Parker, Sr. v. WI Waterstone

Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Parker, Sr.
Defendant: WI Waterstone and WI Waterstone, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02599
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
0 Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
1 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. filed a Complaint on November 7, 2018 (Doc. 1). On December 6, 2018, defendant WI Waterstone, LLC, filed a Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 7). Defendant's motion seeks dismissal of plaintiff's original Complaint. Plaintiff since has filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. 9) on December 17, 2018, as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, the court finds as moot defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 7). The court thus denies defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7 ) as moot but without prejudice to defendant's filing a renewed motion to dismiss directed to plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 9). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/02/2019. Mailed to pro se party Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. (hw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WI Waterstone, LLC filed by Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/22/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/13/18.Mailed to pro se party Michael E. Parker, Sr. by regular mail. (ss)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant WI Waterstone (Anderson, Julie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. upon WI Waterstone served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (hw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued mailed to Michael Eugene Parker Sr. on 11/9/2018 by regular mail. (ca)
November 9, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WI Waterstone. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/9/18. (hw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Eugene Parker, Sr. (ca)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Michael Eugene Parker, Sr.(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #1 Envelope) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker, Sr. v. WI Waterstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WI Waterstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WI Waterstone, LLC
Represented By: Julie A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Parker, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?