Bedivere Insurance Company v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Bedivere Insurance Company
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. and Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02371
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Shawnee
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit OneBeacon Policy, #3 Exhibit AWAC D&O Policy, #4 Exhibit AWAC E&O Policy)(Weems, Douglas)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (Weems, Douglas)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr as counsel for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/24/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4564167.) by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin D. Tessier, #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Weiner, and #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin O. Young as counsel for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/21/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Caitlin O. Young to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4562193.) by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Andrew M. Weiner to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4562182.) by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Electonic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Kevin D. Tessier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4562154.) by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. due on or before 8/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/8/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Weems, Douglas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bedivere Insurance Company. Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/1/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Coverdale, Brent)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service by Process Server by Bedivere Insurance Company upon Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Coverdale, Brent)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard Randal Crispen, and granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Justine M. Casey as counsel for Bedivere Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/20/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sw)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Justine M Casey to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4536230.) by Plaintiff Bedivere Insurance Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Justine M. Casey)(Coverdale, Brent)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Richard Randal Crispen to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4536218.) by Plaintiff Bedivere Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 ECF Registration Form Richard Randal Crispen)(Coverdale, Brent)
July 17, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Bedivere Insurance Company. (Coverdale, Brent)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedivere Insurance Company identifying Armour Group Holdings, Limited as corporate parent . (Coverdale, Brent)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4533897.), filed by Bedivere Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Allied World Primary E&O Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Allied World Primary D&O Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - OneBeacon E&O Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dec. 12, 2012 MDL Transfer Order)(Coverdale, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedivere Insurance Company v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Weiner
Represented By: Kevin D. Tessier
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin O. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedivere Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent N. Coverdale
Represented By: Justine M. Casey
Represented By: Richard Randal Crispen
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?