State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Ward Kraft, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: ZIH Corp, Laser Band, LLC, Zebra Technologies International, LLC, Typenex Medical, LLC, Zebra Technologies Corporation and Ward Kraft, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02671
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alana M. McMullin for Typenex Medical, LLC. and Ward Kraft, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander T. Brown for Typenex Medical, LLC and Ward Kraft, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Alana M. McMullin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4685273.) by Defendants Typenex Medical, LLC, Ward Kraft, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alana M. McMullin, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carr, Chandler)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Alexander T. Brown to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4685263.) by Defendants Typenex Medical, LLC, Ward Kraft, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexander T. Brown, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carr, Chandler)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chandler E. Carr on behalf of Typenex Medical, LLC. (Carr, Chandler)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chandler E. Carr on behalf of Ward Kraft, Inc. (Carr, Chandler)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Typenex Medical, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ward Kraft, Inc. waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Zebra Technologies Corporation waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Zebra Technologies International, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. ZIH Corp waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Laser Band, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Logan, William)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hofer, Scott)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hofer, Scott)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654008.), filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Hofer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Ward Kraft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIH Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Band, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebra Technologies International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Typenex Medical, LLC
Represented By: Alexander T. Brown
Represented By: Chandler E. Carr
Represented By: Alana M. McMullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebra Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Kraft, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander T. Brown
Represented By: Chandler E. Carr
Represented By: Alana M. McMullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William F. Logan
Represented By: Scott D. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?