Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Heart of America Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Heart of America Management, LLC and HOA Hotels Kansas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02675
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Deborah J. Livesay,Bryan F. Jacoutot for Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Deborah J. Livesay, Bryan F. Jacoutot to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4667656.) by Plaintiff Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 ECF Registration Form, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Boden, Ross)
December 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOA Hotels Kansas, LLC, Heart of America Management, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Boden, Ross)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Boden, Ross)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654347.), filed by Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Boden, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Heart of America Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart of America Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOA Hotels Kansas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ross A. Boden
Represented By: Deborah J. Livesay
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?