Young v. Revenue Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Adriana Young
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Revenue Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02430
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Riley
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/8/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/8/2018. (NOTE: As indicated in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, copies of the parties' initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) must be attached to the parties' completed Rule 26(f) planning report. These disclosures will be discussed with the magistrate judge during the upcoming scheduling conference in finalizing a discovery and case plan that achieves the objectives of Rule 1.) See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/28/18. (aw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Revenue Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 1)(Klutho, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/28/2018 for Defendant Revenue Enterprises, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/12/2018. (ca)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Revenue Enterprises, LLC . (Klutho, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Klutho on behalf of Revenue Enterprises, LLC (Klutho, Michael)
August 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Revenue Enterprises, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Adriana Young. (Williston, Keith)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4561458.), filed by Adriana Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williston, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Revenue Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Young
Represented By: Keith N. Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revenue Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Klutho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?