Ross v. Adecco USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Ross
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc., Xerox Corporation and Board of Public Utilities for the City of Kansas City, Kansas, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv02603
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Xerox Corporation.(Fields, Taylor)
January 7, 2019 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Russell, Kyle)
January 2, 2019 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney John F. Doyle as to Ronald Ross (Doyle, John)
December 20, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting #17 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant Xerox is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including January 7, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
December 19, 2018 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Xerox Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Fields, Taylor)
December 17, 2018 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ronald Ross upon Xerox Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/24/2018 (Doyle, John)
December 13, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel E. Linzy for Xerox Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
December 13, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole S. Adler for Xerox Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
December 12, 2018 13 MOTION for attorney Rachel E. Linzy to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4659178.) by Defendant Xerox Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Ex A)(Fields, Taylor)
December 12, 2018 12 MOTION for attorney Nicole S. Adler to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4659177.) by Defendant Xerox Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Ex A)(Fields, Taylor)
December 10, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Xerox Corporation is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including December 24, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 7, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Xerox Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Fields, Taylor)
December 7, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Defendant Adecco USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including January 7, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 7, 2018 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Janelle L. Williams on behalf of Adecco USA, Inc.. (Williams, Janelle)
December 7, 2018 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Adecco USA, Inc.. (Russell, Kyle)
December 7, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Russell, Kyle)
November 29, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Ross. Board of Public Utilities for the City of Kansas City, Kansas, The waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Doyle, John)
November 28, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ronald Ross upon Adecco USA, Inc. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Doyle, John)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adecco USA, Inc., Board of Public Utilities for the City of Kansas City, Kansas, The, Xerox Corporation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 13, 2018 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document #1 Complaint contained personal information. A redacted version has been attached to the entry and is being provided with this entry for notification purposes. (ydm)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Document (Exhibit A in #1 Complaint) is not redacted properly and has been blocked from public view. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Modified on 11/13/2018 to add link. (hl))
November 9, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ronald L. Ross. (Williams, Michael)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4631021.), filed by Ronald L. Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Michael) #3 Exhibit A Redacted. (ydm) Modified to add redacted Exhibit A on 11/13/2018. (ydm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Adecco USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Represented By: Janelle L. Williams
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Nicole S. Adler
Represented By: Taylor Fields
Represented By: Rachel E. Linzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Public Utilities for the City of Kansas City, Kansas, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ross
Represented By: Michael A. Williams
Represented By: John Francis Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?