Fisher v. USD 458 Basehor-Linwood

Plaintiff: Kelsey Fisher
Defendant: Unified School District No. 458, Leavenworth County, Kansas and USD 458 Basehor-Linwood
Case Number: 2:2018cv02664
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/14/18. (alm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Leavenworth County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Goheen, Gregory)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by USD 458 Basehor-Linwood.(Goheen, Gregory)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Unified School District No. 458, Leavenworth County, Kansas (Goheen, Gregory)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Unified School District No. 458, Leavenworth County, Kansas. (Goheen, Gregory)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Leavenworth County District Court, case number 18-CV246 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4652376.), filed by Unified School District No. 458, Leavenworth County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Goheen, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. USD 458 Basehor-Linwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified School District No. 458, Leavenworth County, Kansas
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 458 Basehor-Linwood
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Fisher
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?