Scruggs v. Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bryan Scruggs
Defendant: Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02594
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.(Emert, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brennan P. Fagan on behalf of Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc. (Fagan, Brennan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/26/2018 for Defendant Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/11/2018. (ca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark T. Emert on behalf of Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc. (Emert, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service by Bryan Scruggs upon Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc. served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Geary, Grant)
November 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Mannion on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mannion, Kathleen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Grant Woodson Geary on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Geary, Grant)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Bryan Scruggs. (Schiavone, Anne)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4626643.), filed by Bryan Scruggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Schiavone, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scruggs v. Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Scruggs
Represented By: Kathleen Mannion
Represented By: Grant Woodson Geary
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Masonry Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Emert
Represented By: Brennan P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?