Foster et al v. Andersen et al
Plaintiff: Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project, C. K., Luc Bensimon, Jessica Hicklin and Nyla Foster
Defendant: Elizabeth W. Saadi, Jeff Andersen and Kay Haug
Case Number: 2:2018cv02552
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Andersen, Elizabeth W. Saadi, Kay Haug. (Lueger, Eugene) Modified on 12/12/2018 to add Jeff Andersen and Kay Haug as filers. (mam)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have until December 14, 2018, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/26/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Jeff Andersen, Kay Haug, Elizabeth W. Saadi (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Lueger, Eugene)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/23/2018 for Defendants Kay Haug, Jeff Andersen, Elizabeth W. Saadi to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 11/08/2018. (ca)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/31/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nyla Foster upon Jeff Andersen served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018 (Lawrence, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nyla Foster upon Elizabeth W. Saadi served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018 (Lawrence, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nyla Foster upon Kay Haug served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018 (Lawrence, James)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine A. Keating, #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kara N. Ingelhart, and #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan as counsel for all plaintiffs pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/17/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4610162.) by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Holdmeyer, Sarah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Kara N. Ingelhart to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4610151.) by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Holdmeyer, Sarah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Katherine A. Keating to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4610093.) by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Holdmeyer, Sarah)
October 16, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeff Andersen, Kay Haug, Elizabeth W. Saadi. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project identifying KANSAS STATEWIDE TRANSGENDER EDUCATION PROJECT as corporate parent . (Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION for Order TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project(Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project (Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Luc Bensimon, Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, C. K., Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project. (Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4607669.), filed by C. K., Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, Luc Bensimon, Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project.(Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4607669.), filed by C. K., Nyla Foster, Jessica Hicklin, Luc Bensimon, Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project.(Lawrence, James)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. Andersen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth W. Saadi
Represented By: Eugene J. Lueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Andersen
Represented By: Eugene J. Lueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Haug
Represented By: Eugene J. Lueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas Statewide Transgender Education Project
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Katherine A. Keating
Represented By: Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. K.
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Katherine A. Keating
Represented By: Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc Bensimon
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Katherine A. Keating
Represented By: Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hicklin
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Katherine A. Keating
Represented By: Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyla Foster
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Katherine A. Keating
Represented By: Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?