Jones v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Jones
Defendant: Unified Government of Kansas City/Wyandotte County, Kansas, Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of and Kansas City, Kansas Police Departments
Case Number: 2:2018cv02557
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jennifer J. Jones upon Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018 (Buchanan, Mark)
November 21, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jennifer J. Jones. (Buchanan, Mark)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4609770.), filed by Jennifer J. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Right to Sue letter)(Buchanan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Jones
Represented By: Mark A. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Kansas City/Wyandotte County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas Police Departments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?