Riley et al v. PK Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leora Riley, Carolyn Bell and Terri Ozburn
Defendant: PK Management, LLC, Central Park Investors, LLC, Aspen Companies Management, LLC and Central Park Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02337
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 293 Motion to Amend Complaint, and granting 293 Motion to Intervene. Plaintiffs shall electronically file and serve their Third Amended Class Action Complaint on Defendants PK Management , LLC, Central Park Investors, LLC, Aspen Companies Management, LLC, and Central Park Holdings, LLC within five (5) business days of the date of this order, and shall serve summons and Third Amended Class Action Complaint on Young Management Corporat ion within thirty (30) days of filing the Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Plaintiffs may seek intervention on behalf of any additional former and current tenants of Central Park Towers within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2020. (ts)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 286 Plaintiffs' Motion to Join Young Management Corporation as Defendant. Within ten days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file their motion to amend their Second Amended Class Action Complaint, attaching thereto a proposed pleading that names Young Management Corporation as a Defendant and includes all other amended allegations Plaintiffs intend to assert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/29/2020. (ts)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling without prejudice 243 Motion to Strike Expert Designations Or In The Alternative, Exclude Or Limit Expert Testimony. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/7/2020. (smc)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 239 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/20/19. (hw)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 242 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/9/19. (hw)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 212 Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Aspen Companies Management, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/9/2019. (ts)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 188 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall electronically file and serve their Second Amended Class Action Complaint within five business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/9/2019. (ts)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/8/2019. (ts)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 123 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/5/2019. (ts)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 118 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Aspen Companies Management, LLC and Central Park Holdings, LLC; denying 119 Defendant PK Management, LLC's Motion to Join Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Discovery; and denying 120 Central Park Investors, LLC's Motion to Join Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/1/2019. (ts)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 79 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production. Following in camera review, the Court denies Plaintiffs' motion insofar as it seeks to compel Defendant Aspen Companies Management, LLC to produce an unredacted version of Bates no. Aspen007901 to Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/15/2019. (ts)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. The motion is granted with respect to Interrogatory 5 and denied with respect to Interrogatory 6. In addition, any motion to bifurcate discovery shall be filed no later than 2/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/8/2019. (ts)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant PK Management, LLC is ordered to show cause in writing why the Court should not remand this case to state court because it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the action. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/26/2018. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. PK Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leora Riley
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Mark W. Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bell
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Mark W. Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Ozburn
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Mark W. Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK Management, LLC
Represented By: Derek H. Mackay
Represented By: Pamela Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Park Investors, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Companies Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Park Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?