Exhibit 136, #18 Exhibit 150, #19 Exhibit 165, #20 Exhibit 189 )(Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2205 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 344, #2 Exhibit 345, #3 Exhibit 346, #4 Exhibit 347, #5 Exhibit 348, #6 Exhibit 351, #7 Exhibit 354, #8 Exhibit 360, #9 Exhibit 362, #10 Exhibit 363, #11 Exhibit 364, #12 Exhibit 366, #13 Exhibit 367, #14 Exhibit 368, #15 Exhibit 370) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2204 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 320, #2 Exhibit 323, #3 Exhibit 324 , #4 Exhibit 325, #5 Exhibit 328, #6 Exhibit 329, #7 Exhibit 330, #8 Exhibit 331, #9 Exhibit 332, #10 Exhibit 333, #11 Exhibit 334, #12 Exhibit 335, #13 Exhibit 336, #14 Exhibit 337, #15 Exhibit 338, #16 Exhibit 339, #17 Exhibit 340, #18 Exhibit 341, #19 Exhibit 342, #20 Exhibit 343) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2203 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 290, #2 Exhibit 291, #3 Exhibit 292, #4 Exhibit 293, #5 Exhibit 294, #6 Exhibit 298, #7 Exhibit 299, #8 Exhibit 300, #9 Exhibit 301, #10 Exhibit 302, #11 Exhibit 304, #12 Exhibit 306, #13 Exhibit 309, #14 Exhibit 310, #15 Exhibit 311, #16 Exhibit 312, #17 Exhibit 313, #18 Exhibit 314, #19 Exhibit 315, #20 Exhibit 317, #21 Exhibit 318, #22 Exhibit 319) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2202 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 270, #2 Exhibit 271, #3 Exhibit 272, #4 Exhibit 274, #5 Exhibit 275, #6 Exhibit 276, #7 Exhibit 277, #8 Exhibit 278, #9 Exhibit 279, #10 Exhibit 280, #11 Exhibit 281, #12 Exhibit 282, #13 Exhibit 283, #14 Exhibit 284, #15 Exhibit 285, #16 Exhibit 286, #17 Exhibit 287, #18 Exhibit 288, #19 Exhibit 289) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2201 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 250, #2 Exhibit 251, #3 Exhibit 252, #4 Exhibit 253, #5 Exhibit 254, #6 Exhibit 255, #7 Exhibit 256, #8 Exhibit 257, #9 Exhibit 258, #10 Exhibit 259, #11 Exhibit 260, #12 Exhibit 261, #13 Exhibit 262, #14 Exhibit 263, #15 Exhibit 264, #16 Exhibit 265, #17 Exhibit 266, #18 Exhibit 267, #19 Exhibit 268, #20 Exhibit 269) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2200 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 227, #2 Exhibit 228, #3 Exhibit 229, #4 Exhibit 230, #5 Exhibit 231, #6 Exhibit 233, #7 Exhibit 234, #8 Exhibit 235, #9 Exhibit 236, #10 Exhibit 237, #11 Exhibit 239, #12 Exhibit 240, #13 Exhibit 241, #14 Exhibit 242, #15 Exhibit 243, #16 Exhibit 244, #17 Exhibit 245, #18 Exhibit 246, #19 Exhibit 247, #20 Exhibit 248, #21 Exhibit 249) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2199 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 207, #2 Exhibit 208, #3 Exhibit 209, #4 Exhibit 210, #5 Exhibit 211, #6 Exhibit 212, #7 Exhibit 213, #8 Exhibit 214, #9 Exhibit 215, #10 Exhibit 216, #11 Exhibit 217, #12 Exhibit 218, #13 Exhibit 219, #14 Exhibit 220, #15 Exhibit 221, #16 Exhibit 222, #17 Exhibit 223, #18 Exhibit 224, #19 Exhibit 225, #20 Exhibit 226) (Burns, Warren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2198 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 185, #2 Exhibit 186, #3 Exhibit 187, #4 Exhibit 188, #5 Exhibit 190, #6 Exhibit 191, #7 Exhibit 192, #8 Exhibit 193, #9 Exhibit 194, #10 Exhibit 196, #11 Exhibit 197, #12 Exhibit 198, #13 Exhibit 199, #14 Exhibit 200, #15 Exhibit 201, #16 Exhibit 202, #17 Exhibit 203, #18 Exhibit 204, #19 Exhibit 205, #20 Exhibit 206) (Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2197 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 164, #2 Ex. 166, #3 Ex. 167, #4 Ex. 168, #5 Ex. 169, #6 Ex. 170, #7 Ex. 171, #8 Ex. 172, #9 Ex. 173, #10 Ex. 174, #11 Ex. 175, #12 Ex. 176, #13 Ex. 177, #14 Ex. 178, #15 Ex. 179, #16 Ex. 180, #17 Ex. 181, #18 Ex. 182, #19 Ex. 183, #20 Ex. 184)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2196 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 143, #2 Ex. 144, #3 Ex. 145, #4 Ex. 146, #5 Ex. 147, #6 Ex. 148, #7 Ex. 149, #8 Ex. 151, #9 Ex. 152, #10 Ex. 153, #11 Ex. 154, #12 Ex. 155, #13 Ex. 156, #14 Ex. 157, #15 Ex. 158, #16 Ex. 159, #17 Ex. 160, #18 Ex. 161, #19 Ex. 162, #20 Ex. 163)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2195 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 121, #2 Ex. 122, #3 Ex. 123, #4 Ex. 124, #5 Ex. 125, #6 Ex. 126, #7 Ex. 127, #8 Ex. 128, #9 Ex. 129, #10 Ex. 130, #11 Ex. 131, #12 Ex. 132, #13 Ex. 133, #14 Ex. 134, #15 Ex. 137, #16 Ex. 138, #17 Ex. 139, #18 Ex. 140, #19 Ex. 141, #20 Ex. 142)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2194 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 101, #2 Ex. 102, #3 Ex. 103, #4 Ex. 104, #5 Ex. 105, #6 Ex. 106, #7 Ex. 107, #8 Ex. 108, #9 Ex. 109, #10 Ex. 110, #11 Ex. 111, #12 Ex. 112, #13 Ex. 113, #14 Ex. 115, #15 Ex. 116, #16 Ex. 117, #17 Ex. 118, #18 Ex. 119, #19 Ex. 120)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2193 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 82, #2 Ex. 83, #3 Ex. 84, #4 Ex. 85, #5 Ex. 86, #6 Ex. 87, #7 Ex. 88, #8 Ex. 89, #9 Ex. 90, #10 Ex. 91, #11 Ex. 92, #12 Ex. 93, #13 Ex. 94, #14 Ex. 95, #15 Ex. 96, #16 Ex. 97, #17 Ex. 98, #18 Ex. 99, #19 Ex. 100)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2192 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 50, #2 Ex. 51, #3 Ex. 52, #4 Ex. 53, #5 Ex. 54, #6 Ex. 55, #7 Ex. 56, #8 Ex. 57, #9 Ex. 58, #10 Ex. 59, #11 Ex. 60, #12 Ex. 63, #13 Ex. 64, #14 Ex. 65, #15 Ex. 66, #16 Ex. 67, #17 Ex. 68, #18 Ex. 69, #19 Ex. 70, #20 Ex. 71, #21 Ex. 72, #22 Ex. 73, #23 Ex. 74, #24 Ex. 75, #25 Ex. 76, #26 Ex. 77, #27 Ex. 78, #28 Ex. 79, #29 Ex. 80, #30 Ex. 81)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2191 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Ex. 23, #2 Ex. 24, #3 Ex. 25, #4 Ex. 26, #5 Ex. 27, #6 Ex. 28, #7 Ex. 30, #8 Ex. 31, #9 Ex. 33, #10 Ex. 34, #11 Ex. 36, #12 Ex. 37, #13 Ex. 39, #14 Ex. 40, #15 Ex. 44, #16 Ex. 45, #17 Ex. 46, #18 Ex. 47, #19 Ex. 48, #20 Ex. 49)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2190 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Warren T. Burns, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Ex. 2, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 10, #10 Ex. 11, #11 Ex. 12, #12 Ex. 13, #13 Ex. 14, #14 Ex. 15, #15 Ex. 16, #16 Ex. 17, #17 Ex. 18, #18 Ex. 19, #19 Ex. 21, #20 Ex. 22)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2189 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2187 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge and Certain Associated Exhibits by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs PUBLIC EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 7 Excerpt Proving Antitrust Damages, #2 Ex. 9 Excerpt Using Econometrics, #3 Ex. 10 Excerpt Introductory Econometrics, #4 Ex. 13 Excerpt Econometrics, #5 Ex. 17 Excerpt Tying, Bundling, and Loyalty/Requirement Rebates, #6 Ex. 18 Exerpt Nonlinear Pricing and Exclusion: II, #7 Ex. 21 Decl. of Warren T. Burns)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2188 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent, #2 Declaration of Stuart A. Davison in support thereof, #3 Ex. 1 01.22.20 Clemens Dep_excerpt, #4 Ex. 2 07.02.20 Torrance Dep_excerpt, #5 Ex. 3 Torrance Dep Ex 10)(Davidson, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2187 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge and Certain Associated Exhibits by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Expert Witness Einer Elhauge, #2 Decl. of Warren T Burns, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Ex. 1 Expert Report Elhauge, #5 Ex. 2 Reply Expert Report Elhauge, #6 Ex. 3 Expert Report Elhauge iso Class Certification, #7 Ex. 4 Merits Daubert Decl. Elhauge, #8 Ex. 5 Excerpt Depo. Elhauge, #9 Ex. 6 Expert Report Orzag, #10 Ex. 8 Expert Report Willig, #11 Ex. 11 Expert Report Johnson, #12 Ex. 12 Decl. Willig, #13 Ex. 14 bates numbered doc, #14 Ex. 15 bates numbered doc, #15 Ex. 16 bates numbered doc, #16 Ex. 19 Decl. of Dr. Johnson, #17 Ex. 20 Excerpt Depo Works)(Burns, Warren)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Levin, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2185 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert (ECF No. 2151) by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert, #2 Declaration of Stuart A. Davison in support thereof, #3 Ex. 1 10.31.19 Torrance Merits Report, #4 Ex. 2 11.26.19 Torrance Dep_excerpt, #5 Ex. 3 02.07.20 Torrance Reply Report)(Davidson, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2184 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of James Bruno by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of James Bruno, #2 Declaration of Lynn Sarko in support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Expert Report of James Bruno, #4 Exhibit B - Excerpts Bruno 06/30/20 Deposition, #5 Exhibit C - Def Expert Report Steven M. Weisman, Ph.D., #6 Exhibit D - Excerpts Weisman 01/24/20 Deposition, #7 Exhibit E - Expert Report Carl Peck, M.D., #8 Exhibit F - bates numbered document, #9 Exhibit G - bates numbered document, #10 Exhibit H - bates numbered document)(Sarko, Lynn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2183 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Meredith Rosenthal and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Opp. to Defs' Mot. to Exclude Opinions of Prof. Rosenthal, #2 Decl. of M. Tripolitsiotis in Opp. to Defs' Mot. to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Prof. Meredith Rosenthal, #3 Ex. A 2019-10-31 Merits Expert Report of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal, #4 Ex. B 2020.02.07 Rosenthal_EpiPen_Merits_Rebuttal, #5 Ex. C Johnson Class Cert Report, #6 Ex. D Rosenthal Merits Dep, #7 Ex. E Rosenthal Class Cert Dep, #8 Ex. F 2020-02-12 Elhauge EpiPen Merits Reply, #9 Ex. G MYEP01362752, #10 Ex. H Johnson Merits Dep)(Sharp, Rex)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2182 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude The Expert Opinions of Dr. Carl Peck and Related Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Defs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Peck- near final, #2 M. Tripolitsiotis Declaration OPP Peck Daubert Motion, #3 Ex. A - 2019-10-31 Merits Expert Report of Dr. Carl Peck, #4 Ex. B - 2020.02.07 Carl Peck Merits Rebuttal Report, #5 Ex. C - 2019_12_23_Expert Report of Steven M. Weisman, #6 Ex. D - Rebuttal Expert Report of James Bruno 020720, #7 Ex. E - DrCarlPeck_PDFTran.2, #8 Ex. F - In re EpiPen Marketing - 1-24-20 - Weisman - FINAL_FullSize, #9 Ex. G - Antares 2012 10K)(Sharp, Rex) Modified to correct title and link to motion on 8/17/2020 (gw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2181 NOTICE of Response Letter to Mylan regarding extension of EpiPen Supply Agreement by Mylan addressed to Judge Daniel D. Crabtree from Yehudah L. Buchweitz by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2180 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Daniel D. Crabtree from Philip A. Sechler, dated August 7, 2020, regarding extension of EpiPen Supply Agreement by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Redacted) (Sechler, Philip)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefs, or, alternatively, to Order Refiling in compliance with D. Kan. Rules 5.1(a) and 56.1 (Doc. #2170 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/28/2020. (gw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2178 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2170 MOTION to Strike #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment, #2153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Lit [Memorandum In Further Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefs, or, Alternatively, to Order Refiling in Compliance with D. Kan. Rules 5.1(a) and 56.1] (Davidson, Stuart)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting defendants' Motion to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits (Doc. #2154 ). The court allows defendants to file two separate Daubert motions seeking to exclude expert opinions offered by plaintiffs' expert Andrew Torrance on two topics -- i.e., the first motion asks the court to exclude Mr. Torrance's opinions about the chance of success in patent litigation (Doc. #2151 ), and the second motion asks the court to exclude Mr. Torrance's rebuttal opinions whether a proposed EAI device violates a specific patent (Doc. #2156 ). The court will consider each motion separately. Plaintiffs may file separate responses to each motion; each response separately is subject to the pages limitations established by the court's Order (Doc. #2062 ). And, defendants may file separate replies to each motion; each reply also is subject to the court's Order setting page limits on the Daubert briefing. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2176 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #2170 MOTION to Strike #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment, #2153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Lit - Mylan Defendants and Pfizer Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fries, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2175 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #2154 MOTION to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits with Memorandum in Support (Rebein, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2174 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER - The court orders defendants to file a response to the consumer class plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Doc. #2170 ) on or before July 22, 2020. Defendants' response must not exceed 8 pages. The consumer class plaintiffs may file a Reply on or before July 24, 2020. Any Reply must not exceed 5 pages. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2173 ORDER denying without prejudice #2132 Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Provisionally File Under Seal Their Motion To Strike In Part The Testimony Of Dr. John H. Johnson IV And Related Documents; #2137 Defendants' Motion For Leave To Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents In Support Of Their Daubert Motion Briefing; #2142 Defendants' Motion For Leave To Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents In Support Of Summary Judgment; #2149 Pfizer's Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents in Support of Pfizer Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; #2153 Defendants' Motion For Leave To Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents In Support Of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert; #2158 Defendants' Motion For Leave To Preliminarily File Under Seal Documents In Support Of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/20/2020. (ts)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2172 ORDER ADOPTING SEALING PROCESS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT BRIEFING. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/20/2020. (ts)
July 20, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2170 MOTION to Strike #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment, #2153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Lit. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2171 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2154 MOTION to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits with Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. A Excerpts from July 2, 2020 Dep. Tr. of Prof. Andrew W. Torrance) (Davidson, Stuart)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2170 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Strike #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment, #2153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert, #2137 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, #2149 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Pfizer Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2158 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent [Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefs, or, Alternatively, to Order Refiling in Compliance with D. Kan. Rules 5.1(a) and 56.1] by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. A Email from Carrie DeLone, #3 Ex. B Page 108 double-spaced, #4 Ex. C CafeX Commcn's, Inc. v. Amazon Web Servs., Inc., No. 17-cv-01349 (VM) ECF No. 43 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 30, 2017)) (Davidson, Stuart)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2169 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Dispositive motions due 07/15/2020. Responses to dispositive motions and Daubert motions challenging admissibility of expert testimony due 08/17/2020. Reply briefs in support of dispositive motions and Daubert motions challenging admissibility of expert due 09/15/2020. Trial and In Limine Conference scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 9:00 AM. Estimated time of trial is 5-7 weeks. See Order for additional deadlines and settings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 07/17/2020. (gw)
July 17, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2151 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert; #2156 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent; #2134 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Professor Meredith Rosenthal; #2133 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Einer Elhauge; #2135 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Carl Peck; #2136 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness James Bruno. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2168 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER - The court orders the class plaintiffs to file a response to defendants' Motion to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits (Doc. #2154 ) on or before July 20, 2020. The class plaintiffs' response must not exceed 4 pages. Defendants may file a Reply on or before July 22, 2020. Any Reply must not exceed 3 pages. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
July 16, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2154 MOTION to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits with Memorandum in Support. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2167 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 99, #2 Ex. 100, #3 Ex. 105, #4 Ex. 107, #5 Ex. 110, #6 Ex. 111, #7 Ex. 112, #8 Ex. 155, #9 Ex. 172, #10 Ex. 173, #11 Ex. 223)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2166 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 70, #2 Ex. 71, #3 Ex. 72, #4 Ex. 74, #5 Ex. 77, #6 Ex. 78, #7 Ex. 79, #8 Ex. 80, #9 Ex. 81, #10 Ex. 83, #11 Ex. 84, #12 Ex. 85, #13 Ex. 88, #14 Ex. 89, #15 Ex. 93, #16 Ex. 94, #17 Ex. 96)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2165 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 003, #2 Ex. 004, #3 Ex. 006, #4 Ex. 014, #5 Ex. 015, #6 Ex. 017, #7 Ex. 018, #8 Ex. 019, #9 Ex. 024, #10 Ex. 034, #11 Ex. 036, #12 Ex. 038, #13 Ex. 039, #14 Ex. 040, #15 Ex. 041, #16 Ex. 042, #17 Ex. 043, #18 Ex. 044, #19 Ex. 045, #20 Ex. 046, #21 Ex. 047, #22 Ex. 048, #23 Ex. 054, #24 Ex. 066, #25 Ex. 068)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2164 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 322, #2 Ex. 323, #3 Ex. 324, #4 Ex. 325, #5 Ex. 326, #6 Ex. 327, #7 Ex. 328, #8 Ex. 329, #9 Ex. 330, #10 Ex. 331)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2163 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 304, #2 Ex. 305, #3 Ex. 306, #4 Ex. 307, #5 Ex. 308, #6 Ex. 309, #7 Ex. 310, #8 Ex. 311, #9 Ex. 312, #10 Ex. 313, #11 Ex. 314, #12 Ex. 315, #13 Ex. 316, #14 Ex. 317, #15 Ex. 318, #16 Ex. 319, #17 Ex. 320, #18 Ex. 321)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2162 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 289, #2 Ex. 290, #3 Ex. 291, #4 Ex. 292, #5 Ex. 293, #6 Ex. 294, #7 Ex. 295, #8 Ex. 296, #9 Ex. 297, #10 Ex. 298, #11 Ex. 299, #12 Ex. 300, #13 Ex. 301, #14 Ex. 302, #15 Ex. 303)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2161 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 274, #2 Ex. 275, #3 Ex. 276, #4 Ex. 277, #5 Ex. 278, #6 Ex. 279, #7 Ex. 280, #8 Ex. 281, #9 Ex. 282, #10 Ex. 283, #11 Ex. 284, #12 Ex. 285, #13 Ex. 286, #14 Ex. 287, #15 Ex. 288)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2160 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 257, #2 Ex. 258, #3 Ex. 260, #4 Ex. 261, #5 Ex. 262, #6 Ex. 263, #7 Ex. 264, #8 Ex. 265, #9 Ex. 266, #10 Ex. 267, #11 Ex. 268, #12 Ex. 269, #13 Ex. 270, #14 Ex. 271, #15 Ex. 272, #16 Ex. 273)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2159 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 243, #2 Ex. 244, #3 Ex. 245, #4 Ex. 246, #5 Ex. 247, #6 Ex. 248, #7 Ex. 249, #8 Ex. 250, #9 Ex. 251, #10 Ex. 252, #11 Ex. 253, #12 Ex. 254, #13 Ex. 255, #14 Ex. 256)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2158 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2157 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 225, #2 Ex. 226, #3 Ex. 227, #4 Ex. 228, #5 Ex. 229, #6 Ex. 230, #7 Ex. 231, #8 Ex. 232, #9 Ex. 233, #10 Ex. 234, #11 Ex. 235, #12 Ex. 236, #13 Ex. 237, #14 Ex. 238, #15 Ex. 239, #16 Ex. 240, #17 Ex. 241, #18 Ex. 242)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2156 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Report Regarding the '827 Patent by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kathryn Swisher in Support, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2155 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 215, #2 Ex. 216, #3 Ex. 217, #4 Ex. 218, #5 Ex. 219, #6 Ex. 220, #7 Ex. 221, #8 Ex. 222, #9 Ex. 224)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2154 MOTION to Clarify Order Setting Page Limits with Memorandum in Support by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2153 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2152 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 201, #2 Ex. 202, #3 Ex. 203, #4 Ex. 204, #5 Ex. 205, #6 Ex. 206, #7 Ex. 207, #8 Ex. 208, #9 Ex. 209, #10 Ex. 211, #11 Ex. 212, #12 Ex. 213, #13 Ex. 214)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2151 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Patent Litigation Expert by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Edward Thrasher in Support, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2150 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 174, #2 Ex. 175, #3 Ex. 176, #4 Ex. 177, #5 Ex. 178, #6 Ex. 179, #7 Ex. 180, #8 Ex. 181, #9 Ex. 182, #10 Ex. 183, #11 Ex. 184, #12 Ex. 185, #13 Ex. 186, #14 Ex. 187, #15 Ex. 188, #16 Ex. 189, #17 Ex. 190, #18 Ex. 191, #19 Ex. 192, #20 Ex. 193, #21 Ex. 194, #22 Ex. 195, #23 Ex. 196, #24 Ex. 197, #25 Ex. 198, #26 Ex. 199, #27 Ex. 200)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2149 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Pfizer Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2148 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Raj Gandesha in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2147 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 156, #2 Ex. 157, #3 Ex. 158, #4 Ex. 159, #5 Ex. 160, #6 Ex. 161, #7 Ex. 162, #8 Ex. 163, #9 Ex. 164, #10 Ex. 165, #11 Ex. 166, #12 Ex. 167, #13 Ex. 168, #14 Ex. 169, #15 Ex. 170, #16 Ex. 171)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2146 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 134, #2 Ex. 135, #3 Ex. 136, #4 Ex. 137, #5 Ex. 138, #6 Ex. 139, #7 Ex. 140, #8 Ex. 141, #9 Ex. 142, #10 Ex. 143, #11 Ex. 144, #12 Ex. 145, #13 Ex. 146, #14 Ex. 147, #15 Ex. 148, #16 Ex. 149, #17 Ex. 150, #18 Ex. 151, #19 Ex. 152, #20 Ex. 153, #21 Ex. 154)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2145 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 109, #2 Ex. 113, #3 Ex. 114, #4 Ex. 115, #5 Ex. 116, #6 Ex. 117, #7 Ex. 118, #8 Ex. 119, #9 Ex. 120, #10 Ex. 121, #11 Ex. 122, #12 Ex. 123, #13 Ex. 124, #14 Ex. 125, #15 Ex. 126, #16 Ex. 127, #17 Ex. 128, #18 Ex. 129, #19 Ex. 130, #20 Ex. 131, #21 Ex. 132, #22 Ex. 133)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2144 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 067, #2 Ex. 069, #3 Ex. 073, #4 Ex. 075, #5 Ex. 076, #6 Ex. 082, #7 Ex. 086, #8 Ex. 087, #9 Ex. 090, #10 Ex. 091, #11 Ex. 092, #12 Ex. 095, #13 Ex. 097, #14 Ex. 098, #15 Ex. 101, #16 Ex. 102, #17 Ex. 103, #18 Ex. 104, #19 Ex. 106, #20 Ex. 108)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2143 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 016, #2 Ex. 020, #3 Ex. 021, #4 Ex. 022, #5 Ex. 023, #6 Ex. 025, #7 Ex. 026, #8 Ex. 027, #9 Ex. 028, #10 Ex. 029, #11 Ex. 030, #12 Ex. 031, #13 Ex. 032, #14 Ex. 033, #15 Ex. 035, #16 Ex. 037, #17 Ex. 049, #18 Ex. 050, #19 Ex. 051, #20 Ex. 052, #21 Ex. 053, #22 Ex. 055, #23 Ex. 056, #24 Ex. 057, #25 Ex. 058, #26 Ex. 059, #27 Ex. 060, #28 Ex. 061, #29 Ex. 062, #30 Ex. 063, #31 Ex. 064, #32 Ex. 065)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2142 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Defendants' List of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Ex. 001, #4 Ex. 002, #5 Ex. 005, #6 Ex. 007, #7 Ex. 008, #8 Ex. 009, #9 Ex. 010, #10 Ex. 011, #11 Ex. 012, #12 Ex. 013)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2140 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2135 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Carl Peck, #2133 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Einer Elhauge, #2136 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness James Bruno, #2134 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 335, #2 Ex. 344, #3 Ex. 351, #4 Ex. 355)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2139 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2137 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 347, #2 Ex. 348, #3 Ex. 349, #4 Ex. 350, #5 Ex. 352, #6 Ex. 353, #7 Ex. 354, #8 Ex. 356, #9 Ex. 357, #10 Ex. 358, #11 Ex. 359, #12 Ex. 360, #13 Ex. 361, #14 Ex. 362, #15 Ex. 363, #16 Ex. 364, #17 Ex. 365, #18 Ex. 366, #19 Ex. 367, #20 Ex. 368, #21 Ex. 369, #22 Ex. 370, #23 Ex. 371, #24 Ex. 372, #25 Ex. 373)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2138 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #2137 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 334, #2 Ex. 336, #3 Ex. 337, #4 Ex. 338, #5 Ex. 339, #6 Ex. 340, #7 Ex. 341, #8 Ex. 342, #9 Ex. 343, #10 Ex. 345)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2137 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Einer Elhauge, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Carl Peck, #4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of James Bruno)(Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2136 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness James Bruno by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Foster, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2135 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Carl Peck by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Foster, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2134 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2133 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Einer Elhauge by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Levin, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2132 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike in Part the Testimony of Dr. John H. Johnson IV by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Strike in Part Testimony of Dr. Johnson, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike in Part Testimony of Dr. Johnson, #3 Declaration of Matthew Tripolotsiotis, #4 Exh A, #5 Exh B, #6 Exh C, #7 Exh D, #8 Exh E, #9 Exh F, #10 Exh G, #11 Exh H, #12 Exh I, #13 Exh J, #14 Exh K, #15 Exh L, #16 Exh M, #17 Exh N, #18 Exh O, #19 Exh P, #20 Exh Q, #21 Exh R, #22 Exh S, #23 Exh T, #24 Exh U, #25 Exh V, #26 Exh W, #27 Exh X)(Sarko, Lynn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2131 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2128 MOTION to Adopt Sealing Protocol for Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Greg Wright)(Sharp, Rex)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2130 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Lockwood on behalf of Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP (Lockwood, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2129 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Adopt Sealing Protocol for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sharp, Rex)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2128 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Adopt Sealing Protocol for Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levin, Adam)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2127 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Diplomat Pharmacy, Inc. on 06/19/2020 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2126 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David Victorson on behalf of Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Victorson, David)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2125 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christine A. Sifferman on behalf of Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Sifferman, Christine)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2124 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held July 1, 2020 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Stuart Davidson, Ryan Hudson, Brian Fries, Yehuda Buchweitz. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2020. (kg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2123 NOTICE of Class Plaintiffs' Formal Notice of Waivers Under Lexecon by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Davidson, Stuart)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2122 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE conducted by Zoom Video Conference held on 7/1/2020. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (mig)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2121 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher J. Cormier (Cormier, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2120 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jennifer Kan as to Carly Bowersock, Angie Nordstrum (Kan, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2119 STATUS REPORT Regarding Implementation of Class Notice Plan by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2118 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Daniel D. Crabtree from Philip A. Sechler, dated June 25, 2020, regarding Yehudah L. Buchweitz letter dated June 25, 2020 by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #2117 Notice (Other), (Sechler, Philip)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2117 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE of Letter to Judge Daniel D. Crabtree from Yehudah L. Buchweitz, dated June 25, 2020 regarding intercircuit assignment in connection with a suggestion of remand by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2116 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. on June 8, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2115 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Humana Pharmacy Solutions, Inc. on June 12, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2114 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon CVS Pharmacy, Inc. on June 10, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2113 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Cigna Home Delivery Pharmacy on June 15, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2112 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Caremark LLC on June 10, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2111 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL ON THE STEERING COMMITTEE granting #2105 Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Appoint Substitute Steering Committee Member. The court appoints Matthew S. Tripolitsiotis of Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP as a member of plaintiffs' Steering Committee to replace Damien Marshall who no longer appears in the case. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/24/2020. (mg)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2110 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon WalMart Inc. on 06/09/20 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2109 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. on 06/09/20 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2108 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Rite Aid Corporation on 06/09/20 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2107 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon The Kroger Co. on 06/10/20 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2106 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Albertsons Companies, Inc. on 06/09/20 by Personal Service. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 22, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2105 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Executive Committee Member for Class Plaintiffs. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2105 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Executive Committee Member for Class Plaintiffs by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counsel Bio)(Sharp, Rex)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2104 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Damien J. Marshall as to Carly Bowersock, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Angie Nordstrum (Marshall, Damien)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2103 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon OptumRx, Inc.[Corrected] on June 19, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2102 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) The Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 09:00 AM will be conducted by Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Non-case related participants can join the hearing by dialing into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and entering the ACCESS CODE 8354715#. (mig)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2101 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of James R. Bruno on June 30, 2020. (Foster, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2100 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Dr. Andrew W. Torrance on July 2, 2020. (Rebein, Joseph)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2099 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Humana Pharmacy Solutions, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2098 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Cigna Home Delivery Pharmacy by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2097 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Mitchell L. Herren as to OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Herren, Mitchell)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2096 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service of Supplemental Interrogatory Responses and Objections to Mylan by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Rex)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2095 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ursula A. Taylor (Taylor, Ursula)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2094 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2093 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Caremark LLC by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2092 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon IngenioRx, Inc. on June 5, 2020 by Personal Service. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2091 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party WalMart Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2090 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2089 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Rite Aid Corporation by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2088 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party The Kroger Co. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2087 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Diplomat Pharmacy, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2086 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Albertsons Companies, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2085 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2084 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. Robert P. Navarro on June 25, 2020. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2083 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Prime Therapeutics, LLC on June 4, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2082 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon OptumRx, Inc. on June 4, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2081 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Express Scripts Holding Company on June 4, 2020 by Electronic Mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2080 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Prime Therapeutics, LLC by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2079 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party OptumRx, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2078 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party IngenioRx, Inc. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2077 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Express Scripts Holding Company by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2076 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Zach Chaffee-McClure on behalf of King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2075 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing [NEW DATE]: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (mig)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2074 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2058 Motion for Order Implementing Stage One of Class Notice Plan. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 6/1/2020. (hw)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2073 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #2072 Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Order Deadline in Scheduling Order No. 12. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed Pretrial Order is extended to 6/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2072 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order No. 12 to Amend Pretrial Order Deadline by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Fries, Brian)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2071 ORDER of 10CCA denying petition for permission to appeal. (Appeal No. 20-603) (hw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2070 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Yuri Fuchs as to Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fuchs, Yuri)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2069 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2058 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage One of Class Notice Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A_Supplemental Declaration of Eric Schachter)(Davidson, Stuart)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2068 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re #2058 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage One of Class Notice Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q) (Levin, Adam)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2067 REDACTION to #2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, For Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E- Redacted, #3 Exhibit F- Redacted)(Levin, Adam)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2066 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (mig)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2065 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Joseph Alm as to Carly Bowersock, Angie Nordstrum (Loft, Duane)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2064 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REDACTED MOTION for Leave to File to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie (Redacted per Order ECF No. #2060 ) by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Burns, Warren) (Motion previously ruled on; See #2059 Memorandum and Order. (mg))
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2063 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #2040 Motion to Consolidate Cases (Gott v. Mylan N.V., et al, Case No.20-cv-2099). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/27/2020. (hw)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #2056 Joint Motion to Set Page Limits for Dispositive and Daubert Motion Briefing. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/24/2020. (hw)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2061 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER ruling on #2014 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Their Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Teva Employees; and #2021 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Teva Employees. The parties must follow the instructions the court has outlined in this Order for filing documents both publicly and under seal. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/23/2020. (ts)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2060 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER ruling on #2009 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; and #2023 Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Their Motion for Leave to Take Two Limited Depositions of Teva Employees. The parties must follow the instructions the court has outlined in this Order for filing documents both publicly and under seal. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/23/2020. (ts)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #2008 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie ; and finding as moot #2011 Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and William Marth's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/22/2020. (ts)
April 22, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2058 MOTION for Order Implementing Stage One of Class Notice Plan. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2058 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for Order Implementing Stage One of Class Notice Plan by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A_Declaration of Eric Schachter, #3 Exhibit B_Declaration of Gretchen Freeman Cappio) (Davidson, Stuart).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2057 RESPONSE Class Plaintiffs' Response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiff KPH's Motion for Order of Coordination With MDL No. 2785 by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
April 16, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2056 Joint MOTION to Set Page Limits for Dispositive and Daubert Motion Briefing re #2044 Scheduling Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2056 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION to Set Page Limits for Dispositive and Daubert Motion Briefing re #2044 Scheduling Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam) Modified on 4/16/2020 to remove referral (gw).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2055 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defendants' #2042 Motion for a Stay Pending Resolution of Petition Requesting Permission to Appeal and Any Resulting Appeal. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/15/2020. (mg)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2054 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #2042 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Petition Requesting Permission to Appeal and Any Resulting Appeal. (Levin, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2053 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. Robert P. Navarro on June 25, 2020. (Davidson, Stuart)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2052 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Dr. Robert P. Navarro on April 3, 2020 by electronic mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2051 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2040 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Doc. 11- JPML Order, #2 Exhibit B- Doc. 22-Order) (Sharp, Rex)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2050 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by W. Greg Wright. (Wright, W.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2049 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Taylor P. Foye as to Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Foye, Taylor)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2048 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Stacy A. Burrows as to Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Burrows, Stacy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2047 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Rex A. Sharp. (Sharp, Rex)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2046 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #2042 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Petition Requesting Permission to Appeal and Any Resulting Appeal. (Burns, Warren)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2045 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #2040 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mylan and Pfizer Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Transfer and Consolidate the Gott Case to the EpiPen MDL filed in the Gott Case) (Fries, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2044 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --SCHEDULING ORDER No.12: Dispositive and Daubert motion deadline 4/16/2020. Response to Dispositive and Daubert motion due 5/15/2020. Reply to Dispositive and Daubert motion due by 6/15/2020. Trial set for 4/13/2021. Granting in part #2036 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. See order for additional information. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/20/2020. (hw)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2043 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2036 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Burns, Warren)
March 18, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2042 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Petition Requesting Permission to Appeal and Any Resulting Appeal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2042 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Petition Requesting Permission to Appeal and Any Resulting Appeal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2041 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re #2036 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levin, Adam)
March 17, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2040 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2040 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Gott v. Mylan N.V., et al, Case No.20-cv-2099) by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Rex)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2039 REPLY to #2022 Notice of Related Case - Jointly Submitted by the Mylan Defendants and the Pfizer Defendants - by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fries, Brian)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2038 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER - The court orders defendants to file a Response to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Scheduling Order (Doc. #2036 ) by 5:00 PM CDT on Wednesday, March 18. And it orders Class Plaintiffs to file a Reply, if any, by 5:00 PM CDT on Thursday, March 19. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
March 16, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2036 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2037 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Withdrawal of Notice of Subpoena for Deposition Testimony by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re #2015 Notice to Take Deposition of James R. Bruno. (Foster, David)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2036 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for Scheduling Order by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Burns, Warren)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2035 LETTER FROM 10CCA stating permission to appeal docketed. (Appeal No. 20-603) (hw)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2034 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE to #2022 Notice of Related Case. Class Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Related Case by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2033 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED DOCUMENT: Notice of The Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests For ECF Nos. 2017 and 2018 (Levin, Adam)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2032 RESPONSE to #2022 Notice of Related Case Response of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. to MDL Defendants' Notice of Related Action by Interested Party KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Cartmell, Thomas)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2031 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Tyler W. Hudson on behalf of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Hudson, Tyler)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2030 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Eric D. Barton on behalf of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Barton, Eric)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2029 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Cartmell, Thomas)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2028 ORDER re #2022 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 2:20-cv-02065-CM-TJJ - Jointly Submitted. The court thus directs the parties to the MDL and the KPH Healthcare Services case to follow the procedures recited in the order, as well as the court's local rule, when filing any responses or replies to the Notice of Related Action. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/10/2020. (gw)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2027 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- DOCKET ANNOTATION: An unsealed copy of #2017 Memorandum & Order and #2018 Memorandum & Order has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum & Order) (gw)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2026 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER The court directs the Clerk of the Court to unseal docket entry Nos. #2017 and #2018 . Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(gw)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2025 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2024 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal The Notice of The Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Mylan's request to seal a portion of the court's Memorandum and Order ruling the plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, as described in the "Notice of the Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests for ECF Nos. #2017 and #2018 " (Doc. 2024-1), is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Mylan's "Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Notice of the Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests for ECF Nos. #2017 and #2018 " (Doc. #2024 ) is granted. Mylan is granted leave to file the Notice under seal. Counsel for Mylan is directed to file the Notice on the CM/ECF docket with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's March 1, 2018 Order Denying Sealed Access (Doc. #299 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by separate docket entry, the court will order the Clerk of the Court to unseal, and make available to the public on the CM/ECF docket, Doc. #2017 and Doc. #2018 . Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/10/2020. (gw)
March 9, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #2024 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal The Notice of The Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests For ECF Nos. 2017 and 2018. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2024 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal The Notice of The Parties' Views on Proposed Sealing Requests For ECF Nos. 2017 and 2018 by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint Sealing Notice for Class Certification Order) (Levin, Adam)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2023 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Renewed - by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #3 Exhibit B) (Burns, Warren)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2022 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 2:20-cv-02065-CM-TJJ - Jointly Submitted by the Mylan Defendants and the Pfizer Defendants - by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fries, Brian)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2021 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Renewed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' #2014 Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Teva Employees by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (Levin, Adam)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2020 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #2008 Redacted MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie. (Burns, Warren)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2019 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF UNSEALING AND ORDER Regarding Memoranda and Orders (Docs. #2017 & #2018 ). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/27/2020. (mg)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2018 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- UNSEALED Pursuant to 2026 Text Order. SEALED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1353 Motion to Class Certification. The court certifies a nationwide RICO damages class and a state antitrust damages class under Rule 23(b)(3), as set forth in this Order. The court denies the motion in all other respects. Further, granting #1574 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply. The court orders defendants to file their proposed Sur-reply (Doc. 1574-1) as a separate docket entry. Also, the court orders plaintiffs to file their proposed Response to Defendants' Sur-reply (Doc. 1579-1) as a separate docket entry. Plaintiffs must submit a proposed plan for notice to the class members consistent with Rule 23(c)(2)(B) on or before March 31, 2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/27/2020. (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #1 Memorandum & Order - Unsealed Copy) (gw)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2017 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- UNSEALED Pursuant to 2026 Text Order. SEALED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #1584 Motion to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss; denying #1602 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal; granting in part and denying in part #1604 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge; denying #1847 Motion to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance; and denying #1852 Motion to Strike the Testimony of Professor James Hughes. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/27/2020. (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #1 Memorandum & Order - Unsealed Copy) (gw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2016 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE: The court intends to issue its rulings on plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 1353) and the parties' motions seeking to exclude expert opinions on class certification (Docs. 1584, 1602, 1604, 1847, 1852) on Thursday, February 27. The court will issue its rulings in two sealed filings. Also, the court will issue a publicly available Order that will summarize its rulings and provide a timeline for unsealing the two sealed filings, after the parties have an opportunity to review the filings and consider whether any portion of them contains confidential information that may qualify for continued sealing. (mig)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2015 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of James R. Bruno on March 18, 2020. (Foster, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2014 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Employees of Non- Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Depose Two Former and Present Employees of Non- Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (Levin, Adam)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2013 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re #2008 Redacted MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie (Redacted). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Levin, Adam)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2012 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Withdrawal of Notice of Subpoena for Deposition Testimony by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #1965 Notice to Take Deposition of Jay M. Portnoy. (Levin, Adam)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2011 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Miscellaneous Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. re: #2008 Redacted MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie; and MOTION for Protective Order. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q)(Holding, Christopher) (Modified on 2/18/2020 to reflect this is also a Motion for Protective Order. (mg))
February 10, 2020 Filing 2010 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Merits Rebuttal Expert Disclosures and Rebuttal Merits Expert Reports by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2009 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie and Exhibit B by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie, #2 Exhibit B)(Burns, Warren)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2008 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Redacted MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Depositions of Two Former and Present Employees of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - William Marth and Staci Julie by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Arthur Shingler, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Burns, Warren)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2007 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. Robert P. Navarro on April 15, 2020. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2006 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE to #2005 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Sechler, Philip)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2005 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) #1673 filed by Mylan Specialty, LP, Defendant Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pfizer Inc. Earnings Call Transcript January 28, 2020) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2004 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Rancour on behalf of Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Rancour, Kimberly)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2003 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 11: The court vacates (1) the February 21, 2020 deadline for submitting the proposed Pretrial Order; and (2) the March 10, 2020 Final Pretrial Conference established by Scheduling Order No. 9 (Doc. #1832 ). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 01/29/2020. (mg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2002 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Christopher D. Edelman as to Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Edelman, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2001 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Withdrawal of Notice of Deposition by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #1994 Notice to Take Deposition of Bill Marth. (Burns, Warren)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2000 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE to #1998 Notice of Supplemental Authority, by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Sechler, Philip)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1999 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Felicia Craick on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Craick, Felicia)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1998 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) #1673 filed by Mylan Specialty, LP, Defendant Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC v. Surescripts Decision)(Hochstadt, Eric)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1997 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stacy A. Burrows on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Burrows, Stacy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1996 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Charles E. Clemens on January 22, 2020. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1995 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. Robert D. Willig on February 4, 2020. (Burns, Warren)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1994 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Bill Marth on February 5, 2020. (Burns, Warren)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1993 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Foye on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Foye, Taylor)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1992 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gregory M. Bentz on behalf of Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Bentz, Gregory)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1991 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Charles A. Loughlin on behalf of Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Loughlin, Charles)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1990 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Brian Cumberland on January 30, 2020. (Sharp, Rex)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1989 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Joshua Parks on January 31, 2020. (Sharp, Rex)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1988 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Michael S. Blaiss, M.D. on January 28, 2020. (Kan, Jennifer)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1987 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Dr. Robert P. Navarro on January 9, 2020 by electronic mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1986 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of taking deposition of Dr. Robert P. Navarro on April 1, 2020 by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1985 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Charles E. Clemens on January 08, 2020 by electronic mail. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1984 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Charles E. Clemens on January 22, 2020. (Davidson, Stuart)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1983 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. John H. Johnson, IV on January 28, 2020. (Tripolitsiotis, Matthew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1982 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Dr. Steven M. Weisman on January 24, 2020. (Sarko, Lynn)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1981 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Rex A. Sharp. (Sharp, Rex)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1980 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jonathan M. Orszag on January 23, 2020. (Burns, Warren)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1979 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of David Folsom on January 14, 2020. (Burns, Warren)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1978 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan Defendants' Rule 26 Expert Disclosures and Expert Reports by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1977 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pfizer Defendants' Rule 26 Expert Disclosures by King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rebein, Joseph)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1976 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --SEALED EXHIBIT (2) in Support of #1975 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's #1909 Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission. (Foster, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1975 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of) #1909 Mylan's Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Foster, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1974 ORDER granting #1973 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Plaintiffs to Move to Compel Regarding Pfizer's Final Privilege Log. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, to and including January 15, 2020, in which to file a motion to compel related to the Pfizer Defendants' privilege log. The Court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1973 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel regarding Pfizer's Final Privilege Log by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Klevorn, Amanda)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1972 ***Please disregard. This is a refiling of #1904 that was ruled on in ECF #1946 as directed by ECF #1971 per chambers instruction.*** CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Amended MOTION to Compel Mylan's Responses to Tenth Set of Requests for Productions to Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Redacted 2, #3 Exhibit - Redacted 3)(Sharp, Rex) Modified on 12/17/2019. (gw)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1971 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1908 Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; and granting #1944 Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Reply Under Seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must follow the instructions that the court has outlined in this Order for filing documents publicly. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/12/2019. (ts)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER ruling on #1910 Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Their Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission; and #1923 The Mylan Defendants' Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Mylan's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must follow the instructions that the court has outlined in this Order for filing documents both publicly and under seal. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/12/2019. (ts)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1969 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER finding as moot #1967 Motion to Substitute Attorney. In light of the Withdrawal of Counsel (ECF No. 1968) which complies with D. Kan. Rule 83.5.5(c), this motion is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1968 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Archie I. Grubb, II and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by James Bringhurst Eubank on behalf of Kenneth Evans. (Eubank, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1967 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Substitute Attorney James B. Eubank in place of Archie I. Grubb, II by Plaintiff Kenneth Evans. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Eubank, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1966 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rosemary Medellin Rivas. (Rivas, Rosemary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1965 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- (WITHDRAWN: See #2012 Notice of Withdrawal.) NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Jay M. Portnoy on February 21, 2020. (Levin, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1964 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal on February 21, 2020. (Levin, Adam)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1963 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Einer Elhauge on December 5, 2019. (Levin, Adam)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1962 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Shawn Fox on December 3, 2019. (Levin, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1961 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena for Deposition Testimony to Dr. Andrew W. Torrance by King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rebein, Joseph)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1960 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 10: Granting #1958 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 9. Scheduling Order amends the merits expert disclosure deadlines for defendants' and rebuttal experts, and amends the deadline for completion of all expert discovery previously established by #1832 Scheduling Order No. 9. All other Scheduling Order No. 9 deadlines remain. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/18/2019. (ts)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1959 ORDER granting #1957 Unopposed Motion to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Plaintiffs to Move to Compel Regarding Pfizer's Final Privilege Log. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including December 16, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to the Pfizer Defendants' privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1958 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order No. 9 by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Fries, Brian)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1957 Unopposed MOTION for to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel regarding Pfizer's Final Privilege Log by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Klevorn, Amanda)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1956 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch by Heather Bresch. (Levin, Adam)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1955 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. of taking deposition of Dr. Carl Peck on November 21, 2019. (Foster, David)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1954 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE to #1951 Notice of Supplemental Authority re: Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 1673] and Mylan's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 1883] by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Sechler, Philip)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1953 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Expert Disclosures and Merits Expert Reports by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1952 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #1909 Mylan's Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/31/2019. (ts)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1951 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) #1673 filed by Mylan Specialty, LP, Defendant Mylan, Inc. [Notice also relates to Mylan's August 30, 2019 Reply Brief (ECF No. 1883)] (Hochstadt, Eric)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1949 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including November 1, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to their First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch. The Court notes the parties' representation that they will seek no further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1949 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Second Joint MOTION for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Sarko, Lynn)
October 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1947 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Replies in Support of Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions, #1948 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Mylan's August 30 Summary Judgment and Daubert Reply Briefs. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1948 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Mylan's August 30 Summary Judgment and Daubert Reply Briefs by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Ex. M-001, #3 Ex. M-002, #4 Ex. M-003, #5 Ex. M-004, #6 Ex. M-005, #7 Ex. M-006, #8 Ex. M-007, #9 Ex. M-008, #10 Ex. M-009) (Buchweitz, Yehudah) Motion referral removed on 10/24/2019 (gw).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1947 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Replies in Support of Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. A-1, #3 Ex. A-2, #4 Ex. A-3, #5 Ex. A-4, #6 Ex. A-5, #7 Ex. A-6, #8 Ex. A-7, #9 Ex. A-8, #10 Ex. A-9, #11 Ex. A-10, #12 Ex. A-11, #13 Ex. A-12, #14 Ex. A-13, #15 Ex. A-14, #16 Ex. A-15, #17 Ex. A-16, #18 Ex. A-17, #19 Ex. A-18, #20 Ex. A-19, #21 Ex. A-20, #22 Ex. A-21, #23 Ex. A-22, #24 Ex. A-23, #25 Ex. B, #26 Ex. B-1, #27 Ex. B-2, #28 Ex. B-3, #29 Ex. B-4, #30 Ex. B-5, #31 Ex. B-6, #32 Ex. B-7, #33 Ex. B-8, #34 Ex. B-9, #35 Ex. C) (Sechler, Philip) Motion referral removed on 10/24/2019 (gw).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1946 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1904 Class Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants. The motion is denied with respect to Mylan's responses and objections to RFP No. 10, and granted with respect to Mylan's responses and objections to RFP No. 13. Mylan shall produce responsive documents within ten (10) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/23/2019. (ts)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1945 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1909 MOTION to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Foster, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1944 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion to Compel Tenth Set of RFPs to Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Reply)(Sharp, Rex)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1943 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1904 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants. (Sharp, Rex) (Modified on 10/15/2019 to correct the motion association to reflect this Reply is regarding #1904 . (mg))
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1942 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1941 Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including October 25, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to their First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1935 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Mylan's Memoranda in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Mylan's Expert Reports. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
October 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1937 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Information Cited in Sanofi's June 28 Briefs and Expert Reports; #1936 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Oppositions to Sanofi's Motion for Summary Judgment and Sanofi's Daubert Motions; #1938 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Sanofi's Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morto. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(ts)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1941 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Sarko, Lynn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1940 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1938 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Sanofi's Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morto by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Ex. M-101) (Attachments: #1 Ex. M-102, #2 Ex. M-103, #3 Ex. M-104, #4 Ex. M-105, #5 Ex M-106, #6 Ex. M-107, #7 Ex. M-108, #8 Ex. M-109, #9 Ex. M-110, #10 Ex. M-111, #11 Ex. M-112, #12 Ex. M-113, #13 Ex. M-114, #14 Ex. M-115, #15 Ex. M-116, #16 Ex. M-117, #17 Ex. M-118, #18 Ex. M-119, #19 Ex. M-120, #20 Ex. M-121, #21 Ex. M-122, #22 Ex. M-123, #23 Ex. M-124, #24 Ex. M-125, #25 Ex. M-126, #26 Ex. M-127, #27 Ex. M-128, #28 Ex. M-129, #29 Ex. M-130, #30 Ex. M-131, #31 Ex. M-132, #32 Ex. M-133, #33 Ex. M-134, #34 Ex. M-135, #35 Ex. M-136, #36 Ex. M-137, #37 Ex. M-138, #38 Ex. M-139, #39 Ex. M-140, #40 Ex. M-141, #41 Ex. M-142, #42 Ex. M-143, #43 Ex. M-144, #44 Ex. M-145, #45 Ex. M-146, #46 Ex. M-147, #47 Ex. M-148, #48 Ex. M-149, #49 Ex. M-150, #50 Ex. M-151, #51 Ex. M-152, #52 Ex. M-153, #53 Ex. M-154, #54 Ex. M-155, #55 Ex. M-156, #56 Ex. M-157, #57 Ex. M-158, #58 Ex. M-159, #59 Ex. M-160, #60 Ex. M-161, #61 Ex. M-162, #62 Ex. M-163, #63 Ex. M-164, #64 Ex. M-165, #65 Ex. M-166, #66 Ex. M-167, #67 Ex. M-168, #68 Ex. M-169, #69 Ex. M-170, #70 Ex. M-171, #71 Ex. M-172, #72 Ex. M-173, #73 Ex. M-174, #74 Ex. M-175, #75 Ex. M-176, #76 Ex. M-177, #77 Attachment D, #78 Attachment E, #79 Attachment F, #80 Attachment G, #81 Attachment H, #82 Attachment I, #83 Attachment J, #84 Attachment K, #85 Attachment L, #86 Attachment M, #87 Attachment N, #88 Attachment O, #89 Attachment P) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1939 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1938 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Sanofi's Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morto by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachment B) (Attachments: #1 Attachment C, #2 Ex. M-001, #3 Ex. M-002, #4 Ex. M-003, #5 Ex. M-004, #6 Ex. M-005, #7 Ex. M-006, #8 Ex. M-007, #9 Ex. M-008, #10 Ex. M-009, #11 Ex. M-010, #12 Ex M-011, #13 Ex. M-012, #14 Ex. M-013, #15 Ex. M-014, #16 Ex. M-015, #17 Ex. M-016, #18 Ex. M-017, #19 Ex. M-018, #20 Ex. M-019, #21 Ex. M-020, #22 Ex. M-021, #23 Ex. M-022, #24 Ex. M-023, #25 Ex. M-024, #26 Ex. M-025, #27 Ex. M-026, #28 Ex. M-027, #29 Ex. M-028, #30 Ex. M-029, #31 Ex. M-030, #32 Ex. M-031, #33 Ex. M-032, #34 Ex. M-033, #35 Ex. M-034, #36 Ex. M-035, #37 Ex. M-036, #38 Ex. M-037, #39 Ex. M-038, #40 Ex. M-039, #41 Ex. M-040, #42 Ex. M-041, #43 Ex. M-042, #44 Ex. M-043, #45 Ex. M-044, #46 Ex. M-045, #47 Ex. M-046, #48 Ex. M-047, #49 Ex. M-048, #50 Ex. M-049, #51 Ex. M-050, #52 Ex. M-051, #53 Ex. M-052, #54 Ex. M-053, #55 Ex. M-054, #56 Ex. M-055, #57 Ex. M-056, #58 Ex. M-057, #59 Ex. M-058, #60 Ex. M-059, #61 Ex. M-060, #62 Ex. M-061, #63 Ex. M-062, #64 Ex. M-063, #65 Ex. M-064, #66 Ex. M-065, #67 Ex. M-066, #68 Ex. M-067, #69 Ex. M-068, #70 Ex. M-069, #71 Ex. M-070, #72 Ex. M-071, #73 Ex. M-072, #74 Ex. M-073, #75 Ex. M-074, #76 Ex. M-075, #77 Ex. M-076, #78 Ex. M-077, #79 Ex. M-078, #80 Ex. M-079, #81 Ex. M-080, #82 Ex. M-081, #83 Ex. M-082, #84 Ex. M-083, #85 Ex. M-084, #86 Ex. M-085, #87 Ex. M-086, #88 Ex. M-087, #89 Ex. M-088, #90 Ex. M-089, #91 Ex. M-090, #92 Ex. M-091, #93 Ex. M-092, #94 Ex. M-093, #95 Ex. M-094, #96 Ex. M-095, #97 Ex. M-096, #98 Ex. M-097, #99 Ex. M-098, #100 Ex. M-099, #101 Ex. M-100) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1938 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in Sanofi's Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Mylan's Motions to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. and Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Ex. S-01, #3 Ex. S-02, #4 Ex. S-03, #5 Ex. S-04, #6 Ex. S-05, #7 Ex. S-06, #8 Ex. S-07, #9 Ex. S-08, #10 Ex. S-09, #11 Ex. S-10, #12 Ex. S-11, #13 Ex. S-12, #14 Ex. S-13, #15 Ex. S-14, #16 Ex. S-15, #17 Ex. S-16, #18 Ex. S-17, #19 Ex. S-18, #20 Ex. S-19, #21 Ex. S-20, #22 Ex. S-21, #23 Ex. S-22, #24 Ex. S-23, #25 Ex. S-24, #26 Ex. S-25, #27 Ex. S-26, #28 Ex. S-27, #29 Ex. S-28, #30 Ex. S-29, #31 Ex. S-30, #32 Ex. S-31, #33 Ex. S-32, #34 Ex. S-33, #35 Ex. S-34, #36 Ex. S-35, #37 Ex. S-36, #38 Ex. S-37, #39 Ex S-38, #40 Ex. S-39, #41 Ex. S-40, #42 Ex S-41, #43 Ex. S-42, #44 Ex. S-43, #45 Ex. S-44, #46 Ex. S-45, #47 Ex. S-46, #48 Ex. S-47, #49 Ex. S-48, #50 Ex. S-49, #51 Ex. S-50) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1937 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Information Cited in Sanofi's June 28 Briefs and Expert Reports by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1936 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Oppositions to Sanofi's Motion for Summary Judgment and Sanofi's Daubert Motions by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. A-1, #3 Ex. A-2, #4 Ex. A-3, #5 Ex. A-4, #6 Ex. A-5, #7 Ex. A-6, #8 Ex. A-7, #9 Ex. A-8, #10 Ex. A-9, #11 Ex. A-10, #12 Ex. A-11, #13 Ex. A-12, #14 Ex. A-13, #15 Ex. A-14, #16 Ex. A-15, #17 Ex. A-16, #18 Ex. A-17, #19 Ex. A-18, #20 Ex. A-19, #21 Ex. A-20, #22 Ex. A-21, #23 Ex. A-22, #24 Ex. A-23, #25 Ex. A-24, #26 Ex. A-25, #27 Ex. A-26, #28 Ex. A-27, #29 Ex. A-28, #30 Ex. A-29, #31 Ex. A-30, #32 Ex. A-31, #33 Ex. A-32, #34 Ex. A-33, #35 Ex. A-34, #36 Ex. A-35, #37 Ex. A-36, #38 Ex. A-37, #39 Ex. A-38, #40 Ex. A-39, #41 Ex. A-40, #42 Ex. A-41, #43 Ex. A-42, #44 Ex. A-43, #45 Ex. A-44, #46 Ex. A-45, #47 Ex. A-46, #48 Ex. A-47, #49 Ex. A-48, #50 Ex. A-49, #51 Ex. A-50, #52 Ex. A-51, #53 Ex. A-52, #54 Ex. A-53, #55 Ex. A-54, #56 Ex. A-55, #57 Ex. A-56, #58 Ex. A-57, #59 Ex. A-58, #60 Ex. A-59, #61 Ex. A-60, #62 Ex. A-61, #63 Ex. A-62, #64 Ex. A-63, #65 Ex. A-64, #66 Ex. A-65, #67 Ex. A-66, #68 Ex. A-67, #69 Ex. B, #70 Ex. B-1, #71 Ex. B-2, #72 Ex. B-3, #73 Ex. B-4, #74 Ex. B-5, #75 Ex. B-6, #76 Ex. B-7, #77 Ex. B-8, #78 Ex. B-9, #79 Ex. B-10, #80 Ex. B-11, #81 Ex. B-12, #82 Ex. B-13, #83 Ex. B-14, #84 Ex. B-15, #85 Ex. B-16, #86 Ex. B-17, #87 Ex. B-18, #88 Ex. B-19, #89 Ex. B-20, #90 Ex. B-21, #91 Ex. B-22, #92 Ex. C, #93 Ex. D, #94 Ex. E, #95 Ex. F)(Sechler, Philip)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1935 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Mylan's Memoranda in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Mylan's Expert Reports by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Ex. A, #4 Ex. B, #5 Ex. C, #6 Ex. D, #7 Ex. E, #8 Ex. F, #9 Ex. G, #10 Ex. H, #11 Ex. I, #12 Ex. J, #13 Ex. K)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1934 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 3 (Redacted))(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1933 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 3, #2 Ex. 4, #3 Ex. 5)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1932 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 4, #2 Ex. 5, #3 Ex. 6 (Redacted))(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1931 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 6)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1930 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 2 (Redacted))(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1929 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 2)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1928 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 2 (Redacted), #2 Ex. 4 (Redacted), #3 Ex. 5, #4 Ex. 6 (Redacted), #5 Ex. 9, #6 Ex. 10 (Redacted), #7 Ex. 11 (Redacted), #8 Ex. 12 (Redacted), #9 Ex. 13 (Redacted), #10 Ex. 14, #11 Ex. 17, #12 Ex. 18, #13 Ex. 23, #14 Ex. 24 (Redacted), #15 Ex. 34, #16 Ex. 40 (Redacted), #17 Ex. 49)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1927 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Exhibit Index) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 2, #2 Ex. 4, #3 Ex. 6, #4 Ex. 7, #5 Ex. 8, #6 Ex. 10, #7 Ex. 11, #8 Ex. 12, #9 Ex. 13, #10 Ex. 15, #11 Ex. 19, #12 Ex. 20, #13 Ex. 21, #14 Ex. 22, #15 Ex. 24, #16 Ex. 25, #17 Ex. 26, #18 Ex. 27, #19 Ex. 28, #20 Ex. 29, #21 Ex. 30, #22 Ex. 31, #23 Ex. 32, #24 Ex. 33, #25 Ex. 35, #26 Ex. 36, #27 Ex. 37, #28 Ex. 38, #29 Ex. 39, #30 Ex. 40, #31 Ex. 42, #32 Ex. 43, #33 Ex. 44, #34 Ex. 45, #35 Ex. 47, #36 Ex. 48, #37 Ex. 50, #38 Ex. 51, #39 Ex. 52, #40 Ex. 53, #41 Ex. 54, #42 Ex. 55)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1926 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit Index). (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 (Redacted), #2 Ex. 3 (Redacted), #3 Ex. 4, #4 Ex. 5, #5 Ex. 6, #6 Ex. 7, #7 Ex. 9 (Redacted), #8 Ex. 10 (Redacted), #9 Ex. 11, #10 Ex. 12 (Redacted), #11 Ex. 13, #12 Ex. 14 (Redacted), #13 Ex. 15 (Redacted), #14 Ex. 17 (Redacted), #15 Ex. 19 (Redacted), #16 Ex. 20, #17 Ex. 21 (Redacted), #18 Ex. 22 (Redacted), #19 Ex. 23 (Redacted), #20 Ex. 24 (Redacted), #21 Ex. 25 (Redacted), #22 Ex. 26 (Redacted), #23 Ex. 27 (Redacted), #24 Ex. 29 (Redacted), #25 Ex. 30 (Redacted), #26 Ex. 31 (Redacted), #27 Ex. 32 (Redacted), #28 Ex. 42, #29 Ex. 44, #30 Ex. 46, #31 Ex. 47 (Redacted), #32 Ex. 48, #33 Ex. 49, #34 Ex. 50, #35 Ex. 52 (Redacted), #36 Ex. 53, #37 Ex. 54, #38 Ex. 55, #39 Ex. 71, #40 Ex. 73, #41 Ex. 75, #42 Ex. 77 (Redacted), #43 Ex. 79 (Redacted), #44 Ex. 82 (Redacted), #45 Ex. 88, #46 Ex. 89 (Redacted), #47 Ex. 92, #48 Ex. 100 (Redacted), #49 Ex. 102 (Redacted), #50 Ex. 105 (Redacted), #51 Ex. 109 (Redacted), #52 Ex. 110, #53 Ex. 117, #54 Ex. 118 (Redacted), #55 Ex. 122 (Redacted), #56 Ex. 124 (Redacted), #57 Ex. 127 (Redacted), #58 Ex. 128 (Redacted), #59 Ex. 129 (Redacted), #60 Ex. 134 (Redacted), #61 Ex. 137 (Redacted), #62 Ex. 140 (Redacted), #63 Ex. 147, #64 Ex. 151 (Redacted), #65 Ex. 154 (Redacted), #66 Ex. 155 (Redacted), #67 Ex. 159 (Redacted), #68 Ex. 160 (Redacted), #69 Ex. 163 (Redacted), #70 Ex. 164, #71 Ex. 166 (Redacted), #72 Ex. 168 (Redacted), #73 Ex. 169, #74 Ex. 171, #75 Ex. 179 (Redacted), #76 Ex. 176 (Redacted), #77 Ex. 180, #78 Ex. 183 (Redacted), #79 Ex. 184 (Redacted), #80 Ex. 186 (Redacted), #81 Ex. 188 (Redacted), #82 Ex. 190, #83 Ex. 195, #84 Ex. 206 (Redacted), #85 Ex. 218 (Redacted), #86 Ex. 219 (Redacted), #87 Ex. 220, #88 Ex. 228, #89 Ex. 229, #90 Ex. 231 (Redacted), #91 Ex. 233 (Redacted), #92 Ex. 235, #93 Ex. 236 (Redacted), #94 Ex. 237, #95 Ex. 238, #96 Ex. 249, #97 Ex. 250)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1925 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 131, #2 Ex. 132, #3 Ex. 133, #4 Ex. 134, #5 Ex. 135, #6 Ex. 136, #7 Ex. 137, #8 Ex. 138, #9 Ex. 139, #10 Ex. 140, #11 Ex. 141, #12 Ex. 142, #13 Ex. 143, #14 Ex. 144, #15 Ex. 145, #16 Ex. 146, #17 Ex. 148, #18 Ex. 149, #19 Ex. 150, #20 Ex. 151, #21 Ex. 152, #22 Ex. 153, #23 Ex. 155, #24 Ex. 156, #25 Ex. 157, #26 Ex. 158, #27 Ex. 159, #28 Ex. 160, #29 Ex. 161, #30 Ex. 162, #31 Ex. 163, #32 Ex. 165, #33 Ex. 166, #34 Ex. 167, #35 Ex. 168, #36 Ex. 170, #37 Ex. 172, #38 Ex. 173, #39 Ex. 174, #40 Ex. 175, #41 Ex. 176, #42 Ex. 177, #43 Ex. 178, #44 Ex. 179, #45 Ex. 181, #46 Ex. 182, #47 Ex. 183, #48 Ex. 184, #49 Ex. 185, #50 Ex. 186, #51 Ex. 187, #52 Ex. 188, #53 Ex. 189, #54 Ex. 191, #55 Ex. 192, #56 Ex. 193, #57 Ex. 194, #58 Ex. 196, #59 Ex. 197, #60 Ex. 198, #61 Ex. 199, #62 Ex. 200, #63 Ex. 201, #64 Ex. 202, #65 Ex. 203, #66 Ex. 204, #67 Ex. 205, #68 Ex. 206, #69 Ex. 207, #70 Ex. 208, #71 Ex. 209, #72 Ex. 210, #73 Ex. 211, #74 Ex. 212, #75 Ex. 213, #76 Ex. 214, #77 Ex. 215, #78 Ex. 216, #79 Ex. 217, #80 Ex. 218, #81 Ex. 219, #82 Ex. 221, #83 Ex. 222, #84 Ex. 223, #85 Ex. 224, #86 Ex. 225, #87 Ex. 226, #88 Ex. 227, #89 Ex. 230, #90 Ex. 231, #91 Ex. 232, #92 Ex. 233, #93 Ex. 234, #94 Ex. 236, #95 Ex. 239, #96 Ex. 240, #97 Ex. 241, #98 Ex. 242, #99 Ex. 243, #100 Ex. 244, #101 Ex. 245, #102 Ex. 246, #103 Ex. 247, #104 Ex. 248)(Sechler, Philip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1924 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 8, #5 Ex. 9, #6 Ex. 10, #7 Ex. 12, #8 Ex. 14, #9 Ex. 15, #10 Ex. 16, #11 Ex. 17, #12 Ex. 18, #13 Ex. 19, #14 Ex. 21, #15 Ex. 22, #16 Ex. 23, #17 Ex. 24, #18 Ex. 25, #19 Ex. 26, #20 Ex. 27, #21 Ex. 28, #22 Ex. 29, #23 Ex. 30, #24 Ex. 31, #25 Ex. 32, #26 Ex. 33, #27 Ex. 40, #28 Ex. 41, #29 Ex. 43, #30 Ex. 45, #31 Ex. 47, #32 Ex. 51, #33 Ex. 52, #34 Ex. 56, #35 Ex. 57, #36 Ex. 58, #37 Ex. 59, #38 Ex. 60, #39 Ex. 61, #40 Ex. 62, #41 Ex. 63, #42 Ex. 64, #43 Ex. 65, #44 Ex. 66, #45 Ex. 67, #46 Ex. 68, #47 Ex. 69, #48 Ex. 70, #49 Ex. 72, #50 Ex. 74, #51 Ex. 76, #52 Ex. 77, #53 Ex. 78, #54 Ex. 79, #55 Ex. 80, #56 Ex. 81, #57 Ex. 82, #58 Ex. 83, #59 Ex. 84, #60 Ex. 85, #61 Ex. 86, #62 Ex. 87, #63 Ex. 89, #64 Ex. 90, #65 Ex. 91, #66 Ex. 93, #67 Ex. 94, #68 Ex. 95, #69 Ex. 96, #70 Ex. 97, #71 Ex. 98, #72 Ex. 99, #73 Ex. 100, #74 Ex. 101, #75 Ex. 102, #76 Ex. 103, #77 Ex. 104, #78 Ex. 105, #79 Ex. 106, #80 Ex. 107, #81 Ex. 108, #82 Ex. 109, #83 Ex. 111, #84 Ex. 112, #85 Ex. 113, #86 Ex. 114, #87 Ex. 115, #88 Ex. 116, #89 Ex. 118, #90 Ex. 119, #91 Ex. 120, #92 Ex. 121, #93 Ex. 122, #94 Ex. 123, #95 Ex. 124, #96 Ex. 125, #97 Ex. 126, #98 Ex. 127, #99 Ex. 128, #100 Ex. 129)(Sechler, Philip)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1923 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Mylan's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission- RENEWED by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Redacted Document Exhibit 2)(Levin, Adam)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1922 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Exhibit Index) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1921 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Sealed Exhibit Index) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1920 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Exhibit Index) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 10)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1919 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Sealed Exhibit Index) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1918 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Exhibit List) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 9, #10 Ex. 11, #11 Ex. 13, #12 Ex. 14, #13 Ex. 15, #14 Ex. 17, #15 Ex. 18, #16 Ex. 23, #17 Ex. 33, #18 Ex. 34, #19 Ex. 35, #20 Ex. 37, #21 Ex. 38, #22 Ex. 40, #23 Ex. 41, #24 Ex. 50, #25 Ex. 57, #26 Ex. 58, #27 Ex. 59, #28 Ex. 60, #29 Ex. 61, #30 Ex 62, #31 Ex. 63, #32 Ex. 65, #33 Ex. 66, #34 Ex. 68, #35 Ex. 71, #36 Ex. 72, #37 Ex. 73, #38 Ex. 75, #39 Ex. 77, #40 Ex. 78, #41 Ex. 80, #42 Ex. 94, #43 Ex. 100, #44 Ex. 106, #45 Ex. 107, #46 Ex. 109, #47 Ex. 120, #48 Ex. 121, #49 Ex. 122, #50 Ex. 123, #51 Ex. 124, #52 Ex. 125, #53 Ex. 126, #54 Ex. 127, #55 Ex. 128, #56 Ex. 129, #57 Ex. 130, #58 Ex. 131, #59 Ex. 132, #60 Ex. 133, #61 Ex. 134, #62 Ex. 136, #63 Ex. 137, #64 Ex. 138, #65 Ex. 140, #66 Ex. 141, #67 Ex. 142, #68 Ex. 143, #69 Ex. 144, #70 Ex. 148, #71 Ex. 149, #72 Ex. 152)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1917 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Sealed Exhibit List) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 12, #2 Ex. 14, #3 Ex. 19, #4 Ex. 20, #5 Ex. 21, #6 Ex. 22, #7 Ex. 24, #8 Ex. 25, #9 Ex. 26, #10 Ex. 27, #11 Ex. 28, #12 Ex. 29, #13 Ex. 30, #14 Ex. 31, #15 Ex. 32, #16 Ex. 33, #17 Ex. 34, #18 Ex. 38, #19 Ex. 39, #20 Ex. 43, #21 Ex. 44, #22 Ex. 45, #23 Ex. 46, #24 Ex. 47, #25 Ex. 48, #26 Ex. 49, #27 Ex. 52, #28 Ex. 53, #29 Ex. 54, #30 Ex. 55, #31 Ex. 56, #32 Ex. 57, #33 Ex. 58, #34 Ex. 60, #35 Ex. 61, #36 Ex. 62, #37 Ex. 63, #38 Ex. 64, #39 Ex. 67, #40 Ex. 68, #41 Ex 70, #42 Ex. 72, #43 Ex. 73, #44 Ex. 74, #45 Ex. 75, #46 Ex. 76, #47 Ex. 77, #48 Ex. 78, #49 Ex. 79, #50 Ex. 81, #51 Ex. 82, #52 Ex. 83, #53 Ex. 84, #54 Ex. 85, #55 Ex. 86, #56 Ex. 87, #57 Ex. 88, #58 Ex. 89, #59 Ex. 90, #60 Ex. 91, #61 Ex. 92, #62 Ex. 93, #63 Ex. 95, #64 Ex. 96, #65 Ex. 97, #66 Ex. 98, #67 Ex. 99, #68 Ex. 100, #69 Ex. 101, #70 Ex. 102, #71 Ex. 103, #72 Ex. 104, #73 Ex. 105, #74 Ex. 108, #75 Ex. 109, #76 Ex. 110, #77 Ex. 111, #78 Ex. 112, #79 Ex. 113, #80 Ex. 114, #81 Ex. 115, #82 Ex. 116, #83 Ex. 117, #84 Ex. 118, #85 Ex. 119, #86 Ex. 133, #87 Ex. 139, #88 Ex. 150)(Hochstadt, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1916 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #1909 MOTION to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sharp, Rex)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1915 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re #1904 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants (Rebein, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1914 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE/Opposition by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1904 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Foster, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1913 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan Defendants' Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Twelfth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1912 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA to AT&T, Inc. by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1911 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jiamin Chen as to Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1910 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Foster, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1909 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Amend Their Responses to Mylan's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Admission by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Foster, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1908 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Amended Motion to Compel, and Two Exhibits by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Motion, #2 Sealed Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Exhibit 2, #4 Sealed Exhibit 3)(Sharp, Rex)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1906 Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Heather Bresch and Eleventh Set of Requests for Production of Documents to the Mylan Defendants. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including September 27, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to the discovery requests identified in their motion The Court does not expect to further extend this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1906 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadline Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Heather Bresch and Eleventh Set of Requests for Production of Documents to the Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Sarko, Lynn) Modified on 9/20/2019. (gw)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER. In light of Class Plaintiffs' Amended Motion (ECF No. #1904 ), the Court finds as moot #1892 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1904 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sharp, Rex)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1903 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon The Segal Group, Inc. on September 16, 2019 by electronic mail. (Shingler, Arthur)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1902 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Mylan by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.. (Levin, Adam)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1901 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Heather Bresch by Heather Bresch. (Levin, Adam)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1900 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses & Objections to Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Heather Bresch by Heather Bresch. (Levin, Adam)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1899 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Responses to Mylan Defendants' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Hudson, Ryan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1898 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Responses and Objections to Mylan Defendants' Third Set of Requests for Admission to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1897 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of The Segal Group, Inc. on September 23, 2019 and September 30, 2019. (Shingler, Arthur)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1896 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to the Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1895 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. of taking deposition of The Segal Group, Inc. on September 23 and 30, 2019. (Levin, Adam)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1894 ORDER granting #1893 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel Regarding Teva's Revised Privilege Log. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including September 25, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to Teva Pharmaceuticals' privilege log. The Court does not expect to further extend this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1893 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time of Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel regarding Teva's Revised Privilege Log by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Klevorn, Amanda)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1892 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Tenth Set of RFPs to Mylan - Redacted by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sharp, Rex)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1891 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Consumer Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc. (Burns, Warren)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1890 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Consumer Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Burns, Warren)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 SANOFI CASE -- ORDER denying as moot #1654 the parties' Joint Motion to Adopt Sealing Protocols for Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions; denying without prejudice #1660 Mylan's Unopposed Motion Preliminarily to File Under Seal Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits; #1664 Sanofi's Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, 3, and 4 to its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' Expert Gary Zieziula; #1674 Sanofi's Unopposed Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff's Expert Thomas Varner and Certain Attached Exhibits; #1676 Mylan's Unopposed Motion Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur; #1678 Mylan's Unopposed Motion Preliminarily to File Under Seal Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D.; #1679 Mylan's Unopposed Motion Preliminarily to File Under Seal Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D.; #1680 Mylan's Unopposed Motion Preliminarily to File Under Seal Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D.; #1686 Sanofi's Unopposed Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits; granting in part and denying in part #1764 Sanofi's Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in its Motion for Summary Judgment; #1765 Mylan's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/06/2019. (mig)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1888 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #1847 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Raj Gandesha, #2 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha, #3 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha, #4 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha, #5 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Raj Gandesha) (Rebein, Joseph)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1887 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Heather Bresch on October 15, 2019. (Burns, Warren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1886 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1647 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D)(Levin, Adam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1885 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1640 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G) (Levin, Adam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1884 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1640 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal. REDACTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G- Redacted) (Levin, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1883 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Redacted) (Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1882 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1882 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 251, #4 Exhibit 252, #5 Exhibit 253, #6 Exhibit 254, #7 Exhibit 255, #8 Exhibit 256, #9 Exhibit 257, #10 Exhibit 258, #11 Exhibit 259, #12 Exhibit 260, #13 Exhibit 261, #14 Exhibit 262, #15 Exhibit 263, #16 Exhibit 264, #17 Exhibit 265, #18 Exhibit 266, #19 Exhibit 267, #20 Exhibit 268, #21 Exhibit 269, #22 Exhibit 270, #23 Exhibit 271, #24 Exhibit 272, #25 Exhibit 273, #26 Exhibit 274, #27 Exhibit 275, #28 Exhibit 276, #29 Exhibit 277, #30 Exhibit 278, #31 Exhibit 279, #32 Exhibit 280, #33 Exhibit 281, #34 Exhibit 282, #35 Exhibit 283, #36 Exhibit 284) (Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1881 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE to #1859 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Rex)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1880 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1636 Redacted Document by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. - Exhibit 6 to Mylan Defendants' Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Master Named Plaintiff Records -. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Part 2 of 6, #2 Exhibit 6 - Part 3 of 6, #3 Exhibit 6 - Part 4 of 6, #4 Exhibit 6 - Part 5 of 6, #5 Exhibit 6 - Part 6 of 6)(Fries, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1879 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. (Redacted) (Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1876 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur; #1878 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D.; #1875 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Gary Zieziula and Certain Exhibits Attached thereto. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1878 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1877 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur. (Redacted) (Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1876 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum)(Sechler, Philip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1875 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Gary Zieziula and Certain Exhibits Attached thereto by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Gary Zieziula and Certain Exhibits Attached thereto Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 9) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1874 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1873 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1624 SEALED MOTION and #1852 MOTION to Strike . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hughes Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Rosenthal Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Ipson Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Bulding Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - SEGAL_EPIPEN_018391-SEGAL_EPIPEN_018394) (Fries, Brian)
August 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1872 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Attached Exhibits. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1872 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 153, #5 Exhibit 154, #6 Exhibit 155, #7 Exhibit 156, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 162, #11 Exhibit 163, #12 Exhibit 164) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1871 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 153, #4 Exhibit 154, #5 Exhibit 155, #6 Exhibit 156, #7 Exhibit 157, #8 Exhibit 158, #9 Exhibit 159, #10 Exhibit 160, #11 Exhibit 161, #12 Exhibit 162, #13 Exhibit 163, #14 Exhibit 164) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1870 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Thomas Varner. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1870 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Thomas Varner by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Thomas Varner, #2 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1869 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz in Support of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Thomas Varner, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13) (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1866 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1868 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. (Redacted) (Sechler, Philip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1867 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Twelfth set of Requests for Production to Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., and Mylan Specialty, L.P. by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1866 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11) (Sechler, Philip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1865 SANOFI CASE -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. (Sechler, Philip)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1864 ORDER granting #1858 Joint Motion for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadlines Regarding Certain Discovery Requests. Class Plaintiffs and the Mylan Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including September 20, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to the discovery requests identified in their motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDER granting #1856 Unopposed Motion to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel Regarding Teva's Revised Privilege Log. Class Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including September 16, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel related to Teva Pharmaceuticals' privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 27, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1852 MOTION to Strike Corrected Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes, and #1847 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1862 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1847 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Chen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1A - Torrance Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 2 - Torrance Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2A - KU Letter) (Sharp, Rex)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1861 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1604 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Elhauge Deposition Excerpts) (Sharp, Rex)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1860 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1602 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Rosenthal Deposition Excerpts) (Sharp, Rex)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1859 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: MOTION for Class Certification #1353 filed by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Levin, Adam)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1858 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Joint MOTION for Extension of Motion to Compel Deadlines Regarding Certain Discovery Requests by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Sarko, Lynn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1857 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Interrogatories by King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rebein, Joseph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1856 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Local Rule 37.1 Deadline for Class Plaintiffs to Move to Compel Regarding Teva's Revised Privilege Log by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Klevorn, Amanda)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1855 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1604 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D) (Levin, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1854 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1604 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge (Redacted) by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1853 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1852 MOTION to Strike Corrected Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G) (Sarko, Lynn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1852 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Strike Corrected Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of Matthew S. Tripolitsiotis, #2 Exhibit - Redacted A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit - Redacted C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit - Redacted G, #9 Exhibit H) (Sarko, Lynn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1851 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1602 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Levin, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1850 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1602 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal (Redacted) by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Levin, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1849 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AFFIDAVIT of Edward Thrasher re: #1847 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rebein, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1848 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1847 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc.(Rebein, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1847 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Rebein, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1846 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' First Amended Responses and Objections to Mylan Defendants' Third Set of Requests for Admission to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER. In light of #1788 and #1843 Notices of Withdrawal, the court directs the Clerk of the Court to unseal ECF Nos. #1771 , #1772 , #1775 , [1775-1], ]1775-2], #1780 , and [1780-1]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1844 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1776 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. Exhibit 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Levin, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1843 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Withdrawal of the Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Two Exhibits to Their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1780 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response. (Levin, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1842 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #1353 MOTION for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit F) (Rebein, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1841 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #1353 MOTION for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H) (Rebein, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1840 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1839 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1353 MOTION for Class Certification Filed under seal pursuant to Order Doc #1786 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 97, #3 Exhibit 98, #4 Exhibit 100, #5 Exhibit 101, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104, #8 Exhibit 107, #9 Exhibit 110, #10 Exhibit 113, #11 Exhibit 114, #12 Exhibit 115, #13 Exhibit 116) (Burns, Warren)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1838 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Paul Muma on September 25, 2019. (Hudson, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1837 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1353 MOTION for Class Certification Publicly filed pursuant to Order Doc. 1786 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 97, #3 Exhibit 98, #4 Exhibit 99, #5 Exhibit 100, #6 Exhibit 102, #7 Exhibit 103, #8 Exhibit 105, #9 Exhibit 106, #10 Exhibit 108, #11 Exhibit 109, #12 Exhibit 111, #13 Exhibit 112, #14 Exhibit 117, #15 Exhibit 118) (Burns, Warren)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1836 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference (44 pgs) held 08/12/2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Judge Teresa J. James, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Stuart Davidson. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2019. (ks)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1835 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1834 SEALED Response to Motion for Class Certification (Exhibit 1) by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 6 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 6 Part 4, #7 Exhibit 6 Part 5, #8 Exhibit 6 Part 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 32, #23 Exhibit 33, #24 Exhibit 39, #25 Exhibit 40, #26 Exhibit 41, #27 Exhibit 42, #28 Exhibit 43, #29 Exhibit 44, #30 Exhibit 48, #31 Exhibit 52, #32 Exhibit 54, #33 Exhibit 55, #34 Exhibit 56, #35 Exhibit 57, #36 Exhibit 62, #37 Exhibit 63, #38 Exhibit 64, #39 Exhibit 71, #40 Exhibit 72, #41 Exhibit 75, #42 Exhibit 76, #43 Exhibit 81, #44 Exhibit 82, #45 Exhibit 83, #46 Exhibit 85, #47 Exhibit 86, #48 Exhibit 87, #49 Exhibit 88, #50 Exhibit 89, #51 Exhibit 92, #52 Exhibit 93, #53 Exhibit 94, #54 Exhibit 95) (Levin, Adam)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1834 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1353 MOTION for Class Certification. (Levin, Adam)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1833 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Heather Bresch on September 10, 2019. (Burns, Warren)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1832 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1740 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive motion and Daubert Motion deadline 4/16/2020. Dispositive motion and Daubert motion response deadline 5/15/2020. Dispositive motion and Daubert motion reply deadline 6/15/2020. Completion of all expert discovery deadline 2/14/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree.. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/14/19. (hw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1831 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF MATERIALS From the June 11-12, 2019 Hearing on Class Certification by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: 1761 Order, 1778 Conventionally Filed Exhibits. (Hudson, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1830 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF MATERIALS From the June 11-12, 2019 Hearing on Class Certification by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: 1761 Order, 1779 Conventionally Filed Exhibits. (Levin, Adam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1829 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2019. The court takes under advisement #1740 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (mig)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1828 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER Ruling on Motions for Leave to File Under Seal the Daubert Motions and Supporting Attachments Filed in Connection With the Putative Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Regarding Motions #1583 ; #1620 ; #1649 ; #1586 ; #1601 ; #1621 ; #1640 ; #1587 ; #1589 ; #1609 ; #1624 ; #1588 ; #1603 ; #1622 ; and #1647 . It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must follow the instructions that the court has outlined above (in this Order) for filing documents both publicly and under seal. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/12/2019. (mg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1827 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCKET MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding Exhibit 270 in docket filing #1819 . An unredacted copy of Exhibit 270 was inadvertently attached at the time of filing. That exhibit has been blocked from view, and a corrected document regarding Exhibit 270 has been attached. A copy of that correction is also attached here for the purpose of electronic notification. (mg)
August 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1826 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena for Deposition and Subpoena for Production of Documents to Dr. Phillip Lieberman by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Hudson, Ryan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1825 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 202, #1 Ex. 203, #2 Ex 204, #3 Ex 205, #4 Ex. 207, #5 Ex. 208, #6 Ex 209, #7 Ex 210, #8 Ex 211, #9 Ex. 212, #10 Ex. 213, #11 Ex 214, #12 Ex. 215, #13 Ex 219, #14 Ex. 220, #15 Ex. 221, #16 Ex. 222, #17 Ex. 223, #18 Ex. 224, #19 Ex. 225, #20 Ex. 226, #21 Ex. 227, #22 Ex. 228, #23 Ex. 229, #24 Ex 230, #25 Ex. 231, #26 Ex. 232, #27 Ex. 233, #28 Ex. 234, #29 Ex 235, #30 Ex. 236, #31 Ex. 237, #32 Ex. 238, #33 Ex. 239, #34 Ex. 241, #35 Ex. 243, #36 Ex. 244, #37 Ex. 245, #38 Ex. 246, #39 Ex. 247, #40 Ex. 248, #41 Ex 249, #42 Ex 250, #43 Ex. 251, #44 Ex. 252, #45 Ex. 253, #46 Ex 254, #47 Ex. 255, #48 Ex. 256, #49 Ex. 257, #50 Ex. 258, #51 Ex. 259, #52 Ex. 263, #53 Ex. 265)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1824 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 151, #1 Ex. 153, #2 Ex. 154, #3 Ex 155, #4 Ex. 156, #5 Ex. 157, #6 Ex. 158, #7 Ex. 159, #8 Ex. 160, #9 Ex. 161, #10 Ex. 163, #11 Ex. 164, #12 Ex. 165, #13 Ex. 166, #14 Ex. 167, #15 Ex. 168, #16 Ex. 169, #17 Ex. 170, #18 Ex. 171, #19 Ex. 172, #20 Ex. 173, #21 Ex. 175, #22 Ex. 176, #23 Ex. 177, #24 Ex. 178, #25 Ex. 179, #26 Ex. 180, #27 Ex. 181, #28 Ex. 182, #29 Ex. 183, #30 Ex. 184, #31 Ex. 185, #32 Ex. 186, #33 Ex. 188, #34 Ex. 189, #35 Ex. 190, #36 Ex. 191, #37 Ex. 192, #38 Ex. 193, #39 Ex. 194, #40 Ex. 197, #41 Ex. 198, #42 Ex. 199, #43 Ex. 200)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1823 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC.(Attachments: Main Document Ex. 101, #1 Ex. 102, #2 Ex. 103, #3 Ex. 104, #4 Ex. 105, #5 Ex. 106, #6 Ex. 107, #7 Ex. 108, #8 Ex. 110, #9 Ex. 111, #10 Ex 112, #11 Ex. 113, #12 Ex. 114, #13 Ex. 115, #14 Ex. 116, #15 Ex. 117, #16 Ex. 118, #17 Ex. 119, #18 Ex. 120, #19 Ex 121, #20 Ex. 122, #21 Ex. 123, #22 Ex. 125, #23 Ex. 126, #24 Ex. 127, #25 Ex. 128, #26 Ex. 130, #27 Ex. 131, #28 Ex. 132, #29 Ex. 134, #30 Ex. 135, #31 Ex. 136, #32 Ex. 137, #33 Ex. 138, #34 Ex. 139, #35 Ex. 140, #36 Ex. 141, #37 Ex. 142, #38 Ex. 143, #39 Ex. 144, #40 Ex. 145, #41 Ex. 146, #42 Ex. 147, #43 Ex. 148, #44 Ex. 149, #45 Ex. 150)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1822 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 51, #1 Ex. 52, #2 Ex. 53, #3 Ex. 54, #4 Ex 55, #5 Ex. 56, #6 Ex. 58, #7 Ex. 59, #8 Ex. 60, #9 Ex. 61, #10 Ex. 62, #11 Ex. 63, #12 Ex. 64, #13 Ex. 65, #14 Ex. 66, #15 Ex. 67, #16 Ex. 68, #17 Ex. 69, #18 Ex. 70, #19 Ex. 72, #20 Ex. 73, #21 Ex. 74, #22 Ex. 75, #23 Ex. 76, #24 Ex. 77, #25 Ex 78, #26 Ex 79, #27 Ex 80, #28 Ex. 81, #29 Ex. 82, #30 Ex. 84, #31 Ex. 85, #32 Ex. 86, #33 Ex. 87, #34 Ex. 88, #35 Ex. 89, #36 Ex. 90, #37 Ex. 91, #38 Ex. 92, #39 Ex 94, #40 Ex. 95, #41 Ex. 96, #42 Ex. 97, #43 Ex. 98, #44 Ex. 99, #45 Ex. 100)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1821 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1820 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 1, #1 Ex. 2, #2 Ex. 3, #3 Ex. 6, #4 Ex. 8, #5 Ex. 9, #6 Ex. 10, #7 Ex. 11, #8 Ex. 12, #9 Ex. 13, #10 Ex. 14, #11 Ex. 15, #12 Ex. 16, #13 Ex. 17, #14 Ex. 18, #15 Ex. 19, #16 Ex. 20, #17 Ex. 21, #18 Ex. 22, #19 Ex. 23, #20 Ex. 24, #21 Ex. 25, #22 Ex. 26, #23 Ex. 27, #24 Ex. 28, #25 Ex. 29, #26 Ex. 30, #27 Ex. 31, #28 Ex. 32, #29 Ex. 33, #30 Ex. 34, #31 Ex. 35, #32 Ex. 36, #33 Ex. 37, #34 Ex. 38, #35 Ex. 39, #36 Ex. 40, #37 Ex. 41, #38 Ex. 42, #39 Ex. 43, #40 Ex. 44, #41 Ex. 45, #42 Ex. 46, #43 Ex. 47, #44 Ex. 48, #45 Ex. 49, #46 Ex. 50)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1820 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Mylan's #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz in Support of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit List)(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/12/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1819 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 201, #1 Ex. 202, #2 Ex. 203, #3 Ex. 204, #4 Ex. 205, #5 Ex. 206, #6 Ex. 207, #7 Ex. 208, #8 Ex. 209, #9 Ex. 210, #10 Ex. 211, #11 Ex. 212, #12 Ex. 213, #13 Ex. 214, #14 Ex. 215, #15 Ex. 216, #16 Ex. 217, #17 Ex. 218, #18 Ex. 219, #19 Ex. 220, #20 Ex. 221, #21 Ex. 222, #22 Ex. 223, #23 Ex. 224, #24 Ex 225, #25 Ex 226, #26 Ex. 227, #27 Ex. 228, #28 Ex. 229, #29 Ex. 230, #30 Ex. 231, #31 Ex. 232, #32 Ex. 233, #33 Ex. 234, #34 Ex. 235, #35 Ex. 236, #36 Ex. 237, #37 Ex. 238, #38 Ex. 239, #39 Ex. 240, #40 Ex. 241, #41 Ex. 242, #42 Ex. 243, #43 Ex. 244, #44 Ex. 245, #45 Ex. 246, #46 Ex. 247, #47 Ex. 248, #48 Ex. 249, #49 Ex. 250, #50 Ex. 251, #51 Ex. 252, #52 Ex 253, #53 Ex. 254, #54 Ex. 255, #55 Ex. 256, #56 Ex. 257, #57 Ex. 258, #58 Ex. 259, #59 Ex. 260, #60 Ex. 261, #61 Ex. 262, #62 Ex. 263, #63 Ex. 265, #64 Ex. 266, #65 Ex. 267, #66 SEALED - Unredated document inadvertently attached at the time of filing. Ex. 270)(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Additional attachment added on 8/12/2019: #67 Correct Document Regarding Exhibit 270) (mg))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1818 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 151, #1 Ex. 152, #2 Ex. 153, #3 Ex. 154, #4 Ex. 155, #5 Ex. 156, #6 Ex. 157, #7 Ex. 158, #8 Ex. 159, #9 Ex. 160, #10 Ex. 161, #11 Ex. 162, #12 Ex. 163, #13 Ex. 164, #14 Ex. 165, #15 Ex. 166, #16 Ex. 167, #17 Ex. 168, #18 Ex. 169, #19 Ex. 170, #20 Ex. 171, #21 Ex. 172, #22 Ex. 173, #23 Ex. 174, #24 Ex. 175, #25 Ex. 176, #26 Ex. 177, #27 Ex. 178, #28 Ex 179, #29 Ex. 180, #30 Ex. 181, #31 Ex. 182, #32 Ex. 183, #33 Ex. 184, #34 Ex. 185, #35 Ex. 186, #36 Ex. 187, #37 Ex. 188, #38 Ex. 189, #39 Ex. 190, #40 Ex. 191, #41 Ex. 192, #42 Ex. 193, #43 Ex. 194, #44 Ex. 195, #45 Ex. 196, #46 Ex. 197, #47 Ex. 198, #48 Ex. 199, #49 Ex. 200)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1817 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex. 101, #1 Ex. 102, #2 Ex. 103, #3 Ex. 104, #4 Ex. 105, #5 Ex. 106, #6 Ex. 107, #7 Ex 108, #8 Ex. 109, #9 Ex. 110, #10 Ex. 111, #11 Ex. 112, #12 Ex. 113, #13 Ex. 114, #14 Ex. 115, #15 Ex. 116, #16 Ex. 117, #17 Ex. 118, #18 Ex. 119, #19 Ex. 120, #20 Ex. 121, #21 Ex. 122, #22 Ex. 123, #23 Ex. 124, #24 Ex. 125, #25 Ex. 126, #26 Ex. 127, #27 Ex. 128, #28 Ex 129, #29 Ex. 130, #30 Ex 131, #31 Ex. 132, #32 Ex. 133, #33 Ex. 134, #34 Ex. 135, #35 Ex. 136, #36 Ex. 137, #37 Ex. 138, #38 Ex. 139, #39 Ex. 140, #40 Ex. 141, #41 Ex 142, #42 Ex. 143, #43 Ex 144, #44 Ex. 145, #45 Ex. 146, #46 Ex. 147, #47 Ex. 148, #48 Ex. 149, #49 Ex. 150)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1816 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Ex.51, #1 Ex. 52, #2 Ex. 53, #3 Ex. 54, #4 Ex. 55, #5 Ex. 56, #6 Ex. 57, #7 Ex. 58, #8 Ex. 59, #9 Ex. 60, #10 Ex. 61, #11 Ex. 62, #12 Ex. 63, #13 Ex. 64, #14 Ex. 65, #15 Ex. 66, #16 Ex. 67, #17 Ex. 68, #18 Ex. 69, #19 Ex. 70, #20 Ex. 71, #21 Ex. 72, #22 Ex. 73, #23 Ex. 74, #24 Ex. 75, #25 Ex. 76, #26 Ex. 77, #27 Ex. 78, #28 Ex. 79, #29 Ex. 80, #30 Ex. 81, #31 Ex. 82, #32 Ex. 83, #33 Ex 84, #34 Ex. 85, #35 Ex. 86, #36 Ex. 87, #37 Ex 88, #38 Ex 89, #39 Ex. 90, #40 Ex. 91, #41 Ex. 92, #42 Ex. 93, #43 Ex. 94, #44 Ex. 95, #45 Ex. 96, #46 Ex. 97, #47 Ex. 98, #48 Ex. 99, #49 Ex. 100)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1815 SANOFI CASE -- EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1814 Memorandum in Opposition to #1673 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: Main Document Declaration of Yehudah Buchweitz in Support of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC's Memorandum in Opposition, #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11, #13 Ex. 12, #14 Ex. 13, #15 Ex. 14, #16 Ex. 15, #17 Ex. 16, #18 Ex. 17, #19 Ex. 18, #20 Ex 19, #21 Ex. 20, #22 Ex. 21, #23 Ex. 22, #24 Ex. 23, #25 Ex. 24, #26 Ex. 25, #27 Ex. 26, #28 Ex. 27, #29 Ex. 28, #30 Ex. 29, #31 Ex. 30, #32 Ex. 31, #33 Ex. 32, #34 Ex. 33, #35 Ex. 34, #36 Ex. 35, #37 Ex. 36, #38 Ex. 37, #39 Ex. 38, #40 Ex. 39, #41 Ex. 40, #42 Ex. 41, #43 Ex. 42, #44 Ex. 43, #45 Ex. 44, #46 Ex. 45, #47 Ex. 46, #48 Ex. 47, #49 Ex. 48, #50 Ex. 49, #51 Ex. 50)(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1814 SANOFI CASE -- Redacted MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1813 SANOFI CASE -- Redacted RESPONSE/Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1691 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1812 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 176, #1 Exhibit 177, #2 Exhibit 178, #3 Exhibit 179, #4 Exhibit 180, #5 Exhibit 181, #6 Exhibit 182, #7 Exhibit 183)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1811 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 151, #1 Exhibit 152, #2 Exhibit 153, #3 Exhibit 154, #4 Exhibit 155, #5 Exhibit 156, #6 Exhibit 157, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 161, #11 Exhibit 162, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 164, #14 Exhibit 165, #15 Exhibit 166, #16 Exhibit 167, #17 Exhibit 168, #18 Exhibit 169, #19 Exhibit 170, #20 Exhibit 171, #21 Exhibit 172, #22 Exhibit 173, #23 Exhibit 174, #24 Exhibit 175)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1810 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 126, #1 Exhibit 127, #2 Exhibit 128, #3 Exhibit 129, #4 Exhibit 130, #5 Exhibit 131, #6 Exhibit 132, #7 Exhibit 133, #8 Exhibit 134, #9 Exhibit 135, #10 Exhibit 136, #11 Exhibit 137, #12 Exhibit 138, #13 Exhibit 139, #14 Exhibit 140, #15 Exhibit 141, #16 Exhibit 142, #17 Exhibit 143, #18 Exhibit 144, #19 Exhibit 145, #20 Exhibit 146, #21 Exhibit 147, #22 Exhibit 148, #23 Exhibit 149, #24 Exhibit 150)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1809 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 101, #1 Exhibit 102, #2 Exhibit 103, #3 Exhibit 104, #4 Exhibit 105, #5 Exhibit 106, #6 Exhibit 107, #7 Exhibit 108, #8 Exhibit 109, #9 Exhibit 110, #10 Exhibit 111, #11 Exhibit 112, #12 Exhibit 113, #13 Exhibit 114, #14 Exhibit 115, #15 Exhibit 116, #16 Exhibit 117, #17 Exhibit 118, #18 Exhibit 119, #19 Exhibit 120, #20 Exhibit 121, #21 Exhibit 122, #22 Exhibit 123, #23 Exhibit 124, #24 Exhibit 125)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1808 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 76, #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90, #15 Exhibit 91, #16 Exhibit 92, #17 Exhibit 93, #18 Exhibit 94, #19 Exhibit 95, #20 Exhibit 96, #21 Exhibit 97, #22 Exhibit 98, #23 Exhibit 99, #24 Exhibit 100)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1807 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 51, #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1806 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 26, #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45, #20 Exhibit 46, #21 Exhibit 47, #22 Exhibit 48, #23 Exhibit 49, #24 Exhibit 50)(Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1805 Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1691 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1805 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1691 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25)(Sechler, Philip) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1804 SANOFI CASE -- Redacted RESPONSE/Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1675 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Thomas Varner by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner. (Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1803 SANOFI CASE -- Redacted RESPONSE/Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1666 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Gary Zieziula by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula. (Sechler, Philip)
August 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1802 Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1666 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Gary Zieziula. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1802 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1666 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Gary Zieziula by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Gary Zieziula, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Sechler, Philip) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1801 Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1675 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Thomas Varner. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1801 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION Preliminarily to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's #1675 Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Thomas Varner by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sanofi's Motion to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony Offered by Mylan's Expert Thomas Varner, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Sechler, Philip) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1800 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Portions of Exhibit A to its 1799 Opposition to Mylan's 1685 Motion to exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph. D. Under Seal, #1798 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Portions of the Exhibit Attached to Sanofi's 1797 Opposition to Mylan's 1684 Partial Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur Under Seal, #1796 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Seal Portions of its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Mylan's 1682 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. and Certain Attached Exhibits. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1800 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Portions of Exhibit A to its #1799 Opposition to Mylan's #1685 Motion to exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph. D. Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in support of Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude opinion testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, #2 Exhibit A - May 9, 2019 Transcript of Steven N. Wiggins)(Hochstadt, Eric) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1799 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in support of Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude opinion testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Hochstadt, Eric)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1798 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Portions of the Exhibit Attached to Sanofi's #1797 Opposition to Mylan's #1684 Partial Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in support of Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude testimony of Eduardo Schur, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1)(Hochstadt, Eric) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1797 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in Support of Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude testimony of Eduardo Schur, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1)(Hochstadt, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1796 SANOFI CASE -- Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Seal Portions of its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Mylan's #1682 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. and Certain Attached Exhibits by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude testimony of Professor Scott Morton, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in Supprt of Opposition to Mylan's motion to exclude testimony of Professor Scott Morton, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16)(Hochstadt, Eric) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/09/2019. (mg))
August 8, 2019 Filing 1795 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in Opposition to Mylans motion to exclude testimony of Professor Scott Morton, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16)(Hochstadt, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1794 SANOFI CASE -- RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC re: #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in Opposition to Mylans motion to exclude testimony of Dr. Michelis, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Hochstadt, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1793 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CONVENTIONALLY FILED FLASH DRIVE submitted by Pfizer defendants containing all materials used or referenced during Phase I and Phase II of the Class Certification Hearing received in Judge Crabtree's chambers on August 8, 2019. The clerk's office now has custody of this flash drive and will retain custody of it. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). (mig)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1792 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX Of Materials From the June 11-12, 2019 Hearing on Class Certification by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: 1761 Order. (Rebein, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1791 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan Defendants' Third Amended Responses and Objections to All Plaintiffs' First Set of Coordinated Requests for Admission by Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Sechler, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting defendant's Unopposed Motion to Designate as Confidential Portions of the Class Certification Hearing Transcripts (Doc. #1763 ). The Redacted Transcript of Class Certification, Phase I, held June 11, 2019 (Doc. #1724 ) reflects the redactions that the defendants seek, and the court approves those redactions. The Redacted Transcript of Class Certification, Phase II, held on June 12, 2019 (Doc. #1726 ) contains an additional redaction that the parties no longer seek to redact. The court thus orders the Clerk of the Court to seal Doc. #1726 . And the court orders the court reporter to file as a new docket entry a corrected version of the Redacted Transcript of Class Certification, Phase II, held on June 12, 2019, reflecting the redactions that defendants have requested and the court has approved. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/08/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg) (Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct the of hearing held to June 12, 2019. (mg))
August 8, 2019 Filing 1789 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held June 12, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter: Kim Greiner. Class Certification, Phase II. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber for 90 days from the filing of the original unredacted transcript. After that date (see original transcript filing), the transcript may be obtained through PACER. (kg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1788 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Withdrawal of the Mylan Defendants' Renewed Motions to Seal by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1772 Renewed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Heather Bresch, #1771 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Heather Bresch. (Levin, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO FOLLOW A CERTAIN PROCEDURE GOING FORWARD WHEN SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. The court orders the parties to follow the foregoing procedure when seeking the court's leave to file documents under seal. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/07/2019. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1786 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER CLARIFYING THE COURT'S JUNE 14, 2019 ORDER (DOC. #1633 ) AND DIRECTING THE CLASS PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. See Order for detailed instructions. Further, denying #1593 Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal their Reply in Support of Motion to Seal Class Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Documents. The court directs the Clerk of the Court to unseal Doc. #1593 , allowing public access to this filing. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/07/2019. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER CLARIFYING THE COURT'S JUNE 4, 2019 ORDER (DOC. #1608 ) AND JULY 31, 2019 ORDER (DOC. #1750 ) AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. See Order for detailed instructions. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/07/2019. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1784 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Paul Muma on August 21, 2019. (Hudson, Ryan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1783 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jennifer Varon as to King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Varon, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1782 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. re: #1740 MOTION to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. (Rebein, Joseph)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1781 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of correspondence received from the Type 1 Diabetes Defense Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1780 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1776 Memorandum in Opposition to #1740 MOTION to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit 1, #1 Exhibit 2)(Levin, Adam)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1779 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CONVENTIONALLY FILED FLASH DRIVE submitted by Mylan defendants containing all materials used or referenced during Phase I and Phase II of the Class Certification Hearing received in Judge Crabtree's chambers on August 2, 2019. The clerk's office now has custody of this flash drive and will retain custody of it. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1778 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CONVENTIONALLY FILED FLASH DRIVE submitted by class plaintiffs containing all materials used or referenced during Phase I and Phase II of the Class Certification Hearing received in Judge Crabtree's chambers on July 11, 2019. The clerk's office now has custody of this flash drive and will retain custody of it. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1777 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1775 Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to to Preliminarily File Under Seal Two Exhibits to Their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. The Mylan Defendants may preliminarily file under seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to their their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. Counsel for Mylan is directed to file forthwith the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's Order Denying Sealed Access (ECF No. 299). The Court approves the sealing process, as agreed to by Class Plaintiffs, described in Mylan's motion. No later than August 19, 2019, all parties and non-parties who wish to keep information under seal shall file a renewed motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1776 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1740 MOTION to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Levin, Adam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1775 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Mylan Defendants' Two Exhibits to Their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend The Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Levin, Adam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1774 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' 5th Set of Interrogatories by King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rebein, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1773 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Non-Opposition to Unsealing Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: 1744 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davidson, Stuart)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1772 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- (WITHDRAWN Pursuant to #1788 Notice of Withdrawal.) Renewed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Heather Bresch by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levin, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1771 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- (WITHDRAWN Pursuant to #1788 Notice of Withdrawal.) SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Heather Bresch by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Levin, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1770 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit B-101, #1 Exhibit B-102, #2 Exhibit B-103, #3 Exhibit B-104, #4 Exhibit B-105, #5 Exhibit B-106, #6 Exhibit B-107, #7 Exhibit B-108, #8 Exhibit B-109, #9 Exhibit B-110, #10 Exhibit B-111, #11 Exhibit B-112, #12 Exhibit B-113, #13 Exhibit B-114, #14 Exhibit B-115, #15 Exhibit B-116, #16 Exhibit B-117, #17 Exhibit B-118, #18 Exhibit B-119, #19 Exhibit B-120, #20 Exhibit B-121, #21 Exhibit B-122, #22 Exhibit B-123, #23 Exhibit B-124, #24 Exhibit B-125, #25 Exhibit B-126, #26 Exhibit B-127, #27 Exhibit B-128, #28 Exhibit B-129, #29 Exhibit B-130, #30 Exhibit B-131, #31 Exhibit B-132, #32 Exhibit B-133, #33 Exhibit B-134, #34 Exhibit B-135, #35 Exhibit B-136, #36 Exhibit B-137, #37 Exhibit B-138, #38 Exhibit B-139, #39 Exhibit B-140, #40 Exhibit B-141, #41 Exhibit B-142, #42 Exhibit B-143, #43 Exhibit B-144, #44 Exhibit B-145, #45 Exhibit B-146, #46 Exhibit B-147, #47 Exhibit B-148, #48 Exhibit B-149, #49 Exhibit C, #50 Exhibit D, #51 Exhibit E)(Sechler, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1769 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit B-51, #1 Exhibit B-52, #2 Exhibit B-53, #3 Exhibit B-54, #4 Exhibit B-55, #5 Exhibit B-56, #6 Exhibit B-57, #7 Exhibit B-58, #8 Exhibit B-59, #9 Exhibit B-60, #10 Exhibit B-61, #11 Exhibit B-62, #12 Exhibit B-63, #13 Exhibit B-64, #14 Exhibit B-65, #15 Exhibit B-66, #16 Exhibit B-67, #17 Exhibit B-68, #18 Exhibit B-69, #19 Exhibit B-70, #20 Exhibit B-71, #21 Exhibit B-72, #22 Exhibit B-73, #23 Exhibit B-74, #24 Exhibit B-75, #25 Exhibit B-76, #26 Exhibit B-77, #27 Exhibit B-78, #28 Exhibit B-79, #29 Exhibit B-80, #30 Exhibit B-81, #31 Exhibit B-82, #32 Exhibit B-83, #33 Exhibit B-84, #34 Exhibit B-85, #35 Exhibit B-86, #36 Exhibit B-87, #37 Exhibit B-88, #38 Exhibit B-89, #39 Exhibit B-90, #40 Exhibit B-91, #41 Exhibit B-92, #42 Exhibit B-93, #43 Exhibit B-94, #44 Exhibit B-95, #45 Exhibit B-96, #46 Exhibit B-97, #47 Exhibit B-98, #48 Exhibit B-99, #49 Exhibit B-100)(Sechler, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1768 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit B, #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit B-3, #4 Exhibit B-4, #5 Exhibit B-5, #6 Exhibit B-6, #7 Exhibit B-7, #8 Exhibit B-8, #9 Exhibit B-9, #10 Exhibit B-10, #11 Exhibit B-11, #12 Exhibit B-12, #13 Exhibit B-13, #14 Exhibit B-14, #15 Exhibit B-15, #16 Exhibit B-16, #17 Exhibit B-17, #18 Exhibit B-18, #19 Exhibit B-19, #20 Exhibit B-20, #21 Exhibit B-21, #22 Exhibit B-22, #23 Exhibit B-23, #24 Exhibit B-24, #25 Exhibit B-25, #26 Exhibit B-26, #27 Exhibit B-27, #28 Exhibit B-28, #29 Exhibit B-29, #30 Exhibit B-30, #31 Exhibit B-31, #32 Exhibit B-32, #33 Exhibit B-33, #34 Exhibit B-34, #35 Exhibit B-35, #36 Exhibit B-36, #37 Exhibit B-37, #38 Exhibit B-38, #39 Exhibit B-39, #40 Exhibit B-40, #41 Exhibit B-41, #42 Exhibit B-42, #43 Exhibit B-43, #44 Exhibit B-44, #45 Exhibit B-45, #46 Exhibit B-46, #47 Exhibit B-47, #48 Exhibit B-48, #49 Exhibit B-49, #50 Exhibit B-50)(Sechler, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1767 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit A-101, #1 Exhibit A-102, #2 Exhibit A-103, #3 Exhibit A-104, #4 Exhibit A-105, #5 Exhibit A-106, #6 Exhibit A-107, #7 Exhibit A-108, #8 Exhibit A-109, #9 Exhibit A-110, #10 Exhibit A-111, #11 Exhibit A-112, #12 Exhibit A-113, #13 Exhibit A-114, #14 Exhibit A-115, #15 Exhibit A-116, #16 Exhibit A-117, #17 Exhibit A-118, #18 Exhibit A-119, #19 Exhibit A-120, #20 Exhibit A-121, #21 Exhibit A-122, #22 Exhibit A-123, #23 Exhibit A-124, #24 Exhibit A-125, #25 Exhibit A-126, #26 Exhibit A-127, #27 Exhibit A-128, #28 Exhibit A-129, #29 Exhibit A-130, #30 Exhibit A-131, #31 Exhibit A-132, #32 Exhibit A-133)(Sechler, Philip)
August 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1766 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1765 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: Main Document Exhibit A-51, #1 Exhibit A-52, #2 Exhibit A-53, #3 Exhibit A-54, #4 Exhibit A-55, #5 Exhibit A-56, #6 Exhibit A-57, #7 Exhibit A-58, #8 Exhibit A-59, #9 Exhibit A-60, #10 Exhibit A-61, #11 Exhibit A-62, #12 Exhibit A-63, #13 Exhibit A-64, #14 Exhibit A-65, #15 Exhibit A-66, #16 Exhibit A-67, #17 Exhibit A-68, #18 Exhibit A-69, #19 Exhibit A-70, #20 Exhibit A-71, #21 Exhibit A-72, #22 Exhibit A-73, #23 Exhibit A-74, #24 Exhibit A-75, #25 Exhibit A-76, #26 Exhibit A-77, #27 Exhibit A-78, #28 Exhibit A-79, #29 Exhibit A-80, #30 Exhibit A-81, #31 Exhibit A-82, #32 Exhibit A-83, #33 Exhibit A-84, #34 Exhibit A-85, #35 Exhibit A-86, #36 Exhibit A-87, #37 Exhibit A-88, #38 Exhibit A-89, #39 Exhibit A-90, #40 Exhibit A-91, #41 Exhibit A-92, #42 Exhibit A-93, #43 Exhibit A-94, #44 Exhibit A-95, #45 Exhibit A-96, #46 Exhibit A-97, #47 Exhibit A-98, #48 Exhibit A-99, #49 Exhibit A-100)(Sechler, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1765 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment and Mylan's Daubert Motions Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Proposed Sealing Protocol by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit A-13, #15 Exhibit A-14, #16 Exhibit A-15, #17 Exhibit A-16, #18 Exhibit A-17, #19 Exhibit A-18, #20 Exhibit A-19, #21 Exhibit A-20, #22 Exhibit A-21, #23 Exhibit A-22, #24 Exhibit A-23, #25 Exhibit A-24, #26 Exhibit A-25, #27 Exhibit A-26, #28 Exhibit A-27, #29 Exhibit A-28, #30 Exhibit A-29, #31 Exhibit A-30, #32 Exhibit A-31, #33 Exhibit A-32, #34 Exhibit A-33, #35 Exhibit A-34, #36 Exhibit A-35, #37 Exhibit A-36, #38 Exhibit A-37, #39 Exhibit A-38, #40 Exhibit A-39, #41 Exhibit A-40, #42 Exhibit A-41, #43 Exhibit A-42, #44 Exhibit A-43, #45 Exhibit A-44, #46 Exhibit A-45, #47 Exhibit A-46, #48 Exhibit A-47, #49 Exhibit A-48, #50 Exhibit A-49, #51 Exhibit A-50)(Sechler, Philip) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/02/2019. (mg))
August 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1764 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in its Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1764 SANOFI CASE -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Portions of Exhibits in its Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit S-1, #3 Exhibit S-2, #4 Exhibit S-3, #5 Attachment B, #6 Attachment C, #7 Exhibit M-001, #8 Exhibit M-002, #9 Exhibit M-003, #10 Exhibit M-004, #11 Exhibit M-005, #12 Exhibit M-006, #13 Exhibit M-007, #14 Exhibit M-008, #15 Exhibit M-009, #16 Exhibit M-010, #17 Exhibit M-011, #18 Exhibit M-012, #19 Exhibit M-013, #20 Exhibit M-014, #21 Exhibit M-015, #22 Exhibit M-016, #23 Exhibit M-017, #24 Exhibit M-018, #25 Exhibit M-019, #26 Exhibit M-020, #27 Exhibit M-021, #28 Exhibit M-022, #29 Exhibit M-023, #30 Exhibit M-024, #31 Exhibit M-025, #32 Exhibit M-026, #33 Exhibit M-027, #34 Exhibit M-028, #35 Exhibit M-029, #36 Exhibit M-030, #37 Exhibit M-031, #38 Exhibit M-032, #39 Exhibit M-033, #40 Exhibit M-034, #41 Exhibit M-035, #42 Exhibit M-036, #43 Exhibit M-037, #44 Exhibit M-038, #45 Exhibit M-039, #46 Exhibit M-040, #47 Exhibit M-041, #48 Exhibit M-042, #49 Exhibit M-043, #50 Exhibit M-044, #51 Exhibit M-045, #52 Exhibit M-046, #53 Exhibit M-047, #54 Exhibit M-048, #55 Exhibit M-049, #56 Exhibit M-050, #57 Exhibit M-051, #58 Exhibit M-052, #59 Exhibit M-053, #60 Exhibit M-054, #61 Exhibit M-055, #62 Exhibit M-056, #63 Exhibit M-057, #64 Exhibit M-058, #65 Exhibit M-059, #66 Exhibit M-060, #67 Exhibit M-061, #68 Exhibit M-062, #69 Exhibit M-063, #70 Exhibit M-064, #71 Exhibit M-065, #72 Exhibit M-066, #73 Exhibit M-067, #74 Exhibit M-068, #75 Exhibit M-069, #76 Exhibit M-070, #77 Exhibit M-071, #78 Exhibit M-072, #79 Exhibit M-073, #80 Exhibit M-074, #81 Exhibit M-075, #82 Exhibit M-076, #83 Exhibit M-077, #84 Exhibit M-078, #85 Exhibit M-079, #86 Exhibit M-080, #87 Exhibit M-081, #88 Exhibit M-082, #89 Exhibit M-083, #90 Exhibit M-084, #91 Exhibit M-085, #92 Exhibit M-086, #93 Exhibit M-087, #94 Exhibit M-088, #95 Exhibit M-089, #96 Exhibit M-090, #97 Exhibit M-091, #98 Attachment D, #99 Attachment E, #100 Attachment F, #101 Attachment G, #102 Attachment H, #103 Attachment I)(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Motion Referral Removed on 08/02/2019. (mg))
August 2, 2019 Filing 1763 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Unopposed MOTION to Designate as Confidential Portions of the Class Certification Hearing Transcripts by Defendants Mylan, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: 1759 Order. (Fries, Brian) (Modified on 8/6/2019 to reflect this is a Motion. (mg))
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #1732 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch. Class Plaintiffs may conduct another deposition of Defendant Heather Bresch, not to exceed two hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/2/2019. (ts)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1761 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER - Liaison Counsel informally has advised the court that defendants and class plaintiffs have agreed to a mechanism to ensure "that everything that the parties have asked [the court] to consider in making [the class certification] decision is available to the reviewing court" in the event of an appeal. Specifically, they propose that each party to the certification dispute will submit a flash drive to Chambers that includes "all exhibits, deposition testimony, and demonstratives used or referenced during Phase I and Phase II of the class certification hearing." By this Order, the court approves the parties' proposal and, consistent with the court's Administrative Procedure for Filing, Signing, and Verifying Pleadings and Paper by Electronic Means (available on the court's website), the court grants their informal motion to submit the flash drives in quasi-conventional format. Each party to the certification motion must submit, within 20 days of this Order, a flash drive to Deputy Clerk Megan Garrett, c/o Chambers of United States District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Also, consistent with Article IV (C)(1) of the court's Administrative Procedure, each submitting party must prepare and electronically file an Index of the materials submitted to chambers in conventional format under the terms of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/02/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1760 ORDER CONTINUING TOLLING OF DISCOVERY MOTION DEADLINE. On July 10, 2019, the Court entered an order allowing Class Plaintiffs' deadline to file a discovery motion related to non-party CVS Health Corporation to remain tolled, and ordered Class Plaintiffs to report on the status of the matter no later than August 2, 2019 (ECF No. 1713 ). Class Plaintiffs have timely submitted their report. For good cause shown, Class Plaintiffs' deadline to file a discovery motion, motion to compel, or Rule 45(g) motion for Contempt against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation remains tolled until Class Plaintiffs have had a reasonable opportunity to meet and confer with CVS concerning questions posed to CVS about certain of the documents CVS produced in April 2019. No later than August 30, 2019, Class Plaintiffs shall report on the status of this matter via email to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER directing the parties to file a motion identifying the factors that justify maintaining the seal on the designated portion(s) of the transcript. On April 30, 2019, the court issued an Order Governing Use of Restricted Information During Class Certification Hearing. Doc. #1557 . Among other things, the Order outlined a procedure for the parties to follow for seeking redactions from the transcript of the certification hearing. The court understands that the parties have communicated with the court reporter about their agreed redactions. And the court reporter has filed redacted transcripts with those requested redactions. Docs. #1724 , #1726 . The court's April 30, 2019 Order required the parties to file a motion identifying the factors that justify maintaining the seal on the designated portion(s) of the transcript within 10 days of the confidential designations. Doc. #1557 at 6. The docket does not reflect that the parties have filed such a motion. The court thus directs the parties to file a motion within 10 days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/01/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1758 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Amended Tenth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Mylan by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1757 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Heather Bresch and Eleventh Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Mylan by Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1756 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Mylan Defendants' Amended Fourth Set of Document Requests to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1755 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Mylan Defendants' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1754 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Mylan Defendants' Third Set of Requests for Admission to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1753 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to the Pfizer Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1752 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to the Pfizer Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1751 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to the Pfizer Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission to Class Plaintiffs by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1750 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1634 Joint Motion to Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Mylan's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Counsel is directed to file forthwith portions of Exhibit 6 to Mylan's opposition to class plaintiffs' motion for class certification, with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. It is further Ordered by the Court that the parties shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to file a version of Exhibit 6 consistent with the proposed redactions in Documents 1634-1 through 1634-6. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's #299 Order Denying Sealed Access. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/31/2019. (gw)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1749 ORDER denying #1742 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Expedited Briefing Schedule on Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. The Court will not expedite the response and reply deadlines for Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days (ECF No. #1740 ). Pending ruling on the latter motion (ECF No. #1740 ), the Court holds in abeyance Class Plaintiffs' deadline to produce their merits expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1748 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1742 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days (Doc. #1740 ). (Sarko, Lynn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1747 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories to Heather Bresch by Heather Bresch. (Levin, Adam)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1746 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan Defendants' Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Mylan by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1745 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1732 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch based on Highly Inculpatory Documents Produced by Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals Two Days after the Class Certification Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A Declaration of Arthur Shingler) (Burns, Warren)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1741 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to to Preliminarily File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch. Class Plaintiffs may preliminarily file under seal their reply in support of #1732 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch and Exhibit 1 thereto. Counsel for Class Plaintiffs is directed to file forthwith the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's Order Denying Sealed Access (ECF No. 299). The Court approves the sealing process, as agreed to by Defendants, described in Class Plaintiffs' motion. No later than August 3, 2019, all parties and non-parties who wish to keep information under seal will file a renewed motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1743 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1742 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days (Doc. 1740) - The Mylan and Pfizer Defendants' Joint Opposition in Part to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Expedited Briefing Schedule on Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days. (Fries, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1742 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Extend the Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days (Doc. 1740) by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Burns, Warren)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1741 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Arthur Shingler) (Burns, Warren)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1740 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION for extension of time of Remaining Deadlines by 90 Days by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Burns, Warren)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1739 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE to #1715 Statement Response Letter from Defendants to Judge Crabtree Regarding Class Plaintiffs Report Regarding Lexecon Waivers by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1738 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re #1732 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch based on Highly Inculpatory Documents Produced by Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals Two Days after the Class Certification Hearing, #1736 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Mylan Defendants' Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Mylan CEO Heather Bresch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Levin, Adam)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1736 Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Mylan CEO Heather Bresch. Mylan may preliminarily file under seal its opposition to #1732 Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to re-depose Heather Bresch and Exhibits A through D thereto. Counsel for Mylan is directed to file forthwith the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's #299 Order Denying Sealed Access. The Court approves the sealing process, as agreed to by Class Plaintiffs, described in Mylan's motion. No later than August 7, 2019, all parties and non-parties who wish to keep information under seal will file a renewed motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1736 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Mylan Defendants' Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Mylan CEO Heather Bresch by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Levin, Adam)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1735 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Joseph Haggerty on August 6, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition for Joseph Haggerty)(Burns, Warren)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1734 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) (Third Amended Notice) on August 8, 2019. (Sarko, Lynn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER -- The court sets the next discovery status conference for Monday, August 12, 2019, at 01:30 PM CDT by telephone conference. No later than August 5, 2019, the parties shall submit three-page status reports via email to the chambers of Judges Crabtree and James. No later than the morning of August 8, 2019, the parties shall submit to both chambers a one-page proposed agenda for the discovery conference. To join the conference line, counsel shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 8354715. Counsel will follow the instructions to join the call. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1732 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch based on Highly Inculpatory Documents Produced by Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals Two Days after the Class Certification Hearing by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Burns, Warren) Mo
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER SHORTENING RESPONSE/REPLY DEADLINES. Mylan shall file its response to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch no later than July 24, 2019. The response is limited to five (5) pages. Class Plaintiffs' reply is due no later than July 26, 2019, and shall not exceed three (3) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting #1729 Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch Based on Highly Inculpatory Documents Produced by Non-Party Teva Pharmaceuticals Two Days After the Class Certification Hearing and for Approval of Sealing Process. Class Plaintiffs may preliminarily file under seal their motion for leave to re-depose Heather Bresch and exhibits 1 through 5 thereto. Counsel for Class Plaintiffs is directed to file forthwith the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's #299 Order Denying Sealed Access. The Court approves the sealing process, as agreed to by Mylan, described in Class Plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) Modified on 7/18/2019 (gw).
July 18, 2019 Filing 1729 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Second, Limited Deposition of Heath Bresch, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Burns, Warren)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1728 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Pfizer Inc; King Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. on July 19, 2019, July 23, 2019, July 24, 2019, July 26, 2019, July 30, 2019. (Burns, Warren)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1727 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of John Wilmot on July 30, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition for John Wilmot) (Burns, Warren)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1726 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Class Certification, Phase II, held June 12, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter: Kimberly Greiner. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber for 90 days from the filing of the original unredacted transcript. After that date (see original transcript filing), the transcript may be obtained through PACER. (kg) Modified on 7/17/2019 (gw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1725 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Class Certification, Phase II held June 12, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter: Kimberly Greiner. (kg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1724 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Class Certification, Phase I, held June 11, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter: Kimberly Greiner. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber for 90 days from the filing of the original unredacted transcript. After that date (see original transcript filing), the transcript may be obtained through PACER. (kg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1723 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Class Certification, Phase I, held June 11, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter: Kimberly Greiner. (kg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1722 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jeffrey Rennecker on July 24, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition for Jeffrey Rennecker)(Burns, Warren)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1721 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jeffrey Myers on July 19, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition for Jeffrey Myers)(Burns, Warren)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1720 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Pfizer Inc.; King Pharmaeuticals, Inc.; and Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc. on July 19, 2019, July 23, 2019, July 24, 2019, July 26, 2019, TBD. (Burns, Warren)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1719 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition of Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty, L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Levin, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1718 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Presentation Used in Phase I of the Class Certification Hearing by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Presentation)(Fries, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1717 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jill Ondos on July 31, 2019. (Cox, Spencer)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1716 AMENDED NOTICE by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) (Second Amended Notice) on July 17, 2019 and August 6, 2019 (Sarko, Lynn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1715 STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Lexecon Waivers by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sarko, Lynn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1714 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Powerpoint Slides Offered by Class Plaintiffs During Class Certification Proceedings by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Einer Elhauge Expert Witness, #2 Exhibit B- Meredith Rosenthal Expert Witness, #3 Exhibit C- Oral Argument)(Sharp, Rex)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1713 ORDER CONTINUING TOLLING OF DISCOVERY MOTION DEADLINE. On June 5, 2019, the Court granted Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of L.R. 37.1 Time Limit to File Discovery Motion, Motion to Compel, and/or Rule 45(g) Motion for Contempt Against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation (ECF No. 1612), and ordered Class Plaintiffs to report on the status of the matter no later than July 10, 2019. Class Plaintiffs have timely submitted their report. For good cause shown, Class Plaintiffs' deadline to file a discovery motion, motion to compel, or Rule 45(g) motion for Contempt against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation remains tolled until Class Plaintiffs have had a reasonable opportunity to meet and confer with CVS following completion of Class Plaintiffs' review of the documents CVS produced in April 2019. No later than August 2, 2019, Class Plaintiffs shall report on the status of this matter via email to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ts)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1712 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Christopher Denn on July 25, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition)(Cox, Spencer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1711 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #1633 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and CLASS PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #1554 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 97, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 98, #3 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 100, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 102, #5 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 103, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 111)(Cox, Spencer)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1710 NOTICE by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Jill Ondos on July 30, 2019 (Cox, Spencer)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1709 NOTICE by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Joseph Divinagracia on July 25, 2019 (Cox, Spencer)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1708 ORDER granting #1707 Mylan's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Responsive to Class Plaintiffs' Eighth Requests for Production. The deadline set forth in the order dated June 20, 2019 (ECF No. 1638) for Mylan to produce agreed-upon documents responsive to Class Plaintiffs' Eighth Set of Requests for Production to Mylan is extended to July 19, 2019. Accordingly, the parties are relieved of the July 9, 2019 deadline to file status reports regarding this issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1707 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Heather Bresch, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Foster, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1706 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Paul Muma on July 23, 2019. (Hudson, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1705 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Maissa F. Chouraki as to Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1704 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Paul Muma on July 12, 2019. (Hudson, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1703 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan Defendants' Fourth Set of Interrogatories, Amended Fourth Set of Document Requests, and Third Set of Requests for Admission to Class Plaintiffs by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.. (Fries, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1702 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pfizer's First Set of Requests for Production by Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Rebein, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1701 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pfizer's First Set of Requests for Admission by Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Rebein, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pfizer's First Set of Interrogatories by All Defendants. (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY). (Rebein, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1699 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Heather Bresch and Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Rex)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1698 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Mylan Defendants by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Rex)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1697 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. Subpoena to be issued to Dr. Phillip L. Lieberman. (Sharp, Rex)
June 29, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D., #1679 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D., #1680 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1676 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner , #1678 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1674 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur, #1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D.. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1696 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 136) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 137, #2 Exhibit 138, #3 Exhibit 139, #4 Exhibit 140, #5 Exhibit 141, #6 Exhibit 142, #7 Exhibit 143, #8 Exhibit 144, #9 Exhibit 145, #10 Exhibit 146, #11 Exhibit 147, #12 Exhibit 148, #13 Exhibit 149, #14 Exhibit 150, #15 Exhibit 151, #16 Exhibit 152)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1695 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 106) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 107, #2 Exhibit 108, #3 Exhibit 109, #4 Exhibit 110, #5 Exhibit 111, #6 Exhibit 112, #7 Exhibit 113, #8 Exhibit 114, #9 Exhibit 115, #10 Exhibit 116, #11 Exhibit 117, #12 Exhibit 118, #13 Exhibit 119, #14 Exhibit 120, #15 Exhibit 121, #16 Exhibit 122, #17 Exhibit 123, #18 Exhibit 124, #19 Exhibit 125, #20 Exhibit 126, #21 Exhibit 127, #22 Exhibit 128, #23 Exhibit 129, #24 Exhibit 130, #25 Exhibit 131, #26 Exhibit 132, #27 Exhibit 133, #28 Exhibit 134, #29 Exhibit 135)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1694 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 76) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90, #15 Exhibit 91, #16 Exhibit 92, #17 Exhibit 93, #18 Exhibit 94, #19 Exhibit 95, #20 Exhibit 96, #21 Exhibit 97, #22 Exhibit 98, #23 Exhibit 99, #24 Exhibit 100, #25 Exhibit 101, #26 Exhibit 102, #27 Exhibit 103, #28 Exhibit 104, #29 Exhibit 105)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1693 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 46) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60, #15 Exhibit 61, #16 Exhibit 62, #17 Exhibit 63, #18 Exhibit 64, #19 Exhibit 65, #20 Exhibit 66, #21 Exhibit 67, #22 Exhibit 68, #23 Exhibit 69, #24 Exhibit 70, #25 Exhibit 71, #26 Exhibit 72, #27 Exhibit 73, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 75)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1692 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hochstadt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit List (Exhibit Index), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1691 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1690 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 121) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122, #2 Exhibit 123, #3 Exhibit 124, #4 Exhibit 126, #5 Exhibit 127, #6 Exhibit 128, #7 Exhibit 129, #8 Exhibit 130, #9 Exhibit 131, #10 Exhibit 132, #11 Exhibit 133, #12 Exhibit 134, #13 Exhibit 135, #14 Exhibit 136, #15 Exhibit 137, #16 Exhibit 138, #17 Exhibit 139, #18 Exhibit 141, #19 Exhibit 142, #20 Exhibit 143, #21 Exhibit 144, #22 Exhibit 145, #23 Exhibit 146, #24 Exhibit 147, #25 Exhibit 148, #26 Exhibit 149, #27 Exhibit 150, #28 Exhibit 151)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1689 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 91) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 94, #4 Exhibit 95, #5 Exhibit 96, #6 Exhibit 97, #7 Exhibit 99, #8 Exhibit 100, #9 Exhibit 101, #10 Exhibit 102, #11 Exhibit 103, #12 Exhibit 104, #13 Exhibit 105, #14 Exhibit 106, #15 Exhibit 108, #16 Exhibit 109, #17 Exhibit 110, #18 Exhibit 111, #19 Exhibit 112, #20 Exhibit 113, #21 Exhibit 114, #22 Exhibit 115, #23 Exhibit 116, #24 Exhibit 117, #25 Exhibit 118, #26 Exhibit 119, #27 Exhibit 120)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1688 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 61) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 67, #5 Exhibit 68, #6 Exhibit 69, #7 Exhibit 70, #8 Exhibit 72, #9 Exhibit 73, #10 Exhibit 74, #11 Exhibit 75, #12 Exhibit 76, #13 Exhibit 77, #14 Exhibit 78, #15 Exhibit 79, #16 Exhibit 81, #17 Exhibit 82, #18 Exhibit 83, #19 Exhibit 84, #20 Exhibit 85, #21 Exhibit 86, #22 Exhibit 87, #23 Exhibit 88, #24 Exhibit 89, #25 Exhibit 90)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1687 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Exhibit 31) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39, #8 Exhibit 40, #9 Exhibit 41, #10 Exhibit 42, #11 Exhibit 43, #12 Exhibit 44, #13 Exhibit 45, #14 Exhibit 46, #15 Exhibit 47, #16 Exhibit 48, #17 Exhibit 49, #18 Exhibit 50, #19 Exhibit 51, #20 Exhibit 52, #21 Exhibit 53, #22 Exhibit 54, #23 Exhibit 55, #24 Exhibit 56, #25 Exhibit 57, #26 Exhibit 58, #27 Exhibit 60)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1686 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Exhibit List (Sealed Exhibit Index), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 24, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit 30)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1685 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven N. Wiggins, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1684 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1683 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1682 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D. by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1681 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1680 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 26) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45, #20 Exhibit 46, #21 Exhibit 47, #22 Exhibit 48, #23 Exhibit 49, #24 Exhibit 50, #25 Exhibit 51, #26 Exhibit 52, #27 Exhibit 53, #28 Exhibit 54, #29 Exhibit 55)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1680 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D., #2 Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Fiona M. Scott Morton, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1679 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven Wiggins, Ph.D., #2 Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Steven Wiggins, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1678 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D., #2 Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Mary Ann Michelis, M.D., #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1677 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hochstadt, #2 Exhibit List (Exhibit Index), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1676 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur, #2 Memorandum in Support of Mylan's Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Eduardo Schur, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1675 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Thomas Varner by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1674 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit List (Sealed Exhibit Index), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1673 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Attachments: #1 Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Mylan's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1672 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 226) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 227, #2 Exhibit 228, #3 Exhibit 229, #4 Exhibit 230, #5 Exhibit 231, #6 Exhibit 232, #7 Exhibit 233, #8 Exhibit 234, #9 Exhibit 235, #10 Exhibit 236, #11 Exhibit 237, #12 Exhibit 238, #13 Exhibit 239, #14 Exhibit 240, #15 Exhibit 241, #16 Exhibit 242, #17 Exhibit 243, #18 Exhibit 244, #19 Exhibit 245, #20 Exhibit 246, #21 Exhibit 247, #22 Exhibit 248, #23 Exhibit 249, #24 Exhibit 250)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1671 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 201) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 202, #2 Exhibit 203, #3 Exhibit 204, #4 Exhibit 205, #5 Exhibit 206, #6 Exhibit 207, #7 Exhibit 208, #8 Exhibit 209, #9 Exhibit 210, #10 Exhibit 211, #11 Exhibit 212, #12 Exhibit 213, #13 Exhibit 214, #14 Exhibit 215, #15 Exhibit 216, #16 Exhibit 217, #17 Exhibit 218, #18 Exhibit 219, #19 Exhibit 220, #20 Exhibit 221, #21 Exhibit 222, #22 Exhibit 223, #23 Exhibit 224, #24 Exhibit 225)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1670 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 176) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 177, #2 Exhibit 178, #3 Exhibit 179, #4 Exhibit 180, #5 Exhibit 181, #6 Exhibit 182, #7 Exhibit 183, #8 Exhibit 184, #9 Exhibit 185, #10 Exhibit 186, #11 Exhibit 187, #12 Exhibit 188, #13 Exhibit 189, #14 Exhibit 190, #15 Exhibit 191, #16 Exhibit 192, #17 Exhibit 193, #18 Exhibit 194, #19 Exhibit 195, #20 Exhibit 196, #21 Exhibit 197, #22 Exhibit 198, #23 Exhibit 199, #24 Exhibit 200)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1669 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hochstadt, #2 Exhibit List (Exhibit Index), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1668 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 151) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 152, #2 Exhibit 153, #3 Exhibit 154, #4 Exhibit 155, #5 Exhibit 156, #6 Exhibit 157, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 161, #11 Exhibit 162, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 164, #14 Exhibit 165, #15 Exhibit 166, #16 Exhibit 167, #17 Exhibit 168, #18 Exhibit 169, #19 Exhibit 170, #20 Exhibit 171, #21 Exhibit 172, #22 Exhibit 173, #23 Exhibit 174, #24 Exhibit 175)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , #1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula , #1664 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1667 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 126) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 127, #2 Exhibit 128, #3 Exhibit 129, #4 Exhibit 130, #5 Exhibit 131, #6 Exhibit 132, #7 Exhibit 133, #8 Exhibit 134, #9 Exhibit 135, #10 Exhibit 136, #11 Exhibit 137, #12 Exhibit 138, #13 Exhibit 139, #14 Exhibit 140, #15 Exhibit 141, #16 Exhibit 142, #17 Exhibit 143, #18 Exhibit 144, #19 Exhibit 145, #20 Exhibit 146, #21 Exhibit 147, #22 Exhibit 148, #23 Exhibit 149, #24 Exhibit 150)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1666 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Expert Gary Zieziula by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1665 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 101) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 102, #2 Exhibit 103, #3 Exhibit 104, #4 Exhibit 105, #5 Exhibit 106, #6 Exhibit 107, #7 Exhibit 108, #8 Exhibit 109, #9 Exhibit 110, #10 Exhibit 111, #11 Exhibit 112, #12 Exhibit 113, #13 Exhibit 114, #14 Exhibit 115, #15 Exhibit 116, #16 Exhibit 117, #17 Exhibit 118, #18 Exhibit 119, #19 Exhibit 120, #20 Exhibit 121, #21 Exhibit 122, #22 Exhibit 123, #23 Exhibit 124, #24 Exhibit 125)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1664 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Sealed Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Hochstadt, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1663 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 76) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90, #15 Exhibit 91, #16 Exhibit 92, #17 Exhibit 93, #18 Exhibit 94, #19 Exhibit 95, #20 Exhibit 96, #21 Exhibit 97, #22 Exhibit 98, #23 Exhibit 99, #24 Exhibit 100)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1662 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 51) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1661 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Exhibit 26) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45, #20 Exhibit 46, #21 Exhibit 47, #22 Exhibit 48, #23 Exhibit 49, #24 Exhibit 50)(Sechler, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1660 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Memorandum for Summary Judgment, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25)(Sechler, Philip)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1659 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Heather Bresch by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Pfizer by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1657 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Mylan by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1656 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati on June 25, 2019 by Personal (Davidson, Stuart)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1655 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs executed upon Frank Casty, M.D. on June 25, 2019 by Personal (Davidson, Stuart)
June 26, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1654 Joint MOTION Sanofi and Mylan's Joint Motion to Adopt Sealing Protocol for Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1654 Joint MOTION Sanofi and Mylan's Joint Motion to Adopt Sealing Protocol for Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Mayrell, Ralph)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER - Consistent with the discussion near the end of Phase II of the class certification hearing on June 12, 2019, the court orders lead counsel for the putative class plaintiffs to file a report, no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/25/2019. (gw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1652 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Frank Casty, M.D. on July 23, 2019. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1651 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Party Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1650 SANOFI CASE -- ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Roy T. Englert, Jr. on behalf of Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Englert, Roy)
June 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1647 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #1649 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andrew K. Torrance. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1649 SEALED MOTION by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Gandesha Declaration, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3 to Gandesha Declaration, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4 to Gandesha Declaration, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5 to Gandesha Declaration, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6 to Gandesha Declaration)(Rebein, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1648 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1647 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Levin, Adam)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1647 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit D)(Levin, Adam)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1646 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1644 Reply to Response to Motion, by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sarko, Lynn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1645 NOTICE of Presentation Used in Class Certification Hearing by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Presentation)(Fries, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1644 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1587 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Sarko, Lynn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1643 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1584 MOTION to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss (Sarko, Lynn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1642 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A) and 26(e)(1) by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Davidson, Stuart)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1641 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1640 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I)(Levin, Adam)
June 21, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1640 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1640 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #3 Exhibit G)(Levin, Adam)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mylan's Rule 26(a)(1) Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures in Class Cases by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.. (Levin, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1638 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER. Class Plaintiffs sought further Court involvement following #1581 the Court's order ruling on #1559 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Third Set of Interrogatories and Eighth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. This order provides additional direction. Class Plaintiffs and Mylan have until June 28, 2019 to confer as directed herein. Mylan shall produce any agreed-upon documents no later than July 9, 2019. If they do not agree, each side shall file a status report of no more than three pages by July 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/20/2019. (ts)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1637 REDACTION of Exhibits in Support of Mylan Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 71, #2 Exhibit 72, #3 Exhibit 73, #4 Exhibit 74, #5 Exhibit 75, #6 Exhibit 76, #7 Exhibit 77, #8 Exhibit 78, #9 Exhibit 79, #10 Exhibit 80, #11 Exhibit 81, #12 Exhibit 82, #13 Exhibit 83, #14 Exhibit 84, #15 Exhibit 85, #16 Exhibit 86, #17 Exhibit 87, #18 Exhibit 88, #19 Exhibit 89, #20 Exhibit 90, #21 Exhibit 91, #22 Exhibit 92, #23 Exhibit 93, #24 Exhibit 94, #25 Exhibit 95, #26 Exhibit 96, #27 Exhibit 97, #28 Exhibit 99, #29 Exhibit 100, #30 Exhibit 101)(Levin, Adam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1636 REDACTION of Mylan Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 24, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 27, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 31, #18 Exhibit 32, #19 Exhibit 33, #20 Exhibit 36, #21 Exhibit 37, #22 Exhibit 38, #23 Exhibit 40, #24 Exhibit 41, #25 Exhibit 42, #26 Exhibit 44, #27 Exhibit 49, #28 Exhibit 51, #29 Exhibit 53, #30 Exhibit 58, #31 Exhibit 63, #32 Exhibit 64, #33 Exhibit 65, #34 Exhibit 69)(Levin, Adam)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 ORDER withdrawing #1628 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel The Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. In light of Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of this motion (ECF No. 1615) and the order granting the motion and withdrawing the underlying motion to compel (ECF No. 1616), this unredacted version of the underlying motion to compel is likewise withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1634 Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Mylan's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1634 Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Mylan's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 6, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 6, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 6, Part 4, #5 Exhibit 6, Part 5, #6 Exhibit 6, Part 6)(Levin, Adam)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk: The docket text of #1633 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal has been modified to reflect that access to sealed documents is governed by the Court's Order Denying Sealed Access (document 299). (kao)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1633 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' request for leave to preliminarily file under seal in Doc. #1554 is granted; the "Mylan Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Class Plaintiffs' Class CertificationReply Brief" (Doc. #1568 ) is granted in part and denied in part; OptumRx's motion to seal two exhibits (Doc. #1591 ) is granted in part and denied in part; plaintiffs shall file redacted versions of the exhibits offered in support of their reply brief on certification no earlier than 14 days from the date of this Order and no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. The 14-day delay in the filing of the redacted versions is intended to provide OptumRx adequate time to decide if it wishes to file an interlocutory appeal of the court's partial denial of its motion. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed documents is governed by the Court's #299 Order Denying Sealed Access. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 6/14/2019. (heo) Modified on 6/14/2019 to correct text regarding sealed access. (kao)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1632 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: IN COURT HEARING - Phase II of Class Certification Hearing held on 6/12/2019 re #1353 Motion to Certify Class. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: #1 Witness Sheet) (mig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1631 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: IN COURT HEARING - Phase I of Class Certification Hearing held on 6/11/2019. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1630 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE OF CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING: [NEW TIME] THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. In Court Hearing for Phase II of the Class Certification Hearing is RESET for 6/12/2019 at 01:00 PM Central time in KC Courtroom 643 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel, the parties, and the public to listen to the hearing. Participants on the phone will NOT be able to speak or otherwise participate in the hearing. This is a listening line only. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 8354715. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (mig)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1629 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1628 MOTION to Compel The Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Nintht Set of Requests for Production of Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit Q, #8 Exhibit R, #9 Exhibit S, #10 Exhibit T, #11 Exhibit U, #12 Exhibit V, #13 Exhibit W, #14 Exhibit X, #15 Exhibit Y, #16 Exhibit Z, #17 Exhibit AA, #18 Exhibit EE, #19 Exhibit FF, #20 Exhibit GG, #21 Exhibit HH, #22 Exhibit II, #23 Exhibit JJ)(Sarko, Lynn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1628 MOTION to Compel The Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Nintht Set of Requests for Production of Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alison E. Chase, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit BB, #12 Exhibit CC, #13 Exhibit DD)(Sarko, Lynn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1627 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Consumer Class Plaintiffs re: #1596 Index of Exhibits for Phase I Class Certification Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Sarko, Lynn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1626 NOTICE by Consumer Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Mylan N.V., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on July 17, 2019 (Sharp, Rex)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1625 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re: #1598 Index of Exhibits, Amended. (Levin, Adam)
June 10, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1624 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1624 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Levin, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1623 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP re #1584 MOTION to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Levin, Adam)
June 7, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1622 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #1621 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion to Exclude Meredith Rosenthal. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1622 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A)(Cox, Spencer)
June 7, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1620 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion to Exclude Andrew W. Torrance. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1621 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion to Exclude Meredith Rosenthal by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Exclude Meredith Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Rosenthal Depo Excerpt)(Sharp, Rex)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1620 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion to Exclude Andrew W. Torrance by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Chen Declaration, #4 Exhibit Torrance Depo Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Torrance Declaration, #6 Exhibit KU Law Letter)(Sharp, Rex)
June 7, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1589 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Their Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. James Hughes. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1619 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re #1557 Order,, Set Hearings, Restricted Documents for Phase I Class Certification Hearing. (Sharp, Rex)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1618 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: After consultation with the parties, the court cancels the In Court Hearing set for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM Central time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 ORDER finding as moot #1599 Mylan's Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production. Class Plaintiffs have withdrawn the underlying motion (ECF No. 1616), thereby negating the need for a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 ORDER regarding #1615 Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Their Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. The Motion to Compel (ECF No. 1577-1) is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1615 MOTION to Withdraw #1577 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sarko, Lynn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1614 LETTER re: #1608 Memorandum and Order regarding (1527-3) by Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. (Buchweitz, Yehudah)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1613 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE FOR UPCOMING IN COURT HEARING ON 6/10/2019: An in-person In Court Hearing is set for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM Central time in Courtroom #643. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel, the parties, and the public to listen to the hearing. Participants on the phone will NOT be able to speak or otherwise participate in the hearing. This is a listening line only. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 8354715. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (mig)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1612 ORDER granting Class Plaintiffs' #1611 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of L.R. 37.1 Time Limit to File Discovery Motion, Motion to Compel, and/or Rule 45(g) Motion for Contempt Against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation. For good cause shown, Class Plaintiffs' deadline to file a discovery motion, motion to compel, or Rule 45(g) motion for Contempt against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation is tolled until Class Plaintiffs have had a reasonable opportunity to meet and confer with CVS following completion of Class Plaintiffs' review of the documents CVS produced in April 2019. No later than July 10, 2019, Class Plaintiffs shall report on the status of this matter via email to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1611 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Discovery Motion, Motion to Compel, and/or Rule 45(g) Motion for Contempt Against Non-Party CVS Health Corporation by In Re Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1610 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Miscellaneous OptumRx, Inc. re: #1591 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support - Filed Preliminarily Under Seal - for Continued Sealing of Two Highly Confidential Exhibits (Schlozman, Bradley)
June 4, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1609 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal in Connection with Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Professor James Hughes. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1609 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal in Connection with Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Professor James Hughes by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Testimony of Professor James Hughes, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit G) (Fries, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1608 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The process for proposing seal and redaction requests in Pfizer Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Preliminarily Under Seal and for Approval of Sealing Process (Doc. #1507 ) is approved. The Pfizer Defendants' Renewed Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of its Opposition to Class Certification (Doc. #1526 ) is granted. The process for proposing sealand redaction requests in Mylan Defendants' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Documents Under Seal and for Approval of Sealing Process (Doc. #1503 ) is approved. The Mylan Defendants' Renewed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Doc. #1527 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Further, the parties have 10 days from the date of this Order to move to file a redacted version of Exhibit 6 that complies with the conclusions set forth in this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/04/2019. (mg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1607 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE FOR UPCOMING CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING ON 6/11/2019 and 6/12/2019: An in-person Class Certification Hearing is set for 6/11/2019 at 12:30 PM Central time and 6/12/2019 at 1:30 PM Central time in Courtroom #643. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel, the parties, and the public to listen to the hearing. Participants on the phone will NOT be able to speak or otherwise participate in the hearing. This is a listening line only. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE 8354715. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (mig)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1606 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- NOTICE of Unsealing Their #1583 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance by Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Rebein, Joseph)
June 4, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1603 RENEWED SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #1602 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #1601 RENEWED SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #1604 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1605 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBITS LIST by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. re: #1604 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K)(Fries, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1604 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Fries, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1603 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RENEWED SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Memo ISO, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D)(Fries, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1602 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Fries, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1601 CONSUMER CLASS CASES --RENEWED SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Memo ISO, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B)(Fries, Brian)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1600 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs re: #1591 SEALED MOTION for Continued Sealing of Two Highly Confidential Exhibits. (Sharp, Rex)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1599 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to File its Opposition to [1577-1] Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Foster, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1598 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS - Defendants' List of Exhibits, Deposition Testimony, and Demonstrative Aids That May be Used at Class Certification Hearing by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc.(Fries, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1597 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXPERT WITNESS LIST for Phase I of Class Certification Hearing by Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. (Fries, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1596 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sarko, Lynn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1595 SANOFI CASE -- NOTICE by Defendants Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP of taking deposition of Fiona M. Scott Morton on May 30, 2019. (Mayrell, Ralph)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1594 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1577 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal Their Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Class Plaintiffs' Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. The Court denies the motion with respect to the motion to compel (ECF No. 1577-1) and ECF Nos. 1577-2 through 1577-10, 1577-16, and 1577-30 through 1577-32. The Court grants the motion with respect to ECF Nos. 1577-11 through 1577-15, 1577-17 through 1577-29, and 1577-33 through 1577-38. Counsel for Class Plaintiffs is directed to file forthwith the requested documents described herein with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Access to the sealed document is governed by the Court's #299 Order Denying Sealed Access. The Court's ruling relieves the parties of further review or action regarding the sealed documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1593 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Seal Class Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Documents. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1593 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Seal Class Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Documents by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP (Levin, Adam)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1592 TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference held May 20, 2019 before Judge Theresa J. James, Court Reporter Gayle Wambolt, Gayle_Wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov., 816-512-5641 Transcript purchased by: Ryan Hudson, Stuart Davidson, Brian Fries, Kathie Lemon. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2019. (kg)
May 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1591 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support - Filed Preliminarily Under Seal - for Continued Sealing of Two Highly Confidential Exhibits. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1591 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support - Filed Preliminarily Under Seal - for Continued Sealing of Two Highly Confidential Exhibits by Miscellaneous OptumRx, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schlozman, Bradley) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #1583 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal their Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance and for Approval of Sealing Process, #1584 MOTION to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss, #1586 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, and for Approval of Sealing Process, #1587 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes and Certain Exhibits Thereto, #1588 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, and for Approval of Sealing Process, and #1589 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Their Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. James Hughes. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1590 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- EXHIBIT LIST AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1588 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, and for Approval of Sealing Process by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Levin, Adam)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1589 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Their Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. James Hughes by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Class Plaintiff, Landon Trent Ipson, #2 Proposed Sealed Document PFS_IPSON_00000001, #3 Proposed Sealed Document PFS_IPSON_00000002)(Sarko, Lynn) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1588 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, and for Approval of Sealing Process by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #2 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Levin, Adam)(Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1587 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Matthew S. Tripolitsiotis in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Prof. James Hughes, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit G, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit H)(Sarko, Lynn) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1586 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal the Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, and for Approval of Sealing Process by Defendants Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc., Counter Claimant Mylan Specialty, LP. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #2 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Professor Meredith Rosenthal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Levin, Adam) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1585 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth C. Pritzker re: #1584 MOTION to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sarko, Lynn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1584 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- MOTION to Strike the Partial Testimony of Dr. Michael Blaiss by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (Sarko, Lynn) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1583 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to Preliminarily File Under Seal their Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Andrew K. Torrance and for Approval of Sealing Process by Defendants King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Meridian Medical Technologies, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Notice of Daubert Motion, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration in Support of Daubert Motion, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2 to Declaration)(Rebein, Joseph) (Motion Referral Removed on 05/22/2019. (mg))
May 21, 2019 Filing 1582 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Ivona Kopanja on July 19, 2019. (Sharp, Rex)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- ORDER memorializing oral ruling granting #1559 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to their Third Set of Interrogatories and Eighth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/21/2019. (ts)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1580 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- AMENDED NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Ivona Kopanja on May 21, 2019. (Sharp, Rex)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1579 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- RESPONSE TO MOTION #1574 for Leave to File Sur-Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Class Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Sur-Reply)(Sharp, Rex) (Document title modified on 05/21/2019 to reflect this is not a motion.) (gw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1578 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: MOTION HEARING held on 5/20/2019 re #1559 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Third Set of Interrogatories and Eighth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Gayle Wambolt) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1577 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Alison Chase in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Ninth Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ)(Sarko, Lynn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1576 CONSUMER CLASS CASES -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Consumer Class Cases Plaintiffs re: #1559 MOTION to Compel the Mylan Defendants' Responses to Their Third Set of Interrogatories and Eighth Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Sarko, Lynn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1575 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE