Houston v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County et al
Plaintiff: Eugenia Marie Houston
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas Fire Department, Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas Police Department
Case Number: 2:2018cv02549
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/9/18. Mailed to pro se party Eugenia M. Houston by regular mail. (hw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that this action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 11/9/18. Mailed to pro se party Eugenia M. Houston by regular mail. (hw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Eugenia M. Houston. (hw)
October 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per DE #5 Order, summons are to be withheld at this time. No summons were issued or sent to USM for service. (ca)
October 23, 2018 (PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DOCKET ANNOTATION) NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued, mailed to Eugenia Marie Houston on 10/23/2018 by regular mail. (ca) Modified on 10/23/2018 (ca).
October 23, 2018 (PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DOCKET ANNOTATION) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City, Kansas Fire Department, Kansas City, Kansas Police Department, Unified Government of Wyandotte County. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) Modified on 10/23/2018 (ca).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Order to Show Cause. Although the motion is granted, the Court withholds service of process pending review following receipt of a response by Plaintiff to the Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson, on or before November 2, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/23/2018. Mailed to pro se party Eugenia M. Houston by certified mail. Certified Tracking Number 70162070000006869024. (ts)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kansas City, Kansas Fire Department, Kansas City, Kansas Police Department, Unified Government of Wyandotte County, filed by Eugenia Marie Houston.(hw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Eugenia Marie Houston (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Eugenia Marie Houston. (ca)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Eugenia Marie Houston.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Marie Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?