Reaves v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Susan Reaves
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02485
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Susan Reaves of Plaintiff's Answers to State Farm's Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Responses to State Farm's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Taylor, Donald)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Peterson, F.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Privilege Log by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Peterson, F.)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge John W Lungstrum on 10/23/2018. (ses)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Susan Reaves of Pl Rule 26a(1) Initial Disclosures (Taylor, Donald)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline due 11/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/27/18. (alm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Remand (Peterson, F.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Susan Reaves (Taylor, Donald)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Farm Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Request for Production to Plaintiff by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Peterson, F.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by F. Russell Peterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Peterson, F.)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James L. Sanders on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Sanders, James)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Petition for Damages)(Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2018-CV-000718 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4578813.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Sanders, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Sanders
Represented By: F. Russell Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Reaves
Represented By: Donald T. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?