Hewitt v. Allied Business Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Hewitt
Defendant: Allied Business Solutions, LLC, Allied Business Solutions, Inc and Larry S. Alsup
Case Number: 2:2019cv02012
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document originally attached to docket entry #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim contained personal identification. A redacted version has been attached to the entry and is being provided with this entry for notification purposes. (ydm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Barbara Hewitt by Larry S. Alsup, Allied Business Solutions, Inc, Allied Business Solutions, LLC.(Ryburn, Ronald) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Redacted Main Document (ydm).
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Hewitt. Larry S. Alsup waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Crimmins, Virginia)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Hewitt. Allied Business Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Crimmins, Virginia)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Hewitt. Allied Business Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Crimmins, Virginia)
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied Business Solutions, Inc, Allied Business Solutions, LLC, Larry S. Alsup. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Barbara Hewitt. (Crimmins, Virginia)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4677989.), filed by Barbara Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent, #2 Exhibit 2-Agreement)(Crimmins, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt v. Allied Business Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Business Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Business Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Ronald S. Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry S. Alsup
Represented By: Ronald S. Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hewitt
Represented By: Virginia Irene Stevens Crimmins
Represented By: Matthew R. Crimmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?