Jefferson v. Amsted Rail
Plaintiff: Felicia J. Jefferson and Felicia A. Jefferson
Defendant: Amsted Rail
Case Number: 2:2018cv02620
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amsted Rail . (Jarrold, Richard)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amsted Rail.(Jarrold, Richard)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/31/2018 for Defendant Amsted Rail to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/14/2018. Mailed to pro se party Felicia A. Jefferson by regular mail. (ca)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail (USM-285) upon Amsted Rail served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (ydm)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Felicia Jefferson. (ydm)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/21/2018. Mailed to pro se party Felicia Jefferson by regular mail. (ydm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Felicia A. Jefferson. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (ydm)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued mailed to Felicia A. Jefferson on 11/20/2018 by regular mail. (ca)
November 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amsted Rail. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/19/2018. Mailed to pro se party Felicia J. Jefferson by regular and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70150920000170458409. (ydm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Felicia J. Jefferson (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Felicia J. Jefferson. (ca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Felicia J. Jefferson.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Amsted Rail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Rail
Represented By: Nicole Hininger Howell
Represented By: Richard Evan Jarrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia J. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia A. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?