Nekouee v. HRA Fountains, LP et al

Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: HRA Fountains, LP, Spin Partners, Inc. and Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02612
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER granting #13 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. All defendants are granted an extension of time, to and including February 1, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/20/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
December 20, 2018 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendant Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Moore, Jehan)
December 17, 2018 12 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/02/2019 for Defendant Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/17/2018. (ca)
December 17, 2018 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jehan Moore on behalf of Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P. (Moore, Jehan)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time until December 28, 2018, for defendant HRA Fountains, LP to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Counsel has advised the court the motion is unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/17/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
December 14, 2018 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant HRA Fountains, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Palmer, Brian)
December 14, 2018 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. Palmer on behalf of HRA Fountains, LP. (Palmer, Brian)
December 14, 2018 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by G. Steven Ruprecht on behalf of HRA Fountains, LP. (Ruprecht, G.)
December 10, 2018 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/26/2018 for Defendant Spin Partners, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/11/2018. (ca)
November 29, 2018 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
November 27, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Spin Partners, Inc. served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
November 27, 2018 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon HRA Fountains, LP served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
November 16, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HRA Fountains, LP, Spin Partners, Inc., Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 15, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert)
November 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4636144.), filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. HRA Fountains, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRA Fountains, LP
Represented By: Brian L. Palmer
Represented By: G. Steven Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Robin K. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Represented By: Jehan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert J. Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?