Watson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Watson II
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02663
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
1 Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/3/19. (alm)
December 27, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 27, 2018 4 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 5, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
December 5, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
December 5, 2018 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Watson, II - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Esselman, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jeffrey Watson, II. (Esselman, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4652230.), filed by Jeffrey Watson, II.(Esselman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Watson II
Represented By: Andrew M. Esselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?