Robbins v. Dyck O'Neal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Robbins
Defendant: Dyck O'Neal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02623
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: In-person Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/7/2019. (mn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #6 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Dyck O'Neal, Inc. letter and copy of 1099-C. (Wade, Louis)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dyck O'Neal, Inc..(Wade, Louis)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons Executed of Dyck O'Neal Inc. filed by Plaintiff Stephen Robbins (Parrish, Mark) (Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct title; incorrect ecf event used. (hl))
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/04/2019 for Defendant Dyck O'Neal, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/20/2018. (ca)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dyck O'Neal, Inc. identifying PRG/DON Mortgage Services LLC as corporate parent . (Wade, Louis)
November 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dyck O'Neal, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Stephen Robbins. (Williston, Keith)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4638816.), filed by Stephen Robbins.(Williston, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Dyck O'Neal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyck O'Neal, Inc.
Represented By: Louis J. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Robbins
Represented By: Joshua A. Sanders
Represented By: Mark Everett Parrish
Represented By: Keith N. Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?