Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, John Fultz, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund and Mark Garrett
Defendant: Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02396
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
0 Judge: Carlos Murguia
1 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 6 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund, John Fultz, Mark Garrett, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jasperson Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Scott Brown)(Brown, Scott)
September 10, 2018 5 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc. (jsh)
September 5, 2018 4 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund, John Fultz, Mark Garrett, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The. (Brown, Scott)
August 3, 2018 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Mark Garrett, John Fultz, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The upon Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc. served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018 (Brown, Scott)
August 1, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sw)
August 1, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw)
August 1, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund, John Fultz, Mark Garrett, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The. (Brown, Scott)
August 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4544938.), filed by Mark Garrett, John Fultz, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund, Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds, Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund, Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The.(Brown, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund et al v. Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermakers Apprenticeship and Training Funds
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fultz
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobilization, Optimization, Stabilization and Training Fund, The
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boilermakers National Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Garrett
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?