Jerome v. Kessler et al
Plaintiff: Vincent R. Jerome
Defendant: Alan Kessler and David M. Riley
Case Number: 2:2018cv02506
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Alan Kessler.(Wray, Trevin)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Vincent R. Jerome upon Alan Kessler served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Swift, Matthew)
October 19, 2018 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Kessler. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by David M. Riley.(Clark, Bret)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bret A. Clark on behalf of David M. Riley (Clark, Bret)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service (through counsel) by Vincent R. Jerome upon David M. Riley served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018 (Swift, Matthew)
October 2, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Kessler, David M. Riley. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Vincent R. Jerome - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Swift, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Pospisil on behalf of Vincent R. Jerome. (Pospisil, Michael)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Vincent R. Jerome. (Swift, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4589541.), filed by Vincent R. Jerome.(Swift, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome v. Kessler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kessler
Represented By: Jaime L. Whitt
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Riley
Represented By: Todd A. Scharnhorst
Represented By: Bret A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent R. Jerome
Represented By: Matthew T. Swift
Represented By: Michael D. Pospisil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?