Kellogg et al v. Watts Guerra, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC and Rachel Kellogg
Defendant: Cross Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd., Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Yira Law Office LTD, Wagner Reese, LLP, Francisco Guerra, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., John Does, Law Office of Michael Miller, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Watts Guerra, LLP, Johnson Law Group, Pagel Weikum, PLLP, Givens Law, LLC, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Mikal C. Watts, Dewald Deaver, PC, LLO, Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA, VanDerGinst Law, PC and Yira Law Office, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02408
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER LIFTING STAY: This case was stayed on August 28, 2018, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") on plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of the JPML's order transferring this action to the District of Kansas (ECF No. 97). On October 3, 2018, the JPML denied plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Accordingly, the stay in this case will be lifted on October 13, 2018, per the August 28, 2018 order. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby set for October 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/5/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/28/2018. (amh)
August 23, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office, Ltd. re: #91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Medeiros, Joao)
August 22, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Pagel Weikum, PLLP re: #91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Ricke, Kelly)
August 22, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Dewald Deaver, PC, LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. re: #91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Degnan, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, PC, Wagner Reese, LLP re: #91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Boylan, Arthur)
August 21, 2018 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Goodman, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer From Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Goodman, Christopher)
August 16, 2018 Filing 90 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kelly A. Ricke on behalf of Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Ricke, Kelly)
August 13, 2018 Filing 89 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:18-cv-01082. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
August 9, 2018 Filing 88 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the District of Kansas per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge John W. Lungstrum. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a Motion to Extend Time for Service of Defendant Givens Law, LLC. (Doc. No. 84.) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), a plaintiff must timely serve a copy of the summons and complaint although the Court may expand the allowable time for good cause shown. On July 16, 2018, the Court stayed this action. (Doc. No. 83.) In light of the stay, the Court finds that good cause exists to expand the time for service. Consequently, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion (Doc. No. #84 ), and concludes that while the case is stayed, the 90-day service period under Rule 4(m) will not run. Order by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/24/2018. (las) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 86 TEXT ONLY - NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearings: The Motion Hearings set FOR 08/03/2018 and 09/20/2018 have been CANCELLED. SEE THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #83 . (las) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 85 Declaration of Douglas J Nill in Support of #84 MOTION re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 11)(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendants Daniel M. Homolka, P.A. and Yira Law Office Ltd.'s Motion to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Doc. No. #10 ) is GRANTED. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are STAYED until ten days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. See In re Syngenta MIR162 Corn Litig., MDL No. 2591. Plaintiffs' appeal (Doc. No. #60 ) of Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson's May 25, 2018 Order is OVERRULED. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson's May 25, 2018 Order (Doc. No. #49 ) is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/16/2018. (las) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of John M. Degnan in OPPOSITION TO #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD re #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, to Join in Opposition (Lind, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP re #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (of Joinder) (Boylan, Arthur) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. re #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of Complaint or Certification of Several Questions to the MN Supreme Court (Doc. No. 76) (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher L. Goodman in OPPOSITION TO #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 75 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc. . (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 74 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc..(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 71 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #69 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc..(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Support re #69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Partial Declaratory Judgment for Count VII of the Class Action Complaint filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RULE 72.2 REQUEST TO REVIEW MAGISTRATE JUDGES RULING by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP re #67 MOTION (Goodman, Christopher) Modified text on 6/20/2018 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION for Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Rule 72.2 Request to Review Magistrate Judge's Ruling filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, , #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc..(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 63 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #60 Motion to Vacate Order filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc..(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Douglas J Nill in Opposition to #60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, , #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5, #3 Exhibit(s) 6, #4 Exhibit(s) 7, #5 Exhibit(s) 8)(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, , #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Vacate Order 59 Order (Text Only), #49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter at Doc. No. 52. Please proceed with filing any objections to the Court's May 25, 2018 Order as a formal appeal to the district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/6/2018. (DMM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 58 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP . (Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 57 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. . (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 56 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Pagel Weikum, PLLP . (Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 55 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 54 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD . (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. Deward Deaver P.C., LLOC served on 5/4/18, answer due 5/25/18; Francisco Guerra served 5/7/18, answer due 5/29/18; Daniel Homolka served 5/10/18; answer due 5/31/18; Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC served 5/11/18, answer due 6/1/18; Johnson Law Group served 5/7/18, answer due 5/29/18; Law Office of Michael Miller served 5/3/18, answer due 5/24/18; Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC served 5/15/18, answer due 6/5/18; Pagel Weium, PLLP served 5/4/18, answer due 5/25/18; Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A. served 5/3/18, answer due 5/24/18; VanDerGinst Law, P.C. served 5/3/18, anwer due 5/24/18; Wagner Reese, LLP served 5/3/18, anwer due 5/24/18; Mikal C. Watts served 4/30/18, answer due 5/21/18; Watts Guerra, LLP served 4/30/18, answer due 5/21/18; Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. served 5/3/18, anwer due 5/24/18; Yira Law Offic Ltd. served 5/10/18, answer due 5/31/18. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Daniel M. Homolka PA, #2 Affidavit of Service Dewald Deaver, #3 Affidavit of Service Francisco Guerra, #4 Affidavit of Service Hovland Rasmus, #5 Affidavit of Service Johnson Law Group, #6 Affidavit of Service Law Office Michael Miller, #7 Affidavit of Service Mauro Archer Associates, #8 Affidavit of Service Mikal C Watts, #9 Affidavit of Service Pagel Weikum, #10 Affidavit of Service Patton Hoversten Berg, #11 Affidavit of Service VanDerGinst Law, #12 Affidavit of Service Wagner Reese, #13 Affidavit of Service Wojtalewicz Law, #14 Affidavit of Service Yira Law Office)(Nill, Douglas) Modified on 5/31/2018 (kt). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 52 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter Ex 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Letter Ex 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Letter Ex 3)(Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #50 MOTION to Certify Class and Request for Injunctive Relief : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Certify Class and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on Answer Date for Complaint Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/25/2018. (MSK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Arthur G. Boylan re #46 Notice (Other), #47 Notice (Other), by Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Boylan, Arthur) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Notice of Joinder in Motion to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Boylan, Arthur) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Notice of Joinder in Motion to Extend Time to Answer Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Boylan, Arthur) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G Boylan on behalf of Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP. (Boylan, Arthur) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #43 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 42 TEXT ENTRY ONLY NOTICE: Due to the pending Motion to Stay, there is good cause to delay scheduling a Rule 16 Conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP.(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 40 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP.(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Richard J. Thomas in SUPPORT OF #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP.(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : at date and time to be determined. (Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Notice of Joinder (Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher L. Goodman with attached Exhibit 1 in SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP.(Goodman, Christopher) Modified on 5/22/2018 (AKL). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Notice of Joinder (Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Goodman on behalf of Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP. (Goodman, Christopher) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Richard A Lind in SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Correspondence to Plaintiffs' Counsel dated May 10, 2018, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Correspondence to Plaintiffs' Counsel dated May 14, 2018, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Email Correspondence dated May 18, 2018)(Lind, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd..(Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of John M. Degnan in SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Degnan, John) Modified on 5/22/2018 (AKL). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : at date and time to be determined. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Thomas on behalf of Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (Thomas, Richard) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 20, 2018 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc. with attached May 18 email to opposing counsel. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Degnan on behalf of Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.. (Degnan, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc.. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER - Counsel for Defendants Daniel M. Homolka PA and Yira Law Office Ltd have filed a Motion to Stay (Doc. No. #12 ). Counsel for Plaintiffs have indicated they object and will be filing a response. The Court directs the parties to agree to a briefing schedule and memorialize that schedule in a brief letter to be filed on the docket. Once fully briefed, the Court reserves the right to set this matter for a hearing. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/17/2018. (RLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc. . (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation : at date and time to be determined. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD.(De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Stay filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD.(De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Joao C.J.G. de Medeiros in SUPPORT OF #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 -Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Civil Docket for United States Judicial Panel)(De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Yira Law Office LTD. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Daniel M. Homolka. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros on behalf of Daniel M. Homolka, Yira Law Office LTD. (De Medeiros, Joao) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cross Law Firm, LLC. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A., VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Wagner Reese, LLP, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra, LLP, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd., Yira Law Office LTD. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, John Does, Givens Law, LLC, Francisco Guerra, Daniel M. Homolka, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Pagel Weikum, PLLP. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-1082 (DWF/BRT). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Douglas J Nill re #1 Complaint, byKenneth P Kellogg. (Nill, Douglas) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6075669) filed by Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3) (Nill, Douglas) Modified text on 4/24/2018 (lmb). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellogg et al v. Watts Guerra, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Homolka
Represented By: Richard A Lind
Represented By: Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros
Represented By: Joao Medeiros
Represented By: Richard A. Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn M Short
Represented By: John M Degnan
Represented By: Kathryn M. Short
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Arthur G Boylan
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yira Law Office LTD
Represented By: Richard A Lind
Represented By: Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Reese, LLP
Represented By: Arthur G Boylan
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Guerra
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patton Hoversten & Berg, P.A.
Represented By: Kathryn M Short
Represented By: John M Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Michael Miller
Represented By: Arthur G Boylan
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanDerGinst Law, P.C.
Represented By: Arthur G Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Guerra, LLP
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Law Group
Represented By: Arthur G Boylan
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pagel Weikum, PLLP
Represented By: Richard J Thomas
Represented By: Chad J Hintz
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Represented By: Chad J. Hintz
Represented By: Kelly A. Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givens Law, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC
Represented By: Kathryn M Short
Represented By: John M Degnan
Represented By: Kathryn M. Short
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO
Represented By: Kathryn M Short
Represented By: John M Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewald Deaver, PC, LLO
Represented By: Kathryn M. Short
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA
Represented By: Kathryn M. Short
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanDerGinst Law, PC
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yira Law Office, Ltd.
Represented By: Joao Medeiros
Represented By: Richard A. Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellogg Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Kellogg
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland B. Bromley
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bromley Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kellogg
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?