Brown v. Olathe, Kansas, City of, et al

Plaintiff: Larry Brown
Defendant: J. Michael Wilkes, Michael Copeland, Shawn Whitcomb, Steven Menke, Jr., City of Olathe, Kansas, ex rel, Steven Menke, John Doe (1) and Olathe, Kansas, City of
Case Number: 2:2018cv02676
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 02/15/2019 for Defendants J. Michael Wilkes, Olathe, Kansas, City of, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, Michael Copeland to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 01/30/2019. (ca)
January 18, 2019 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Larry Brown.(DeKruif, Michael)
December 28, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Olathe, Kansas, City of, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes(Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 28, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Olathe, Kansas, City of, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes (Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 13, 2018 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/28/2018 for Defendants J. Michael Wilkes, Olathe, Kansas, City of, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, Michael Copeland to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/13/2018. (ca)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 7, 2018 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Olathe, Kansas, City of, Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 7, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of State Court Filing by Olathe, Kansas, City of, Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 7, 2018 3 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Rebekah L. Pinkston on behalf of Olathe, Kansas, City of, Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes. (Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Michael Copeland, Steven Menke, Jr., Olathe, Kansas, City of, Shawn Whitcomb, J. Michael Wilkes. (Pinkston, Rebekah)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 18CV05549 Trial location of Kansas City, (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654669.), filed by J. Michael Wilkes, Olathe, Kansas, City of, Steven Menke, Shawn Whitcomb, Michael Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pinkston, Rebekah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Olathe, Kansas, City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Brown
Represented By: Michael K. DeKruif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Wilkes
Represented By: Rebekah L. Pinkston
Represented By: Vaughn Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Copeland
Represented By: Rebekah L. Pinkston
Represented By: Vaughn Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Whitcomb
Represented By: Rebekah L. Pinkston
Represented By: Vaughn Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Menke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Olathe, Kansas, ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Menke
Represented By: Rebekah L. Pinkston
Represented By: Vaughn Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Rebekah L. Pinkston
Represented By: Vaughn Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?