Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.

Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02515
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Weems, Douglas)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 , #11 , #12 , and #13 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorneys Andrew M. Weiner, Kevin D. Tessier, Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr, Caitlin O. Young for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/ Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/9/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Caitlin O. Young to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4630208.) by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4630199.) by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Kevin D. Tessier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4630189.) by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Andrew M. Weiner to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4630158.) by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Weems, Douglas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Barry L. Pickens on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. (Pickens, Barry)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Harper, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Heidi Hudson Raschke for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Brodie for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Heidi Hudson Raschke, Esq. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4597883.) by Plaintiff Allied World Specialty Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harper, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Steven J. Brodie, Esq. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4597865.) by Plaintiff Allied World Specialty Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harper, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company identifying f/k/a Darwin national Assurance Company as corporate parent . (Harper, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Allied World Specialty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Harper, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4592173.), filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Mullen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Lavelle Mullen
Represented By: Heidi Hudson Raschke
Represented By: Steven J. Brodie
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Weiner
Represented By: Kevin D. Tessier
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Caitlin O. Young
Represented By: Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr.
Represented By: Barry L. Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?