Kaminsky et al v. Equity Bank
Plaintiff: Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time, Linda J Kaminsky and Lawrence S Kaminsky
Defendant: Equity Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv02618
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Joint Motion for Temporary Stay of Deadlines. The parties are relieved of the obligations set in the initial scheduling order (ECF No. 34), and the January 14, 2019 scheduling conference is cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if this case is not dismissed in its entirety by February 28, 2019, plaintiff shall file a status report by that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/12/18. (hw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines , Hearings, and Discovery and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiffs Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Ballew, David)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/3/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/27/18. (ss)
November 16, 2018 Filing 33 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:17-cv-00573. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
November 16, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #31 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Case transferred to District Court of Kansas in Kansas City ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #18 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 30 SURREPLY to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time ; (With attachments) (Ballew, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern The Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Respond to Defendant's New Evidence (Doc. 26) is denied in part and granted in part. Specifically, the Motion is Strike is denied; the alternative request for leave to file a sur-reply is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their Sur-Reply to Defendant's Reply by November 15, 2018. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/15/2018); granting in part and denying in part #26 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Equity Bank's Motion to Transfer Venue ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time ; (Ballew, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Equity Bank's Motion to Transfer Venue ) by Equity Bank ; (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Equity Bank's Motion to Transfer Venue (Re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (With attachments) (Ballew, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Equity Bank ; (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 24 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #23 Response in Opposition to Motion,, ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (With attachments) (Ballew, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue (Re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time ; (With attachments) (Ballew, David) Modified on 4/11/2018 to seal main document & exhibits 2, 3 and 6 as they were filed unredacted; counsel will file the redacted version using the Errata/Correction event (sc, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Equity Bank (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew W Muller on behalf of Equity Bank (Muller, Andrew) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Equity Bancshares for Equity Bank) by Equity Bank (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Andrew W. Muller is admitted to this Court to represent Defendant, Equity Bank, Pro Hac Vice ; ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District by Equity Bank (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Equity Bank to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/6/2018); granting #15 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Equity Bank (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew W. Muller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1890463) by Equity Bank (With attachments) (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of Equity Bank [Note: Attorney Courtney Jo Davis Powell added to party Equity Bank(pty:dft).] (Powell, Courtney) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; staying case; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/28/2018); granting #11 Motion to Stay (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Stay Deadlines, Hearings, and Discovery by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (Ballew, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; staying case; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/31/2017); granting #9 Motion to Stay (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines, Hearings and Discovery by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (Robinett, Tracy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice of John M. Duggan and David L. Ballew (Doc. 6) on behalf of Plaintiffs is GRANTED. ; ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 7 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #6 MOTION for Attorney(s) John M. Duggan; David L. Ballew to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1835410) ) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (With attachments) (Duren, Dylan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) John M. Duggan; David L. Ballew to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1835410) by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (Duren, Dylan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John Duggan, Deron Anliker and David Ballew to file by November 3, 2017 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lal, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dylan Tyler Duren on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duren, Dylan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tracy Wayne Robinett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robinett, Tracy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equity Bank (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1834444) by Linda J Kaminsky, Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (Robinett, Tracy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lawrence S Kaminsky, Linda J Kaminsky, Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time (Robinett, Tracy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 11/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaminsky et al v. Equity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Bank
Represented By: Andrew W. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Kaminsky and Lawrence S. Kaminsky, Trustees of the Linda J. Kaminsky Revocable Living Trust Under Agreement Dated January 26, 1993, as Amended from Time to Time
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J Kaminsky
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence S Kaminsky
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?