S.C. as Parent and Next Friend of minor A.J. v. Lansing Unified School District #469 et al
Plaintiff: S. C.
Defendant: Lansing Unified School District #469, Darrell Stufflebeam, Steve Dike and Jacob Baker
Case Number: 2:2018cv02228
Filed: May 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties, but with modification to paragraph 18 to account for disclosure inadvertent or otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/15/2019. (amh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Minor A.J. and Defendant Baker. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/22/2019. (mig)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Setting Hearing on Motion 39 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement - Approval- Between Minor A.J. and Defendant Baker. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 440 before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/9/19. (hw)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 23 defendants Lansing USD No. 469, Darrel Stufflebeam, and Steve Dike's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/22/2019. (mig)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/15/2018. (srj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.C. as Parent and Next Friend of minor A.J. v. Lansing Unified School District #469 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Jessica M McDowell
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing Unified School District #469
Represented By: William Dennis Cross, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Stufflebeam
Represented By: William Dennis Cross, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dike
Represented By: William Dennis Cross, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Baker
Represented By: Ross A. Boden
Represented By: Philip Charles Graham
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?