Taylor v. Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: Robby Taylor
Defendant: James Fleetwood, Melinda Slater, Jeff Dewey, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners, Carl Wheeler, Seth Rundle, Jeff Easter and Bernie Lumbreras
Case Number: 2:2018cv02674
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Jeff Easter, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners. (Steed, David)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. In light of the order (ECF No. 23) granting the state defendants' motion to stay discovery (ECF No. 16), the deadlines set in the court's initial order regarding planning and scheduling (ECF No. 13) are vacated, and the scheduling conference set for March 4, 2019 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(srj)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/1/2019. (srj)
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler re: #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Phillips, Stephen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robby Taylor re #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Johnston, Shayla)
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Melinda Slater (Whalen, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendants Jeff Easter, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners (Steed, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendants James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Phillips, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING regarding #16 motion to stay discovery and pretrial proceedings. Given the fast-approaching February 12, 2019 Rule 26(f) meeting deadline, any response is due by January 31, 2019, and any reply is due by February 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Phillips, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler(Phillips, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler (Phillips, Stephen)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/20/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/20/2019. All parties must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/23/19. (ss)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion for a 14-day extension for defendant Melinda Slater to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Plaintiff has informed the court he does not oppose the extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Melinda Slater (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Whalen, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Whalen on behalf of Melinda Slater (Whalen, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 unopposed motion for extension of time until February 1, 2019, for defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, and Carl Wheeler to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney),,,,, by Defendants Jeff Dewey, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Carl Wheeler (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Phillips, Stephen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/28/2019 for Defendants Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners, Jeff Easter to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 01/11/2019. (ca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT INCORRECTLY FILED*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Jeff Easter, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Steed, David) (Modified on 1/11/2019 to block from public view; Document filed incorrectly. (hl))
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David W. Steed on behalf of Jeff Easter, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners. (Steed, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen O. Phillips on behalf of Carl Wheeler. (Phillips, Stephen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/18/2019 for Defendants James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Jeff Dewey, Seth Rundle to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/17/2018. (ca)
December 10, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeff Dewey, Jeff Easter, James Fleetwood, Bernie Lumbreras, Seth Rundle, Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners, Melinda Slater, Carl Wheeler. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Robby Taylor. (Johnston, Shayla)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654313.), filed by Robby Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Striking of Sanction Notice, 1.15.18, #2 Exhibit Excerpted Transcript of Proceedings, #3 Exhibit Memorandum Decision, 2.12.18, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Robby Taylor, 10.3.18, #5 Exhibit Disqualification Motion, 3.20.18, #6 Exhibit Disqualification Motion Denial, 3.27.18, #7 Exhibit Disqualification Affidavit, 3.29.18, #8 Exhibit Notice of Demand for Recusal Decision, 4.11.18, #9 Exhibit Legal Sufficiency Denial of Reassignment Affidavit, 4.13.18, #10 Exhibit Minute Sheet, 6.27.18, #11 Exhibit Contempt Motion, 9.21.18, #12 Exhibit Responsive Pleadings for Hearing 10.1.18, #13 Exhibit Rule 400 Request for Continuance, 10.1.18, #14 Exhibit - Redacted Redacted Minute Sheets of Concurrent, Conflicting Docket, 10.1.18, #15 Exhibit Minute Sheet dated 10.2.18, #16 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Venue and Reconsider Attorney Disqualification, 10.8.18, #17 Exhibit Notice of Appellate Attorney Disqualification Denial, 10.12.18 and 11.1.18, #18 Exhibit Attorney eFiling Obstruction, 10.13.18, #19 Exhibit Fleetwood Complaint to Yost, 10.29.18)(Johnston, Shayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fleetwood
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Slater
Represented By: Michael P. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Dewey
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: David W. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Wheeler
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Rundle
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Easter
Represented By: David W. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Lumbreras
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robby Taylor
Represented By: Shayla C. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?