Sturdivant v. USD 229 Blue Valley et al

Plaintiff: Camille Sturdivant
Defendant: Amy Pressly, Carley Fine, USD 229 Blue Valley and Katie Porter
Case Number: 2:2018cv02661
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 02/14/2019 for Defendant Katie Porter to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 01/31/2019. (ca)
January 30, 2019 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 02/14/2019 for Defendant Carley Fine to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 01/30/2019. (ca)
January 24, 2019 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Amy Pressly, USD 229 Blue Valley.(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
January 15, 2019 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Camille Sturdivant upon Katie Porter served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019 (Bratcher, Lynne)
January 15, 2019 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Camille Sturdivant upon Carley Fine served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019 (Bratcher, Lynne)
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carley Fine, Katie Porter. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 3, 2019 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Madison A. Perry on behalf of Amy Pressly, USD 229 Blue Valley. (Perry, Madison)
December 18, 2018 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of Amy Pressly, USD 229 Blue Valley. (Hatley, W.)
December 18, 2018 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman on behalf of Amy Pressly, USD 229 Blue Valley. (Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
December 5, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4652087.), filed by Camille Sturdivant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Bratcher, Lynne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdivant v. USD 229 Blue Valley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Sturdivant
Represented By: Marie L. Gockel
Represented By: Lynne J. Bratcher
Represented By: Antonette Marie DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Pressly
Represented By: Madison A. Perry
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carley Fine
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 229 Blue Valley
Represented By: Madison A. Perry
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Porter
Represented By: Terelle A. Mock
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?