Townson v. Huynh
Plaintiff: Sheryl L. Townson
Defendant: Kahn T. Huynh
Case Number: 2:2018cv02151
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment on the survival claim is DENIED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment on the wrongful death claim is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 3/24/2020. (sz)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/7/2019. (ydm)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 12 Motion for Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/23/2018. (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townson v. Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl L. Townson
Represented By: Matthew E. Birch
Represented By: Richard L. Budden
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kahn T. Huynh
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?