Pace v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Crystal Pace
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and University of Kansas Hospital Authority
Case Number: 2:2018cv02443
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: James P O'Hara
3 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Steven D. Davidson as to University of Kansas Hospital Authority (Davidson, Steven)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Randy J. Troutt on behalf of University of Kansas Hospital Authority. (Troutt, Randy)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's answer deadline extended to 10/19/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/27/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Second) by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Davidson, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Petition re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Hartford's answer deadline extended to 9/28/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/5/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer.) (Davidson, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Crystal Pace. (Whitham, Tylor)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Davidson, Steven)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Davidson, Steven)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, case number 2018-CV-669 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4566941.), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal Wyandotte County)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kansas Hospital Authority
Represented By: Randy J. Troutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Pace
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Represented By: Tylor Blaine Whitham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?